GWR Hawksworth "1600" Class 0-6-0PT
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
18/10/1949 | To Service | 1602 | NEW | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||
03/11/1949 | To Service | 1606 | NEW | DG | Danygraig | ||
11/11/1949 | To Service | 1607 | NEW | LLY | Llanelli | ||
17/11/1949 | To Service | 1608 | NEW | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
18/11/1949 | To Service | 1609 | NEW | LDR | Landore | ||
24/11/1949 | To Service | 1610 | NEW | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
28/11/1949 | To Service | 1611 | NEW | WTD | Whitland | ||
30/11/1949 | To Service | 1612 | NEW | LYD | Lydney | ||
02/12/1949 | To Service | 1613 | NEW | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
05/12/1949 | To Service | 1614 | NEW | LLY | Llanelli | ||
12/12/1949 | To Service | 1615 | NEW | BRY | Barry | ||
13/12/1949 | To Service | 1616 | NEW | LYD | Lydney | ||
14/12/1949 | To Service | 1617 | NEW | OXF | Oxford | ||
19/12/1949 | To Service | 1618 | NEW | LLY | Llanelli | ||
23/12/1949 | To Service | 1619 | NEW | WLN | Wellington | ||
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 1614 | LLY | Llanelli | LDR | Landore | |
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 1618 | LLY | Llanelli | LDR | Landore | |
25/03/1950 | Reallocation | 1607 | LLY | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
14/06/1950 | To Service | 1620 | NEW | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 1620 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
21/06/1950 | To Service | 1621 | NEW | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
27/06/1950 | To Service | 1622 | NEW | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 1620 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88E | Abercynon | |
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 1621 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 1622 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 1623 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |||
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 1624 | 84J | Croes Newydd | |||
02/08/1950 | To Service | 1625 | NEW | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
10/08/1950 | To Service | 1626 | NEW | 83E | St Blazey | ||
12/08/1950 | Reallocation | 1625 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
12/08/1950 | Reallocation | 1626 | 83E | St Blazey | 83E | St Blazey | |
16/08/1950 | To Service | 1627 | NEW | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
24/08/1950 | To Service | 1628 | NEW | 87H | Neyland | ||
01/09/1950 | To Service | 1629 | NEW | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 1606 | DG | Danygraig | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 1622 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 1627 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 1628 | 87H | Neyland | 87H | Neyland | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 1629 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 1606 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 1622 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 1610 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | 88E | Abercynon | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 1610 | 88E | Abercynon | 88E | Abercynon | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 1601 | 87H | Neyland | |||
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 1602 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 87H | Neyland | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 1606 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87H | Neyland | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 1629 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 1601 | 87H | Neyland | 87H | Neyland | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 1602 | 87H | Neyland | 87H | Neyland | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 1606 | 87H | Neyland | 87H | Neyland | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 1629 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
02/12/1950 | Reallocation | 1629 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 1629 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
13/01/1951 | To Service | 1630 | NEW | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
19/01/1951 | To Service | 1631 | NEW | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
23/01/1951 | To Service | 1632 | NEW | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 1630 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 1631 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 1632 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 1633 | 87F | Llanelli | |||
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 1634 | 87C | Danygraig | |||
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 1635 | 89A | Oswestry | |||
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 1636 | 89A | Oswestry | |||
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 1637 | 87H | Neyland | |||
02/03/1951 | To Service | 1638 | NEW | 87F | Llanelli | ||
05/03/1951 | To Service | 1639 | NEW | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
20/03/1951 | To Service | 1640 | NEW | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 1633 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 1634 | 87C | Danygraig | 87C | Danygraig | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 1635 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 1636 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 1637 | 87H | Neyland | 87H | Neyland | |
02/04/1951 | To Service | 1642 | NEW | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
10/04/1951 | To Service | 1643 | NEW | 87C | Danygraig | ||
17/04/1951 | To Service | 1644 | NEW | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 1639 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85A | Worcester | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 1641 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |||
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 1642 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 1643 | 87C | Danygraig | 87C | Danygraig | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 1644 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
24/04/1951 | To Service | 1645 | NEW | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
30/04/1951 | Reallocation | 1638 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
30/04/1951 | Reallocation | 1639 | 85A | Worcester | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
30/04/1951 | Reallocation | 1640 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
