Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1176 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 2407 Week
» 14112 Month
» 345601 Year
» 422188 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4062
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 01/06/1951
Castle 7027 THORNBURY CASTLE 19/03/1953
Castle 7028 CADBURY CASTLE 29/10/1959
Castle 5077 FAIREY BATTLE 22/12/1960