Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 801 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18604 Week
» 71620 Month
» 191147 Year
» 3218000 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #5255
Type |
GNR 5,000g |
Company |
GNR |
Water |
5,000gal |
Coal |
8t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
56t 6cwt |
Wheelbase |
5' 3" + 5' 6" + 5' 3" = 16' 0" |
Wheel Diameter |
4' 2" |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
2545 |
DIAMOND JUBILEE |
09/08/1924 |
A3 |
2749 |
FLAMINGO |
26/01/1929 |
A3 |
2743 |
FELSTEAD |
06/02/1929 |
A3 |
60087 |
BLENHEIM |
07/11/1957 |
A3 |
60089 |
FELSTEAD |
18/12/1957 |
|