GWR |
GWR (Renum) |
LTE |
LTE (London Transport) |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Mileage |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
3600
|
|
|
|
29/12/1938 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
25 |
519,360 |
|
|
|
25.31 |
3601
|
|
|
|
30/12/1938 |
|
24/10/1964 |
|
25.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
02/1965 |
26.15 |
3602
|
|
|
|
04/01/1939 |
|
06/02/1962 |
|
23.08 |
|
|
|
|
23.38 |
3603
|
|
|
|
09/01/1939 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
25.5 |
|
|
|
|
25.95 |
3604
|
|
|
|
09/01/1939 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
24.92 |
500,868 |
|
|
|
25.20 |
3605
|
|
|
|
23/01/1939 |
|
01/10/1966 |
|
27.75 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
01/1967 |
28.00 |
3606
|
|
|
|
27/01/1939 |
|
18/12/1962 |
|
23.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1963 |
24.73 |
3607
|
|
|
|
02/02/1939 |
|
08/10/1966 |
|
27.67 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
04/1967 |
28.22 |
3608
|
|
|
|
02/02/1939 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
26.33 |
|
|
|
|
26.72 |
3609
|
|
|
|
06/02/1939 |
|
08/08/1960 |
|
21.5 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
12/1960 |
21.87 |
3610
|
|
|
|
18/02/1939 |
|
20/02/1965 |
|
26 |
|
|
|
|
26.25 |
3611
|
|
|
|
25/02/1939 |
|
24/08/1962 |
|
23.5 |
|
|
|
|
24.82 |
3612
|
|
|
|
04/03/1939 |
|
09/10/1964 |
|
25.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
3613
|
|
|
|
13/03/1939 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
25.17 |
|
|
|
|
25.36 |
3614
|
|
|
|
18/03/1939 |
|
14/03/1962 |
|
23 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
05/1962 |
23.18 |
3615
|
|
|
|
29/03/1939 |
|
01/10/1965 |
|
26.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1966 |
26.90 |
3616
|
|
|
|
31/03/1939 |
|
10/09/1965 |
|
26.5 |
|
|
|
|
26.65 |
3617
|
|
|
|
11/04/1939 |
|
07/09/1964 |
|
25.42 |
|
|
|
|
25.62 |
3618
|
|
|
|
18/04/1939 |
|
08/06/1964 |
|
25.17 |
|
|
|
|
25.26 |
3619
|
|
|
|
28/04/1939 |
|
10/09/1966 |
|
27.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
11/1966 |
27.57 |
3620
|
|
|
|
05/05/1939 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
26.08 |
|
|
|
|
26.47 |
3621
|
|
|
|
13/05/1939 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
25.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1965 |
25.70 |
3622
|
|
|
|
18/05/1939 |
|
01/09/1964 |
|
25.33 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
11/1964 |
25.52 |
3623
|
|
|
|
23/05/1939 |
|
01/09/1962 |
|
23.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1963 |
24.33 |
3624
|
|
|
|
26/05/1939 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
23 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1962 |
23.41 |
3625
|
|
|
|
03/06/1939 |
|
02/07/1966 |
|
27.08 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
11/1966 |
27.47 |
3626
|
|
|
|
03/06/1939 |
|
01/08/1963 |
|
24.17 |
414,414 |
|
|
|
24.64 |
3627
|
|
|
|
17/06/1939 |
|
18/02/1963 |
|
23.67 |
479,260 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1963 |
24.43 |
3628
|
|
|
|
17/06/1939 |
|
21/01/1963 |
|
23.58 |
490,786 |
|
|
|
23.76 |
3629
|
|
|
|
24/06/1939 |
|
14/01/1963 |
|
23.58 |
527,819 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
06/1964 |
24.99 |
3630
|
|
|
|
28/06/1939 |
|
01/09/1962 |
|
23.25 |
|
|
|
|
24.48 |
3631
|
|
|
|
01/07/1939 |
|
31/07/1965 |
|
26 |
|
|
|
|
26.39 |
3632
|
|
|
|
04/07/1939 |
|
13/11/1962 |
|
23.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1963 |
24.38 |
3633
|
|
|
|
15/07/1939 |
|
15/10/1963 |
|
24.25 |
497,014 |
|
|
|
24.94 |
3634
|
|
|
|
15/07/1939 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1964 |
25.44 |
3635
|
|
|
|
20/09/1939 |
|
17/04/1965 |
|
25.58 |
|
|
|
|
25.92 |
3636
|
|
|
|
27/09/1939 |
|
12/02/1962 |
|
22.42 |
|
|
|
|
22.65 |
3637
|
|
|
|
28/09/1939 |
|
15/10/1962 |
|
23.08 |
|
|
|
|
23.90 |
3638
|
|
|
|
30/09/1939 |
|
12/01/1961 |
|
21.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1961 |
21.56 |
3639
|
|
|
|
04/10/1939 |
|
29/01/1963 |
|
23.25 |
515,847 |
|
|
|
23.96 |
3640
|
|
|
|
11/10/1939 |
|
01/05/1962 |
|
22.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1962 |
22.95 |
3641
|
|
|
|
16/10/1939 |
|
16/08/1962 |
|
22.83 |
|
|
|
|
24.01 |
3642
|
|
|
|
23/10/1939 |
|
21/04/1965 |
|
25.5 |
|
|
|
|
25.66 |
3643
|
|
|
|
26/10/1939 |
|
26/10/1965 |
|
26 |
|
|
|
|
26.33 |
3644
|
|
|
|
28/10/1939 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
25.67 |
|
|
|
|
25.98 |
3645
|
|
|
|
10/11/1939 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
22.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
08/1962 |
22.78 |
3646
|
|
|
|
13/11/1939 |
|
08/06/1964 |
|
24.58 |
|
|
|
|
24.77 |
3647
|
|
|
|
20/11/1939 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
25.58 |
|
|
|
|
25.92 |
3648
|
|
|
|
21/11/1939 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
24.08 |
467,201 |
|
|
|
24.33 |
3649
|
|
|
|
25/11/1939 |
|
12/01/1961 |
|
21.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1961 |
21.40 |
3650
|
|
|
|
11/12/1939 |
|
24/09/1963 |
|
23.75 |
493,103 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
3651
|
|
|
|
11/12/1939 |
|
04/04/1963 |
|
23.33 |
490,312 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1963 |
24.03 |
3652
|
|
|
|
15/12/1939 |
|
10/10/1963 |
|
23.83 |
448,853 |
|
|
|
24.02 |
3653
|
|
|
|
18/12/1939 |
|
10/10/1963 |
|
23.83 |
461,172 |
|
|
|
24.18 |
3654
|
|
|
|
22/12/1939 |
|
25/08/1965 |
|
25.67 |
|
|
|
|
27.17 |
3655
|
|
|
|
12/01/1940 |
|
18/12/1962 |
|
22.92 |
|
|
|
|
24.02 |
3656
|
|
|
|
13/01/1940 |
|
20/02/1962 |
|
22.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
05/1962 |
22.35 |
3657
|
|
|
|
18/01/1940 |
|
15/05/1961 |
|
21.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1961 |
21.67 |
3658
|
|
|
|
25/01/1940 |
|
25/09/1965 |
|
25.67 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
11/1965 |
25.82 |
3659
|
|
|
|
31/01/1940 |
|
01/10/1965 |
|
25.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1965 |
25.89 |
3660
|
|
|
|
05/02/1940 |
|
05/04/1963 |
|
23.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
09/1963 |
23.62 |
3661
|
|
|
|
15/02/1940 |
|
30/04/1965 |
|
25.17 |
|
|
|
|
25.52 |
3662
|
|
|
|
14/02/1940 |
|
25/08/1965 |
|
25.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1966 |
26.02 |
3663
|
|
|
|
20/02/1940 |
|
17/12/1962 |
|
22.83 |
|
|
|
|
30.84 |
3664
|
|
|
|
21/02/1940 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
24.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
07/1964 |
24.41 |
3665
|
|
|
|
08/03/1940 |
|
06/01/1964 |
|
23.83 |
|
|
|
|
24.12 |
3666
|
|
|
|
12/03/1940 |
|
10/12/1962 |
|
22.75 |
|
|
|
|
22.86 |
3667
|
|
|
|
14/03/1940 |
|
15/05/1961 |
|
21.17 |
|
|
|
|
21.52 |
3668
|
|
|
|
19/03/1940 |
|
02/07/1963 |
|
23.33 |
454,588 |
|
|
|
24.09 |
3669
|
|
|
|
26/03/1940 |
|
10/09/1965 |
|
25.5 |
|
|
|
|
25.74 |
3670
|
|
|
|
06/04/1940 |
|
15/05/1961 |
|
21.08 |
|
|
|
|
21.46 |
3671
|
|
|
|
11/04/1940 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
25.25 |
|
|
|
|
25.53 |
3672
|
|
|
|
18/04/1940 |
|
08/04/1964 |
|
24 |
|
|
|
|
24.51 |
3673
|
|
|
|
22/04/1940 |
|
16/05/1964 |
|
24.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
08/1964 |
24.33 |
3674
|
|
|
|
26/04/1940 |
|
19/12/1962 |
|
22.67 |
|
|
|
|
23.74 |
3675
|
|
|
|
21/06/1940 |
|
31/12/1965 |
|
25.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1966 |
25.83 |
3676
|
|
|
|
25/06/1940 |
|
15/05/1961 |
|
20.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
08/1961 |
21.15 |
3677
|
|
|
|
28/06/1940 |
|
31/12/1965 |
|
25.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
06/1966 |
25.98 |
3678
|
|
|
|
02/07/1940 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
23.42 |
520,995 |
|
|
|
23.72 |
3679
|
|
|
|
06/07/1940 |
|
01/03/1963 |
|
22.67 |
455,410 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
06/1964 |
23.96 |
3680
|
|
|
|
15/07/1940 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
23.83 |
|
|
|
|
24.02 |
3681
|
|
|
|
18/07/1940 |
|
07/03/1966 |
|
25.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
08/1966 |
26.09 |
3682
|
|
|
|
20/07/1940 |
|
31/12/1965 |
|
25.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
06/1966 |
25.92 |
3683
|
|
|
|
23/07/1940 |
|
09/10/1964 |
|
24.25 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
12/1964 |
24.41 |
3684
|
|
|
|
27/07/1940 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
21.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
08/1962 |
22.07 |
3685
|
|
|
|
21/12/1940 |
|
08/04/1964 |
|
23.33 |
|
|
|
|
24.08 |
3686
|
|
|
|
27/12/1940 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
24.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1965 |
24.82 |
3687
|
|
|
|
04/01/1941 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
24.42 |
|
|
|
|
24.79 |
3688
|
|
|
|
13/01/1941 |
|
01/09/1962 |
|
21.67 |
|
|
|
|
22.93 |
3689
|
|
|
|
21/01/1941 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
23.33 |
|
|
|
|
23.67 |
3690
|
|
|
|
15/02/1941 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
24.33 |
|
|
|
|
24.68 |
3691
|
|
|
|
21/02/1941 |
|
30/04/1965 |
|
24.17 |
|
|
|
|
24.58 |
3692
|
|
|
|
28/02/1941 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
23.25 |
|
|
|
|
23.39 |
3693
|
|
|
|
03/03/1941 |
|
24/07/1964 |
|
23.33 |
|
|
|
|
23.80 |
3694
|
|
|
|
08/03/1941 |
|
01/09/1962 |
|
21.5 |
|
|
|
|
22.87 |
3695
|
|
|
|
28/08/1941 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
22.92 |
|
|
|
|
23.32 |
3696
|
|
|
|
30/08/1941 |
|
18/11/1965 |
|
24.25 |
|
|
|
|
24.48 |
3697
|
|
|
|
05/09/1941 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
20.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1962 |
21.04 |
3698
|
|
|
|
06/09/1941 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
22.58 |
|
|
|
|
22.96 |
3699
|
|
|
|
10/09/1941 |
|
20/02/1965 |
|
23.42 |
|
|
|
|
23.86 |
3700
|
|
|
|
28/09/1936 |
|
06/02/1965 |
|
28.42 |
|
|
|
|
28.40 |
3701
|
|
|
|
28/09/1936 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
27.67 |
|
|
|
|
27.81 |
3702
|
|
|
|
02/10/1936 |
|
24/04/1964 |
|
27.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1964 |
28.22 |
3703
|
|
|
|
03/10/1936 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
25.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1962 |
25.97 |
3704
|
|
|
|
08/10/1936 |
|
12/01/1961 |
|
24.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1961 |
24.53 |
3705
|
|
|
|
14/10/1936 |
|
08/03/1965 |
|
28.42 |
|
