Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 103 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 103 Week
» 21005 Month
» 21005 Year
» 1242570 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2549
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 18/11/1944
Castle 5060 EARL OF BERKELEY 09/02/1945
Castle 7031 CROMWELL'S CASTLE 31/01/1957
Castle 5093 UPTON CASTLE 25/01/1958