Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 790 Today
» 975 Yesterday
» 790 Week
» 22498 Month
» 285475 Year
» 362062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



Reliable $1 Web Hosting by HostBig

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Guestbook
BRDatabase Guestbook
Thanks for visiting my website. Please leave your comments...
Total Entries: 61   Entries Viewed Per Page: 10
[1] 2 3 ... 7
Name Comments
61) obaki 
Location:
CzarnaBiałostocka Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 6.1; WOW64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/51.0.2704.103 Safari/537.36 View Web Page 
Sunday, 13 August 2017 06:41 Host: 88-119-160-242.bacloud.com Write a comment

Śród moc Dźwigi hydrauliczne Dźwigi hydrauliczne taks wybornych wyrazistszej od liczby.
60) icanadym 
Location:
Janikowo Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 6.1; WOW64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/51.0.2704.103 Safari/537.36 View Web Page 
Tuesday, 8 August 2017 10:32 IP: 31.14.255.234 Write a comment

Materia grafika na szkle Warszawa gaże debetu kabiny prysznicowe Warszawa inicjatywie kolportażu handlowego.
59) Tony Newman  Male
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 10.0; Win64; x64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/60.0.3112.90 Safari/537.36 MSN
Tuesday, 8 August 2017 02:19 Host: CPE84948c8a9681-CM84948c8a9680.cpe.net.cable.rogers.com Write a comment

Further to your history of 90697:
On Wednesday 28 March 1962, Austerity No 90697 (Woodford Halse) was involved in a collision with L1 No. 67767 (Colwick) in Rugby Central station, as the former attempted to leave the siding prematurely - the local passenger train headed by the L1 blocking the points.
58) olini 
Location:
Kowalewo Pomorskie Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 6.1; WOW64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/51.0.2704.103 Safari/537.36 View Web Page 
Friday, 28 July 2017 04:49 IP: 196.16.1.12 Write a comment

Zdobywanie spośród wypadające włosy lek, a może wypadające włosy lek dłużnik rozwija akcja oszczędnościową.
57) Paul 
Location:
Bolton Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 10.0; Win64; x64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/57.0.2987.133 Safari/537.36
Sunday, 9 April 2017 08:03 IP: 2.31.58.231 Write a comment

What a fantastic website this is, I use it all thee time. You deserve some sort of official recognition for all the hard work and your dedication and service to the railway hobby. Another donation on the way.
56) GEOFF GRIFFITHS  Male
Location:
DONCASTER Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Macintosh; Intel Mac OS X 10_10_5) AppleWebKit/602.3.12 (KHTML, like Gecko) Version/10.0.2 Safari/602.3.12 View Web Page 
Monday, 20 March 2017 19:02 Host: 215.237.198.146.dyn.plus.net Write a comment

Absolutely fantastic website...i use it all the time to find information on locomotives. Well done. smile
55) Archie Bennett 
Location:
Ontario, Canada Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 10.0; Win64; x64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/51.0.2704.79 Safari/537.36 Edge/14.14393
Friday, 27 January 2017 22:37 Host: bas1-oakville54-184-146-131-107.dsl.bell.ca Write a comment

Good range of information.
The 1947 directions to visit Perth South shed from the main station appear to refer to the old NBR shed close to the station, on the West side of the tracks, which was closed in 1950.
Perth South was a lot more than 5 minutes walk - more like 25 minutes. The map shows the correct location, however.
54) Stuart Warr  Male
Location:
Porthcawl Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 6.3; WOW64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/55.0.2883.87 Safari/537.36
Tuesday, 24 January 2017 20:54 Host: host-2-100-56-205.as13285.net Write a comment

Just found your website by chance, have had a quick look and I am amazed at how much information you have. I will return and look in greater depth when I have some spare time.
53) alan carter 
Location:
Eccles Manchester Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 6.1; WOW64; rv:50.0) Gecko/20100101 Firefox/50.0
Wednesday, 18 January 2017 15:25 Host: 50-195-136-133-static.hfc.comcastbusiness.net Write a comment

Fantastic web -site thanks to all who keep this running Appreciated..Alan
52) David Finch  Male
Location:
Montreal, Quebec, Canada Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Macintosh; Intel Mac OS X 10.9; rv:50.0) Gecko/20100101 Firefox/50.0 View Web Page 
Friday, 23 December 2016 18:12 Host: modemcable155.86-22-96.mc.videotron.ca Write a comment

Hi Ian,
Fell on your site while researching a particular ex-LNER J50 for a friend. Very helpful and easy to navigate. A magnificent job you've done creating this! I will definitely donate to keep it going.


Cheers,

David
View RSS Feed
[1] 2 3 ... 7