Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 75 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 1936 Week
» 22918 Month
» 164872 Year
» 1049253 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

10 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
02/03/1955 To Service 13137   NEW 53C Hull Springhead  
05/03/1955 To Service 13138   NEW 53C Hull Springhead  
12/03/1955 To Service 13139   NEW 53C Hull Springhead  
29/04/1955 To Service 13140   NEW 53C Hull Springhead  
04/05/1955 To Service 13141   NEW 53C Hull Springhead  
08/06/1955 To Service 13142   NEW 53A Hull Dairycoates  
08/06/1955 To Service 13143   NEW 53A Hull Dairycoates  
21/06/1955 To Service 13144   NEW 51B Newport (Teeside)  
22/06/1955 To Service 13145   NEW 51B Newport (Teeside)  
07/07/1955 To Service 13146   NEW 51B Newport (Teeside)  
12/07/1955 To Service 13147   NEW 51B Newport (Teeside)  
15/07/1955 To Service 13148   NEW 51B Newport (Teeside)  
21/07/1955 To Service 13149   NEW 51B Newport (Teeside)  
28/07/1955 To Service 13150   NEW 51B Newport (Teeside)  
08/08/1955 To Service 13151   NEW 51B Newport (Teeside)  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 13144 51B Newport (Teeside) 51A Darlington  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 13145 51B Newport (Teeside) 51A Darlington  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 13146 51B Newport (Teeside) 51A Darlington  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 13147 51B Newport (Teeside) 51A Darlington  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 13148 51B Newport (Teeside) 51A Darlington  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 13149 51B Newport (Teeside) 51A Darlington  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 13150 51B Newport (Teeside) 51A Darlington  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 13151 51B Newport (Teeside) 51A Darlington  
18/02/1956 Reallocation 13142 53A Hull Dairycoates 51A Darlington  
18/02/1956 Reallocation 13143 53A Hull Dairycoates 51A Darlington  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 13137 53C Hull Springhead 51A Darlington  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 13138 53C Hull Springhead 51A Darlington  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 13139 53C Hull Springhead 51A Darlington  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 13140 53C Hull Springhead 51A Darlington  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 13141 53C Hull Springhead 51A Darlington  
24/09/1957 To Service 3439   NEW 34A Kings Cross  
27/09/1957 To Service 3440   NEW 34A Kings Cross  
01/10/1957 To Service 3441   NEW 34A Kings Cross  
08/10/1957 To Service 3442   NEW 34A Kings Cross  
10/10/1957 To Service 3443   NEW 34A Kings Cross  
17/10/1957 To Service 3444   NEW 34A Kings Cross  
22/10/1957 To Service 3445   NEW 35A New England  
25/10/1957 To Service 3446   NEW 35A New England  
31/10/1957 To Service 3447   NEW 35A New England  
06/11/1957 To Service 3448   NEW 35A New England  
08/11/1957 To Service 3449   NEW 35A New England  
13/11/1957 To Service 3450   NEW 35A New England  
18/11/1957 To Service 3451   NEW 35A New England  
22/11/1957 To Service 3452   NEW 35A New England  
28/11/1957 To Service 3453   NEW 35A New England  
10/12/1957 To Service 3473   NEW 35A New England  
11/12/1957 To Service 3474   NEW 35A New England  
14/12/1957 To Service 3497   NEW 30A Stratford  
18/12/1957 To Service 3475   NEW 35A New England  
21/12/1957 To Service 3498   NEW 30A Stratford  
24/12/1957 To Service 3476   NEW 34A Kings Cross  
28/12/1957 To Service 3499   NEW 30A Stratford  
31/12/1957 To Service 3477   NEW 34A Kings Cross  
01/01/1958 To Service 3500   NEW 30A Stratford  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 3450 35A New England 34A Kings Cross  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 3473 35A New England 34A Kings Cross  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 3474 35A New England 34A Kings Cross  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 3475 35A New England 34A Kings Cross  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 3476 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 3477 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
11/01/1958 To Service 3501   NEW 30A Stratford  
15/01/1958 To Service 3502   NEW 30A Stratford  
16/01/1958 To Service 3478   NEW 34C Hatfield  
22/01/1958 To Service 3479   NEW 36A Doncaster  
28/01/1958 To Service 3480   NEW 36A Doncaster  
24/02/1958 To Service 3481   NEW 36A Doncaster  
28/02/1958 To Service 3482   NEW 36A Doncaster  
05/03/1958 To Service 3483   NEW 36A Doncaster  
07/03/1958 To Service 3484   NEW 36A Doncaster  
11/03/1958 To Service 3485   NEW 35A New England  
19/03/1958 To Service 3486   NEW 34E New England  
21/03/1958 To Service 3487   NEW 34E New England  
