Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 713 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14119 Week
» 67135 Month
» 186662 Year
» 3213515 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4092
Type |
Hawksworth 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
47t 6cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7023 |
PENRICE CASTLE |
18/10/1954 |
Castle |
5030 |
SHIRBURN CASTLE |
06/11/1954 |
Castle |
5076 |
GLADIATOR |
22/12/1954 |
Castle |
5064 |
BISHOP'S CASTLE |
24/01/1956 |
Castle |
7006 |
LYDFORD CASTLE |
20/11/1956 |
Castle |
5053 |
EARL CAIRNS |
10/10/1960 |
|