Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 76 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 1937 Week
» 22919 Month
» 164873 Year
» 1049254 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

10 0-6-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Pre Tops) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
13137 D3137 02/03/1955 53C
51A
51L
51C
51L
34E
91E
31B
W
Hull Springhead (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
West Hartlepool
Thornaby
New England
To Eastern Region
March
Withdrawn
02/03/1955
24/03/1956
06/02/1960
26/03/1966
07/10/1967
29/06/1968
20/07/1968
26/10/1968
02/07/1970
02/07/1970
13138 D3138 05/03/1955 53C
51A
51L
34E
91E
31B
W
Hull Springhead (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
New England
To Eastern Region
March
Withdrawn
05/03/1955
24/03/1956
15/11/1958
29/06/1968
20/07/1968
26/10/1968
23/04/1972
23/04/1972
13139 D3139 12/03/1955 53C
51A
51L
W
Hull Springhead (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
12/03/1955
24/03/1956
14/06/1958
10/06/1968
10/06/1968
13140 D3140 29/04/1955 53C
51A
51L
W
Hull Springhead (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
29/04/1955
24/03/1956
14/06/1958
10/06/1968
10/06/1968
13141 D3141 04/05/1955 53C
51A
51L
W
Hull Springhead (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
04/05/1955
24/03/1956
14/06/1958
05/07/1971
05/07/1971
13142 D3142 08/06/1955 53A
51A
51L
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
08/06/1955
18/02/1956
14/06/1958
26/06/1968
26/06/1968
13143 D3143 08/06/1955 53A
51A
51L
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
08/06/1955
18/02/1956
14/06/1958
08/1969
08/1969
13144 D3144 21/06/1955 51B
51A
51L
W
Newport (Teeside) (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
21/06/1955
21/01/1956
14/06/1958
07/1969
07/1969
13145 D3145 22/06/1955 51B
51A
51L
W
Newport (Teeside) (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
22/06/1955
21/01/1956
14/06/1958
23/04/1972
23/04/1972
13146 D3146 07/07/1955 51B
51A
51L
W
Newport (Teeside) (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
07/07/1955
21/01/1956
14/06/1958
12/02/1968
12/02/1968
13147 D3147 12/07/1955 51B
51A
51L
W
Newport (Teeside) (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
12/07/1955
21/01/1956
14/06/1958
06/05/1968
06/05/1968
13148 D3148 15/07/1955 51B
51A
51L
W
Newport (Teeside) (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
15/07/1955
21/01/1956
14/06/1958
05/03/1968
05/03/1968
13149 D3149 21/07/1955 51B
51A
51L
W
Newport (Teeside) (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
21/07/1955
21/01/1956
14/06/1958
02/07/1970
02/07/1970
13150 D3150 28/07/1955 51B
51A
51L
W
Newport (Teeside) (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
28/07/1955
21/01/1956
14/06/1958
10/06/1968
10/06/1968
13151 D3151 08/08/1955 51B
51A
51L
W
Newport (Teeside) (New)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
08/08/1955
21/01/1956
14/06/1958
04/12/1967
04/12/1967
  D3439 24/09/1957 34A
36E
36A
41A
41B
41A
41E
W
Kings Cross (New)
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
24/09/1957
06/02/1960
27/02/1960
02/03/1963
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
01/01/1966
01/09/1968
01/09/1968
  D3440 27/09/1957 34A
34E
41B
41A
41E
W
Kings Cross (New)
New England
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
27/09/1957
19/12/1959
30/05/1964
09/10/1965
01/01/1966
28/12/1968