27/03/1958 To Service 3488   NEW 34E New England  
03/04/1958 To Service 3489   NEW 34E New England  
12/04/1958 Reallocation 3501 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
12/04/1958 Reallocation 3502 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
14/04/1958 To Service 3490   NEW 34A Kings Cross  
16/04/1958 To Service 3491   NEW 31B March  
24/04/1958 To Service 3492   NEW 31B March  
30/04/1958 To Service 3493   NEW 31B March  
01/05/1958 To Service 3494   NEW 31B March  
10/05/1958 Reallocation 3500 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
15/05/1958 To Service 3495   NEW 30A Stratford  
05/06/1958 To Service 3496   NEW 30A Stratford  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 13139 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 13140 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 13141 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 13142 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 13143 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 13144 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 3145 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 3146 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 13147 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 13148 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 13149 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 13150 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 13151 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
27/06/1958 To Service 3612   NEW 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
27/06/1958 To Service 3613   NEW 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
09/07/1958 To Service 3614   NEW 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
19/07/1958 Reallocation 3500 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
19/07/1958 Reallocation 3501 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
30/07/1958 To Service 3615   NEW 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
02/08/1958 To Service 3616   NEW 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
06/08/1958 To Service 3617   NEW 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
21/08/1958 To Service 3618   NEW 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
26/08/1958 To Service 3619   NEW 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
28/08/1958 To Service 3620   NEW 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
03/09/1958 To Service 3621   NEW 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
09/09/1958 To Service 3622   NEW 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
11/09/1958 To Service 3623   NEW 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
19/09/1958 To Service 3624   NEW 40E Colwick  
02/10/1958 To Service 3625   NEW 40E Colwick  
06/10/1958 To Service 3626   NEW 40E Colwick  
07/10/1958 To Service 3627   NEW 40E Colwick  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 3495 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 3502 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
16/10/1958 To Service 3628   NEW 40E Colwick  
20/10/1958 To Service 3629   NEW 40E Colwick  
21/10/1958 To Service 3630   NEW 40E Colwick  
23/10/1958 To Service 3631   NEW 30A Stratford  
28/10/1958 To Service 3632   NEW 30A Stratford  
31/10/1958 To Service 3633   NEW 30A Stratford  
03/11/1958 To Service 3634   NEW 30A Stratford  
05/11/1958 To Service 3635   NEW 30A Stratford  
13/11/1958 To Service 3636   NEW 30A Stratford  
13/11/1958 To Service 3637   NEW 40B Immingham  
15/11/1958 Reallocation 3138 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
15/11/1958 Reallocation 3496 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
15/11/1958 Reallocation 3621 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36A Doncaster  
15/11/1958 Reallocation 3622 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36A Doncaster  
15/11/1958 Reallocation 3623 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36A Doncaster  
24/11/1958 To Service 3638   NEW 36C Frodingham  
25/11/1958 To Service 3639   NEW 36C Frodingham  
28/11/1958 To Service 3640   NEW 36C Frodingham  
05/12/1958 To Service 3641   NEW 36C Frodingham  
05/12/1958 To Service 3642   NEW 36C Frodingham  
12/12/1958 To Service 3643   NEW 36C Frodingham  
12/12/1958 To Service 3644   NEW 36C Frodingham  
16/12/1958 To Service 3645   NEW 36C Frodingham  
19/12/1958 To Service 3646   NEW 36C Frodingham  
23/12/1958 To Service 3647   NEW 36C Frodingham  
07/01/1959 To Service 3648   NEW 36C Frodingham  
09/01/1959 To Service 3649   NEW 36C Frodingham  
27/01/1959 To Service 3650   NEW 36A Doncaster  
25/02/1959 To Service 3651   NEW 36A Doncaster  
14/03/1959 Reallocation 3475 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
