GWR Collett "6400" Class 0-6-0PT
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6401 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6403 | LMTN | Leamington | |||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 6401 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 6416 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 6429 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 6401 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 6403 | LMTN | Leamington | SRD | Stafford Road | |
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 6416 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | LTS | Llantrisant | |
29/12/1945 | Reallocation | 6419 | TN | Taunton | |||
29/12/1945 | Reallocation | 6422 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
26/01/1946 | Reallocation | 6419 | TN | Taunton | LA | Laira | |
20/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6410 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | |||
18/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6410 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ABDR | Aberdare | |
18/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6433 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6400 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6401 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | AYN | Abercynon | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6402 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6403 | SRD | Stafford Road | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6404 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6405 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6406 | LA | Laira | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6407 | SHL | Southall | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6408 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6409 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6410 | ABDR | Aberdare | ABDR | Aberdare | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6411 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6412 | LDR | Landore | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6413 | ABDR | Aberdare | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6414 | LA | Laira | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6415 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6416 | CVAYN | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6417 | LA | Laira | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6418 | SRD | Stafford Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6419 | LA | Laira | LA | Laira | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6420 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6421 | LA | Laira | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6422 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | SRD | Stafford Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6423 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6424 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6425 | LDR | Landore | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6426 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6427 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6428 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6429 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6430 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6431 | LDR | Landore | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6432 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6433 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6434 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6435 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6436 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6437 | ABDR | Aberdare | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6438 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6439 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 6405 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 6420 | TN | Taunton | TN | Taunton | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 6434 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | AYN | Abercynon | |
07/08/1948 | Reallocation | 6434 | AYN | Abercynon | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |
14/10/1948 | Reallocation | 6420 | TN | Taunton | LA | Laira | |
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 6407 | SHL | Southall | LA | Laira | |
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 6419 | LA | Laira | TN | Taunton | |
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 6404 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 6419 | TN | Taunton | LA | Laira | |
25/02/1950 | Reallocation | 6418 | SRD | Stafford Road | 84C | Banbury | |
20/05/1950 | Reallocation | 6418 | 84C | Banbury | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 6418 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84C | Banbury | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 6409 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86D | Llantrisant | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 6409 | 86D | Llantrisant | 86D | Llantrisant | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 6409 | 86D | Llantrisant | 86B | Newport Pill | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 6409 | 86B | Newport Pill | 86B | Newport Pill | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 6418 | 84C | Banbury | 84A | Stafford Road | |
31/07/1951 | Reallocation | 6418 | 84A | Stafford Road | 84A | Stafford Road | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 6439 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86D | Llantrisant | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6433 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6435 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6436 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6417 | LA | Laira | 86J | Aberdare | |
14/08/1954 | Reallocation | 6439 | 86D | Llantrisant | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 6430 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 6404 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 84A | Stafford Road | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 6404 | 84A | Stafford Road | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 6407 | LA | Laira | 83C | Exeter | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 6407 | 83C | Exeter | 83D | Laira | |
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 6436 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88E | Abercynon | |
31/12/1955 | Reallocation | 6436 | 88E | Abercynon | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 6423 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 6435 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6427 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 88E | Abercynon | |
14/07/1956 | Reallocation | 6427 | 88E | Abercynon | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 6412 | LDR | Landore | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 6425 | LDR | Landore | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 6431 | LDR | Landore | 86J | Aberdare | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 6401 | AYN | Abercynon | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
23/02/1957 | Reallocation | 6416 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 6426 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 6434 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 6426 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 6434 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 6434 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 6435 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88E | Abercynon | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 6403 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 6408 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 88C | Barry | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 6428 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 6408 | 88C | Barry | 82D | Westbury | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 6415 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
