Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 781 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18584 Week
» 71600 Month
» 191127 Year
» 3217980 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #5328
Type |
LNER Corridor |
Company |
LNER |
Water |
5,000gal |
Coal |
9t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
62t 8cwt |
Wheelbase |
5' 3" + 5' 6" + 5' 3" = 16' 0" |
Wheel Diameter |
4' 2" |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
2569 |
GLADIATEUR |
24/04/1928 |
A1 |
2563 |
WILLIAM WHITELAW |
16/05/1928 |
A3 |
2795 |
CALL BOY |
17/06/1930 |
A4 |
4490 |
EMPIRE OF INDIA |
25/06/1937 |
A4 |
4489 |
DOMINION OF CANADA |
06/12/1937 |
A4 |
60006 |
SIR RALPH WEDGWOOD |
24/06/1953 |
A4 |
60010 |
DOMINION OF CANADA |
27/08/1953 |
A4 |
60011 |
EMPIRE OF INDIA |
28/10/1960 |
|