CambR/GWR "CAMB1" Class 0-6-0
GWR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Mileage | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
844 | 10/1918 | 28/08/1954 | 35.83 | 753,885 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/10/1954 | 36.01 | ||
849 | 11/1918 | 13/10/1954 | 35.92 | 728,723 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/12/1954 | 36.08 | ||
855 | 05/1919 | 15/10/1954 | 35.42 | 714,408 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/11/1954 | 35.50 | ||
864 | 03/1908 | 14/11/1952 | 44.67 | |||||||
873 | 06/1919 | 24/03/1954 | 34.75 | 798,614 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 24/04/1954 | 34.88 | ||
887 | 30/03/1903 | 17/11/1952 | 49.67 | |||||||
892 | 06/1903 | 14/04/1953 | 49.83 | |||||||
893 | 03/1908 | 24/02/1953 | 44.92 | |||||||
894 | 03/1908 | 13/04/1953 | 45.08 | |||||||
895 | 03/1908 | 12/10/1954 | 46.58 | 776,007 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/11/1954 | 46.68 | ||
896 | 03/1908 | 15/04/1953 | 45.08 |