Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 103 Today
» 832 Yesterday
» 2796 Week
» 23778 Month
» 165732 Year
» 1050113 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

10 0-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sun 26/02/1961 D3440,
D3480,
D3482
34E,
36A,
36A
  Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sat 11/11/1961 D3140 51L   Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Crossing. SLS 1/1962  
Sat 02/12/1961 D3447,
D3451,
D3474,
D3474,
D3477,
D3478,
D3646
34E,
34E,
36A,
36A,
40B,
40B,
36C
  Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on Doncaster shed.
Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - New erecting shop.
Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - New erecting shop.
Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Weigh house.
Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Sun 25/03/1962 D3138 51L   Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. SLS 5/1962  
Sat 24/10/1964 D3612 36E   A visit to Retford (G.N.) shed: On shed John Thickitt  
Sun 08/11/1964 D3639 36C   A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed John Thickitt  
Sun 23/05/1965 D4066 41J   Noted on shed at Langwith Junction Peter Rigby  
Sun 15/06/1969 D3637 Wdn   G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard RO 9/1969  
Mon 01/09/1969 D3444,
D3488,
D3491
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  At Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
At Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
At Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
RO489 11/69  
Sat 20/09/1969 D3483 Wdn   Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead RO489 11/69  
Mon 02/08/1971 D3642 Wdn   British Steel Co. (RTB) Scunthorpe - In use as number 37 RO 3/1972