28/12/1968
  D3441 01/10/1957 34A
34E
30F
30E
W
Kings Cross (New)
New England
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/10/1957
05/12/1959
10/09/1966
07/01/1967
01/09/1968
01/09/1968
  D3442 08/10/1957 34A
34C
40B
40E
40F
40E
16A
W
Kings Cross (New)
Hatfield
Immingham
Colwick
Boston
Colwick
Toton
Withdrawn
08/10/1957
14/11/1959
16/07/1960
12/11/1960
22/04/1961
11/01/1964
16/12/1967
29/09/1968
29/09/1968
  D3443 10/10/1957 34A
36A
41A
41B
41A
30A
W
Kings Cross (New)
Doncaster
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Stratford
Withdrawn
10/10/1957
28/11/1959
28/09/1963
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
09/03/1968
08/12/1968
08/12/1968
  D3444 17/10/1957 34A
36A
41B
41A
34E
31B
W
Kings Cross (New)
Doncaster
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
New England
March
Withdrawn
17/10/1957
28/11/1959
21/11/1964
09/10/1965
06/07/1968
14/09/1968
29/12/1968
29/12/1968
  D3445 22/10/1957 35A
30A
W
New England (New)
Stratford
Withdrawn
22/10/1957
06/05/1967
07/11/1968
07/11/1968
  D3446 25/10/1957 35A
16A
W
New England (New)
Toton
Withdrawn
25/10/1957
12/11/1966
01/06/1968
01/06/1968
  D3447 31/10/1957 35A
16A
W
New England (New)
Toton
Withdrawn
31/10/1957
12/11/1966
23/03/1968
23/03/1968
  D3448 06/11/1957 35A
16A
W
New England (New)
Toton
Withdrawn
06/11/1957
12/11/1966
08/06/1968
08/06/1968
  D3449 08/11/1957 35A
16A
W
New England (New)
Toton
Withdrawn
08/11/1957
12/11/1966
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
  D3450 13/11/1957 35A
34A
34E
16A
W
New England (New)
Kings Cross
New England
Toton
Withdrawn
13/11/1957
08/01/1958
21/11/1959
12/11/1966
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
  D3451 18/11/1957 35A
W
New England (New)
Withdrawn
18/11/1957
14/07/1968
14/07/1968
  D3452 22/11/1957 35A
36A
41B
41A
16A
W
New England (New)
Doncaster
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Toton
Withdrawn
22/11/1957
14/07/1962
19/12/1964
09/10/1965
12/11/1966
22/06/1968
22/06/1968
  D3453 28/11/1957 35A
W
New England (New)
Withdrawn
28/11/1957
14/07/1968
14/07/1968
  D3473 10/12/1957 35A
34A
36A
16A
W
New England (New)
Kings Cross
Doncaster
Toton
Withdrawn
10/12/1957
08/01/1958
28/11/1959
12/11/1966
27/07/1968
27/07/1968
  D3474 11/12/1957 35A
34A
36A
W
New England (New)
Kings Cross
Doncaster
Withdrawn
11/12/1957
08/01/1958
28/11/1959
30/06/1968
30/06/1968
  D3475 18/12/1957 35A
34A
34C
40B
41A
41B
41A
16A
W
New England (New)
Kings Cross
Hatfield
Immingham
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Toton
Withdrawn
18/12/1957
08/01/1958
14/03/1959
16/07/1960
02/03/1963
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
12/11/1966
13/07/1968
13/07/1968
  D3476 24/12/1957 34A
34C
34D
41A
36E
40A
41J
16A
16B
16A
W
Kings Cross (New)
Hatfield
Hitchin (GNR)
Sheffield Darnall
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Lincoln
Shirebrook
Toton
Colwick
Toton
Withdrawn
24/12/1957
08/01/1958
07/01/1961
22/04/1961
04/08/1962
19/06/1965
02/04/1966
03/09/1966
11/11/1967
16/12/1967
01/06/1968
01/06/1968
  D3477 31/12/1957 34A
34C
34D
40B
30A
W
Kings Cross (New)
Hatfield
Hitchin (GNR)
Immingham
Stratford
Withdrawn
31/12/1957
08/01/1958
07/01/1961
29/04/1961
06/05/1967
14/07/1968
14/07/1968
  D3478 16/01/1958 34C
34D
40B
40A
41A
40A
W
Hatfield (New)
Hitchin (GNR)
Immingham
Lincoln
Tinsley
Lincoln
Withdrawn
16/01/1958
07/01/1961
29/04/1961
11/05/1963
13/04/1968
11/05/1968
30/06/1968
30/06/1968