28/03/1959 Reallocation 3490 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 3649 36C Frodingham 36A Doncaster  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 3629 40E Colwick 34E New England  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 3630 40E Colwick 34E New England  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 3637 40B Immingham 34A Kings Cross  
14/11/1959 Reallocation 3442 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 3450 34A Kings Cross 34E New England  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 3443 34A Kings Cross 36A Doncaster  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 3444 34A Kings Cross 36A Doncaster  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 3473 34A Kings Cross 36A Doncaster  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 3474 34A Kings Cross 36A Doncaster  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 3637 34A Kings Cross 36A Doncaster  
05/12/1959 Reallocation 3441 34A Kings Cross 34E New England  
12/12/1959 Reallocation 3481 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
12/12/1959 Reallocation 3648 36C Frodingham 36A Doncaster  
19/12/1959 Reallocation 3440 34A Kings Cross 34E New England  
16/01/1960 Reallocation 3489 34E New England 40F Boston  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 3137 51A Darlington 51L Thornaby  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 3439 34A Kings Cross 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
27/02/1960 Reallocation 3439 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36A Doncaster  
27/02/1960 Reallocation 3481 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36A Doncaster  
05/03/1960 Reallocation 3490 34C Hatfield 40F Boston  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 3442 34C Hatfield 40B Immingham  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 3475 34C Hatfield 40B Immingham  
12/11/1960 Reallocation 3442 40B Immingham 40E Colwick  
12/11/1960 Reallocation 3493 31B March 31A Cambridge  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 3476 34C Hatfield 34D Hitchin (GNR)  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 3477 34C Hatfield 34D Hitchin (GNR)  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 3478 34C Hatfield 34D Hitchin (GNR)  
11/01/1961 To Service 4049   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
18/01/1961 To Service 4050   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
18/01/1961 To Service 4051   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
25/01/1961 To Service 4052   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
28/01/1961 To Service 4053   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
02/02/1961 To Service 4054   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
04/02/1961 Reallocation 3493 31A Cambridge 31B March  
08/02/1961 To Service 4055   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
11/02/1961 To Service 4056   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
18/02/1961 To Service 4057   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
22/02/1961 To Service 4058   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
03/03/1961 To Service 4059   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
09/03/1961 To Service 4060   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
15/03/1961 To Service 4061   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
24/03/1961 To Service 4062   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
07/04/1961 To Service 4063   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
07/04/1961 To Service 4064   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
15/04/1961 To Service 4065   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
22/04/1961 Reallocation 3442 40E Colwick 40F Boston  
22/04/1961 Reallocation 3476 34D Hitchin (GNR) 41A Sheffield Darnall  
24/04/1961 To Service 4066   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
29/04/1961 Reallocation 3477 34D Hitchin (GNR) 40B Immingham  
29/04/1961 Reallocation 3478 34D Hitchin (GNR) 40B Immingham  
02/05/1961 To Service 4067   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
10/05/1961 To Service 4068   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
25/05/1961 To Service 4069   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
05/06/1961 To Service 4070   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
21/06/1961 To Service 4071   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
26/07/1961 To Service 4072   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
05/08/1961 To Service 4073   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
24/08/1961 To Service 4074   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
30/09/1961 To Service 4075   NEW 34E New England  
14/10/1961 To Service 4076   NEW 34E New England  