|
|
|
28.52 |
3706
|
|
|
|
19/10/1936 |
|
13/11/1963 |
|
27.08 |
499,534 |
|
|
|
27.26 |
3707
|
|
|
|
21/10/1936 |
|
07/09/1964 |
|
27.92 |
|
|
|
|
28.25 |
3708
|
|
|
|
23/10/1936 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
28.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1965 |
29.00 |
3709
|
|
|
|
27/10/1936 |
|
20/08/1966 |
|
29.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
12/1966 |
30.15 |
3710
|
|
|
|
31/10/1936 |
|
17/05/1963 |
|
26.58 |
524,996 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1963 |
27.14 |
3711
|
|
|
|
05/11/1936 |
|
09/05/1963 |
|
26.5 |
470,160 |
|
|
|
27.04 |
3712
|
|
|
|
06/11/1936 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
27.08 |
596,210 |
|
|
|
27.37 |
3713
|
|
|
|
10/11/1936 |
|
12/02/1962 |
|
25.25 |
|
|
|
|
25.69 |
3714
|
|
|
|
27/11/1936 |
|
16/12/1963 |
|
27.08 |
619,636 |
|
|
|
27.32 |
3715
|
|
|
|
22/01/1937 |
|
19/03/1965 |
|
28.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
07/1965 |
28.50 |
3716
|
|
|
|
26/01/1937 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
26.92 |
661,948 |
|
|
|
27.15 |
3717
|
|
|
|
29/01/1937 |
|
03/06/1965 |
|
28.42 |
|
|
|
|
28.73 |
3718
|
|
|
|
02/02/1937 |
|
15/05/1962 |
|
25.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1962 |
25.72 |
3719
|
|
|
|
03/02/1937 |
|
07/01/1963 |
|
25.92 |
615,165 |
|
|
|
25.96 |
3720
|
|
|
|
06/02/1937 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
26.83 |
533,940 |
|
|
|
27.29 |
3721
|
|
|
|
06/02/1937 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
27.17 |
|
|
|
|
27.29 |
3722
|
|
|
|
12/02/1937 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
25.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1962 |
25.77 |
3723
|
|
|
|
12/02/1937 |
|
03/04/1962 |
|
25.17 |
|
|
|
|
25.44 |
3724
|
|
|
|
20/02/1937 |
|
15/05/1961 |
|
24.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
08/1961 |
24.50 |
3725
|
|
|
|
21/06/1937 |
|
15/01/1965 |
|
27.58 |
|
|
|
|
27.75 |
3726
|
|
|
|
25/06/1937 |
|
08/01/1962 |
|
24.58 |
|
|
|
|
25.07 |
3727
|
|
|
|
26/06/1937 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
26.83 |
|
|
|
|
27.74 |
3728
|
|
|
|
01/07/1937 |
|
30/04/1965 |
|
27.75 |
|
|
|
|
28.14 |
3729
|
|
|
|
06/07/1937 |
|
22/03/1963 |
|
25.67 |
561,244 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1963 |
26.46 |
3730
|
|
|
|
24/07/1937 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
27.33 |
|
|
|
|
27.58 |
3731
|
|
|
|
30/07/1937 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
26.83 |
|
|
|
|
27.06 |
3732
|
|
|
|
05/08/1937 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
24.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
02/1963 |
25.55 |
3733
|
|
|
|
12/08/1937 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
26.33 |
|
|
|
|
26.61 |
3734
|
|
|
|
17/08/1937 |
|
24/04/1964 |
|
26.67 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
09/1964 |
27.10 |
3735
|
|
|
|
26/08/1937 |
|
10/09/1965 |
|
28.08 |
|
|
|
|
28.32 |
3736
|
|
|
|
02/09/1937 |
|
22/03/1963 |
|
25.5 |
541,953 |
|
|
|
25.88 |
3737
|
|
|
|
06/09/1937 |
|
01/09/1964 |
|
27 |
|
|
|
|
27.62 |
3738
|
|
|
|
10/09/1937 |
|
06/08/1965 |
|
27.92 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
3739
|
|
|
|
15/09/1937 |
|
19/10/1964 |
|
27.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1965 |
27.60 |
3740
|
|
|
|
17/09/1937 |
|
07/01/1959 |
|
21.33 |
|
|
|
|
21.50 |
3741
|
|
|
|
22/09/1937 |
|
01/09/1962 |
|
25 |
|
|
|
|
26.16 |
3742
|
|
|
|
25/09/1937 |
|
27/11/1964 |
|
27.17 |
|
|
|
|
27.41 |
3743
|
|
|
|
29/09/1937 |
|
15/05/1962 |
|
24.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1962 |
25.06 |
3744
|
|
|
|
02/10/1937 |
|
27/08/1966 |
|
28.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
12/1966 |
29.22 |
3745
|
|
|
|
09/10/1937 |
|
14/12/1964 |
|
27.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1965 |
27.53 |
3746
|
|
|
|
13/10/1937 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
26.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1964 |
27.19 |
3747
|
|
|
|
14/10/1937 |
|
20/02/1965 |
|
27.33 |
|
|
|
|
27.77 |
3748
|
|
|
|
18/10/1937 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
26.58 |
|
|
|
|
27.18 |
3749
|
|
|
|
22/10/1937 |
|
06/11/1965 |
|
28.08 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
05/1966 |
28.58 |
3750
|
|
|
|
11/11/1937 |
|
01/09/1962 |
|
24.83 |
|
|
|
|
26.11 |
3751
|
|
|
|
12/11/1937 |
|
10/09/1965 |
|
27.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1965 |
28.11 |
3752
|
|
|
|
12/11/1937 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
26.67 |
|
|
|
|
27.11 |
3753
|
|
|
|
13/11/1937 |
|
15/01/1965 |
|
27.17 |
|
|
|
|
27.35 |
3754
|
|
|
|
17/11/1937 |
|
13/11/1965 |
|
28 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
02/1966 |
28.27 |
3755
|
|
|
|
24/11/1937 |
|
15/10/1962 |
|
24.92 |
|
|
|
|
26.16 |
3756
|
|
|
|
26/11/1937 |
|
22/03/1963 |
|
25.33 |
506,980 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1963 |
26.07 |
3757
|
|
|
|
01/12/1937 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
26.42 |
|
|
|
|
26.64 |
3758
|
|
|
|
04/12/1937 |
|
07/03/1966 |
|
28.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
08/1966 |
28.72 |
3759
|
|
|
|
04/12/1937 |
|
31/12/1965 |
|
28 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1966 |
28.38 |
3760
|
|
|
|
11/12/1937 |
|
27/09/1962 |
|
24.75 |
|
|
|
|
24.95 |
3761
|
|
|
|
11/12/1937 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
26.42 |
|
|
|
|
26.61 |
3762
|
|
|
|
11/12/1937 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
26 |
497,841 |
|
|
|
26.28 |
3763
|
|
|
|
11/12/1937 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
27.5 |
|
|
|
|
27.86 |
3764
|
|
|
|
11/12/1937 |
|
29/01/1963 |
|
25.08 |
482,943 |
|
|
|
26.11 |
3765
|
|
|
|
29/03/1938 |
|
17/07/1963 |
|
25.33 |
483,157 |
|
|
|
25.48 |
3766
|
|
|
|
05/04/1938 |
|
29/08/1963 |
|
25.33 |
483,278 |
|
|
|
25.80 |
3767
|
|
|
|
12/04/1938 |
|
01/10/1965 |
|
27.5 |
|
|
|
|
27.70 |
3768
|
|
|
|
21/04/1938 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
26.08 |
|
|
|
|
26.25 |
3769
|
|
|
|
27/04/1938 |
|
30/10/1962 |
|
24.5 |
|
|
|
|
25.65 |
3770
|
|
|
|
11/05/1938 |
|
03/04/1965 |
|
26.92 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kingsbury) |
10/1965 |
27.45 |
3771
|
|
|
|
16/05/1938 |
|
29/01/1963 |
|
24.67 |
|
|
|
|
25.43 |
3772
|
|
|
|
19/05/1938 |
|
25/06/1965 |
|
27.08 |
|
|
|
|
27.51 |
3773
|
|
|
|
20/05/1938 |
|
23/10/1962 |
|
24.42 |
|
|
|
|
24.51 |
3774
|
|
|
|
26/05/1938 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
24 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1962 |
24.41 |
3775
|
|
|
|
01/07/1938 |
|
31/12/1965 |
|
27.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1966 |
27.81 |
3776
|
|
|
|
07/07/1938 |
|
16/04/1966 |
|
27.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
08/1966 |
28.13 |
3777
|
|
|
|
21/07/1938 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
25.42 |
|
|
|
|
25.67 |
3778
|
|
|
|
28/07/1938 |
|
07/03/1964 |
|
25.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
08/1964 |
26.07 |
3779
|
|
|
|
30/07/1938 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
25.42 |
|
|
|
|
25.73 |
3780
|
|
|
|
12/08/1938 |
|
18/12/1962 |
|
24.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1963 |
25.11 |
3781
|
|
|
|
18/08/1938 |
|
19/08/1963 |
|
25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
03/1964 |
25.59 |
3782
|
|
|
|
19/08/1938 |
|
15/10/1966 |
|
28.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
04/1967 |
28.67 |
3783
|
|
|
|
19/08/1938 |
|
01/09/1962 |
|
24.08 |
|
|
|
|
25.01 |
3784
|
|
|
|
22/08/1938 |
|
03/06/1965 |
|
26.83 |
|
|
|
|
27.17 |
3785
|
|
|
|
21/09/1938 |
|
06/07/1962 |
|
23.83 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
09/1962 |
24.00 |
3786
|
|
|
|
23/09/1938 |
|
22/03/1963 |
|
24.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1963 |
25.24 |
3787
|
|
|
|
27/09/1938 |
|
07/01/1963 |
|
24.33 |
|
|
|
|
25.23 |
3788
|
|
|
|
29/09/1938 |
|
06/11/1965 |
|
27.17 |
|
|
|
|
27.48 |
3789
|
|
|
|
06/10/1938 |
|
23/10/1965 |
|
27 |
|
|
|
|
27.30 |
3790
|
|
|
|
08/10/1938 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
26.67 |
|
|
|
|
27.04 |
3791
|
|
|
|
12/10/1938 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
25.17 |
|
|
|
|
25.69 |
3792
|
|
|
|
18/10/1938 |
|
06/11/1965 |
|
27.08 |
|
|
|
|
27.35 |
3793
|
|
|
|
22/10/1938 |
|
08/09/1958 |
|
19.92 |
|
Cut |
Morkot Ltd (Caerphilly) |
|
|
3794
|
|
|
|
27/10/1938 |
|
26/12/1964 |
|
26.17 |
|
|
|
|
26.82 |
3795
|
|
|
|
26/11/1938 |
|
24/05/1963 |
|
24.5 |
|
|
|
|
24.73 |
3796
|
|
|
|
29/11/1938 |
|
26/03/1965 |
|
26.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
07/1965 |
26.64 |
3797
|
|
|
|
01/12/1938 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
25.92 |
|
|
|
|
26.14 |
3798
|
|
|
|
02/12/1938 |
|
19/10/1964 |
|
25.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1965 |
26.14 |
3799
|
|
|
|
06/12/1938 |
|
13/01/1961 |
|
22.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1961 |
22.37 |
4600
|
|
|
|
27/09/1941 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
22.83 |
|
|
|
|
22.98 |
4601
|
|
|
|
30/09/1941 |
|
17/11/1962 |
|
21.17 |
|
|
|
|
21.14 |
4602
|
|
|
|
04/10/1941 |
|
14/11/1964 |
|
23.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
02/1965 |
23.38 |
4603
|
|
|
|
07/10/1941 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
22.5 |
|
|
|
|
22.79 |
4604
|
|
|
|
10/10/1941 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
23.75 |
|
|
|
|
24.03 |
4605
|
|
|
|
03/01/1942 |
|
23/10/1962 |
|
20.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
12/1963 |
21.96 |
4606
|
|
|
|
10/01/1942 |
|
20/02/1965 |
|
23.08 |
|
|
|
|
23.19 |
4607
|
|
|
|
17/01/1942 |
|
10/09/1965 |
|
23.67 |
|
|
|
|
23.93 |
4608
|
|
|
|
20/01/1942 |
|
21/09/1964 |
|
22.67 |
|
|
|
|
22.92 |
4609
|
|
|
|
27/01/1942 |
|
21/05/1965 |
|
23.33 |
|
|
|
|
23.56 |
4610
|
|
|
|
21/02/1942 |
|
23/10/1964 |
|
22.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1965 |
23.16 |
4611
|
|
|
|
21/02/1942 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
23.33 |
|
|
|
|
23.66 |
4612
|
|
|
|
23/02/1942 |
|
06/08/1965 |
|
23.5 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
4613
|
|
|
|
28/02/1942 |
|
14/12/1964 |
|
22.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
04/1965 |
23.14 |
4614
|
|
|
|
27/02/1942 |
|
24/07/1964 |
|
22.42 |
|
|
|
|
22.81 |
4615
|
|
|
|
13/04/1942 |
|
09/10/1964 |
|
22.5 |
|
|
|
|
22.69 |
4616
|
|
|