01/05/1951 | To Service | 1646 | NEW | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
09/05/1951 | To Service | 1647 | NEW | 82C | Swindon | ||
18/05/1951 | To Service | 1648 | NEW | 82C | Swindon | ||
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 1639 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 1641 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 1645 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 1646 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 1647 | 82C | Swindon | 82C | Swindon | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 1648 | 82C | Swindon | 82C | Swindon | |
24/05/1951 | To Service | 1649 | NEW | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 1624 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 1649 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 1624 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 1624 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 89C | Machynlleth | |
31/07/1951 | Reallocation | 1624 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89C | Machynlleth | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 1614 | LDR | Landore | 87F | Llanelli | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 1633 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 1614 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 1633 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 1612 | LYD | Lydney | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 1644 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 87F | Llanelli | |
30/04/1952 | Reallocation | 1612 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
30/04/1952 | Reallocation | 1644 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 1609 | LDR | Landore | 87F | Llanelli | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 1612 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 1614 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 1622 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87F | Llanelli | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 1618 | LDR | Landore | 87F | Llanelli | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 1644 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
31/08/1952 | Reallocation | 1618 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
31/08/1952 | Reallocation | 1644 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 1640 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 1640 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 1609 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 1614 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 1619 | WLN | Wellington | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 1646 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 1622 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 1627 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 1614 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 1617 | OXF | Oxford | 85C | Hereford | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 1624 | 89C | Machynlleth | 83D | Laira | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 1628 | 87H | Neyland | 87F | Llanelli | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 1640 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 87C | Danygraig | |
08/08/1953 | Reallocation | 1643 | 87C | Danygraig | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
05/09/1953 | Reallocation | 1613 | CARM | Carmarthen | 87F | Llanelli | |
05/09/1953 | Reallocation | 1629 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 85A | Worcester | |
05/09/1953 | Reallocation | 1635 | 89A | Oswestry | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 1605 | 85A | Worcester | |||
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 1624 | 83D | Laira | 83E | St Blazey | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 1643 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 1645 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 1643 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 87F | Llanelli | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 1645 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 1603 | 89A | Oswestry | |||
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 1636 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 1647 | 82C | Swindon | 87C | Danygraig | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 1648 | 82C | Swindon | 87C | Danygraig | |
22/11/1954 | To Service | 1650 | NEW | 83D | Laira | ||
30/11/1954 | Reallocation | 1650 | 83D | Laira | |||
01/12/1954 | To Service | 1651 | NEW | 87F | Llanelli | ||
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 1651 | 87F | Llanelli | |||
07/12/1954 | To Service | 1652 | NEW | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
21/12/1954 | To Service | 1653 | NEW | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
22/12/1954 | To Service | 1654 | NEW | 87F | Llanelli | ||
31/12/1954 | Reallocation | 1651 | 87F | Llanelli | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
31/12/1954 | Reallocation | 1652 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |||
31/12/1954 | Reallocation | 1653 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
31/12/1954 | Reallocation | 1654 | 87F | Llanelli | |||
06/01/1955 | To Service | 1655 | NEW | 87F | Llanelli | ||
18/01/1955 | To Service | 1656 | NEW | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
28/01/1955 | To Service | 1657 | NEW | 85C | Hereford | ||
31/01/1955 | Reallocation | 1655 | 87F | Llanelli | |||
31/01/1955 | Reallocation | 1656 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
31/01/1955 | Reallocation | 1657 | 85C | Hereford | |||
10/02/1955 | To Service | 1659 | NEW | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
28/02/1955 | To Service | 1658 | NEW | 82C | Swindon | ||
28/02/1955 | Reallocation | 1659 | 87G | Carmarthen | |||
28/02/1955 | To Service | 1660 | NEW | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
09/03/1955 | To Service | 1661 | NEW | 85D | Kidderminster | ||
10/03/1955 | To Service | 1662 | NEW | 85A | Worcester | ||
29/03/1955 | To Service | 1664 | NEW | 83E | St Blazey | ||
31/03/1955 | Reallocation | 1661 | 85D | Kidderminster | |||
31/03/1955 | Reallocation | 1662 | 85A | Worcester | |||
31/03/1955 | To Service | 1663 | NEW | 84H | Wellington | ||
31/03/1955 | Reallocation | 1664 | 83E | St Blazey | |||
04/04/1955 | To Service | 1665 | NEW | 87F | Llanelli | ||
20/04/1955 | To Service | 1666 | NEW | 87F | Llanelli | ||
30/04/1955 | Reallocation | 1665 | 87F | Llanelli | |||
30/04/1955 | Reallocation | 1666 | 87F | Llanelli | |||