31/10/1961 To Service 4077   NEW 34E New England  
13/11/1961 To Service 4078   NEW 34G Finsbury Park  
30/11/1961 To Service 4079   NEW 36A Doncaster  
16/12/1961 To Service 4080   NEW 36A Doncaster  
11/01/1962 To Service 4081   NEW 36A Doncaster  
17/01/1962 To Service 4082   NEW 36A Doncaster  
26/01/1962 To Service 4083   NEW 34G Finsbury Park  
03/02/1962 To Service 4084   NEW 34G Finsbury Park  
08/02/1962 To Service 4085   NEW 34G Finsbury Park  
15/02/1962 To Service 4086   NEW 40F Boston  
28/02/1962 To Service 4087   NEW 40B Immingham  
02/03/1962 To Service 4088   NEW 40B Immingham  
08/03/1962 To Service 4089   NEW 16D Annesley  
14/03/1962 To Service 4090   NEW 9G Gorton  
25/04/1962 To Service 4091   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1962 To Service 4092   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 4089 16D Annesley 41A Sheffield Darnall  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 4090 9G Gorton 41A Sheffield Darnall  
19/05/1962 To Service 4093   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
26/05/1962 Reallocation 4089 41A Sheffield Darnall 41A Sheffield Darnall  
26/05/1962 Reallocation 4090 41A Sheffield Darnall 41A Sheffield Darnall  
05/06/1962 To Service 4094   NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 3452 35A New England 36A Doncaster  
04/08/1962 Reallocation 3476 41A Sheffield Darnall 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
29/09/1962 Reallocation 3648 36A Doncaster 36C Frodingham  
29/09/1962 Reallocation 4078 34G Finsbury Park 36A Doncaster  
01/12/1962 Reallocation 4083 34G Finsbury Park 34E New England  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 4053 41A Sheffield Darnall 41J Langwith Junction  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 4057 41A Sheffield Darnall 41J Langwith Junction  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 4060 41A Sheffield Darnall 41J Langwith Junction  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 4061 41A Sheffield Darnall 41J Langwith Junction  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 4066 41A Sheffield Darnall 41J Langwith Junction  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 4067 41A Sheffield Darnall 41J Langwith Junction  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 4069 41A Sheffield Darnall 41J Langwith Junction  
12/01/1963 Reallocation 4084 34G Finsbury Park 34E New England  
02/03/1963 Reallocation 3439 36A Doncaster 41A Sheffield Darnall  
02/03/1963 Reallocation 3475 40B Immingham 41A Sheffield Darnall  
02/03/1963 Reallocation 4085 34G Finsbury Park 41J Langwith Junction  
11/05/1963 Reallocation 3478 40B Immingham 40A Lincoln  
18/05/1963 Reallocation 4087 40B Immingham 34E New England  
28/09/1963 Reallocation 3443 36A Doncaster 41A Sheffield Darnall  
19/10/1963 Reallocation 3624 40E Colwick 40B Immingham  
11/01/1964 Reallocation 3442 40F Boston 40E Colwick  
11/01/1964 Reallocation 3489 40F Boston 40E Colwick  
11/01/1964 Reallocation 3490 40F Boston 40E Colwick  
11/01/1964 Reallocation 4086 40F Boston 40E Colwick  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 3439 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 3443 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 3475 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4049 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4050 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4051 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4052 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4054 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4055 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4056 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4058 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4059 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4062 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4063 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4064 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4065 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4068 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4070 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4071 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4072 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4073 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4074 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4089 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4090 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4091 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4092 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4093 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
02/05/1964 Reallocation 4094 41A Sheffield Darnall 41B Sheffield Darnall  
30/05/1964 Reallocation 3440 34E New England 41B Sheffield Darnall  