|
23/04/1942 |
|
19/10/1964 |
|
22.5 |
|
|
|
|
22.75 |
4617
|
|
|
|
23/04/1942 |
|
22/10/1963 |
|
21.5 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) |
02/1964 |
21.83 |
4618
|
|
|
|
28/04/1942 |
|
15/10/1963 |
|
21.5 |
|
|
|
|
21.82 |
4619
|
|
|
|
09/05/1942 |
|
07/09/1964 |
|
22.33 |
|
|
|
|
22.62 |
4620
|
|
|
|
28/05/1942 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
23.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1965 |
23.40 |
4621
|
|
|
|
29/05/1942 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
23.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1965 |
23.40 |
4622
|
|
|
|
05/06/1942 |
|
01/06/1964 |
|
22 |
|
|
|
|
22.21 |
4623
|
|
|
|
25/06/1942 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
23 |
|
|
|
|
23.32 |
4624
|
|
|
|
27/06/1942 |
|
01/09/1964 |
|
22.25 |
|
|
|
|
22.40 |
4625
|
|
|
|
15/09/1942 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
19.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
09/1962 |
20.01 |
4626
|
|
|
|
15/09/1942 |
|
10/03/1964 |
|
21.5 |
|
|
|
|
22.35 |
4627
|
|
|
|
22/09/1942 |
|
09/10/1964 |
|
22.08 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
12/1964 |
22.25 |
4628
|
|
|
|
02/10/1942 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
21.58 |
|
|
|
|
21.80 |
4629
|
|
|
|
06/10/1942 |
|
10/09/1963 |
|
20.92 |
|
|
|
|
21.21 |
4630
|
|
|
|
09/11/1942 |
|
26/10/1965 |
|
22.92 |
|
|
|
|
23.28 |
4631
|
|
|
|
12/11/1942 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
22.58 |
|
|
|
|
22.94 |
4632
|
|
|
|
17/11/1942 |
|
08/01/1962 |
|
19.17 |
|
|
|
|
19.50 |
4633
|
|
|
|
23/11/1942 |
|
04/04/1963 |
|
20.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1963 |
21.07 |
4634
|
|
|
|
30/11/1942 |
|
07/09/1964 |
|
21.83 |
|
|
|
|
22.39 |
4635
|
|
|
|
14/12/1942 |
|
16/07/1966 |
|
23.58 |
|
|
|
|
23.94 |
4636
|
|
|
|
17/12/1942 |
|
10/09/1965 |
|
22.75 |
|
|
|
|
23.01 |
4637
|
|
|
|
21/12/1942 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
21.42 |
|
|
|
|
21.75 |
4638
|
|
|
|
23/12/1942 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
22.5 |
|
|
|
|
22.99 |
4639
|
|
|
|
24/12/1942 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
22.5 |
|
|
|
|
22.82 |
4640
|
|
|
|
31/12/1942 |
|
16/12/1963 |
|
21 |
|
|
|
|
21.14 |
4641
|
|
|
|
31/12/1942 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
19.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
09/1962 |
19.72 |
4642
|
|
|
|
09/01/1943 |
|
15/01/1964 |
|
21 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
07/1964 |
21.53 |
4643
|
|
|
|
13/01/1943 |
|
30/04/1965 |
|
22.25 |
|
|
|
|
22.60 |
4644
|
|
|
|
18/01/1943 |
|
23/10/1963 |
|
20.75 |
|
|
|
|
21.17 |
4645
|
|
|
|
23/02/1943 |
|
06/11/1965 |
|
22.75 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
05/1966 |
23.24 |
4646
|
|
|
|
28/02/1943 |
|
12/11/1966 |
|
23.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
05/1967 |
24.22 |
4647
|
|
|
|
05/03/1943 |
|
23/10/1962 |
|
19.58 |
|
|
|
|
19.71 |
4648
|
|
|
|
10/03/1943 |
|
26/09/1964 |
|
21.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
01/1965 |
21.87 |
4649
|
|
|
|
14/03/1943 |
|
07/09/1964 |
|
21.5 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
11/1964 |
21.69 |
4650
|
|
|
|
06/04/1943 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
22.25 |
|
|
|
|
22.54 |
4651
|
|
|
|
08/04/1943 |
|
13/09/1963 |
|
20.42 |
|
|
|
|
20.62 |
4652
|
|
|
|
13/04/1943 |
|
08/04/1964 |
|
21 |
|
|
|
|
21.19 |
4653
|
|
|
|
18/04/1943 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
21.58 |
|
|
|
|
22.34 |
4654
|
|
|
|
23/04/1943 |
|
16/12/1963 |
|
20.67 |
|
|
|
|
20.99 |
4655
|
|
|
|
17/05/1943 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
22.08 |
|
|
|
|
22.43 |
4656
|
|
|
|
31/05/1943 |
|
08/12/1962 |
|
19.58 |
|
|
|
|
19.80 |
4657
|
|
|
|
31/05/1943 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
21.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1964 |
21.56 |
4658
|
|
|
|
05/06/1943 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
20.92 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
09/1964 |
21.30 |
4659
|
|
|
|
07/06/1943 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
20.92 |
|
|
|
|
21.87 |
4660
|
|
|
|
10/06/1943 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
21.08 |
|
|
|
|
21.53 |
4661
|
|
|
|
26/10/1943 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
20.17 |
|
|
|
|
20.73 |
4662
|
|
|
|
31/10/1943 |
|
10/09/1965 |
|
21.92 |
|
|
|
|
22.14 |
4663
|
|
|
|
22/11/1943 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
21.58 |
|
|
|
|
21.91 |
4664
|
|
|
|
28/11/1943 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
21.67 |
|
|
|
|
21.90 |
4665
|
|
|
|
03/12/1943 |
|
19/06/1965 |
|
21.5 |
|
|
|
|
21.80 |
4666
|
|
|
|
18/12/1943 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
21.5 |
|
|
|
|
21.84 |
4667
|
|
|
|
22/12/1943 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
20.33 |
|
|
|
|
20.58 |
4668
|
|
|
|
11/01/1944 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
21.5 |
|
|
|
|
21.86 |
4669
|
|
|
|
14/01/1944 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
21.42 |
|
|
|
|
21.77 |
4670
|
|
|
|
26/01/1944 |
|
09/10/1964 |
|
20.75 |
|
|
|
|
20.90 |
4671
|
|
|
|
17/02/1944 |
|
18/11/1965 |
|
21.75 |
|
|
|
|
22.01 |
4672
|
|
|
|
01/03/1944 |
|
07/07/1963 |
|
19.33 |
|
|
|
|
20.81 |
4673
|
|
|
|
10/03/1944 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
21.25 |
|
|
|
|
21.61 |
4674
|
|
|
|
17/03/1944 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
20.67 |
|
|
|
|
21.01 |
4675
|
|
|
|
21/03/1944 |
|
03/06/1965 |
|
21.25 |
|
|
|
|
21.58 |
4676
|
|
|
|
15/04/1944 |
|
01/10/1965 |
|
21.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1966 |
21.85 |
4677
|
|
|
|
22/04/1944 |
|
25/03/1963 |
|
18.92 |
|
|
|
|
18.99 |
4678
|
|
|
|
22/04/1944 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
20.25 |
|
|
|
|
20.33 |
4679
|
|
|
|
15/05/1944 |
|
21/05/1965 |
|
21 |
|
|
|
|
21.27 |
4680
|
|
|
|
30/06/1944 |
|
31/12/1965 |
|
21.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
06/1966 |
21.97 |
4681
|
|
|
|
15/11/1944 |
|
16/12/1963 |
|
19.08 |
|
|
|
|
19.34 |
4682
|
|
|
|
21/11/1944 |
|
18/09/1963 |
|
18.83 |
|
|
|
|
18.91 |
4683
|
|
|
|
28/11/1944 |
|
02/10/1965 |
|
20.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
04/1966 |
21.39 |
4684
|
|
|
|
02/12/1944 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
20.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1965 |
20.88 |
4685
|
|
|
|
09/12/1944 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
17.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1962 |
17.78 |
4686
|
|
|
|
15/12/1944 |
|
08/08/1959 |
|
14.67 |
|
|
|
|
14.67 |
4687
|
|
|
|
21/12/1944 |
|
14/11/1964 |
|
19.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
01/1965 |
20.08 |
4688
|
|
|
|
22/12/1944 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
19 |
|
|
|
|
19.24 |
4689
|
|
|
|
30/12/1944 |
|
31/12/1965 |
|
21 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1966 |
21.30 |
4690
|
|
|
|
08/01/1945 |
|
09/10/1963 |
|
18.75 |
|
|
|
|
19.19 |
4691
|
|
|
|
15/01/1945 |
|
01/09/1964 |
|
19.67 |
|
|
|
|
20.68 |
4692
|
|
|
|
17/01/1945 |
|
07/09/1964 |
|
19.67 |
|
|
|
|
19.92 |
4693
|
|
|
|
26/01/1945 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
19.25 |
|
|
|
|
19.56 |
4694
|
|
|
|
27/01/1945 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
20.42 |
|
|
|
|
20.73 |
4695
|
|
|
|
31/01/1945 |
|
15/06/1964 |
|
19.42 |
|
|
|
|
19.88 |
4696
|
|
|
|
08/02/1945 |
|
12/11/1966 |
|
21.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
04/1967 |
22.19 |
4697
|
|
|
|
14/02/1945 |
|
02/07/1965 |
|
20.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1964 |
19.68 |
4698
|
|
|
|
17/02/1945 |
|
26/10/1965 |
|
20.67 |
|
|
|
|
21.01 |
4699
|
|
|
|
24/02/1945 |
|
15/06/1964 |
|
19.33 |
|
|
|
|
19.48 |
5700
|
|
|
|
01/1929 |
|
19/03/1956 |
|
27.17 |
535,004 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
14/07/1956 |
27.51 |
5701
|
|
|
|
01/1929 |
|
11/01/1958 |
|
29 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
22/03/1958 |
29.20 |
5702
|
|
|
|
01/1929 |
|
19/05/1960 |
|
31.33 |
|
|
|
|
31.52 |
5703
|
|
|
|
01/1929 |
|
09/02/1959 |
|
30.08 |
|
|
|
|
30.68 |
5704
|
|
|
|
01/1929 |
|
23/05/1960 |
|
31.33 |
|
|
|
|
31.60 |
5705
|
|
|
|
01/1929 |
|
24/08/1959 |
|
30.58 |
|
|
|
|
31.14 |
5706
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
21/09/1961 |
|
32.58 |
|
|
|
|
32.77 |
5707
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
10/03/1959 |
|
30.08 |
|
|
|
|
31.77 |
5708
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
07/04/1959 |
|
30.17 |
|
|
|
|
30.26 |
5709
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
28/03/1960 |
|
31.08 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
12/1960 |
31.85 |
5710
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
12/08/1957 |
|
28.5 |
552,136 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
14/06/1958 |
29.35 |
5711
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
06/01/1958 |
|
28.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Caerphilly) |
22/02/1958 |
29.04 |
5712
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
21/10/1957 |
|
28.67 |
544,069 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
28/12/1957 |
28.88 |
5713
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
04/01/1960 |
|
30.92 |
|
|
|
|
31.27 |
5714
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
11/01/1958 |
|
28.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
22/03/1958 |
29.04 |
5715
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
13/08/1958 |
|
29.42 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
01/11/1958 |
29.65 |
5716
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
12/03/1958 |
|
29 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
09/08/1958 |
29.42 |
5717
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
02/05/1960 |
|
31.17 |
|
|
|
|
31.36 |
5718
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
21/07/1958 |
|
29.33 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
04/10/1958 |
29.58 |
5719
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
11/1958 |
Chester (MR) |
29.67 |
|
|
|
|
30.02 |
5720
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
08/01/1962 |
|
32.83 |
|
|
|
|
33.19 |
5721
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
10/08/1959 |
|
30.42 |
|
|
|
|
29.69 |
5722
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
22/09/1958 |
|
