Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 398 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5367 Week
» 17880 Month
» 106072 Year
» 990453 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "74xx" Class 0-6-0PT


Class GWR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
7400 7400 07/1936 87K
87G
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Carmarthen
Withdrawn
30/04/1951
19/05/1951
06/1960
06/1960
7400 7401 08/1936 85C
W
Hereford
Withdrawn
24/01/1959
08/1959
08/1959
7400 7402 08/1936 89C
87G
W
Machynlleth
Carmarthen
Withdrawn
16/05/1953
26/03/1955
07/1962
07/1962
7400 7403 08/1936 86E
W
Severn Tunnel Junction
Withdrawn
10/09/1960
01/1964
01/1964
7400 7404 08/1936 87D
W
Swansea East Dock
Withdrawn
28/12/1963
06/1964
06/1964
7400 7405 08/1936 87G
W
Carmarthen
Withdrawn
15/12/1962
12/1963
12/1963
7400 7406 08/1936 W Withdrawn 03/1962 03/1962
7400 7407 08/1936 W Withdrawn 12/1963 12/1963
7400 7408 08/1936 82C
87K
87D
87G
W
Swindon
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Swansea East Dock
Carmarthen
Withdrawn
29/01/1955
26/03/1955
05/09/1959
28/01/1961
08/1962
08/1962
7400 7409 08/1936 W Withdrawn 08/1961 08/1961
7400 7410 12/1936 89C
89A
W
Machynlleth
Oswestry
Withdrawn
17/07/1954
06/11/1954
01/1961
01/1961
7400 7411 12/1936 W Withdrawn 05/1959 05/1959
7400 7412 12/1936 W Withdrawn 07/1963 07/1963
7400 7413 12/1936 WTD
82C
86C
84E
2C
W
Whitland
Swindon
Hereford
Tyseley
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
18/05/1946
24/04/1954
09/09/1961
20/07/1963
21/03/1964
09/1964
09/1964
7400 7414 12/1936 84F
W
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
30/03/1963
09/1964
09/1964
7400 7415 12/1936 82F
82C
82F
82C
W
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Swindon
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Swindon
Withdrawn
21/03/1953
03/10/1953
05/10/1957
02/11/1957
02/1959
02/1959
7400 7416 12/1936 HFD
W
Hereford
Withdrawn
30/10/1948
01/1959
01/1959
7400 7417 01/1937 WTD
89D
89C
W
Whitland
Oswestry
Machynlleth
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
03/12/1960
25/02/1961
09/1961
09/1961
7400 7418 01/1937 82F
82C
82F
82C
85C
89B
89B
84F
W
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Swindon
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Swindon
Hereford
Croes Newydd
Croes Newydd
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
19/05/1951
31/08/1951
21/03/1953
03/10/1953
08/08/1959
24/02/1962
15/12/1962
30/03/1963
09/1964
09/1964
7400 7419 01/1937 W Withdrawn 07/1960 07/1960
7400 7420 05/1937 84F
84E
W
Stourbridge Junction
Tyseley
Withdrawn
01/12/1956
21/03/1959
07/1959
07/1959
7400 7421 05/1937 82F
82C
82F
82C
W
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Swindon
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Swindon
Withdrawn
21/03/1953
19/06/1954
10/09/1955
03/12/1955
11/1961
11/1961
7400 7422 05/1937 EXE
84J
87G
W
Exeter
Croes Newydd
Carmarthen
Withdrawn
07/09/1946
26/01/1957
20/04/1957
03/1962
03/1962
7400 7423 05/1937 W Withdrawn 07/1964 07/1964
7400 7424 05/1937 84E
2C
W
Tyseley
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
08/08/1959