07/11/1964 Reallocation 3494 31B March 34E New England  
21/11/1964 Reallocation 3444 36A Doncaster 41B Sheffield Darnall  
29/11/1964 Reallocation 3647 36C Frodingham 86A Cardiff Canton  
29/11/1964 Reallocation 3648 36C Frodingham 86A Cardiff Canton  
29/11/1964 Reallocation 3649 36A Doncaster 86A Cardiff Canton  
19/12/1964 Reallocation 3452 36A Doncaster 41B Sheffield Darnall  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 3476 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 3612 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 3613 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 3614 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 3615 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 3616 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 3617 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 3618 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 3619 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 3620 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 3624 40B Immingham 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 4088 40B Immingham 40E Colwick  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 3439 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 3440 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 3443 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 3444 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 3452 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 3475 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4049 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4050 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4051 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4052 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4054 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4055 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4056 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4058 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4059 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4062 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4063 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4064 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4065 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4068 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4070 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4071 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4072 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4073 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4074 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4089 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4090 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4091 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4092 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4093 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
09/10/1965 Reallocation 4094 41B Sheffield Darnall 41A Tinsley  
06/11/1965 Reallocation 4055 41A Tinsley 36A Doncaster  
06/11/1965 Reallocation 4056 41A Tinsley 40A Lincoln  
06/11/1965 Reallocation 4058 41A Tinsley 36A Doncaster  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 4059 41A Tinsley 40B Immingham  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 4062 41A Tinsley 40B Immingham  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 4063 41A Tinsley 40B Immingham  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 4064 41A Tinsley 40E Colwick  
11/12/1965 Reallocation 4065 41A Tinsley 40B Immingham  
11/12/1965 Reallocation 4068 41A Tinsley 40B Immingham  
18/12/1965 Reallocation 4070 41A Tinsley 34E New England  
18/12/1965 Reallocation 4071 41A Tinsley 34E New England  
25/12/1965 Reallocation 4073 41A Tinsley 40B Immingham  
25/12/1965 Reallocation 4074 41A Tinsley 40A Lincoln  
01/01/1966 Reallocation 3439 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
01/01/1966 Reallocation 3440 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
01/01/1966 Reallocation 4072 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
01/01/1966 Reallocation 4088 40E Colwick 40B Immingham  
01/01/1966 Reallocation 4091 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
01/01/1966 Reallocation 4092 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
15/01/1966 Reallocation 4070 34E New England 31B March  
15/01/1966 Reallocation 4071 34E New England 31B March  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 4049 41A Tinsley 41A Tinsley  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 4050 41A Tinsley 41A Tinsley  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 4051 41A Tinsley 41A Tinsley  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 4052 41A Tinsley 41A Tinsley  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 4054 41A Tinsley 41A Tinsley  