03/05/1955 | To Service | 1667 | NEW | 85C | Hereford | ||
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 1612 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 87F | Llanelli | |
26/05/1955 | To Service | 1669 | NEW | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
31/05/1955 | Reallocation | 1667 | 85C | Hereford | |||
31/05/1955 | To Service | 1668 | NEW | 83B | Taunton | ||
31/05/1955 | Reallocation | 1669 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |||
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 1612 | 87F | Llanelli | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 1612 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 87F | Llanelli | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 1612 | 87F | Llanelli | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 1630 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 82C | Swindon | |
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 1630 | 82C | Swindon | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
31/12/1955 | Reallocation | 1612 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 87F | Llanelli | |
28/01/1956 | Reallocation | 1608 | NA | Newton Abbot | 83B | Taunton | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 1616 | LYD | Lydney | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 1608 | 83B | Taunton | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 1602 | 87H | Neyland | 89A | Oswestry | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 1606 | 87H | Neyland | 87F | Llanelli | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 1662 | 85A | Worcester | 87G | Carmarthen | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 1625 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85C | Hereford | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 1662 | 87G | Carmarthen | 85C | Hereford | |
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 1615 | BRY | Barry | 87F | Llanelli | |
16/02/1957 | Reallocation | 1646 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 60C | Helmsdale | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 1659 | 87G | Carmarthen | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 1605 | 85A | Worcester | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 1661 | 85D | Kidderminster | 85A | Worcester | |
05/07/1958 | Reallocation | 1649 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 60C | Helmsdale | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 1618 | 87F | Llanelli | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 1663 | 84H | Wellington | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 1669 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 1635 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 1635 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
16/03/1959 | Condemned | 1600 | 98W | COND | |||
08/06/1959 | Condemned | 1603 | 98W | COND | |||
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 1628 | 87F | Llanelli | 89A | Oswestry | |
08/08/1959 | Reallocation | 1636 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89A | Oswestry | |
05/09/1959 | Reallocation | 1627 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 83E | St Blazey | |
12/10/1959 | Condemned | 1644 | 98W | COND | |||
19/10/1959 | Condemned | 1616 | 98W | COND | |||
19/10/1959 | Condemned | 1635 | 98W | COND | |||
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 1611 | 98W | 87F | Llanelli | ||
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 1612 | 87F | Llanelli | 88E | Abercynon | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 1613 | 87F | Llanelli | 87H | Neyland | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 1627 | 83E | St Blazey | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
25/12/1959 | Condemned | 1610 | 98W | COND | |||
11/01/1960 | Condemned | 1652 | 98W | COND | |||
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 1618 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 1641 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 88E | Abercynon | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 1648 | 87C | Danygraig | 87G | Carmarthen | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 1663 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 1669 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 81C | Southall | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 1608 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83C | Exeter | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 1634 | 87C | Danygraig | 82C | Swindon | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 1640 | 87C | Danygraig | 82C | Swindon | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 1647 | 87C | Danygraig | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
23/04/1960 | Reallocation | 1647 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85A | Worcester | |
08/06/1960 | Condemned | 1620 | 98W | COND | |||
30/06/1960 | Condemned | 1625 | 98W | COND | |||
30/06/1960 | Condemned | 1629 | 98W | COND | |||
30/06/1960 | Condemned | 1637 | 98W | COND | |||
11/07/1960 | Condemned | 1604 | 98W | COND | |||
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 1650 | 83D | Laira | 83C | Exeter | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 1668 | 83B | Taunton | 89A | Oswestry | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 1669 | 81C | Southall | 87H | Neyland | |
29/08/1960 | Condemned | 1601 | 98W | COND | |||
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 1621 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 82C | Swindon | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 1648 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87H | Neyland | |
23/09/1960 | Condemned | 1602 | 98W | COND | |||
24/10/1960 | Condemned | 1659 | 98W | COND | |||
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 1639 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85A | Worcester | |
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 1666 | 87F | Llanelli | 87H | Neyland | |
22/04/1961 | Reallocation | 1663 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 88E | Abercynon | |
27/04/1961 | Condemned | 1647 | 98W | COND | |||
13/06/1961 | Condemned | 1634 | 98W | COND | |||
22/06/1961 | Condemned | 1615 | 98W | COND | |||
18/07/1961 | Condemned | 1640 | 98W | COND | |||
27/09/1961 | Condemned | 1606 | 98W | COND | |||
10/1961 | Reallocation | 1626 | 98W | 83E | St Blazey | ||
04/11/1961 | Reallocation | 1630 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85A | Worcester | |
04/11/1961 | Reallocation | 1650 | 83C | Exeter | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
