GWR Collett "6400" Class 0-6-0PT
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6400 | 6400 | 02/1932 | PPRD 83D 72A 83E W |
Pontypool Road Laira Exmouth Junction Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/04/1959 06/04/1963 30/11/1963 04/1964 |
20/04/1964 |
6400 | 6401 | 02/1932 | CHYS MTHR CHYS CV.AYN 86A 84F 86A W |
Cardiff Cathays Merthyr Tydfil Cardiff Cathays Abercynon Ebbw Junction (Newport) Stourbridge Junction Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 11/01/1936 07/03/1936 15/06/1947 08/09/1956 27/12/1958 21/05/1960 06/1960 |
30/06/1960 |
6400 | 6402 | 02/1932 | CHYS 83D W |
Cardiff Cathays Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/09/1958 06/1959 |
15/06/1959 |
6400 | 6403 | 03/1932 | LMTN SRD PPRD 84F 84C 84F W |
Leamington Stafford Road Pontypool Road Stourbridge Junction Banbury Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 07/03/1936 15/06/1947 25/01/1958 30/01/1960 06/10/1962 10/1963 |
07/10/1963 |
6400 | 6404 | 03/1932 | BHD CNYD 84A 84J 89A W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Croes Newydd Stafford Road Croes Newydd Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/02/1949 04/12/1954 29/01/1955 21/03/1959 06/1959 |
23/06/1959 |
6400 | 6405 | 03/1932 | BHD CNYD W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Croes Newydd Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/07/1948 06/1959 |
15/06/1959 |
6400 | 6406 | 04/1932 | LA W |
Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1960 |
30/06/1960 |
6400 | 6407 | 04/1932 | SHL LA 83C 83D W |
Southall Laira Exeter Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 29/01/1949 16/07/1955 08/10/1955 08/1958 |
13/08/1958 |
6400 | 6408 | 04/1932 | MTHR 88C 82D 83D 86A 86F W |
Merthyr Tydfil Barry Westbury Laira Ebbw Junction (Newport) Aberbeeg Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/01/1958 22/03/1958 05/09/1959 18/06/1960 10/09/1960 02/1962 |
02/02/1962 |
6400 | 6409 | 04/1932 | NPT 86D 86D 86B 86B W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Llantrisant Llantrisant Newport Pill Newport Pill Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/10/1950 31/10/1950 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 03/1959 |
19/03/1959 |
6400 | 6410 | 05/11/1934 | ABEEG ABDR ABDR 83D 81B W |
Aberbeeg Aberdare Aberdare Laira Slough Withdrawn |
20/04/1946 18/05/1946 15/06/1947 03/10/1959 16/07/1960 13/11/1962 |
13/11/1962 |
6400 | 6411 | 09/11/1934 | CV.AYN 88A W |
Abercynon Radyr Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/09/1958 03/1961 |
02/03/1961 |
6400 | 6412 | 12/11/1934 | LDR 86A 72A 83E 85B W |
Landore Ebbw Junction (Newport) Exmouth Junction Yeovil Town Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/08/1956 27/07/1963 30/11/1963 24/08/1964 11/1964 |
06/11/1964 |
6400 | 6413 | 13/11/1934 | ABDR 14D 83D 91W W |
Aberdare Neasden Laira To Western Region / GWR Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/07/1959 31/10/1959 14/11/1959 11/1961 |
14/11/1961 |
6400 | 6414 | 14/11/1934 | LA W |
Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1959 |
29/06/1959 |
6400 | 6415 | 20/11/1934 | NPT 85B W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 22/03/1958 11/1961 |
02/11/1961 |
6400 | 6416 | 23/11/1934 | CDF LTS CHYS 88D 88A 88D W |
Cardiff Canton Llantrisant Cardiff Cathays Merthyr Tydfil Radyr Merthyr Tydfil Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 07/03/1936 23/03/1946 20/04/1946 15/06/1947 23/02/1957 19/04/1958 09/08/1958 09/1963 |
23/09/1963 |
6400 | 6417 | 06/12/1934 | LA 86J 86A W |
Laira Aberdare Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/10/1953 19/04/1958 06/1959 |
22/06/1959 |
6400 | 6418 | 07/12/1934 | SRD 84C 84F 84C 84A 84A 84F W |
Stafford Road Banbury Stourbridge Junction Banbury Stafford Road Stafford Road Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/02/1950 20/05/1950 17/06/1950 14/07/1951 31/07/1951 11/08/1962 26/11/1962 |
26/11/1962 |
6400 | 6419 | 11/12/1934 | TN LA LA TN LA 85B 86F 83E W |
