Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 588 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6193 Week
» 17740 Month
» 417422 Year
» 494009 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4105
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 7034 INCE CASTLE 01/08/1950
Castle 5050 EARL OF ST GERMANS 22/05/1952
Castle 5081 LOCKHEED HUDSON 19/04/1956
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 13/01/1959
Castle 7001 SIR JAMES MILNE 26/03/1960