29.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
27/12/1958 |
29.81 |
5723
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
07/11/1957 |
|
28.67 |
602,781 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
26/03/1960 |
31.05 |
5724
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
14/08/1957 |
|
28.42 |
556,388 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
05/10/1957 |
28.58 |
5725
|
|
|
|
01/1929 |
|
09/1958 |
|
29.67 |
|
|
|
|
29.77 |
5726
|
|
|
|
01/1929 |
|
02/10/1959 |
|
30.75 |
|
|
|
|
30.93 |
5727
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
30/05/1960 |
|
31.25 |
|
|
|
|
31.52 |
5728
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
07/05/1962 |
|
33.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1962 |
33.68 |
5729
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
14/10/1957 |
|
28.67 |
565,541 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
28/12/1957 |
28.88 |
5730
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
20/03/1958 |
|
29.08 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
19/04/1958 |
29.19 |
5731
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
30/05/1960 |
|
31.25 |
|
|
|
|
31.68 |
5732
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
11/01/1958 |
|
28.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
22/02/1958 |
29.04 |
5733
|
|
|
|
02/1929 |
|
05/08/1958 |
|
29.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
26/03/1960 |
31.13 |
5734
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
25/05/1959 |
|
30.17 |
|
|
|
|
30.52 |
5735
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
01/11/1957 |
|
28.67 |
641,805 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
25/01/1958 |
28.88 |
5736
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
10/01/1958 |
|
28.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
22/02/1958 |
28.96 |
5737
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
05/10/1959 |
|
30.58 |
|
|
|
|
30.98 |
5738
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
28/09/1959 |
|
30.5 |
|
|
|
|
30.98 |
5739
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
09/1958 |
|
29.5 |
|
|
|
|
29.77 |
5740
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
22/06/1959 |
|
30.25 |
|
|
|
|
30.44 |
5741
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
03/06/1957 |
|
28.25 |
569,001 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
14/06/1958 |
29.27 |
5742
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
15/09/1958 |
|
29.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
04/10/1958 |
29.58 |
5743
|
|
|
|
03/1929 |
|
19/01/1959 |
|
29.83 |
|
|
|
|
30.44 |
5744
|
|
|
|
04/1929 |
|
02/04/1962 |
|
33 |
|
|
|
|
33.44 |
5745
|
|
|
|
04/1929 |
|
23/11/1959 |
|
30.58 |
|
|
|
|
31.02 |
5746
|
|
|
|
04/1929 |
|
01/09/1962 |
|
33.42 |
|
|
|
|
34.69 |
5747
|
|
|
|
04/1929 |
|
28/09/1959 |
|
30.42 |
|
|
|
|
30.89 |
5748
|
|
|
|
04/1929 |
|
23/09/1960 |
|
31.42 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
12/1960 |
31.69 |
5749
|
|
|
|
04/1929 |
|
23/07/1963 |
|
34.25 |
|
|
|
|
34.52 |
5750
|
|
|
|
04/1929 |
|
09/05/1960 |
|
31.08 |
|
|
|
|
31.27 |
5751
|
|
|
|
04/1929 |
|
14/04/1958 |
|
29 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
17/05/1958 |
29.11 |
5752
|
|
|
|
04/1929 |
|
30/11/1960 |
|
31.58 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
06/1961 |
32.19 |
5753
|
|
|
|
04/1929 |
|
14/09/1959 |
|
30.42 |
|
|
|
|
30.89 |
5754
|
|
|
|
04/1929 |
|
20/06/1960 |
|
31.17 |
|
|
|
|
31.52 |
5755
|
|
|
|
04/1929 |
|
18/07/1960 |
|
31.25 |
|
|
|
|
31.52 |
5756
|
|
|
|
05/1929 |
|
05/09/1961 |
|
32.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
03/1962 |
32.85 |
5757
|
|
|
|
05/1929 |
|
30/11/1960 |
|
31.5 |
|
|
|
|
40.70 |
5758
|
|
|
|
05/1929 |
|
15/05/1962 |
|
33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1962 |
33.53 |
5759
|
|
|
|
05/1929 |
|
23/09/1960 |
|
31.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1961 |
31.69 |
5760
|
|
|
|
05/1929 |
|
14/10/1957 |
|
28.42 |
547,837 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
28/12/1957 |
28.64 |
5761
|
|
|
|
06/1929 |
|
07/05/1962 |
|
32.92 |
|
|
|
|
33.27 |
5762
|
|
|
|
06/1929 |
|
19/03/1956 |
|
26.75 |
551,615 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
14/07/1956 |
27.10 |
5763
|
|
|
|
06/1929 |
|
02/05/1960 |
|
30.92 |
|
|
|
|
31.19 |
5764
|
|
|
L95
|
06/1929 |
|
22/05/1960 |
|
30.92 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
5765
|
|
|
|
06/1929 |
|
23/03/1959 |
|
29.75 |
|
|
|
|
29.93 |
5766
|
|
|
|
07/1929 |
|
07/05/1962 |
|
32.83 |
|
|
|
|
33.11 |
5767
|
|
|
|
07/1929 |
|
08/09/1958 |
|
29.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
01/11/1958 |
29.32 |
5768
|
|
|
|
07/1929 |
|
02/03/1961 |
|
31.67 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
06/1961 |
31.94 |
5769
|
|
|
|
07/1929 |
|
28/05/1960 |
|
30.83 |
|
|
|
|
31.11 |
5770
|
|
|
|
09/1929 |
|
20/12/1961 |
|
32.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
05/1962 |
32.68 |
5771
|
|
|
|
09/1929 |
|
10/03/1961 |
|
31.5 |
|
|
|
|
31.85 |
5772
|
|
|
|
09/1929 |
|
06/1958 |
|
28.75 |
|
|
|
|
29.19 |
5773
|
|
|
|
09/1929 |
|
12/09/1962 |
|
33 |
|
|
|
|
34.27 |
5774
|
|
|
|
09/1929 |
|
05/10/1962 |
|
33.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
01/1964 |
34.36 |
5775
|
|
|
|
09/1929 |
|
14/01/1963 |
|
33.33 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
5776
|
|
|
|
09/1929 |
|
02/05/1960 |
|
30.67 |
|
|
|
|
31.19 |
5777
|
|
|
|
09/1929 |
|
25/06/1958 |
|
28.75 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
|
|
5778
|
|
|
|
09/1929 |
|
24/07/1962 |
|
32.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1963 |
33.44 |
5779
|
|
|
|
09/1929 |
|
07/05/1962 |
|
32.67 |
|
|
|
|
33.02 |
5780
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
02/10/1961 |
|
31.83 |
|
|
|
|
32.02 |
5781
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
10/1958 |
|
28.83 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
04/1959 |
29.35 |
5782
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
10/11/1958 |
Llanelli |
28.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
27/12/1958 |
29.05 |
5783
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
13/03/1962 |
|
32.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
05/1962 |
32.44 |
5784
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
22/06/1959 |
|
29.5 |
|
|
|
|
29.85 |
5785
|
|
|
|
01/1930 |
|
22/12/1958 |
|
28.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
21/02/1959 |
29.12 |
5786
|
|
|
|
01/1930 |
|
04/1958 |
|
28.25 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
5787
|
|
|
|
01/1930 |
|
01/10/1963 |
|
33.75 |
|
|
|
|
34.69 |
5788
|
|
|
|
01/1930 |
|
19/10/1959 |
|
29.75 |
|
|
|
|
30.18 |
5789
|
|
|
|
01/1930 |
|
07/05/1962 |
|
32.33 |
|
|
|
|
32.69 |
5790
|
|
|
|
09/1930 |
|
02/03/1959 |
|
28.5 |
|
|
|
|
28.85 |
5791
|
|
|
|
09/1930 |
|
27/04/1961 |
|
30.58 |
|
|
|
|
30.85 |
5792
|
|
|
|
10/1930 |
|
08/10/1956 |
|
26 |
537,386 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
26/01/1957 |
26.30 |
5793
|
|
|
|
10/1930 |
|
24/04/1962 |
|
31.5 |
|
|
|
|
31.94 |
5794
|
|
|
|
10/1930 |
|
14/12/1959 |
|
29.17 |
|
|
|
|
34.86 |
5795
|
|
|
|
10/1930 |
|
25/04/1960 |
|
29.5 |
|
|
|
|
29.77 |
5796
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
02/03/1959 |
|
28.33 |
|
|
|
|
28.52 |
5797
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
29/09/1958 |
|
27.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
|
5798
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
20/09/1962 |
|
31.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1964 |
33.19 |
5799
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
13/07/1959 |
|
28.67 |
|
|
|
|
28.85 |
6700
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
30/06/1961 |
|
31.33 |
|
|
|
|
31.94 |
6701
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
05/06/1959 |
|
29.33 |
|
|
|
|
29.68 |
6702
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
18/07/1960 |
|
30.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1960 |
30.61 |
6703
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
28/01/1958 |
|
27.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
22/02/1958 |
27.96 |
6704
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
10/03/1958 |
|
28 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
17/05/1958 |
28.19 |
6705
|
|
|
|
04/1930 |
|
29/01/1958 |
|
27.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
22/02/1958 |
27.88 |
6706
|
|
|
|
04/1930 |
|
28/01/1958 |
|
27.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
22/02/1958 |
27.88 |
6707
|
|
|
|
04/1930 |
|
05/06/1959 |
|
29.17 |
|
|
|
|
29.61 |
6708
|
|
|
|
05/1930 |
|
09/12/1957 |
|
27.58 |
586,185 |
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
04/1959 |
28.94 |
6709
|
|
|
|
05/1930 |
|
29/01/1958 |
|
27.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
22/03/1958 |
27.87 |
6710
|
|
|
|
06/1930 |
|
26/08/1957 |
|
27.17 |
651,944 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
30/11/1957 |
27.48 |
6711
|
|
|
|
06/1930 |
|
09/06/1959 |
|
29 |
|
|
|
|
30.44 |
6712
|
|
|
|
06/1930 |
|
18/07/1960 |
|
30.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1960 |
30.36 |
6713
|
|
|
|
06/1930 |
|
28/09/1957 |
|
27.25 |
517,611 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
30/11/1957 |
27.48 |
6714
|
|
|
|
06/1930 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
33.5 |
|
|
|
|
34.02 |
6715
|
|
|
|
07/1930 |
|
22/05/1958 |
|
27.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
12/07/1958 |
28.01 |
6716
|
|
|
|
07/1930 |
|
09/02/1959 |
|
28.58 |
|
|
|
|
29.52 |
6717
|
|
|
|
07/1930 |
|
09/02/1959 |
|
28.58 |
|
|
|
|
28.61 |
6718
|
|
|
|
08/1930 |
|
21/05/1958 |
|
27.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
12/07/1958 |
27.93 |
6719
|
|
|
|
08/1930 |
|
18/07/1960 |
|
29.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1960 |
30.19 |
6720
|
|
|
|
09/1930 |
|
26/07/1961 |
|
30.83 |
|
|
|
|
31.10 |
6721
|
|
|
|
09/1930 |
|
10/02/1959 |
|
28.42 |
|
|
|
|
28.93 |
6722
|
|
|
|
09/1930 |
|
27/01/1958 |
|
27.33 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
22/03/1958 |
27.53 |
6723
|
|
|
|
10/1930 |
|
09/02/1959 |
|
28.33 |
|
|
|
|
29.10 |
6724
|
|
|
|
10/1930 |
|
01/11/1963 |
|
33.08 |
|
|
|
|
33.27 |
6725
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
12/10/1959 |
|
29.58 |
|
|
|
|
29.86 |
6726
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
01/07/1958 |
|