Taunton Laira Laira Taunton Laira Gloucester Horton Road Aberbeeg Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
29/12/1945 26/01/1946 15/06/1947 29/01/1949 05/11/1949 16/07/1960 10/09/1960 04/05/1964 12/1964 |
26/12/1964 |
6400 | 6420 | 24/08/1935 | TN TN LA W |
Taunton Taunton Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/07/1948 14/10/1948 11/1959 |
27/11/1959 |
6400 | 6421 | 29/08/1935 | LA 84C 84H 83D W |
Laira Banbury Wellington Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/07/1960 07/10/1961 17/11/1962 09/02/1963 |
07/01/1963 |
6400 | 6422 | 31/08/1935 | CNYD SRD W |
Croes Newydd Stafford Road Withdrawn |
29/12/1945 15/06/1947 09/1962 |
27/09/1962 |
6400 | 6423 | 05/09/1935 | CHYS 88D W |
Cardiff Cathays Merthyr Tydfil Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/03/1956 08/1958 |
11/08/1958 |
6400 | 6424 | 09/09/1935 | PPRD 86E 85C 84F W |
Pontypool Road Severn Tunnel Junction Gloucester Barnwood Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/11/1959 21/04/1962 15/12/1962 09/1964 |
05/09/1964 |
6400 | 6425 | 09/11/1935 | LDR 86A W |
Landore Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/08/1956 01/1961 |
17/01/1961 |
6400 | 6426 | 11/11/1935 | NPT 86G 86A W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Pontypool Road Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/04/1957 05/10/1957 03/1961 |
22/03/1961 |
6400 | 6427 | 13/11/1935 | MTHR 88E 88D W |
Merthyr Tydfil Abercynon Merthyr Tydfil Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 08/1958 |
12/08/1958 |
6400 | 6428 | 15/11/1935 | NPT 84F W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/01/1958 03/1959 |
19/03/1959 |
6400 | 6429 | 18/11/1935 | PPRD PPRD 84J 84C 84H W |
Pontypool Road Pontypool Road Croes Newydd Banbury Wellington Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 15/06/1947 27/12/1958 13/06/1959 07/10/1961 03/1962 |
15/03/1962 |
6400 | 6430 | 02/03/1937 | PPRD 86A 86E 88B 83D 88H 72A 83E W |
Pontypool Road Ebbw Junction (Newport) Severn Tunnel Junction Radyr Laira Tondu Exmouth Junction Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/10/1954 21/03/1959 09/09/1961 19/05/1962 09/02/1963 06/04/1963 30/11/1963 10/1964 |
09/10/1964 |
6400 | 6431 | 03/03/1937 | LDR 86J 86A 86J 88H W |
Landore Aberdare Ebbw Junction (Newport) Aberdare Tondu Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/08/1956 19/04/1958 09/08/1958 24/02/1962 09/02/1963 |
07/01/1963 |
6400 | 6432 | 05/03/1937 | PPRD W |
Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1959 |
19/03/1959 |
6400 | 6433 | 15/03/1937 | CHYS CHYS 88D W |
Cardiff Cathays Cardiff Cathays Merthyr Tydfil Withdrawn |
18/05/1946 15/06/1947 03/10/1953 09/02/1963 |
14/01/1963 |
6400 | 6434 | 12/03/1937 | MTHR CV.AYN MTHR 88A 86G 88A 86A 88H 2C W |
Merthyr Tydfil Abercynon Merthyr Tydfil Cardiff Cathays Pontypool Road Cardiff Cathays Ebbw Junction (Newport) Tondu Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/07/1948 07/08/1948 18/05/1957 05/10/1957 02/11/1957 07/10/1961 27/07/1963 06/10/1963 09/1964 |
05/09/1964 |
6400 | 6435 | 03/04/1937 | CHYS 88D 88A 88E 88H 83E W |
Cardiff Cathays Merthyr Tydfil Cardiff Cathays Abercynon Tondu Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/10/1953 21/04/1956 30/11/1957 11/08/1962 30/11/1963 10/1964 |
09/10/1964 |
6400 | 6436 | 07/04/1937 | CHYS 88D 88E 88D 88H W |
Cardiff Cathays Merthyr Tydfil Abercynon Merthyr Tydfil Tondu Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/10/1953 03/12/1955 31/12/1955 16/06/1962 09/1962 |
27/09/1962 |
6400 | 6437 | 19/04/1937 | ABDR 85B W |
Aberdare Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/05/1960 07/1963 |
02/07/1963 |
6400 | 6438 | 22/04/1937 | PPRD 86C 88E 88H 88B 83D W |
Pontypool Road Hereford Abercynon Tondu Radyr Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/12/1960 25/03/1961 09/09/1961 07/10/1961 19/05/1962 13/11/1962 |
13/11/1962 |
6400 | 6439 | 26/04/1937 | NPT 86D 86A W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Llantrisant Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/09/1952 14/08/1954 05/1960 |
10/05/1960 |