GWR Collett "5800" Class 0-4-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5806 | SDN | Swindon | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5812 | EXE.1 | Tiverton Junction | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5813 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5815 | WOS | Worcester | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5818 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5819 | CARM | Carmarthen | |||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 5807 | WOS | Worcester | |||
26/01/1946 | Reallocation | 5814 | 215 | HFD | Hereford | ||
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 5813 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
20/04/1946 | Reallocation | 5807 | 95 | WOS | Worcester | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5800 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5801 | BCN | Brecon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5802 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5803 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5804 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5805 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5806 | 129 | OSY | Oswestry | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5807 | WOS | Worcester | HFD | Hereford | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5808 | HFD | Hereford | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5809 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5810 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5811 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5812 | EXE.1 | Tiverton Junction | TN | Taunton | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5813 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5814 | HFD | Hereford | HFD | Hereford | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5815 | WOS | Worcester | WOS | Worcester | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5816 | 215 | WOS | Worcester | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5817 | HFD | Hereford | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5818 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5819 | CARM | Carmarthen | CARM | Carmarthen | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 5808 | HFD | Hereford | WOS | Worcester | |
14/10/1948 | Reallocation | 5808 | WOS | Worcester | HFD | Hereford | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 5818 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 85C | Hereford | |
02/03/1953 | Reallocation | 5808 | 98S | 81F | Oxford | ||
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 5803 | OSW | 81F | Oxford | ||
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 5803 | 81F | Oxford | 89C | Machynlleth | |
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 5801 | BCN | Brecon | 89C | Machynlleth | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 5809 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 89C | Machynlleth | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 5818 | 85C | Hereford | 85A | Worcester | |
04/02/1957 | Condemned | 5808 | 98W | COND | |||
06/02/1957 | Reallocation | 5811 | 98S | 81F | Oxford | ||
05/04/1957 | Reallocation | 5813 | 98S | 84D | Leamington | ||
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 5815 | WOS | Worcester | 84D | Leamington | |
27/05/1957 | Condemned | 5811 | 98W | COND | |||
14/06/1957 | Condemned | 5806 | 98W | COND | |||
14/06/1957 | Condemned | 5807 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1957 | Reallocation | 5816 | 98S | 81F | Oxford | ||
18/06/1957 | Condemned | 5812 | 98W | COND | |||
18/06/1957 | Condemned | 5814 | 98W | COND | |||
18/06/1957 | Condemned | 5817 | 98W | COND | |||
26/06/1957 | Condemned | 5819 | 98W | COND | |||
02/07/1957 | Condemned | 5803 | 98W | COND | |||
02/07/1957 | Condemned | 5816 | 98W | COND | |||
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 5818 | 85A | Worcester | 81F | Oxford | |
30/11/1957 | Condemned | 5813 | 98W | COND | |||
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 5815 | 84D | Leamington | 84C | Banbury | |
24/03/1958 | Condemned | 5805 | 98W | COND | |||
19/04/1958 | Reallocation | 5815 | 84C | Banbury | 82C | Swindon | |
22/07/1958 | Condemned | 5800 | 98W | COND | |||
09/09/1958 | Condemned | 5801 | 98W | COND | |||
29/12/1958 | Condemned | 5802 | 98W | COND | |||
05/01/1959 | Condemned | 5810 | 98W | COND | |||
01/06/1959 | Condemned | 5804 | 98W | COND | |||
10/08/1959 | Condemned | 5809 | 98W | COND | |||
14/09/1959 | Condemned | 5818 | 98W | COND | |||
27/04/1961 | Condemned | 5815 | 98W | COND |