21/03/1964
09/1964
09/1964
7400 7425 06/1937 W Withdrawn 06/1962 06/1962
7400 7426 06/1937 86E
85C
84F
84E
W
Severn Tunnel Junction
Hereford
Stourbridge Junction
Tyseley
Withdrawn
18/06/1955
06/09/1958
25/02/1961
25/03/1961
07/1963
07/1963
7400 7427 06/1937 82C
86E
87D
W
Swindon
Severn Tunnel Junction
Swansea East Dock
Withdrawn
21/03/1959
15/07/1961
25/01/1964
06/1964
06/1964
7400 7428 06/1937 84J
89C
W
Croes Newydd
Machynlleth
Withdrawn
27/12/1958
08/10/1960
05/10/1962
05/10/1962
7400 7429 06/1937 W Withdrawn 02/1961 02/1961
7400 7430 31/08/1948 W Withdrawn 12/1963 12/1963
7400 7431 31/08/1948 89A
89B
W
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
05/11/1960
25/02/1961
08/1964
08/1964
7400 7432 31/08/1948 84J
84F
85C
84F
84F
W
Croes Newydd
Stourbridge Junction
Gloucester Barnwood
Stourbridge Junction
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
28/02/1951
24/03/1962
21/04/1962
06/04/1963
09/1964
09/1964
7400 7433 31/08/1948 W Withdrawn 02/1961 02/1961
7400 7434 31/08/1948 89C
89D
W
Machynlleth
Oswestry
Withdrawn
08/08/1959
25/02/1961
22/10/1962
22/10/1962
7400 7435 30/09/1948 84J
84F
85B
84F
88J
W
Croes Newydd
Stourbridge Junction
Gloucester Horton Road
Stourbridge Junction
Aberdare
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
30/11/1950
27/01/1962
14/07/1962
30/11/1963
07/1964
07/1964
7400 7436 30/09/1948 83B
82B
W
Taunton
St Philips Marsh
Withdrawn
14/06/1958
30/11/1963
06/1964
06/1964
7400 7437 30/09/1948 85C
87F
87F
W
Hereford
Llanelly
Llanelly
Withdrawn
24/01/1953
28/12/1963
20/07/1964
03/1965
03/1965
7400 7438 31/10/1948 W Withdrawn 02/1959 02/1959
7400 7439 31/10/1948 87K
87F
87K
87G
87C
87G
87F
87F
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Carmarthen
Danygraig
Carmarthen
Llanelly
Llanelly
Withdrawn
30/09/1950
30/04/1951
19/05/1951
26/03/1955
07/09/1957
30/01/1960
13/04/1964
20/07/1964
04/1965
04/1965
7400 7440 31/01/1950 W Withdrawn 30/10/1962 30/10/1962
7400 7441 31/01/1950 84F
W
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
17/05/1952
12/1963
12/1963
7400 7442 28/02/1950 84F
84J
89C
89B
89C
89B
87G
W
Stourbridge Junction
Croes Newydd
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Carmarthen
Withdrawn
17/05/1952
12/07/1952
07/10/1961
24/02/1962
24/03/1962
03/11/1962
09/02/1963
12/1963
12/1963
7400 7443 28/02/1950 84F
W
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
30/03/1963
09/1964
09/1964
7400 7444 28/02/1950 87G
87F
87F
W
Carmarthen
Llanelly
Llanelly
Withdrawn
28/12/1963
22/02/1964
13/04/1964
07/1964
07/1964
7400 7445 31/03/1950 83D
83A
81F
87G
87G
W
Laira
Newton Abbot
Oxford
Carmarthen
Carmarthen
Withdrawn
10/08/1957
07/09/1957
13/06/1959
11/08/1962
28/12/1963
03/1964
03/1964
7400 7446 31/03/1950 89C
89D
87F
W
Machynlleth
Oswestry
Llanelly
Withdrawn
21/04/1962
11/08/1962
28/12/1963
07/1964
07/1964
7400 7447 31/03/1950 84F
W
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
11/08/1956
04/1959
04/1959
7400 7448 30/04/1950 37C
87G
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Carmarthen
Withdrawn
31/05/1950
10/09/1960
09/02/1963
09/02/1963
7400 7449 30/04/1950 W Withdrawn 06/1963 06/1963