28.33 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
06/09/1958 |
28.50 |
6727
|
|
|
|
04/1930 |
|
21/04/1958 |
|
28 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Briton Ferry) |
|
|
6728
|
|
|
|
04/1930 |
|
20/06/1960 |
|
30.17 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
12/1960 |
30.69 |
6729
|
|
|
|
04/1930 |
|
08/06/1959 |
|
29.17 |
|
|
|
|
29.35 |
6730
|
|
|
|
05/1930 |
|
28/09/1957 |
|
27.33 |
558,768 |
Cut |
Hayes (Gloucester) |
02/1960 |
29.78 |
6731
|
|
|
|
05/1930 |
|
19/05/1958 |
|
28 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
12/07/1958 |
28.18 |
6732
|
|
|
|
05/1930 |
|
24/07/1958 |
|
28.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
04/10/1958 |
28.41 |
6733
|
|
|
|
05/1930 |
|
08/05/1958 |
|
28 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
14/06/1958 |
28.10 |
6734
|
|
|
|
07/1930 |
|
09/02/1959 |
|
28.58 |
|
|
|
|
31.27 |
6735
|
|
|
|
07/1930 |
|
22/06/1959 |
|
28.92 |
|
|
|
|
29.44 |
6736
|
|
|
|
07/1930 |
|
09/02/1959 |
|
28.58 |
|
|
|
|
30.27 |
6737
|
|
|
|
08/1930 |
|
15/07/1957 |
|
26.92 |
500,315 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
11/07/1959 |
28.92 |
6738
|
|
|
|
08/1930 |
|
01/10/1962 |
|
32.17 |
|
|
|
|
33.19 |
6739
|
|
|
|
09/1930 |
|
01/06/1962 |
|
31.75 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
09/1962 |
32.02 |
6740
|
|
|
|
10/1930 |
|
20/01/1958 |
|
27.25 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
14/06/1958 |
27.68 |
6741
|
|
|
|
10/1930 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
33.17 |
|
|
|
|
33.36 |
6742
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
33.08 |
|
|
|
|
33.27 |
6743
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
27/04/1959 |
|
28.42 |
|
|
|
|
30.02 |
6744
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
03/07/1958 |
|
27.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
27/12/1958 |
28.13 |
6745
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
09/06/1959 |
|
28.5 |
|
|
|
|
28.68 |
6746
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
11/08/1958 |
|
27.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
29/11/1958 |
27.98 |
6747
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
03/07/1958 |
|
27.58 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
06/09/1958 |
27.75 |
6748
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
20/01/1958 |
|
27.08 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
19/04/1958 |
27.36 |
6749
|
|
|
|
01/1931 |
|
30/10/1962 |
|
31.75 |
|
|
|
|
32.77 |
6750
|
|
|
|
27/06/1947 |
|
25/01/1960 |
|
12.58 |
|
|
|
|
13.40 |
6751
|
|
|
|
28/06/1947 |
|
29/08/1960 |
|
13.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1960 |
13.48 |
6752
|
|
|
|
04/07/1947 |
|
12/01/1961 |
|
13.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1961 |
13.79 |
6753
|
|
|
|
01/08/1947 |
|
13/01/1961 |
|
13.42 |
|
|
|
|
13.88 |
6754
|
|
|
|
06/08/1947 |
|
18/12/1962 |
|
15.33 |
|
|
|
|
15.37 |
6755
|
|
|
|
26/08/1947 |
|
08/06/1962 |
|
14.83 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
09/1962 |
15.07 |
6756
|
|
|
|
29/08/1947 |
|
11/07/1960 |
|
12.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1960 |
13.31 |
6757
|
|
|
|
04/09/1947 |
|
12/12/1962 |
|
15.25 |
|
|
|
|
15.62 |
6758
|
|
|
|
05/09/1947 |
|
01/06/1962 |
|
14.75 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
08/1962 |
14.95 |
6759
|
|
|
|
08/09/1947 |
|
25/04/1960 |
|
12.58 |
|
|
|
|
12.86 |
6760
|
|
|
|
02/11/1948 |
Newport Pill |
02/12/1963 |
|
15.08 |
|
|
|
|
15.30 |
6761
|
|
|
|
04/11/1948 |
Duffryn Yard |
12/01/1961 |
|
12.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1961 |
12.45 |
6762
|
|
|
|
05/11/1948 |
Tondu |
26/03/1963 |
|
14.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1963 |
15.12 |
6763
|
|
|
|
11/11/1948 |
Danygraig |
16/12/1963 |
|
15.08 |
|
|
|
|
15.68 |
6764
|
|
|
|
12/11/1948 |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
02/12/1963 |
|
15.08 |
|
|
|
|
15.27 |
6765
|
|
|
|
31/12/1948 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
15.42 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
08/1964 |
15.63 |
6766
|
|
|
|
31/01/1949 |
|
01/08/1960 |
|
11.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1960 |
11.88 |
6767
|
|
|
|
31/01/1949 |
|
12/12/1962 |
|
13.92 |
|
|
|
|
14.71 |
6768
|
|
|
|
31/01/1949 |
|
15/01/1964 |
|
15 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
06/1964 |
15.38 |
6769
|
|
|
|
31/01/1949 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
14.92 |
|
|
|
|
15.30 |
6770
|
|
|
|
17/10/1950 |
|
30/10/1962 |
|
12 |
|
|
|
|
12.00 |
6771
|
|
|
|
19/10/1950 |
|
24/03/1958 |
|
7.42 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
10/05/1964 |
13.57 |
6772
|
|
|
|
02/11/1950 |
Newport Pill |
16/12/1963 |
|
13.08 |
|
|
|
|
13.63 |
6773
|
|
|
|
03/11/1950 |
Cardiff East Dock |
05/10/1959 |
|
8.92 |
|
|
|
|
9.37 |
6774
|
|
|
|
14/11/1950 |
Barry |
14/12/1959 |
|
9.08 |
|
|
|
|
9.42 |
6775
|
|
|
|
21/11/1950 |
Barry |
01/08/1960 |
|
9.75 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
03/1961 |
10.32 |
6776
|
|
|
|
27/11/1950 |
Neath (Court Sart) |
12/01/1961 |
|
10.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1961 |
10.39 |
6777
|
|
|
|
04/12/1950 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
13.42 |
|
|
|
|
13.62 |
6778
|
|
|
|
07/12/1950 |
|
04/05/1962 |
|
11.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1962 |
11.95 |
6779
|
|
|
|
12/12/1950 |
|
22/06/1959 |
|
8.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1960 |
10.02 |
7700
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
15/05/1961 |
|
31.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1961 |
31.53 |
7701
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
01/02/1960 |
|
30 |
|
|
|
|
30.27 |
7702
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
23/09/1960 |
|
30.58 |
|
|
|
|
31.35 |
7703
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
21/03/1960 |
|
30.08 |
|
|
|
|
30.27 |
7704
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
23/12/1960 |
|
30.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1961 |
31.18 |
7705
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
24/08/1959 |
|
29.42 |
|
|
|
|
29.98 |
7706
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
21/03/1960 |
|
30 |
|
|
|
|
30.69 |
7707
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
09/11/1960 |
|
30.67 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
04/1961 |
31.11 |
7708
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
20/06/1960 |
|
30.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1960 |
30.78 |
7709
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
29/08/1960 |
|
30.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1960 |
30.78 |
7710
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
08/09/1958 |
|
28.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
01/11/1958 |
28.65 |
7711
|
|
L90
|
|
03/1930 |
|
07/10/1956 |
|
26.58 |
|
|
|
|
31.86 |
7712
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
18/07/1960 |
|
30.33 |
|
|
|
|
31.27 |
7713
|
|
|
|
03/1930 |
|
16/08/1962 |
|
32.42 |
|
|
|
|
32.53 |
7714
|
|
|
|
05/1930 |
|
26/01/1959 |
|
28.67 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
7715
|
|
|
|
19/05/1930 |
|
19/05/1963 |
|
33 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
7716
|
|
|
|
05/1930 |
|
14/12/1959 |
|
29.58 |
|
|
|
|
30.02 |
7717
|
|
|
|
05/1930 |
|
07/03/1960 |
|
29.83 |
|
|
|
|
30.02 |
7718
|
|
|
|
05/1930 |
|
13/04/1962 |
|
31.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
06/1962 |
32.11 |
7719
|
|
|
|
06/1930 |
|
23/09/1960 |
|
30.25 |
|
|
|
|
30.61 |
7720
|
|
|
|
06/1930 |
|
01/05/1962 |
|
31.92 |
|
|
|
|
32.36 |
7721
|
|
|
|
06/1930 |
|
13/07/1962 |
|
32.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1962 |
32.27 |
7722
|
|
|
|
06/1930 |
|
24/10/1960 |
|
30.33 |
|
|
|
|
35.19 |
7723
|
|
|
|
06/1930 |
|
29/08/1960 |
|
30.17 |
|
|
|
|
34.77 |
7724
|
|
|
|
07/1930 |
|
12/09/1962 |
|
32.17 |
|
|
|
|
32.44 |
7725
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
29/08/1960 |
|
30.67 |
|
|
|
|
31.52 |
7726
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
19/08/1960 |
|
30.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1960 |
30.85 |
7727
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
04/01/1960 |
|
30.08 |
|
|
|
|
30.35 |
7728
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
10/05/1960 |
|
30.42 |
|
|
|
|
30.94 |
7729
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
13/07/1962 |
|
32.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1962 |
32.94 |
7730
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
23/03/1959 |
|
29.25 |
|
|
|
|
29.43 |
7731
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
06/04/1959 |
|
29.33 |
|
|
|
|
30.10 |
7732
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
15/10/1962 |
|
32.83 |
|
|
|
|
32.85 |
7733
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
28/05/1960 |
|
30.42 |
|
|
|
|
30.77 |
7734
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
14/04/1959 |
|
29.33 |
|
|
|
|
35.61 |
7735
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
11/05/1959 |
|
29.42 |
|
|
|
|
29.77 |
7736
|
|
|
|
12/1929 |
|
14/05/1962 |
|
32.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1962 |
32.94 |
7737
|
|
|
|
01/1930 |
|
28/03/1960 |
|
30.17 |
|
|
|
|
30.35 |
7738
|
|
|
|
01/1930 |
|
16/02/1959 |
|
29.08 |
|
|
|
|
29.85 |
7739
|
|
|
|
01/1930 |
|
04/11/1962 |
|
32.83 |
|
|
|
|
40.03 |
7740
|
|
|
|
01/1930 |
|
23/12/1960 |
|
30.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1961 |
31.27 |
7741
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
03/12/1961 |
|
31.83 |
|
|
|
|
37.61 |
7742
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
13/07/1959 |
|
29.42 |
|
|
|
|
29.60 |
7743
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
10/08/1959 |
|
29.5 |
|
|
|
|
29.93 |
7744
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
27/09/1962 |
|
32.58 |
|
|
|
|
32.60 |
7745
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
22/03/1961 |
|
31.08 |
|
|
|
|
31.68 |
7746
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
19/10/1959 |
|
29.67 |
|
|
|
|
29.85 |
7747
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
06/02/1961 |
|
31 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
06/1961 |
31.35 |
7748
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
27/04/1961 |
|
31.17 |
|
|
|
|
31.43 |
7749
|
|
|
|
02/1930 |
|
09/09/1962 |
|
32.58 |
|
|
|
|
39.94 |
7750
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
