Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

CambR/GWR "15" Class 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
11/1952 Condemned 864       COND  
11/1952 Condemned 887       COND  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 849     89C Machynlleth  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 896     89B Brecon  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 844     89B Brecon  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 873     89B Brecon  
02/1953 Condemned 893       COND  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 873 89B Brecon 89A Oswestry  
04/1953 Condemned 892       COND  
04/1953 Condemned 894       COND  
04/1953 Condemned 896 89B Brecon   COND  
18/04/1953 Reallocation 844 89B Brecon 89A Oswestry  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 873 89A Oswestry 89C Machynlleth  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 895     89C Machynlleth  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 873 89C Machynlleth 89A Oswestry  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 895 89C Machynlleth 89A Oswestry  
03/1954 Condemned 873 89A Oswestry   COND  
08/1954 Condemned 844 89A Oswestry   COND  
10/1954 Condemned 849 89C Machynlleth   COND  
10/1954 Condemned 855       COND  
10/1954 Condemned 895 89A Oswestry   COND