02/12/1961 | Reallocation | 1626 | 83E | St Blazey | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
02/12/1961 | Reallocation | 1630 | 85A | Worcester | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
02/12/1961 | Reallocation | 1663 | 88E | Abercynon | 87F | Llanelli | |
30/12/1961 | Reallocation | 1664 | 83E | St Blazey | 82C | Swindon | |
03/01/1962 | Condemned | 1642 | 98W | COND | |||
24/02/1962 | Reallocation | 1608 | 83C | Exeter | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
24/02/1962 | Reallocation | 1669 | 87H | Neyland | 87G | Carmarthen | |
27/02/1962 | Condemned | 1605 | 98W | COND | |||
27/02/1962 | Condemned | 1624 | 98W | COND | |||
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 1630 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 82C | Swindon | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 1663 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
19/05/1962 | Reallocation | 1632 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
21/05/1962 | Condemned | 1618 | 98W | COND | |||
13/07/1962 | Condemned | 1609 | 98W | COND | |||
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 1622 | 87F | Llanelli | 81B | Slough | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 1632 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 1636 | 89A | Oswestry | 81E | Didcot | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 1627 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 81F | Oxford | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 1638 | 87F | Llanelli | 89D | Oswestry | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 1646 | 60C | Helmsdale | 63A | Perth South | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 1654 | 87F | Llanelli | 81C | Southall | |
24/08/1962 | Condemned | 1626 | 98W | COND | |||
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 1663 | 87F | Llanelli | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
30/10/1962 | Condemned | 1633 | 87F | Llanelli | COND | ||
30/10/1962 | Condemned | 1645 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Reallocation | 1628 | 89A | Oswestry | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
03/11/1962 | Reallocation | 1630 | 82C | Swindon | 81F | Oxford | |
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 1663 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 89D | Oswestry | |
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 1669 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
05/12/1962 | Condemned | 1653 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | COND | ||
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 1614 | 87F | Llanelli | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 1666 | 87H | Neyland | 89D | Oswestry | |
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 1646 | 63A | Perth South | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 1649 | 60C | Helmsdale | COND | ||
14/01/1963 | Condemned | 1621 | 82C | Swindon | COND | ||
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 1627 | 81F | Oxford | 81F | Oxford | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 1654 | 81C | Southall | 81B | Slough | |
06/04/1963 | Reallocation | 1663 | 89D | Oswestry | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
02/05/1963 | Condemned | 1619 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | COND | ||
04/05/1963 | Reallocation | 1663 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
17/05/1963 | Condemned | 1648 | 87H | Neyland | COND | ||
01/06/1963 | Reallocation | 1608 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
01/06/1963 | Reallocation | 1623 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 87F | Llanelli | |
01/06/1963 | Reallocation | 1666 | 89D | Oswestry | 87H | Neyland | |
15/06/1963 | Reallocation | 1663 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 1666 | 87H | Neyland | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
30/09/1963 | Condemned | 1608 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | COND | ||
13/11/1963 | Condemned | 1617 | 98W | COND | |||
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 1613 | 87H | Neyland | 86C | Hereford | |
28/12/1963 | Condemned | 1662 | 98W | COND | |||
26/02/1964 | Condemned | 1614 | 98W | COND | |||
26/02/1964 | Condemned | 1650 | 98W | COND | |||
26/02/1964 | Condemned | 1666 | 98W | COND | |||
13/04/1964 | Reallocation | 1631 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 86C | Hereford | |
16/05/1964 | Reallocation | 1663 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 1622 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 1627 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 1630 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 1636 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 1654 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 1656 | 98W | COND | |||
13/07/1964 | Condemned | 1661 | 98W | COND | |||
24/07/1964 | Condemned | 1665 | 98W | COND | |||
24/08/1964 | Reallocation | 1669 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 87F | Llanelli | |
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 1631 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 1639 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 1641 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 1657 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 1658 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 1664 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 1667 | 98W | COND | |||
08/11/1964 | Reallocation | 1612 | 88E | Abercynon | 88B | Radyr | |
08/11/1964 | Reallocation | 1613 | 86C | Hereford | 88B | Radyr | |
21/11/1964 | Reallocation | 1628 | On Loan - McAlpi | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
23/01/1965 | Reallocation | 1638 | 89D | Oswestry | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
23/01/1965 | Condemned | 1663 | 98W | COND | |||
23/01/1965 | Condemned | 1668 | 98W | COND | |||
19/03/1965 | Condemned | 1613 | 98W | COND | |||
28/03/1965 | Reallocation | 1655 | 87F | Llanelli | 88B | Radyr | |
17/04/1965 | Condemned | 1632 | 98W | COND | |||
16/06/1965 | Condemned | 1623 | 98W | COND | |||
21/07/1965 | Condemned | 1612 | 98W | COND | |||
21/07/1965 | Condemned | 1655 | 98W | COND | |||
25/08/1965 | Condemned | 1607 | 98W | COND | |||
01/10/1965 | Condemned | 1611 | 87F | Llanelli | COND | ||
01/10/1965 | Condemned | 1643 | 98W | COND | |||
01/10/1965 | Condemned | 1651 | 98W | COND | |||
01/10/1965 | Condemned | 1669 | 98W | COND | |||
26/02/1966 | Condemned | 1660 | 98W | COND | |||
06/08/1966 | Condemned | 1638 | 98W | COND | |||
18/09/1966 | Condemned | 1628 | 98W | COND |