05/01/1959 |
|
28.17 |
|
|
|
|
28.43 |
7751
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
19/10/1959 |
|
28.83 |
|
|
|
|
29.22 |
7752
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
01/11/1959 |
|
29 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
7753
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
13/04/1962 |
|
31.33 |
|
|
|
|
31.69 |
7754
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
27/01/1959 |
|
28.08 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
7755
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
04/05/1962 |
|
31.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1962 |
31.77 |
7756
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
07/06/1961 |
|
30.5 |
|
|
|
|
31.19 |
7757
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
23/09/1960 |
|
29.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1961 |
30.11 |
7758
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
20/06/1960 |
|
29.5 |
|
|
|
|
31.19 |
7759
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
14/03/1960 |
|
29.25 |
|
|
|
|
29.77 |
7760
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
03/12/1961 |
|
31 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
7761
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
23/01/1961 |
|
30.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1961 |
30.77 |
7762
|
|
|
|
01/1931 |
|
07/05/1962 |
|
31.33 |
|
|
|
|
31.60 |
7763
|
|
|
|
01/1931 |
|
16/11/1959 |
|
28.83 |
|
|
|
|
29.27 |
7764
|
|
|
|
01/1931 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
31.33 |
|
|
|
|
31.94 |
7765
|
|
|
|
01/1931 |
|
31/07/1962 |
|
31.5 |
|
|
|
|
31.52 |
7766
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
09/11/1960 |
|
29.75 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
03/1961 |
30.10 |
7767
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
14/03/1960 |
|
29.08 |
|
|
|
|
29.43 |
7768
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
30/11/1959 |
|
28.75 |
647,331 |
|
|
|
29.27 |
7769
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
24/08/1959 |
|
28.5 |
|
|
|
|
29.10 |
7770
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
21/04/1959 |
|
28.17 |
|
|
|
|
28.35 |
7771
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
24/11/1961 |
|
30.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1962 |
31.11 |
7772
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
16/11/1961 |
|
30.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1962 |
31.11 |
7773
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
14/12/1959 |
|
28.75 |
|
|
|
|
29.11 |
7774
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
02/11/1959 |
|
28.67 |
|
|
|
|
28.98 |
7775
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
09/11/1960 |
|
30 |
|
|
|
|
31.10 |
7776
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
12/01/1961 |
|
30.17 |
|
|
|
|
30.68 |
7777
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
09/11/1960 |
|
30 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
03/1961 |
30.35 |
7778
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
07/12/1959 |
|
29.08 |
|
|
|
|
29.52 |
7779
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
10/1958 |
|
27.92 |
|
|
|
|
37.86 |
7780
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
26/06/1963 |
|
32.58 |
|
|
|
|
33.61 |
7781
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
18/07/1960 |
|
29.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1960 |
29.94 |
7782
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
19/10/1964 |
|
33.92 |
|
|
|
|
34.19 |
7783
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
12/09/1962 |
|
31.83 |
|
|
|
|
32.19 |
7784
|
|
|
|
11/1930 |
|
05/03/1962 |
|
31.33 |
|
|
|
|
31.44 |
7785
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
31.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1963 |
32.19 |
7786
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
14/05/1962 |
|
31.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1962 |
31.85 |
7787
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
22/06/1961 |
|
30.5 |
|
|
|
|
31.02 |
7788
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
13/07/1962 |
|
31.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
09/1962 |
31.77 |
7789
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
09/11/1959 |
|
28.92 |
|
|
|
|
29.22 |
7790
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
05/11/1962 |
|
31.92 |
|
|
|
|
33.02 |
7791
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
07/12/1959 |
|
29 |
|
|
|
|
29.22 |
7792
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
18/11/1957 |
|
26.92 |
562,175 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
25/01/1958 |
27.13 |
7793
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
25/04/1960 |
|
29.33 |
|
|
|
|
29.69 |
7794
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
24/10/1960 |
|
29.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1961 |
30.35 |
7795
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
03/02/1958 |
|
27.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Stafford Road, Wolverhampton) |
10/02/1958 |
27.18 |
7796
|
|
|
|
01/1931 |
|
13/02/1962 |
|
31.08 |
|
|
|
|
31.52 |
7797
|
|
|
|
01/1931 |
|
19/10/1959 |
|
28.75 |
|
|
|
|
29.18 |
7798
|
|
|
|
01/1931 |
|
30/05/1961 |
|
30.33 |
|
|
|
|
30.85 |
7799
|
|
|
|
01/1931 |
|
22/05/1962 |
|
31.33 |
|
|
|
|
31.94 |
8700
|
9700
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
03/10/1963 |
|
32.67 |
|
|
|
|
32.85 |
8701
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
29/03/1963 |
|
32.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
07/1964 |
33.44 |
8702
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
33.25 |
|
|
|
|
33.35 |
8703
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
06/01/1958 |
|
26.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
17/05/1958 |
27.27 |
8704
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
29/02/1960 |
|
29 |
|
|
|
|
29.43 |
8705
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
27/04/1961 |
|
30.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1961 |
30.60 |
8706
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
04/07/1961 |
|
30.33 |
|
|
|
|
30.78 |
8707
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
33.42 |
|
|
|
|
33.52 |
8708
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
19/05/1960 |
|
29.17 |
|
|
|
|
29.36 |
8709
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
27/09/1962 |
|
31.58 |
|
|
|
|
31.85 |
8710
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
08/03/1963 |
|
32 |
|
|
|
|
32.19 |
8711
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
15/03/1962 |
|
31 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
05/1962 |
31.19 |
8712
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
14/01/1963 |
|
31.83 |
|
|
|
|
32.78 |
8713
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
15/03/1962 |
|
31 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1962 |
31.36 |
8714
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
27/11/1964 |
|
33.67 |
|
|
|
|
34.11 |
8715
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
02/04/1962 |
|
31.08 |
|
|
|
|
31.44 |
8716
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
33.08 |
|
|
|
|
33.44 |
8717
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
33.33 |
|
|
|
|
33.78 |
8718
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
23/07/1966 |
|
35.33 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
11/1966 |
35.70 |
8719
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
14/05/1962 |
|
31.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1962 |
31.69 |
8720
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
28/09/1964 |
|
33.5 |
|
|
|
|
33.78 |
8721
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
18/07/1961 |
|
30.33 |
|
|
|
|
31.19 |
8722
|
|
|
|
04/1931 |
|
27/04/1961 |
|
30 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1961 |
30.44 |
8723
|
|
|
|
04/1931 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
33.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1964 |
33.61 |
8724
|
|
|
|
04/1931 |
|
18/07/1962 |
|
31.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1963 |
31.86 |
8725
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
22/10/1962 |
|
31.83 |
|
|
|
|
31.85 |
8726
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
27/04/1961 |
|
30.33 |
|
|
|
|
30.60 |
8727
|
|
|
|
12/1930 |
|
02/04/1962 |
|
31.33 |
|
|
|
|
31.77 |
8728
|
|
|
|
01/1931 |
|
20/07/1963 |
|
32.5 |
|
|
|
|
33.19 |
8729
|
|
|
|
01/1931 |
|
05/12/1962 |
|
31.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
08/1963 |
32.60 |
8730
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
13/07/1962 |
|
31.42 |
|
|
|
|
31.77 |
8731
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
13/07/1962 |
|
31.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1962 |
31.85 |
8732
|
|
|
|
02/1931 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
33.17 |
|
|
|
|
33.35 |
8733
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
09/02/1962 |
|
30.92 |
|
|
|
|
31.11 |
8734
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
05/03/1962 |
|
31 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
04/1962 |
31.11 |
8735
|
|
|
|
03/1931 |
|
15/01/1962 |
|
30.83 |
|
|
|
|
31.02 |
8736
|
|
|
|
04/1931 |
|
13/03/1962 |
|
30.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
05/1962 |
31.10 |
8737
|
|
|
|
04/1931 |
|
12/12/1962 |
|
31.67 |
|
|
|
|
32.10 |
8738
|
|
|
|
04/1931 |
|
08/03/1963 |
|
31.92 |
|
|
|
|
33.02 |
8739
|
|
|
|
05/1931 |
|
14/11/1964 |
|
33.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1965 |
33.86 |
8740
|
|
|
|
05/1931 |
|
06/02/1961 |
|
29.75 |
|
|
|
|
30.53 |
8741
|
|
|
|
05/1931 |
|
04/05/1962 |
|
31 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1962 |
31.36 |
8742
|
|
|
|
06/1931 |
|
20/09/1962 |
|
31.25 |
|
|
|
|
31.69 |
8743
|
|
|
|
06/1931 |
|
25/06/1964 |
|
33 |
|
|
|
|
33.19 |
8744
|
|
|
|
06/1931 |
|
05/10/1962 |
|
31.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
07/1964 |
33.11 |
8745
|
|
|
|
06/1931 |
|
25/08/1965 |
|
34.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1965 |
34.53 |
8746
|
|
|
|
07/1931 |
|
19/12/1962 |
|
31.42 |
|
|
|
|
32.44 |
8747
|
|
|
|
07/1931 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
32.83 |
|
|
|
|
33.11 |
8748
|
|
|
|
07/1931 |
|
20/09/1962 |
|
31.17 |
|
|
|
|
31.19 |
8749
|
|
|
|
07/1931 |
|
09/10/1964 |
|
33.25 |
|
|
|
|
33.69 |
8750
|
|
|
|
29/09/1933 |
|
07/05/1962 |