  D3479 22/01/1958 36A
W
Doncaster (New)
Withdrawn
22/01/1958
19/04/1969
19/04/1969
  D3480 28/01/1958 36A
W
Doncaster (New)
Withdrawn
28/01/1958
18/08/1968
18/08/1968
  D3481 24/02/1958 36A
36E
36A
W
Doncaster (New)
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
24/02/1958
12/12/1959
27/02/1960
01/12/1968
01/12/1968
  D3482 28/02/1958 36A
16A
W
Doncaster (New)
Toton
Withdrawn
28/02/1958
12/11/1966
22/06/1968
22/06/1968
  D3483 05/03/1958 36A
W
Doncaster (New)
Withdrawn
05/03/1958
15/03/1969
15/03/1969
  D3484 07/03/1958 36A
W
Doncaster (New)
Withdrawn
07/03/1958
18/08/1968
18/08/1968
  D3485 11/03/1958 35A
31B
W
New England (New)
March
Withdrawn
11/03/1958
14/09/1968
15/12/1968
15/12/1968
  D3486 19/03/1958 34E
31B
W
New England (New)
March
Withdrawn
19/03/1958
26/10/1968
14/11/1970
14/11/1970
  D3487 21/03/1958 34E
W
New England (New)
Withdrawn
21/03/1958
14/07/1968
14/07/1968
  D3488 27/03/1958 34E
31B
W
New England (New)
March
Withdrawn
27/03/1958
26/10/1968
08/12/1968
08/12/1968
  D3489 03/04/1958 34E
40F
40E
16A
W
New England (New)
Boston
Colwick
Toton
Withdrawn
03/04/1958
16/01/1960
11/01/1964
16/12/1967
06/04/1968
06/04/1968
  D3490 14/04/1958 34A
34C
40F
40E
16A
W
Kings Cross (New)
Hatfield
Boston
Colwick
Toton
Withdrawn
14/04/1958
28/03/1959
05/03/1960
11/01/1964
11/05/1968
22/06/1968
22/06/1968
  D3491 16/04/1958 31B
34E
31B
W
March (New)
New England
March
Withdrawn
16/04/1958
29/10/1966
26/10/1968
17/12/1968
17/12/1968
  D3492 24/04/1958 31B
W
March (New)
Withdrawn
24/04/1958
28/06/1969
28/06/1969
  D3493 30/04/1958 31B
31A
31B
16A
W
March (New)
Cambridge
March
Toton
Withdrawn
30/04/1958
12/11/1960
04/02/1961
17/09/1966
22/06/1968
22/06/1968
  D3494 01/05/1958 31B
34E
30A
30F
30E
W
March (New)
New England
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/05/1958
07/11/1964
10/09/1966
10/12/1966
07/01/1967
26/05/1968
26/05/1968
  D3495 15/05/1958 30A
30F
16A
W
Stratford (New)
Parkeston Quay
Toton
Withdrawn
15/05/1958
11/10/1958
17/09/1966
22/06/1968
22/06/1968
  D3496 05/06/1958 30A
30F
30E
W
Stratford (New)
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Withdrawn
05/06/1958
15/11/1958
07/01/1967
26/11/1967
26/11/1967
  D3497 14/12/1957 30A
16A
16B
W
Stratford (New)
Toton
Colwick
Withdrawn
14/12/1957
17/09/1966
11/11/1967
13/04/1968
13/04/1968
  D3498 21/12/1957 30A
16A
W
Stratford (New)
Toton
Withdrawn
21/12/1957
17/09/1966
01/06/1968
01/06/1968
  D3499 28/12/1957 30A
16A
W
Stratford (New)
Toton
Withdrawn
28/12/1957
17/09/1966
20/01/1968
20/01/1968
  D3500 01/01/1958 30A
30F
30A
16A
W
Stratford (New)
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1958
10/05/1958
19/07/1958
17/09/1966
20/01/1968
20/01/1968
  D3501 11/01/1958 30A
30F
30A
16A
W
Stratford (New)
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Toton
Withdrawn
11/01/1958
12/04/1958
19/07/1958
17/09/1966
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
  D3502 15/01/1958 30A
30F
30A
16A
W
Stratford (New)
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Toton
Withdrawn
15/01/1958
12/04/1958
11/10/1958
17/09/1966
03/02/1968
03/02/1968
  D3612 27/06/1958 36E
40A
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New)
Lincoln
Withdrawn
27/06/1958
19/06/1965
15/03/1969
15/03/1969
  D3613 27/06/1958 36E
40A
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New)
Lincoln
Withdrawn
27/06/1958
19/06/1965
15/03/1969
15/03/1969
  D3614 09/07/1958 36E
40A
