Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 35 Online
» 4574 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20186 Week
» 118831 Month
» 321495 Year
» 3348348 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4127
Type |
Hawksworth 3,800g Self Weighing |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
3,800gal |
Notes |
Self weighing tender |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4084 |
ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE |
11/08/1952 |
Castle |
5081 |
LOCKHEED HUDSON |
26/09/1952 |
Castle |
5077 |
FAIREY BATTLE |
01/11/1952 |
Castle |
5080 |
DEFIANT |
11/07/1953 |
|