|
28.67 |
|
|
|
|
28.98 |
8751
|
|
|
|
03/10/1933 |
|
18/12/1962 |
|
29.17 |
|
|
|
|
29.30 |
8752
|
|
|
|
06/10/1933 |
|
29/01/1963 |
|
29.25 |
|
|
|
|
30.46 |
8753
|
|
|
|
10/10/1933 |
|
08/02/1962 |
|
28.33 |
|
|
|
|
28.78 |
8754
|
|
|
|
12/10/1933 |
|
10/11/1960 |
|
27.08 |
|
|
|
|
27.19 |
8755
|
|
|
|
12/10/1933 |
|
02/12/1957 |
|
24.17 |
496,419 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
25/01/1958 |
24.30 |
8756
|
|
|
|
13/10/1933 |
|
15/10/1962 |
|
29 |
|
|
|
|
30.19 |
8757
|
|
|
|
13/10/1933 |
|
27/09/1962 |
|
28.92 |
|
|
|
|
30.28 |
8758
|
|
|
|
18/10/1933 |
|
19/01/1959 |
|
25.25 |
|
|
|
|
25.76 |
8759
|
|
|
|
18/10/1933 |
|
29/01/1963 |
|
29.25 |
|
|
|
|
30.18 |
8760
|
|
|
|
19/10/1933 |
|
08/01/1962 |
|
28.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1962 |
28.51 |
8761
|
|
|
|
28/10/1933 |
|
14/05/1962 |
|
28.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1962 |
28.90 |
8762
|
|
|
|
25/10/1933 |
|
09/08/1961 |
|
27.83 |
|
|
|
|
28.49 |
8763
|
|
|
|
26/10/1933 |
|
14/08/1962 |
|
28.83 |
|
|
|
|
30.16 |
8764
|
|
|
|
26/10/1933 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
28.58 |
|
|
|
|
29.24 |
8765
|
|
|
|
08/12/1933 |
|
25/09/1962 |
|
28.75 |
|
|
|
|
30.12 |
8766
|
|
|
|
08/12/1933 |
|
23/07/1963 |
|
29.58 |
|
|
|
|
29.87 |
8767
|
|
|
|
08/12/1933 |
|
23/07/1966 |
|
32.58 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
11/1966 |
32.96 |
8768
|
|
|
|
12/12/1933 |
|
28/09/1964 |
|
30.75 |
|
|
|
|
31.36 |
8769
|
|
|
|
12/12/1933 |
|
07/04/1961 |
|
27.33 |
|
|
|
|
27.61 |
8770
|
|
|
|
01/01/1934 |
|
12/12/1962 |
|
28.92 |
|
|
|
|
29.55 |
8771
|
|
|
|
01/01/1934 |
|
13/07/1962 |
|
28.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1962 |
28.97 |
8772
|
|
|
|
01/01/1934 |
|
17/08/1961 |
|
27.58 |
|
|
|
|
27.97 |
8773
|
|
|
|
01/01/1934 |
|
22/10/1962 |
|
28.75 |
|
|
|
|
29.47 |
8774
|
|
|
|
01/01/1934 |
|
09/08/1961 |
|
27.58 |
|
|
|
|
27.89 |
8775
|
|
|
|
02/01/1934 |
|
20/12/1961 |
|
27.92 |
|
|
|
|
28.30 |
8776
|
|
|
|
05/01/1934 |
|
18/12/1962 |
|
28.92 |
|
|
|
|
29.38 |
8777
|
|
|
|
04/01/1934 |
|
27/04/1961 |
|
27.25 |
|
|
|
|
27.80 |
8778
|
|
|
|
09/01/1934 |
|
01/08/1960 |
|
26.58 |
|
|
|
|
26.95 |
8779
|
|
|
|
09/01/1934 |
|
09/02/1962 |
|
28.08 |
|
|
|
|
28.28 |
8780
|
|
|
|
16/01/1934 |
|
31/07/1962 |
|
28.5 |
|
|
|
|
29.43 |
8781
|
|
|
|
16/01/1934 |
|
13/11/1962 |
|
28.83 |
|
|
|
|
28.93 |
8782
|
|
|
|
17/01/1934 |
|
14/11/1961 |
|
27.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1962 |
28.10 |
8783
|
|
|
|
18/01/1934 |
|
06/06/1963 |
|
29.42 |
|
|
|
|
29.68 |
8784
|
|
|
|
22/01/1934 |
|
23/04/1962 |
|
28.25 |
|
|
|
|
28.67 |
8785
|
|
|
|
24/01/1934 |
|
16/12/1963 |
|
29.92 |
|
|
|
|
30.16 |
8786
|
|
|
|
26/01/1934 |
|
20/07/1963 |
|
29.5 |
|
|
|
|
29.74 |
8787
|
|
|
|
26/01/1934 |
|
16/08/1961 |
|
27.58 |
|
|
|
|
27.99 |
8788
|
|
|
|
29/01/1934 |
|
07/05/1962 |
|
28.33 |
|
|
|
|
28.65 |
8789
|
|
|
|
31/01/1934 |
|
13/06/1961 |
|
27.42 |
|
|
|
|
27.72 |
8790
|
|
|
|
22/02/1934 |
|
15/05/1962 |
|
28.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1962 |
28.58 |
8791
|
|
|
|
26/02/1934 |
|
08/03/1963 |
|
29.08 |
|
|
|
|
29.82 |
8792
|
|
|
|
28/02/1934 |
|
06/02/1962 |
|
28 |
|
|
|
|
28.23 |
8793
|
|
|
|
02/03/1934 |
|
14/12/1964 |
|
30.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
04/1965 |
31.14 |
8794
|
|
|
|
02/03/1934 |
|
20/07/1963 |
|
29.33 |
|
|
|
|
29.64 |
8795
|
|
|
|
14/03/1934 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
31.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1965 |
31.61 |
8796
|
|
|
|
16/03/1934 |
|
27/04/1961 |
|
27.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1961 |
27.52 |
8797
|
|
|
|
21/03/1934 |
|
02/04/1962 |
|
28.08 |
|
|
|
|
28.34 |
8798
|
|
|
|
23/03/1934 |
|
13/06/1961 |
|
27.25 |
|
|
|
|
27.42 |
8799
|
|
|
|
08/06/1934 |
|
01/12/1962 |
|
28.5 |
|
|
|
|
28.54 |
9600
|
|
|
|
28/02/1945 |
|
10/09/1965 |
|
20.58 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
9601
|
|
|
|
27/04/1945 |
|
26/12/1964 |
|
19.67 |
|
|
|
|
20.48 |
9602
|
|
|
|
12/05/1945 |
|
08/03/1965 |
|
19.83 |
|
|
|
|
20.19 |
9603
|
|
|
|
19/05/1945 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
18.58 |
|
|
|
|
19.34 |
9604
|
|
|
|
25/05/1945 |
|
12/12/1962 |
|
17.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1964 |
18.65 |
9605
|
|
|
|
31/05/1945 |
|
10/09/1965 |
|
20.33 |
|
|
|
|
20.56 |
9606
|
|
|
|
07/06/1945 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
19.42 |
|
|
|
|
19.54 |
9607
|
|
|
|
15/06/1945 |
|
17/03/1964 |
|
18.75 |
|
|
|
|
19.60 |
9608
|
|
|
|
29/06/1945 |
|
16/07/1966 |
|
21.08 |
|
|
|
|
21.39 |
9609
|
|
|
|
30/06/1945 |
|
01/10/1965 |
|
20.33 |
|
|
|
|
21.64 |
9610
|
|
|
|
16/07/1945 |
Tyseley |
24/09/1966 |
|
21.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1967 |
21.52 |
9611
|
|
|
|
23/08/1945 |
Oxford |
30/04/1965 |
|
19.67 |
|
|
|
|
19.99 |
9612
|
|
|
|
28/08/1945 |
Westbury |
02/12/1963 |
|
18.33 |
|
|
|
|
18.81 |
9613
|
|
|
|
01/09/1945 |
|
23/10/1965 |
|
20.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
01/1966 |
20.39 |
9614
|
|
|
|
11/09/1945 |
|
16/07/1966 |
|
20.83 |
|
|
|
|
21.19 |
9615
|
|
|
|
19/09/1945 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
19.83 |
|
|
|
|
20.08 |
9616
|
|
|
|
28/09/1945 |
|
25/08/1965 |
|
19.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1965 |
20.23 |
9617
|
|
|
|
04/10/1945 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
19.67 |
|
|
|
|
20.04 |
9618
|
|
|
|
08/10/1945 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
18.17 |
|
|
|
|
18.45 |
9619
|
|
|
|
13/10/1945 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
19.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1965 |
20.02 |
9620
|
|
|
|
17/10/1945 |
|
24/07/1964 |
|
18.75 |
|
|
|
|
19.18 |
9621
|
|
|
|
24/10/1945 |
|
09/10/1964 |
|
19 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
02/1965 |
19.33 |
9622
|
|
|
|
05/11/1945 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
19.67 |
|
|
|
|
19.96 |
9623
|
|
|
|
08/11/1945 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
19.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1965 |
19.95 |
9624
|
|
|
|
10/11/1945 |
|
16/01/1965 |
|
19.17 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) |
03/1965 |
19.36 |
9625
|
|
|
|
16/11/1945 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
19.58 |
|
|
|
|
19.93 |
9626
|
|
|
|
27/11/1945 |
|
31/12/1965 |
|
20.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
06/1966 |
20.56 |
9627
|
|
|
|
30/11/1945 |
|
13/07/1962 |
|
16.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1963 |
17.22 |
9628
|
|
|
|
05/12/1945 |
|
07/03/1963 |
|
17.25 |
|
|
|
|
19.04 |
9629
|
|
|
|
13/12/1945 |
|
09/10/1964 |
|
18.83 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
9630
|
|
|
|
15/12/1945 |
|
24/09/1966 |
|
20.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
12/1966 |
21.01 |
9631
|
|
|
|
18/12/1945 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
19.5 |
|
|
|
|
19.84 |
9632
|
|
|
|
29/12/1945 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
18.92 |
|
|
|
|
19.15 |
9633
|
|
|
|
08/01/1946 |
|
09/10/1963 |
|
17.75 |
|
|
|
|
17.95 |
9634
|
|
|
|
16/01/1946 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
18.33 |
|
|
|
|
18.59 |
9635
|
|
|
|
24/01/1946 |
|
25/06/1964 |
|
18.42 |
|
|
|
|
18.90 |
9636
|
|
|
|
09/02/1946 |
|
03/10/1963 |
|
17.67 |
|
|
|
|
17.78 |
9637
|
|
|
|
19/02/1946 |
|
07/09/1964 |
|
18.58 |
|
|
|
|
18.83 |
9638
|
|
|
|
25/02/1946 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
17.83 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
06/1964 |
18.32 |
9639
|
|
|
|
27/02/1946 |
|
25/09/1965 |
|
19.58 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
11/1965 |
19.73 |
9640
|
|
|
|
07/03/1946 |
|
30/07/1966 |
|
20.33 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
11/1966 |
20.71 |
9641
|
|
|
|
12/03/1946 |
|
29/10/1966 |
|
20.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
05/1967 |
21.19 |
9642
|
|
|
|
03/04/1946 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
18.58 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
9643
|
|
|
|
09/04/1946 |
|
22/05/1962 |
|
16.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1962 |
16.53 |
9644
|
|
|
|
13/04/1946 |
|
03/06/1965 |
|
19.17 |
|
|
|
|
19.52 |
9645
|
|
|
|
17/04/1946 |
|
03/10/1963 |
|
17.5 |
|
|
|
|
17.84 |
9646
|
|
|
|
04/05/1946 |
Newton Abbot |
15/05/1965 |
|
19 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
08/1965 |
19.30 |
9647
|
|
|
|
18/05/1946 |
Exeter |
16/06/1965 |
|
19.08 |
|
|
|
|
19.42 |
9648
|
|
|
|
25/05/1946 |
Cardiff Canton |
06/07/1964 |
|
18.17 |
|
|
|
|
18.57 |
9649
|
|
|
|
04/06/1946 |
Tondu |
21/07/1965 |
|
19.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
08/1965 |
19.21 |
9650
|
|
|
|
13/06/1946 |
Pontypool Road |
14/12/1964 |
|
18.5 |
|
|
|
|
19.02 |
9651
|
|
|
|
20/06/1946 |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
02/07/1965 |
|
19.08 |
|
|
|
|
19.33 |
9652
|
|
|
|
05/11/1946 |
|
29/01/1963 |
|
16.17 |
|
|
|
|
16.70 |
9653
|
|
|
|
09/11/1946 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
18.67 |
|
|
|
|
18.95 |
9654
|
|
|
|
12/11/1946 |
|
19/10/1964 |
|
17.92 |
|
|
|
|
18.27 |
9655
|
|
|
|
15/11/1946 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
17.5 |
|
|
|
|
18.10 |
9656
|
|
|
|
19/11/1946 |
|
18/11/1965 |
|
19 |
|
|
|
|
19.25 |
9657
|
|
|
|
22/11/1946 |
|
02/04/1966 |
|
19.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1966 |
19.66 |
9658
|
|
|
|
25/11/1946 |
|
15/10/1966 |
|
19.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
04/1967 |
20.40 |
9659
|
|
|
|
28/11/1946 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
18.58 |
|
|
|
|
18.89 |
9660
|
|
|
|
02/12/1946 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
17.92 |
|
|
|
|
18.13 |
9661
|
|
|
|
07/12/1946 |
|
14/11/1964 |
|
17.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1965 |
18.28 |
9662
|
|
|
|
08/04/1948 |
|
10/09/1965 |
|
17.42 |
|
|
|
|
17.70 |
9663
|
|
|
|
09/04/1948 |
|
07/09/1964 |
|
16.42 |
|
|
|
|
17.03 |
9664
|
|
|
|
15/04/1948 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
16.08 |
|
|
|
|
16.43 |
9665
|
|
|
|
20/04/1948 |
St Philips Marsh |
18/02/1963 |
|
14.83 |
|
|
|
|
15.91 |
9666
|
|
|
|
23/04/1948 |
|
10/09/1965 |
|
17.42 |
|
|
|
|
17.66 |
9667
|
|
|
|
06/05/1948 |
|
03/06/1965 |
|
17.08 |
|
|
|
|
17.45 |
9668
|
|
|
|
11/05/1948 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
