RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRS" Class 0-6-0T
Class | RR (Rhymney) | GWR (1st) | GWR (2nd) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RRS | 111 | 608 | 93 | 06/1908 | CED W |
Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/1954 |
04/05/1954 |
RRS | 112 | 609 | 94 | 07/1908 | CED W |
Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/1954 |
17/05/1954 |
RRS | 113 | 610 | 95 | 07/1908 | CED W |
Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/1953 |
28/09/1953 |
RRS | 114 | 611 | 96 | 08/1908 | CED W |
Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1954 |
30/04/1954 |