Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3900 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17306 Week
» 70322 Month
» 189849 Year
» 3216702 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4104
Type |
Hawksworth 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
47t 6cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7033 |
HARTLEBURY CASTLE |
07/07/1950 |
Castle |
5042 |
WINCHESTER CASTLE |
07/04/1952 |
Castle |
5030 |
SHIRBURN CASTLE |
11/08/1955 |
Castle |
5095 |
BARBURY CASTLE |
18/01/1957 |
|