Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 984 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18787 Week
» 71803 Month
» 191330 Year
» 3218183 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2779
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Star |
4070 |
NEATH ABBEY |
22/04/1939 |
Castle |
5075 |
WELLINGTON |
27/07/1943 |
Castle |
7006 |
LYDFORD CASTLE |
24/01/1955 |
Castle |
7031 |
CROMWELL'S CASTLE |
13/08/1955 |
Castle |
5094 |
TRETOWER CASTLE |
31/10/1955 |
Castle |
7023 |
PENRICE CASTLE |
16/05/1958 |
|