Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 4278 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13852 Week
» 78806 Month
» 281470 Year
» 3308323 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4019
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7007 |
OGMORE CASTLE |
01/07/1946 |
Castle |
7013 |
BRISTOL CASTLE |
04/05/1950 |
Castle |
7012 |
BARRY CASTLE |
04/06/1950 |
Castle |
5095 |
BARBURY CASTLE |
16/11/1951 |
Castle |
5086 |
VISCOUNT HORNE |
11/05/1953 |
Castle |
7008 |
SWANSEA CASTLE |
04/04/1957 |
Castle |
5097 |
SARUM CASTLE |
02/06/1959 |
|