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New)
Lincoln
Withdrawn
09/07/1958
19/06/1965
15/03/1969
15/03/1969
  D3615 30/07/1958 36E
40A
41J
34E
31B
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New)
Lincoln
Shirebrook
New England
March
Withdrawn
30/07/1958
19/06/1965
02/04/1966
29/10/1966
26/10/1968
28/12/1968
28/12/1968
  D3616 02/08/1958 36E
40A
41J
34E
31B
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New)
Lincoln
Shirebrook
New England
March
Withdrawn
02/08/1958
19/06/1965
02/04/1966
29/10/1966
26/10/1968
07/1969
07/1969
  D3617 06/08/1958 36E
40A
41J
34E
31B
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New)
Lincoln
Shirebrook
New England
March
Withdrawn
06/08/1958
19/06/1965
02/04/1966
29/10/1966
26/10/1968
07/1969
07/1969
  D3618 21/08/1958 36E
40A
41J
41J
40B
40A
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New)
Lincoln
Shirebrook
Shirebrook
Immingham
Lincoln
Withdrawn
21/08/1958
19/06/1965
02/04/1966
31/10/1966
22/07/1967
06/07/1968
19/04/1969
19/04/1969
  D3619 26/08/1958 36E
40A
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New)
Lincoln
Withdrawn
26/08/1958
19/06/1965
15/03/1969
15/03/1969
  D3620 28/08/1958 36E
40A
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New)
Lincoln
Withdrawn
28/08/1958
19/06/1965
19/02/1967
19/02/1967
  D3621 03/09/1958 36E
36A
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
03/09/1958
15/11/1958
07/1969
07/1969
  D3622 09/09/1958 36E
36A
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
09/09/1958
15/11/1958
15/03/1969
15/03/1969
  D3623 11/09/1958 36E
36A
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
11/09/1958
15/11/1958
15/03/1969
15/03/1969
  D3624 19/09/1958 40E
40B
40A
W
Colwick (New)
Immingham
Lincoln
Withdrawn
19/09/1958
19/10/1963
19/06/1965
03/11/1968
03/11/1968
  D3625 02/10/1958 40E
W
Colwick (New)
Withdrawn
02/10/1958
27/07/1968
27/07/1968
  D3626 06/10/1958 40E
W
Colwick (New)
Withdrawn
06/10/1958
27/07/1968
27/07/1968
  D3627 07/10/1958 40E
W
Colwick (New)
Withdrawn
07/10/1958
27/07/1968
27/07/1968
  D3628 16/10/1958 40E
W
Colwick (New)
Withdrawn
16/10/1958
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
  D3629 20/10/1958 40E
34E
30A
W
Colwick (New)
New England
Stratford
Withdrawn
20/10/1958
26/09/1959
10/09/1966
31/05/1969
31/05/1969
  D3630 21/10/1958 40E
34E
30A
W
Colwick (New)
New England
Stratford
Withdrawn
21/10/1958
26/09/1959
10/09/1966
19/12/1968
19/12/1968
  D3631 23/10/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
23/10/1958
25/06/1967
25/06/1967
  D3632 28/10/1958 30A
16A
W
Stratford (New)
Toton
Withdrawn
28/10/1958
17/09/1966
27/07/1968
27/07/1968
  D3633 31/10/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
31/10/1958
28/12/1968
28/12/1968
  D3634 03/11/1958 30A
31B
36A
W
Stratford (New)
March
Doncaster
Withdrawn
03/11/1958
13/09/1969
15/05/1971
19/11/1971
19/11/1971
  D3635 05/11/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
05/11/1958
28/12/1968
28/12/1968
  D3636 13/11/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
13/11/1958
07/04/1968
07/04/1968
  D3637 13/11/1958 40B
34A
36A
W
Immingham (New)
Kings Cross
Doncaster
Withdrawn
13/11/1958
26/09/1959
28/11/1959
12/11/1968
12/11/1968
  D3638 24/11/1958 36C
36A
R
W
Frodingham (New)
Doncaster
Reinstated
Withdrawn
24/11/1958
12/08/1967
21/03/1970
07/11/1970
07/11/1970
  D3639 25/11/1958 36C
40B
36A
W
Frodingham (New)
Immingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
