Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 338 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18141 Week
» 71157 Month
» 190684 Year
» 3217537 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GWR Dean "3571" Class 0-4-2T
GWR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
3571
|
05/1895 |
|
10/1942 |
|
47.42 |
|
|
|
|
3572
|
06/1895 |
|
10/1928 |
|
33.33 |
|
|
|
|
3573
|
07/1895 |
|
19/12/1945 |
|
50.42 |
|
|
|
|
3574
|
08/1895 |
|
23/12/1949 |
|
54.33 |
|
|
|
|
3575
|
09/1895 |
|
21/10/1949 |
|
54.08 |
|
|
|
|
3576
|
09/1895 |
|
06/1929 |
|
33.75 |
|
|
|
|
3577
|
10/1895 |
|
13/05/1949 |
|
53.58 |
|
|
|
|
3578
|
11/1895 |
|
28/07/1945 |
|
49.67 |
|
|
|
|
3579
|
12/1895 |
|
09/1942 |
|
46.75 |
|
|
|
|
3580
|
01/1897 |
|
29/12/1945 |
|
48.92 |
|
|
|
|