Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 127 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17930 Week
» 70946 Month
» 190473 Year
» 3217326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #5223
Type |
GNR 5,000g |
Company |
GNR |
Water |
5,000gal |
Coal |
8t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
56t 6cwt |
Wheelbase |
5' 3" + 5' 6" + 5' 3" = 16' 0" |
Wheel Diameter |
4' 2" |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
1472 |
FLYING SCOTSMAN |
24/02/1923 |
A1 |
4472 |
FLYING SCOTSMAN |
16/11/1925 |
A1 |
256l |
MINORU |
11/07/1928 |
A3 |
4480 |
ENTERPRISE |
10/04/1937 |
A3 |
2747 |
CORONACH |
14/04/1938 |
A1 |
4481 |
ST SIMON |
07/05/1938 |
A3 |
66 |
MERRY HAMPTON |
02/01/1948 |
A3 |
60108 |
GAY CRUSADER |
06/04/1962 |
|