25/11/1958
06/07/1968
03/05/1969
07/1969
07/1969
  D3640 28/11/1958 36C
W
Frodingham (New)
Withdrawn
28/11/1958
03/12/1968
03/12/1968
  D3641 05/12/1958 36C
W
Frodingham (New)
Withdrawn
05/12/1958
05/12/1971
05/12/1971
  D3642 05/12/1958 36C
W
Frodingham (New)
Withdrawn
05/12/1958
28/06/1969
28/06/1969
  D3643 12/12/1958 36C
W
Frodingham (New)
Withdrawn
12/12/1958
06/10/1968
06/10/1968
  D3644 12/12/1958 36C
W
Frodingham (New)
Withdrawn
12/12/1958
15/06/1970
15/06/1970
  D3645 16/12/1958 36C
W
Frodingham (New)
Withdrawn
16/12/1958
15/03/1969
15/03/1969
  D3646 19/12/1958 36C
36A
W
Frodingham (New)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
19/12/1958
20/02/1971
09/05/1971
09/05/1971
  D3647 23/12/1958 36C
86A
W
Frodingham (New)
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
23/12/1958
29/11/1964
15/03/1970
15/03/1970
  D3648 07/01/1959 36C
36A
36C
86A
36A
52A
W
Frodingham (New)
Doncaster
Frodingham
Cardiff Canton
Doncaster
Gateshead
Withdrawn
07/01/1959
12/12/1959
29/09/1962
29/11/1964
19/08/1967
09/01/1971
24/01/1971
24/01/1971
  D3649 09/01/1959 36C
36A
86A
W
Frodingham (New)
Doncaster
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
09/01/1959
11/04/1959
29/11/1964
07/1969
07/1969
  D3650 27/01/1959 36A
W
Doncaster (New)
Withdrawn
27/01/1959
05/12/1971
05/12/1971
  D3651 25/02/1959 36A
W
Doncaster (New)
Withdrawn
25/02/1959
12/12/1971
12/12/1971
  D4049 11/01/1961 41A
41B
41A
41A
36A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Tinsley
Doncaster
Withdrawn
11/01/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
05/02/1966
26/12/1970
03/01/1972
03/01/1972
  D4050 18/01/1961 41A
41B
41A
41A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Tinsley
Withdrawn
18/01/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
05/02/1966
31/12/1971
31/12/1971
  D4051 18/01/1961 41A
41B
41A
41A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Tinsley
Withdrawn
18/01/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
05/02/1966
04/07/1971
04/07/1971
  D4052 25/01/1961 41A
41B
41A
41A
36A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Tinsley
Doncaster
Withdrawn
25/01/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
05/02/1966
14/06/1969
12/10/1970
12/10/1970
  D4053 28/01/1961 41A
41J
41J
40B
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Langwith Junction
Shirebrook
Immingham
Withdrawn
28/01/1961
15/12/1962
31/10/1966
26/07/1969
31/12/1971
31/12/1971
  D4054 02/02/1961 41A
41B
41A
41A
36A
51L
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Tinsley
Doncaster
Thornaby
Withdrawn
02/02/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
05/02/1966
28/11/1970
18/03/1972
11/06/1972
11/06/1972
  D4055 08/02/1961 41A
41B
41A
36A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Doncaster
Withdrawn
08/02/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
06/11/1965
31/12/1971
31/12/1971
  D4056 11/02/1961 41A
41B
41A
40A
40B
41J
40B
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Lincoln
Immingham
Shirebrook
Immingham
Withdrawn
11/02/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
06/11/1965
02/03/1968
27/12/1969
29/01/1972
11/06/1972
11/06/1972
  D4057 18/02/1961 41A
41J
41J
41A
41J
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Langwith Junction
Shirebrook
Tinsley
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
18/02/1961
15/12/1962
31/10/1966
23/08/1969
26/12/1970
21/01/1972
21/01/1972