26/03/1966 Reallocation 3137 51L Thornaby 51C West Hartlepool  
02/04/1966 Reallocation 3476 40A Lincoln 41J Shirebrook  
02/04/1966 Reallocation 3615 40A Lincoln 41J Shirebrook  
02/04/1966 Reallocation 3616 40A Lincoln 41J Shirebrook  
02/04/1966 Reallocation 3617 40A Lincoln 41J Shirebrook  
02/04/1966 Reallocation 3618 40A Lincoln 41J Shirebrook  
02/04/1966 Reallocation 4074 40A Lincoln 41J Shirebrook  
04/06/1966 Reallocation 4070 31B March 34E New England  
04/06/1966 Reallocation 4071 31B March 34E New England  
03/09/1966 Reallocation 3476 41J Shirebrook 16A Toton  
10/09/1966 Reallocation 3441 34E New England 30F Parkeston Quay  
10/09/1966 Reallocation 3494 34E New England 30A Stratford  
10/09/1966 Reallocation 3629 34E New England 30A Stratford  
10/09/1966 Reallocation 3630 34E New England 30A Stratford  
10/09/1966 Reallocation 4070 34E New England 30A Stratford  
10/09/1966 Reallocation 4071 34E New England 30A Stratford  
17/09/1966 Reallocation 3493 31B March 16A Toton  
17/09/1966 Reallocation 3495 30F Parkeston Quay 16A Toton  
17/09/1966 Reallocation 3497 30A Stratford 16A Toton  
17/09/1966 Reallocation 3498 30A Stratford 16A Toton  
17/09/1966 Reallocation 3499 30A Stratford 16A Toton  
17/09/1966 Reallocation 3500 30A Stratford 16A Toton  
17/09/1966 Reallocation 3501 30A Stratford 16A Toton  
17/09/1966 Reallocation 3502 30A Stratford 16A Toton  
17/09/1966 Reallocation 3632 30A Stratford 16A Toton  
29/10/1966 Reallocation 3491 31B March 34E New England  
29/10/1966 Reallocation 3615 41J Shirebrook 34E New England  
29/10/1966 Reallocation 3616 41J Shirebrook 34E New England  
29/10/1966 Reallocation 3617 41J Shirebrook 34E New England  
31/10/1966 Reallocation 3618 41J Shirebrook 41J Shirebrook  
31/10/1966 Reallocation 4053 41J Langwith Junction 41J Shirebrook  
31/10/1966 Reallocation 4057 41J Langwith Junction 41J Shirebrook  
31/10/1966 Reallocation 4060 41J Langwith Junction 41J Shirebrook  
31/10/1966 Reallocation 4061 41J Langwith Junction 41J Shirebrook  
31/10/1966 Reallocation 4066 41J Langwith Junction 41J Shirebrook  
31/10/1966 Reallocation 4067 41J Langwith Junction 41J Shirebrook  
31/10/1966 Reallocation 4068 40B Immingham 41J Shirebrook  
31/10/1966 Reallocation 4074 41J Shirebrook 41J Shirebrook  
31/10/1966 Reallocation 4085 41J Langwith Junction 41J Shirebrook  
12/11/1966 Reallocation 3446 35A New England 16A Toton  
12/11/1966 Reallocation 3447 35A New England 16A Toton  
12/11/1966 Reallocation 3448 35A New England 16A Toton  
12/11/1966 Reallocation 3449 35A New England 16A Toton  
12/11/1966 Reallocation 3450 34E New England 16A Toton  
12/11/1966 Reallocation 3452 41A Tinsley 16A Toton  
12/11/1966 Reallocation 3473 36A Doncaster 16A Toton  
12/11/1966 Reallocation 3475 41A Tinsley 16A Toton  
12/11/1966 Reallocation 3482 36A Doncaster 16A Toton  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 3494 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
07/01/1967 Reallocation 3441 30F Parkeston Quay 30E Colchester  
07/01/1967 Reallocation 3494 30F Parkeston Quay 30E Colchester  
07/01/1967 Reallocation 3496 30F Parkeston Quay 30E Colchester  
19/02/1967 Condemned 3620 40A Lincoln   COND  
06/05/1967 Reallocation 3445 35A New England 30A Stratford  
06/05/1967 Reallocation 3477 40B Immingham 30A Stratford  
25/06/1967 Condemned 3631 30A Stratford   COND  
22/07/1967 Reallocation 3618 41J Shirebrook 40B Immingham  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 3638 36C Frodingham 36A Doncaster  
19/08/1967 Reallocation 3648 86A Cardiff Canton 36A Doncaster  
23/09/1967 Reallocation 4089 41A Tinsley 40B Immingham  
23/09/1967 Reallocation 4090 41A Tinsley 40B Immingham  
23/09/1967 Reallocation 4093 41A Tinsley 40B Immingham  
23/09/1967 Reallocation 4094 41A Tinsley 40B Immingham  
07/10/1967 Reallocation 3137 51C West Hartlepool 51L Thornaby  
11/11/1967 Reallocation 3476 16A Toton 16B Colwick  
11/11/1967 Reallocation 3497 16A Toton 16B Colwick  
26/11/1967 Condemned 3496 30E Colchester   COND  
04/12/1967 Condemned 3151 51L Thornaby   COND  
16/12/1967 Reallocation 3442 40E Colwick 16A Toton  
16/12/1967 Reallocation 3476 16B Colwick 16A Toton  
16/12/1967 Reallocation 3489 40E Colwick 16A Toton  
30/12/1967 Condemned 3449 16A Toton   COND  
30/12/1967 Condemned 3628 40E Colwick   COND  
20/01/1968 Condemned 3499 16A Toton   COND  
20/01/1968 Condemned 3500 16A Toton   COND  
03/02/1968 Condemned 3502 16A Toton   COND  
11/02/1968 Condemned 4080 36A Doncaster   COND  
12/02/1968 Condemned 3146 51L Thornaby   COND  
24/02/1968 Reallocation 4091 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 36A Doncaster  
02/03/1968 Reallocation 4056 40A Lincoln 40B Immingham  
05/03/1968 Condemned 3148 51L Thornaby   COND  
09/03/1968 Reallocation 3443 41A Tinsley 30A Stratford  
23/03/1968 Condemned 3447 16A Toton   COND  