15.58 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
07/1964 |
16.19 |
9669
|
|
|
|
19/04/1948 |
|
22/01/1966 |
|
17.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
04/1966 |
18.00 |
9670
|
|
|
|
26/05/1948 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
17.08 |
|
|
|
|
17.40 |
9671
|
|
|
|
02/06/1948 |
|
19/03/1965 |
|
16.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
07/1965 |
17.13 |
9672
|
|
|
|
08/06/1948 |
|
31/12/1965 |
|
17.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1966 |
17.86 |
9673
|
|
|
|
18/02/1949 |
|
17/05/1960 |
|
11.25 |
|
|
|
|
11.58 |
9674
|
|
|
|
02/03/1949 |
|
08/04/1964 |
|
15.08 |
|
|
|
|
15.30 |
9675
|
|
|
|
10/03/1949 |
|
01/10/1965 |
|
16.58 |
|
|
|
|
16.78 |
9676
|
|
|
|
11/03/1949 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
16.25 |
|
|
|
|
16.61 |
9677
|
|
|
|
18/03/1949 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
15.67 |
|
|
|
|
15.84 |
9678
|
|
|
|
04/04/1949 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
16.17 |
|
|
|
|
16.54 |
9679
|
|
|
|
11/04/1949 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
15.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1965 |
15.86 |
9680
|
|
|
|
25/04/1949 |
|
31/12/1965 |
|
16.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
06/1966 |
17.15 |
9681
|
|
|
|
03/05/1949 |
|
06/08/1965 |
|
16.25 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
9682
|
|
|
|
09/05/1949 |
|
06/08/1965 |
|
16.25 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
9701
|
|
|
|
15/09/1933 |
|
13/01/1961 |
|
27.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1961 |
27.60 |
9702
|
|
|
|
22/09/1933 |
|
07/05/1962 |
|
28.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1962 |
29.17 |
9703
|
|
|
|
28/09/1933 |
|
11/12/1961 |
|
28.25 |
|
|
|
|
28.81 |
9704
|
|
|
|
11/10/1933 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
30.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
06/1964 |
30.70 |
9705
|
|
|
|
16/10/1933 |
|
09/10/1961 |
|
28 |
|
|
|
|
28.27 |
9706
|
|
|
|
08/12/1933 |
|
13/11/1964 |
|
30.92 |
|
|
|
|
31.21 |
9707
|
|
|
|
28/11/1933 |
|
07/09/1964 |
|
30.83 |
|
|
|
|
31.07 |
9708
|
|
|
|
12/12/1933 |
|
29/01/1959 |
|
25.08 |
|
|
|
|
25.61 |
9709
|
|
|
|
05/12/1933 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
28.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1962 |
28.80 |
9710
|
|
|
|
07/12/1933 |
|
09/10/1964 |
|
30.83 |
|
|
|
|
31.13 |
9711
|
|
|
|
12/06/1934 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
31.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1965 |
31.36 |
9712
|
|
|
|
13/06/1934 |
|
25/09/1962 |
|
28.25 |
|
|
|
|
28.53 |
9713
|
|
|
|
18/06/1934 |
|
23/07/1963 |
|
29.08 |
|
|
|
|
29.26 |
9714
|
|
|
|
19/06/1934 |
|
07/11/1961 |
|
27.42 |
|
|
|
|
27.76 |
9715
|
|
|
|
25/06/1934 |
|
23/07/1963 |
|
29.08 |
|
|
|
|
29.33 |
9716
|
|
|
|
28/06/1934 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
31 |
|
|
|
|
31.32 |
9717
|
|
|
|
28/06/1934 |
|
18/12/1962 |
|
28.5 |
|
|
|
|
28.48 |
9718
|
|
|
|
29/06/1934 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
27.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1963 |
28.65 |
9719
|
|
|
|
04/07/1934 |
|
24/07/1962 |
|
28 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
10/1962 |
28.30 |
9720
|
|
|
|
30/11/1934 |
|
22/11/1961 |
|
27 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1962 |
27.39 |
9721
|
|
|
|
30/11/1934 |
|
22/06/1962 |
|
27.58 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
09/1962 |
27.81 |
9722
|
|
|
|
04/12/1934 |
|
13/07/1962 |
|
27.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1962 |
28.05 |
9723
|
|
|
|
06/12/1934 |
|
24/07/1962 |
|
27.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1962 |
27.88 |
9724
|
|
|
|
06/12/1934 |
|
15/01/1966 |
|
31.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
04/1966 |
31.38 |
9725
|
|
|
|
11/12/1934 |
|
12/12/1962 |
|
28 |
|
|
|
|
28.53 |
9726
|
|
|
|
11/12/1934 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
30.5 |
|
|
|
|
30.87 |
9727
|
|
|
|
12/12/1934 |
|
09/11/1962 |
|
27.92 |
|
|
|
|
28.27 |
9728
|
|
|
|
14/12/1934 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
27.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1962 |
27.77 |
9729
|
|
|
|
13/12/1934 |
|
23/10/1964 |
|
29.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1965 |
30.36 |
9730
|
|
|
|
01/01/1935 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
29.33 |
|
|
|
|
29.64 |
9731
|
|
|
|
04/01/1935 |
|
02/05/1963 |
|
28.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1963 |
28.88 |
9732
|
|
|
|
05/01/1935 |
|
08/04/1964 |
|
29.25 |
|
|
|
|
29.46 |
9733
|
|
|
|
04/01/1935 |
|
25/09/1965 |
|
30.67 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
11/1965 |
30.88 |
9734
|
|
|
|
05/01/1935 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
29.5 |
|
|
|
|
29.96 |
9735
|
|
|
|
10/01/1935 |
|
02/03/1961 |
|
26.17 |
|
|
|
|
26.87 |
9736
|
|
|
|
11/01/1935 |
|
23/06/1961 |
|
26.42 |
|
|
|
|
26.78 |
9737
|
|
|
|
14/01/1935 |
|
14/12/1960 |
|
25.92 |
|
|
|
|
26.18 |
9738
|
|
|
|
15/01/1935 |
|
18/01/1962 |
|
27 |
|
|
|
|
27.52 |
9739
|
|
|
|
16/01/1935 |
|
04/07/1961 |
|
26.5 |
|
|
|
|
27.10 |
9740
|
|
|
|
24/01/1935 |
|
02/02/1962 |
|
27.08 |
|
|
|
|
27.49 |
9741
|
|
|
|
24/01/1935 |
|
03/08/1962 |
|
27.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
11/1963 |
28.83 |
9742
|
|
|
|
28/01/1935 |
|
01/09/1964 |
|
29.67 |
|
|
|
|
29.73 |
9743
|
|
|
|
29/01/1935 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
29.25 |
|
|
|
|
29.73 |
9744
|
|
|
|
31/01/1935 |
|
14/01/1963 |
|
28 |
|
|
|
|
28.22 |
9745
|
|
|
|
04/02/1935 |
|
30/06/1961 |
|
26.33 |
|
|
|
|
26.96 |
9746
|
|
|
|
06/02/1935 |
|
10/03/1964 |
|
29.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1965 |
29.96 |
9747
|
|
|
|
07/02/1935 |
|
14/01/1963 |
|
27.92 |
|
|
|
|
28.37 |
9748
|
|
|
|
08/02/1935 |
|
06/01/1964 |
|
28.92 |
|
|
|
|
29.12 |
9749
|
|
|
|
13/02/1935 |
|
09/11/1960 |
|
25.75 |
|
|
|
|
26.94 |
9750
|
|
|
|
22/05/1935 |
|
14/05/1962 |
|
27 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1962 |
27.42 |
9751
|
|
|
|
24/05/1935 |
|
13/06/1961 |
|
26.08 |
|
|
|
|
26.33 |
9752
|
|
|
|
31/05/1935 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
28.58 |
|
|
|
|
30.23 |
9753
|
|
|
|
31/05/1935 |
|
08/05/1965 |
|
30 |
|
|
|
|
30.40 |
9754
|
|
|
|
06/06/1935 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
30 |
|
|
|
|
30.38 |
9755
|
|
|
|
14/06/1935 |
|
02/05/1963 |
|
27.92 |
|
|
|
|
28.61 |
9756
|
|
|
|
19/06/1935 |
|
01/12/1962 |
|
27.5 |
|
|
|
|
27.59 |
9757
|
|
|
|
21/06/1935 |
|
16/08/1962 |
|
27.17 |
|
|
|
|
28.34 |
9758
|
|
|
|
26/06/1935 |
|
07/05/1962 |
|
26.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1962 |
27.24 |
9759
|
|
|
|
27/06/1935 |
|
22/10/1962 |
|
27.33 |
|
|
|
|
27.99 |
9760
|
|
|
|
19/09/1935 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
28.25 |
|
|
|
|
28.43 |
9761
|
|
|
|
21/09/1935 |
|
22/10/1962 |
|
27.08 |
|
|
|
|
27.08 |
9762
|
|
|
|
23/09/1935 |
|
09/05/1961 |
|
25.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
08/1961 |
25.91 |
9763
|
|
|
|
25/09/1935 |
|
23/09/1963 |
|
28 |
|
|
|
|
28.16 |
9764
|
|
|
|
27/09/1935 |
|
06/08/1963 |
|
27.92 |
|
|
|
|
28.24 |
9765
|
|
|
|
28/09/1935 |
|
04/12/1961 |
|
26.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1962 |
26.56 |
9766
|
|
|
|
02/10/1935 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
28.75 |
|
|
|
|
29.22 |
9767
|
|
|
|
05/10/1935 |
|
23/06/1961 |
|
25.67 |
|
|
|
|
26.05 |
9768
|
|
|
|
05/10/1935 |
|
12/12/1964 |
|
29.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1965 |
29.46 |
9769
|
|
|
|
08/10/1935 |
|
28/03/1963 |
|
27.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
06/1964 |
28.71 |
9770
|
|
|
|
04/03/1936 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
27.75 |
|
|
|
|
28.22 |
9771
|
|
|
|
06/03/1936 |
|
31/05/1961 |
|
25.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1961 |
25.55 |
9772
|
|
|
|
06/03/1936 |
|
07/01/1959 |
|
22.83 |
|
|
|
|
22.96 |
9773
|
|
|
|
07/03/1936 |
|
31/12/1965 |
|
29.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
06/1966 |
30.29 |
9774
|
|
|
|
13/03/1936 |
|
12/11/1966 |
|
30.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
04/1967 |
31.11 |
9775
|
|
|
|
20/03/1936 |
|
05/11/1962 |
|
26.67 |
|
|
|
|
27.25 |
9776
|
|
|
|
25/03/1936 |
|
16/04/1966 |
|
30.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
06/1966 |
30.24 |
9777
|
|
|
|
26/03/1936 |
Swansea East Dock |
06/05/1964 |
|
28.17 |
|
|
|
|
28.32 |
9778
|
|
|
|
01/04/1936 |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
06/11/1964 |
|
28.58 |
|
|
|
|
28.97 |
9779
|
|
|
|
03/04/1936 |
Milford Haven |
14/02/1964 |
|
27.83 |
|
|
|
|
28.30 |
9780
|
|
|
|
23/06/1936 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
29.08 |
|
|
|
|
29.33 |
9781
|
|
|
|
24/06/1936 |
|
15/05/1961 |
|
24.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1961 |
25.24 |
9782
|
|
|
|
29/06/1936 |
|
10/10/1964 |
|
28.33 |
|
|
|
|
28.57 |
9783
|
|
|
|
01/07/1936 |
|
21/05/1962 |
|
25.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1962 |
26.31 |
9784
|
|
|
|
04/07/1936 |
|
02/05/1963 |
|
26.83 |
|
|
|
|
27.55 |
9785
|
|
|
|
07/05/1936 |
|
01/09/1962 |
|
26.33 |
|
|
|
|
26.46 |
9786
|
|
|
|
08/05/1936 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
28 |
|
|
|
|
28.21 |
9787
|
|
|
|
09/05/1936 |
|
07/09/1964 |
|
28.33 |
|
|
|
|
28.54 |
9788
|
|
|
|
14/05/1936 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
27.92 |
|
|
|
|
28.44 |
9789
|
|
|
|
15/05/1936 |
|
03/12/1965 |
|
29.58 |
|
|
|
|
29.94 |
9790
|
|
|
|
25/05/1936 |
|
10/09/1965 |
|
29.33 |
|
|
|
|
29.66 |
9791
|
|
|
|
29/05/1936 |
|
06/01/1964 |
|
27.67 |
|
|
|
|
27.81 |
9792
|
|
|
|
30/05/1936 |
|
20/03/1964 |
|
27.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
9793
|
|
|
|
05/06/1936 |
|
19/08/1963 |
|
27.17 |
|
|
|
|
27.46 |
9794
|
|
|
|
06/06/1936 |
|
07/09/1964 |
|
28.25 |
|
|
|
|
28.46 |
9795
|
|
|
|
09/09/1936 |
|
29/11/1960 |
|
24.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1961 |
24.61 |
9796
|
|
|
|
10/09/1936 |
|
06/02/1965 |
|
28.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
03/1965 |
28.53 |
9797
|
|
|
|
11/09/1936 |
|
12/09/1962 |
|
26 |
|
|
|
|
26.11 |
9798
|
|
|
|
16/09/1936 |
|
09/10/1964 |
|
28.08 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
12/1964 |
28.27 |
9799
|
|
|
|
21/09/1936 |
|
04/10/1963 |
|
27.08 |
|
|
|
|
27.25 |
8700
|
|
|
|
28/03/1934 |
|
09/02/1962 |
|
27.92 |
|
|
|
|
28.15 |