  D4058 22/02/1961 41A
41B
41A
36A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Doncaster
Withdrawn
22/02/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
06/11/1965
03/01/1972
03/01/1972
  D4059 03/03/1961 41A
41B
41A
40B
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Immingham
Withdrawn
03/03/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
13/11/1965
12/12/1971
12/12/1971
  D4060 09/03/1961 41A
41J
41J
36A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Langwith Junction
Shirebrook
Doncaster
Withdrawn
09/03/1961
15/12/1962
31/10/1966
26/07/1969
31/12/1971
31/12/1971
  D4061 15/03/1961 41A
41J
41J
40A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Langwith Junction
Shirebrook
Lincoln
Withdrawn
15/03/1961
15/12/1962
31/10/1966
26/07/1969
03/01/1972
03/01/1972
  D4062 24/03/1961 41A
41B
41A
40B
36C
40B
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Immingham
Frodingham
Immingham
Withdrawn
24/03/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
13/11/1965
29/11/1969
08/01/1972
11/01/1972
11/01/1972
  D4063 07/04/1961 41A
41B
41A
40B
40A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Immingham
Lincoln
Withdrawn
07/04/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
13/11/1965
24/10/1970
11/06/1972
11/06/1972
  D4064 07/04/1961 41A
41B
41A
40E
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Colwick
Withdrawn
07/04/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
13/11/1965
27/07/1968
27/07/1968
  D4065 15/04/1961 41A
41B
41A
40B
40A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Immingham
Lincoln
Withdrawn
15/04/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
11/12/1965
17/05/1969
07/11/1971
07/11/1971
  D4066 24/04/1961 41A
41J
41J
40B
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Langwith Junction
Shirebrook
Immingham
Withdrawn
24/04/1961
15/12/1962
31/10/1966
10/07/1971
25/06/1972
25/06/1972
  D4067 02/05/1961 41A
41J
41J
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Langwith Junction
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
02/05/1961
15/12/1962
31/10/1966
13/12/1970
13/12/1970
  D4068 10/05/1961 41A
41B
41A
40B
41J
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Immingham
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
10/05/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
11/12/1965
31/10/1966
11/06/1972
11/06/1972
  D4069 25/05/1961 41A
41J
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Langwith Junction
Withdrawn
25/05/1961
15/12/1962
23/04/1972
23/04/1972
  D4070 05/06/1961 41A
41B
41A
34E
31B
34E
30A
40B
41J
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
New England
March
New England
Stratford
Immingham
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
05/06/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
18/12/1965
15/01/1966
04/06/1966
10/09/1966
13/09/1969
27/12/1969
23/04/1972
23/04/1972
  D4071 21/06/1961 41A
41B
41A
34E
31B
34E
30A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
New England
March
New England
Stratford
Withdrawn
21/06/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
18/12/1965
15/01/1966
04/06/1966
10/09/1966
14/07/1968
14/07/1968
  D4072 26/07/1961 41A
41B
41A
41E
34E
31B
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
New England
March
Withdrawn
26/07/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
01/01/1966
06/07/1968
26/10/1968
23/04/1972
23/04/1972
  D4073 05/08/1961 41A
41B