19/04/1958 | Reallocation | 6416 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88A | Radyr | |
19/04/1958 | Reallocation | 6417 | 86J | Aberdare | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
19/04/1958 | Reallocation | 6431 | 86J | Aberdare | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 6416 | 88A | Radyr | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 6431 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86J | Aberdare | |
11/08/1958 | Condemned | 6423 | 98W | COND | |||
12/08/1958 | Condemned | 6427 | 98W | COND | |||
13/08/1958 | Condemned | 6407 | 98W | COND | |||
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 6402 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 83D | Laira | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 6411 | AYN | Abercynon | 88A | Radyr | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 6401 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 6429 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
19/03/1959 | Condemned | 6409 | 98W | COND | |||
19/03/1959 | Condemned | 6428 | 98W | COND | |||
19/03/1959 | Condemned | 6432 | 98W | COND | |||
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 6404 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 89A | Oswestry | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 6430 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 6400 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 83D | Laira | |
13/06/1959 | Reallocation | 6429 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84C | Banbury | |
15/06/1959 | Condemned | 6402 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1959 | Condemned | 6405 | 98W | COND | |||
22/06/1959 | Condemned | 6417 | 98W | COND | |||
23/06/1959 | Condemned | 6404 | 98W | COND | |||
29/06/1959 | Condemned | 6414 | 98W | COND | |||
18/07/1959 | Reallocation | 6413 | ABDR | Aberdare | 14D | Neasden | |
05/09/1959 | Reallocation | 6408 | 82D | Westbury | 83D | Laira | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6410 | ABDR | Aberdare | 83D | Laira | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6413 | 14D | Neasden | 83D | Laira | |
14/11/1959 | Reallocation | 6413 | 83D | Laira | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
27/11/1959 | Condemned | 6420 | 98W | COND | |||
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 6424 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 6403 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84C | Banbury | |
10/05/1960 | Condemned | 6439 | 98W | COND | |||
21/05/1960 | Reallocation | 6401 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
21/05/1960 | Reallocation | 6437 | ABDR | Aberdare | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 6408 | 83D | Laira | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
30/06/1960 | Condemned | 6401 | 98W | COND | |||
30/06/1960 | Condemned | 6406 | 98W | COND | |||
16/07/1960 | Reallocation | 6410 | 83D | Laira | 81B | Slough | |
16/07/1960 | Reallocation | 6419 | LA | Laira | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
16/07/1960 | Reallocation | 6421 | LA | Laira | 84C | Banbury | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 6408 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86F | Aberbeeg | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 6419 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 86F | Aberbeeg | |
31/12/1960 | Reallocation | 6438 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86C | Hereford | |
17/01/1961 | Condemned | 6425 | 98W | COND | |||
02/03/1961 | Condemned | 6411 | 98W | COND | |||
22/03/1961 | Condemned | 6426 | 98W | COND | |||
25/03/1961 | Reallocation | 6438 | 86C | Hereford | 88E | Abercynon | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 6430 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 88B | Radyr | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 6438 | 88E | Abercynon | 88H | Tondu | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 6421 | 84C | Banbury | 84H | Wellington | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 6429 | 84C | Banbury | 84H | Wellington | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 6434 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 6438 | 88H | Tondu | 88B | Radyr | |
02/11/1961 | Condemned | 6415 | 98W | COND | |||
14/11/1961 | Condemned | 6413 | 98W | COND | |||
02/02/1962 | Condemned | 6408 | 98W | COND | |||
24/02/1962 | Reallocation | 6431 | 86J | Aberdare | 88H | Tondu | |
15/03/1962 | Condemned | 6429 | 98W | COND | |||
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 6424 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
19/05/1962 | Reallocation | 6430 | 88B | Radyr | 83D | Laira | |
19/05/1962 | Reallocation | 6438 | 88B | Radyr | 83D | Laira | |
16/06/1962 | Reallocation | 6436 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88H | Tondu | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 6418 | 84A | Stafford Road | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 6435 | 88E | Abercynon | 88H | Tondu | |
27/09/1962 | Condemned | 6422 | 98W | COND | |||
27/09/1962 | Condemned | 6436 | 98W | COND | |||
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 6403 | 84C | Banbury | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
13/11/1962 | Condemned | 6410 | 81B | Slough | COND | ||
13/11/1962 | Condemned | 6438 | 83D | Laira | COND | ||
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 6421 | 84H | Wellington | 83D | Laira | |
26/11/1962 | Condemned | 6418 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | COND | ||
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 6424 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
07/01/1963 | Condemned | 6421 | 83D | Laira | COND | ||
07/01/1963 | Condemned | 6431 | 88H | Tondu | COND | ||
14/01/1963 | Condemned | 6433 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | COND | ||
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 6430 | 83D | Laira | 88H | Tondu | |
06/04/1963 | Reallocation | 6400 | 83D | Laira | 72A | Exmouth Junction | |
06/04/1963 | Reallocation | 6430 | 88H | Tondu | 72A | Exmouth Junction | |
02/07/1963 | Condemned | 6437 | 98W | COND | |||
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 6412 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 72A | Exmouth Junction | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 6434 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 88H | Tondu | |
23/09/1963 | Condemned | 6416 | 98W | COND | |||
06/10/1963 | Reallocation | 6434 | 88H | Tondu | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | |
07/10/1963 | Condemned | 6403 | 98W | COND | |||
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6400 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 83E | Yeovil Town | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6412 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 83E | Yeovil Town | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6430 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 83E | Yeovil Town | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6435 | 88H | Tondu | 83E | Yeovil Town | |
20/04/1964 | Condemned | 6400 | 98W | COND | |||
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 6419 | 86F | Aberbeeg | 83E | Yeovil Town | |
24/08/1964 | Reallocation | 6412 | 83E | Yeovil Town | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
05/09/1964 | Condemned | 6424 | 98W | COND | |||
05/09/1964 | Condemned | 6434 | 98W | COND | |||
09/10/1964 | Condemned | 6430 | 98W | COND | |||
09/10/1964 | Condemned | 6435 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 6412 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 6419 | 98W | COND |