06/04/1968 Condemned 3489 16A Toton   COND  
07/04/1968 Condemned 3636 30A Stratford   COND  
13/04/1968 Reallocation 3478 40A Lincoln 41A Tinsley  
13/04/1968 Condemned 3497 16B Colwick   COND  
06/05/1968 Condemned 3147 51L Thornaby   COND  
11/05/1968 Reallocation 3478 41A Tinsley 40A Lincoln  
11/05/1968 Reallocation 3490 40E Colwick 16A Toton  
26/05/1968 Condemned 3494 30E Colchester   COND  
01/06/1968 Condemned 3446 16A Toton   COND  
01/06/1968 Condemned 3476 16A Toton   COND  
01/06/1968 Condemned 3498 16A Toton   COND  
08/06/1968 Condemned 3448 16A Toton   COND  
10/06/1968 Condemned 3139 51L Thornaby   COND  
10/06/1968 Condemned 3140 51L Thornaby   COND  
10/06/1968 Condemned 3150 51L Thornaby   COND  
22/06/1968 Condemned 3452 16A Toton   COND  
22/06/1968 Condemned 3482 16A Toton   COND  
22/06/1968 Condemned 3490 16A Toton   COND  
22/06/1968 Condemned 3493 16A Toton   COND  
22/06/1968 Condemned 3495 16A Toton   COND  
26/06/1968 Condemned 3142 51L Thornaby   COND  
29/06/1968 Reallocation 3137 51L Thornaby 34E New England  
29/06/1968 Reallocation 3138 51L Thornaby 34E New England  
29/06/1968 Condemned 3450 16A Toton   COND  
29/06/1968 Condemned 3501 16A Toton   COND  
30/06/1968 Condemned 3474 36A Doncaster   COND  
30/06/1968 Condemned 3478 40A Lincoln   COND  
30/06/1968 Condemned 4081 36A Doncaster   COND  
30/06/1968 Condemned 4082 36A Doncaster   COND  
30/06/1968 Condemned 4085 41J Shirebrook   COND  
06/07/1968 Reallocation 3444 41A Tinsley 34E New England  
06/07/1968 Reallocation 3618 40B Immingham 40A Lincoln  
06/07/1968 Reallocation 3639 36C Frodingham 40B Immingham  
06/07/1968 Reallocation 4072 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 34E New England  
06/07/1968 Reallocation 4074 41J Shirebrook 34E New England  
06/07/1968 Reallocation 4092 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 34E New England  
13/07/1968 Condemned 3475 16A Toton   COND  
14/07/1968 Condemned 3451 35A New England   COND  
14/07/1968 Condemned 3453 35A New England   COND  
14/07/1968 Condemned 3477 30A Stratford   COND  
14/07/1968 Condemned 3487 34E New England   COND  
14/07/1968 Condemned 4071 30A Stratford   COND  
14/07/1968 Condemned 4076 34E New England   COND  
14/07/1968 Condemned 4083 34E New England   COND  
14/07/1968 Condemned 4084 34E New England   COND  
20/07/1968 Reallocation 3137 34E New England 91E To Eastern Region  
20/07/1968 Reallocation 3138 34E New England 91E To Eastern Region  
27/07/1968 Condemned 3473 16A Toton   COND  
27/07/1968 Condemned 3625 40E Colwick   COND  
27/07/1968 Condemned 3626 40E Colwick   COND  
27/07/1968 Condemned 3627 40E Colwick   COND  
27/07/1968 Condemned 3632 16A Toton   COND  
27/07/1968 Condemned 4064 40E Colwick   COND  
27/07/1968 Condemned 4086 40E Colwick   COND  
11/08/1968 Condemned 4088 40B Immingham   COND  
11/08/1968 Condemned 4090 40B Immingham   COND  
11/08/1968 Condemned 4091 36A Doncaster   COND  
11/08/1968 Condemned 4093 40B Immingham   COND  
11/08/1968 Condemned 4094 40B Immingham   COND  
18/08/1968 Condemned 3480 36A Doncaster   COND  
18/08/1968 Condemned 3484 36A Doncaster   COND  
18/08/1968 Condemned 4089 40B Immingham   COND  
01/09/1968 Condemned 3439 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)   COND  
01/09/1968 Condemned 3441 30E Colchester   COND  
01/09/1968 Condemned 4087 34E New England   COND  
01/09/1968 Condemned 4092 34E New England   COND  
14/09/1968 Reallocation 3444 34E New England 31B March  
14/09/1968 Reallocation 3485 35A New England 31B March  
29/09/1968 Condemned 3442 16A Toton   COND  
06/10/1968 Condemned 3643 36C Frodingham   COND  
26/10/1968 Reallocation 3137 91E To Eastern Region 31B March  
26/10/1968 Reallocation 3138 91E To Eastern Region 31B March  
26/10/1968 Reallocation 3486 34E New England 31B March  
26/10/1968 Reallocation 3488 34E New England 31B March  
26/10/1968 Reallocation 3491 34E New England 31B March  
26/10/1968 Reallocation 3615 34E New England 31B March  
26/10/1968 Reallocation 3616 34E New England 31B March  
26/10/1968 Reallocation 3617 34E New England 31B March  
26/10/1968 Reallocation 4072 34E New England 31B March  
26/10/1968 Reallocation 4074 34E New England 31B March  
26/10/1968 Reallocation 4075 34E New England 40A Lincoln  
26/10/1968 Reallocation 4077 34E New England 31B March  
26/10/1968 Reallocation 4079 36A Doncaster 40A Lincoln  
03/11/1968 Condemned 3624 40A Lincoln   COND  
07/11/1968 Condemned 3445 30A Stratford   COND  
12/11/1968 Condemned 3637 36A Doncaster   COND  
01/12/1968 Condemned 3481 36A Doncaster   COND  
03/12/1968 Condemned 3640 36C Frodingham   COND  
08/12/1968 Condemned 3443 30A Stratford   COND  
08/12/1968 Condemned 3488 31B March   COND  
15/12/1968 Condemned 3485 31B March   COND  
17/12/1968 Condemned 3491 31B March   COND  