41A
40B
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Immingham
Withdrawn
05/08/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
25/12/1965
25/06/1972
25/06/1972
  D4074 24/08/1961 41A
41B
41A
40A
41J
41J
34E
31B
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Lincoln
Shirebrook
Shirebrook
New England
March
Withdrawn
24/08/1961
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
25/12/1965
02/04/1966
31/10/1966
06/07/1968
26/10/1968
23/04/1972
23/04/1972
  D4075 30/09/1961 34E
40A
W
New England (New)
Lincoln
Withdrawn
30/09/1961
26/10/1968
11/06/1972
11/06/1972
  D4076 14/10/1961 34E
W
New England (New)
Withdrawn
14/10/1961
14/07/1968
14/07/1968
  D4077 31/10/1961 34E
31B
W
New England (New)
March
Withdrawn
31/10/1961
26/10/1968
14/11/1970
14/11/1970
  D4078 13/11/1961 34G
36A
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
13/11/1961
29/09/1962
11/06/1972
11/06/1972
  D4079 30/11/1961 36A
40A
36A
40B
W
Doncaster (New)
Lincoln
Doncaster
Immingham
Withdrawn
30/11/1961
26/10/1968
08/02/1969
14/06/1969
25/06/1972
25/06/1972
  D4080 16/12/1961 36A
W
Doncaster (New)
Withdrawn
16/12/1961
11/02/1968
11/02/1968
  D4081 11/01/1962 36A
W
Doncaster (New)
Withdrawn
11/01/1962
30/06/1968
30/06/1968
  D4082 17/01/1962 36A
W
Doncaster (New)
Withdrawn
17/01/1962
30/06/1968
30/06/1968
  D4083 26/01/1962 34G
34E
W
Finsbury Park (New)
New England
Withdrawn
26/01/1962
01/12/1962
14/07/1968
14/07/1968
  D4084 03/02/1962 34G
34E
W
Finsbury Park (New)
New England
Withdrawn
03/02/1962
12/01/1963
14/07/1968
14/07/1968
  D4085 08/02/1962 34G
41J
41J
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Langwith Junction
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
08/02/1962
02/03/1963
31/10/1966
30/06/1968
30/06/1968
  D4086 15/02/1962 40F
40E
W
Boston (New)
Colwick
Withdrawn
15/02/1962
11/01/1964
27/07/1968
27/07/1968
  D4087 28/02/1962 40B
34E
W
Immingham (New)
New England
Withdrawn
28/02/1962
18/05/1963
01/09/1968
01/09/1968
  D4088 02/03/1962 40B
40E
40B
W
Immingham (New)
Colwick
Immingham
Withdrawn
02/03/1962
19/06/1965
01/01/1966
11/08/1968
11/08/1968
  D4089 08/03/1962 16D
41A
41A
41B
41A
40B
W
Annesley (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Immingham
Withdrawn
08/03/1962
05/05/1962
26/05/1962
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
23/09/1967
18/08/1968
18/08/1968
  D4090 14/03/1962 9G
41A
41A
41B
41A
40B
W
Gorton (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Immingham
Withdrawn
14/03/1962
05/05/1962
26/05/1962
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
23/09/1967
11/08/1968
11/08/1968
  D4091 25/04/1962 41A
41B
41A
41E
36A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
25/04/1962
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
01/01/1966
24/02/1968
11/08/1968
11/08/1968
  D4092 02/05/1962 41A
41B
41A
41E
34E
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
New England
Withdrawn
02/05/1962
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
01/01/1966
06/07/1968
01/09/1968
01/09/1968
  D4093 19/05/1962 41A
41B
41A
40B
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Immingham
Withdrawn
19/05/1962
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
23/09/1967
11/08/1968
11/08/1968
  D4094 05/06/1962 41A
41B
41A
40B
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Immingham
Withdrawn
05/06/1962
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
23/09/1967
11/08/1968
11/08/1968