Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2755 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 18367 Week
» 117012 Month
» 319676 Year
» 3346529 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2889
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5032 |
USK CASTLE |
17/08/1953 |
Castle |
5034 |
CORFE CASTLE |
21/04/1955 |
Castle |
5035 |
COITY CASTLE |
10/12/1956 |
Castle |
5072 |
HURRICANE |
29/07/1958 |
Castle |
7024 |
POWIS CASTLE |
10/09/1960 |
Castle |
7026 |
TENBY CASTLE |
11/04/1962 |
Castle |
5072 |
HURRICANE |
01/12/1964 |
|