19/12/1968 Condemned 3630 30A Stratford   COND  
28/12/1968 Condemned 3440 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)   COND  
28/12/1968 Condemned 3615 31B March   COND  
28/12/1968 Condemned 3633 30A Stratford   COND  
28/12/1968 Condemned 3635 30A Stratford   COND  
29/12/1968 Condemned 3444 31B March   COND  
08/02/1969 Reallocation 4079 40A Lincoln 36A Doncaster  
15/03/1969 Condemned 3483 36A Doncaster   COND  
15/03/1969 Condemned 3612 40A Lincoln   COND  
15/03/1969 Condemned 3613 40A Lincoln   COND  
15/03/1969 Condemned 3614 40A Lincoln   COND  
15/03/1969 Condemned 3619 40A Lincoln   COND  
15/03/1969 Condemned 3622 36A Doncaster   COND  
15/03/1969 Condemned 3623 36A Doncaster   COND  
15/03/1969 Condemned 3645 36C Frodingham   COND  
19/04/1969 Condemned 3479 36A Doncaster   COND  
19/04/1969 Condemned 3618 40A Lincoln   COND  
03/05/1969 Reallocation 3639 40B Immingham 36A Doncaster  
17/05/1969 Reallocation 4065 40B Immingham 40A Lincoln  
31/05/1969 Condemned 3629 30A Stratford   COND  
14/06/1969 Reallocation 4052 41A Tinsley 36A Doncaster  
14/06/1969 Reallocation 4079 36A Doncaster 40B Immingham  
28/06/1969 Condemned 3492 31B March   COND  
28/06/1969 Condemned 3642 36C Frodingham   COND  
07/1969 Condemned 3144 51L Thornaby   COND  
07/1969 Condemned 3616 31B March   COND  
07/1969 Condemned 3617 31B March   COND  
07/1969 Condemned 3621 36A Doncaster   COND  
07/1969 Condemned 3639 36A Doncaster   COND  
07/1969 Condemned 3649 86A Cardiff Canton   COND  
26/07/1969 Reallocation 4053 41J Shirebrook 40B Immingham  
26/07/1969 Reallocation 4060 41J Shirebrook 36A Doncaster  
26/07/1969 Reallocation 4061 41J Shirebrook 40A Lincoln  
08/1969 Condemned 3143 51L Thornaby   COND  
23/08/1969 Reallocation 4057 41J Shirebrook 41A Tinsley  
13/09/1969 Reallocation 3634 30A Stratford 31B March  
13/09/1969 Reallocation 4070 30A Stratford 40B Immingham  
29/11/1969 Reallocation 4062 40B Immingham 36C Frodingham  
27/12/1969 Reallocation 4056 40B Immingham 41J Shirebrook  
27/12/1969 Reallocation 4070 40B Immingham 41J Shirebrook  
15/03/1970 Condemned 3647 86A Cardiff Canton   COND  
21/03/1970 Reallocation 3638 36A Doncaster 52A Gateshead  
15/06/1970 Condemned 3644 36C Frodingham   COND  
02/07/1970 Condemned 3137 31B March   COND  
02/07/1970 Condemned 3149 51L Thornaby   COND  
12/10/1970 Condemned 4052 36A Doncaster   COND  
24/10/1970 Reallocation 4063 40B Immingham 40A Lincoln  
07/11/1970 Condemned 3638 52A Gateshead   COND  
14/11/1970 Condemned 3486 31B March   COND  
14/11/1970 Condemned 4077 31B March   COND  
28/11/1970 Reallocation 4054 41A Tinsley 36A Doncaster  
13/12/1970 Condemned 4067 41J Shirebrook   COND  
26/12/1970 Reallocation 4049 41A Tinsley 36A Doncaster  
26/12/1970 Reallocation 4057 41A Tinsley 41J Shirebrook  
09/01/1971 Reallocation 3648 36A Doncaster 52A Gateshead  
24/01/1971 Condemned 3648 52A Gateshead   COND  
20/02/1971 Reallocation 3646 36C Frodingham 36A Doncaster  
09/05/1971 Condemned 3646 36A Doncaster   COND  
15/05/1971 Reallocation 3634 31B March 36A Doncaster  
04/07/1971 Condemned 4051 41A Tinsley   COND  
05/07/1971 Condemned 3141 51L Thornaby   COND  
10/07/1971 Reallocation 4066 41J Shirebrook 40B Immingham  
07/11/1971 Condemned 4065 40A Lincoln   COND  
19/11/1971 Condemned 3634 36A Doncaster   COND  
05/12/1971 Condemned 3641 36C Frodingham   COND  
05/12/1971 Condemned 3650 36A Doncaster   COND  
12/12/1971 Condemned 3651 36A Doncaster   COND  
12/12/1971 Condemned 4059 40B Immingham   COND  
31/12/1971 Condemned 4050 41A Tinsley   COND  
31/12/1971 Condemned 4053 40B Immingham   COND  
31/12/1971 Condemned 4055 36A Doncaster   COND  
31/12/1971 Condemned 4060 36A Doncaster   COND  
03/01/1972 Condemned 4049 36A Doncaster   COND  
03/01/1972 Condemned 4058 36A Doncaster   COND  
03/01/1972 Condemned 4061 40A Lincoln   COND  
08/01/1972 Reallocation 4062 36C Frodingham 40B Immingham  
11/01/1972 Condemned 4062 40B Immingham   COND  
21/01/1972 Condemned 4057 41J Shirebrook   COND  
29/01/1972 Reallocation 4056 41J Shirebrook 40B Immingham  
18/03/1972 Reallocation 4054 36A Doncaster 51L Thornaby  
23/04/1972 Condemned 3138 31B March   COND  
23/04/1972 Condemned 3145 51L Thornaby   COND  
23/04/1972 Condemned 4069 41J Langwith Junction   COND  
23/04/1972 Condemned 4070 41J Shirebrook   COND  
23/04/1972 Condemned 4072 31B March   COND  
23/04/1972 Condemned 4074 31B March   COND  
11/06/1972 Condemned 4054 51L Thornaby   COND  
11/06/1972 Condemned 4056 40B Immingham   COND  
11/06/1972 Condemned 4063 40A Lincoln   COND  
11/06/1972 Condemned 4068 41J Shirebrook   COND  
11/06/1972 Condemned 4075 40A Lincoln   COND  
11/06/1972 Condemned 4078 36A Doncaster   COND  
25/06/1972 Condemned 4066 40B Immingham   COND  
25/06/1972 Condemned 4073 40B Immingham   COND  
25/06/1972 Condemned 4079 40B Immingham   COND