GWR Collett "5400" Class 0-6-0PT
Class | GWR | GWR (Prototype) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5400 | 2062 | 5400 | 05/1899 | 08/1930 | |||
5400 | 5400 | 06/1932 | LDR LDR 87J 87E 87G 87G 89A W |
Landore Landore Fishguard Goodwick Landore Carmarthen Carmarthen Oswestry Withdrawn |
26/01/1946 15/06/1947 20/05/1950 15/07/1950 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 23/02/1957 04/1959 |
22/04/1959 | |
5400 | 5401 | 11/1931 | SHL 89A W |
Southall Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 27/12/1952 02/1957 |
11/02/1957 | |
5400 | 5402 | 11/1931 | WES W |
Westbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/1958 |
10/09/1958 | |
5400 | 5403 | 12/1931 | WES 82A 82D W |
Westbury Bristol Bath Road Westbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/01/1957 20/04/1957 08/1957 |
19/08/1957 | |
5400 | 5404 | 12/1931 | BAN W |
Banbury Withdrawn |
23/03/1946 15/06/1947 12/1957 |
02/12/1957 | |
5400 | 5405 | 12/1931 | SHL 89A W |
Southall Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 27/12/1952 10/1957 |
07/10/1957 | |
5400 | 5406 | 12/1931 | WES W |
Westbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/1957 |
16/09/1957 | |
5400 | 5407 | 01/1932 | BAN W |
Banbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1960 |
30/06/1960 | |
5400 | 5408 | 01/1932 | LDR LDR 87G 85B 85B W |
Landore Landore Carmarthen Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
26/01/1946 15/06/1947 19/05/1951 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 12/1956 |
18/12/1956 | |
5400 | 5409 | 01/1932 | SHL SLO 34E W |
Southall Slough Neasden Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/01/1950 24/07/1954 06/1959 |
15/06/1959 | |
5400 | 5410 | 01/1932 | SHL 81B 82D 72C W |
Southall Slough Westbury Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/11/1959 26/12/1959 09/03/1963 10/1963 |
14/10/1963 | |
5400 | 5411 | 05/1932 | SHL SHL CHYS 83B W |
Southall Southall Cardiff Cathays Taunton Withdrawn |
29/12/1945 15/06/1947 26/03/1949 19/05/1951 06/1958 |
04/06/1958 | |
5400 | 5412 | 05/1932 | LA SBZ LA TN 83C W |
Laira St Blazey Laira Taunton Exeter Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/06/1948 10/07/1948 03/12/1949 06/11/1954 04/1962 |
18/04/1962 | |
5400 | 5413 | 05/1932 | SHL OXF 85B W |
Southall Oxford Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/05/1948 26/01/1957 10/1957 |
07/10/1957 | |
5400 | 5414 | 05/1932 | SHL OXF SHL 86A 82D W |
Southall Oxford Southall Ebbw Junction (Newport) Westbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/12/1949 28/01/1950 09/10/1954 07/09/1957 10/1959 |
28/10/1959 | |
5400 | 5415 | 05/1932 | SHL W |
Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/1957 |
03/07/1957 | |
5400 | 5416 | 06/1932 | SHL 84J 82D 72C W |
Southall Croes Newydd Westbury Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 27/03/1954 04/10/1958 09/03/1963 08/1963 |
26/08/1963 | |
5400 | 5417 | 06/1932 | SHL BAN 85B 85B 14D 84C W |
Southall Banbury Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Neasden Banbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 29/01/1949 21/04/1951 19/05/1951 14/11/1959 27/02/1960 01/1961 |
17/01/1961 | |
5400 | 5418 | 06/1932 | SHL SHL 85B W |
Southall Southall Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
23/03/1946 15/06/1947 29/01/1955 06/1960 |
30/06/1960 | |
5400 | 5419 | 06/1932 | WES W |
Westbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/1958 |
24/02/1958 | |
5400 | 5420 | 22/11/1935 | SHL 84C 84C 85B 85C 72C 85C W |
Southall Banbury Banbury Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Barnwood Yeovil Town Gloucester Barnwood Withdrawn |
03/11/1945 01/12/1945 15/06/1947 25/01/1958 09/09/1961 02/12/1961 27/07/1963 31/08/1963 28/09/1963 10/1963 |
10/10/1963 | |
5400 | 5421 | 23/11/1935 | SHL CV.AYN 86G 83B 85B 89A W |
Southall Abercynon Pontypool Road Taunton Gloucester Horton Road Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/03/1949 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 02/11/1957 21/05/1960 09/1962 |
12/09/1962 | |
5400 | 5422 | 26/11/1935 | WES 82F 82D 83C 82D 89A W |
Westbury Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Westbury Exeter Westbury Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/03/1956 16/06/1956 11/08/1956 08/09/1956 02/11/1957 06/1960 |
30/06/1960 | |
5400 | 5423 | 27/11/1935 | WES W |
Westbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1959 |
01/06/1959 | |
5400 | 5424 | 03/12/1935 | BAN W |
Banbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1959 |
27/04/1959 |