Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 62 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 62 Week
» 18383 Month
» 106575 Year
» 990956 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "54xx" Class 0-6-0PT


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
03/11/1945 Reallocation 5420     172 Westbury  
01/12/1945 Reallocation 5420 172 Westbury 131 Southall  
29/12/1945 Reallocation 5411     SHL Southall  
26/01/1946 Reallocation 5400     LDR Landore  
26/01/1946 Reallocation 5408     LDR Landore  
23/03/1946 Reallocation 5418     SHL Southall  
03/12/1949 Reallocation 5412     TN Taunton  
03/12/1949 Reallocation 5414     OXF Oxford  
20/05/1950 Reallocation 5400 LDR Landore 87J Fishguard Goodwick  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 5408 LDR Landore 87G Carmarthen  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 5411 SHL Southall 83B Taunton  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 5417     85B Gloucester Horton Road  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 5400 87J Fishguard Goodwick 87G Carmarthen  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 5408 87G Carmarthen 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 5421     86G Pontypool Road  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 5421 86G Pontypool Road 83B Taunton  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 5401     89A Oswestry  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 5405     89A Oswestry  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 5416     84J Croes Newydd  
24/07/1954 Reallocation 5409     34E Neasden  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 5414 OXF Oxford 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 5412 TN Taunton 83C Exeter  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 5418 SHL Southall 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 5422     82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 5422 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 82D Westbury  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 5422 82D Westbury 83C Exeter  
08/09/1956 Reallocation 5422 83C Exeter 82D Westbury  
12/1956 Condemned 5408 85B Gloucester Horton Road   COND  
26/01/1957 Reallocation 5403     82A Bristol Bath Road  
26/01/1957 Reallocation 5413     85B Gloucester Horton Road  
02/1957 Condemned 5401 89A Oswestry   COND  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 5400 87G Carmarthen 89A Oswestry  
20/04/1957 Reallocation 5403 82A Bristol Bath Road 82D Westbury  
07/1957 Condemned 5415       COND  
08/1957 Condemned 5403 82D Westbury   COND  
09/1957 Condemned 5406       COND  
07/09/1957 Reallocation 5414 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 82D Westbury  
10/1957 Condemned 5405 89A Oswestry   COND  
10/1957 Condemned 5413 85B Gloucester Horton Road   COND  
02/11/1957 Reallocation 5421 83B Taunton 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
02/11/1957 Reallocation 5422 82D Westbury 89A Oswestry  
12/1957 Condemned 5404 CYND     COND  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 5420 131 Southall 84C Banbury  
02/1958 Condemned 5419       COND  
06/1958 Condemned 5411 83B Taunton   COND  
09/1958 Condemned 5402       COND  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 5416 84J Croes Newydd 82D Westbury  
04/1959 Condemned 5400 89A Oswestry   COND  
04/1959 Condemned 5424       COND  
06/1959 Condemned 5409 34E Neasden   COND  
06/1959 Condemned 5423       COND  
10/1959 Condemned 5414 82D Westbury   COND  
14/11/1959 Reallocation 5417 85B Gloucester Horton Road 14D Neasden  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 5410     81B Slough  
26/12/1959 Reallocation 5410 81B Slough 82D Westbury  
27/02/1960 Reallocation 5417 14D Neasden 84C Banbury  
21/05/1960 Reallocation 5421 85B Gloucester Horton Road 89A Oswestry  
06/1960 Condemned 5407       COND  
06/1960 Condemned 5418 85B Gloucester Horton Road   COND  
06/1960 Condemned 5422 89A Oswestry   COND  
01/1961 Condemned 5417 84C Banbury   COND  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 5420 84C Banbury 84C Banbury  
02/12/1961 Reallocation 5420 84C Banbury 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
04/1962 Condemned 5412 83C Exeter   COND  
09/1962 Condemned 5421 89A Oswestry   COND  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 5410 82D Westbury 72C Yeovil Town  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 5416 82D Westbury 72C Yeovil Town  
27/07/1963 Reallocation 5420 85B Gloucester Horton Road 85C Gloucester Barnwood  
08/1963 Condemned 5416 72C Yeovil Town   COND  
31/08/1963 Reallocation 5420 85C Gloucester Barnwood 72C Yeovil Town  
28/09/1963 Reallocation 5420 72C Yeovil Town 85C Gloucester Barnwood  
10/1963 Condemned 5410 72C Yeovil Town   COND  
10/1963 Condemned 5420 85C Gloucester Barnwood   COND