Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4248 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17654 Week
» 70670 Month
» 190197 Year
» 3217050 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2900
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5096 |
BRIDGWATER CASTLE |
16/10/1952 |
Castle |
5085 |
EVESHAM ABBEY |
15/04/1954 |
Castle |
7027 |
THORNBURY CASTLE |
13/09/1955 |
Castle |
5092 |
TRESCO ABBEY |
13/12/1956 |
Castle |
5054 |
EARL OF DUCIE |
26/11/1960 |
|