GWR Collett "7400" Class 0-6-0PT
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 7417 | WTD | Whitland | |||
18/05/1946 | Reallocation | 7413 | WTD | Whitland | |||
07/09/1946 | Reallocation | 7422 | EXE | Exeter | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7400 | CARM | Carmarthen | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7401 | CARM | Carmarthen | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7402 | TYS | Tyseley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7403 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7404 | OXF | Oxford | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7405 | OSY | Oswestry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7406 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7407 | CARM | Carmarthen | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7408 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7409 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7410 | OSY | Oswestry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7411 | OXF | Oxford | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7412 | OXF | Oxford | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7413 | WTD | Whitland | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7414 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7415 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7416 | WOS | Worcester | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7417 | WTD | Whitland | WTD | Whitland | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7418 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7419 | CARM | Carmarthen | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7420 | HFD | Hereford | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7421 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7422 | EXE | Exeter | TR | Truro | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7423 | ABDR | Aberdare | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7424 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7425 | CARM | Carmarthen | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7426 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7427 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7428 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7429 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |||
30/10/1948 | Reallocation | 7416 | WOS | Worcester | HFD | Hereford | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 7417 | WTD | Whitland | WTD | Whitland | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 7429 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 7438 | TYS | Tyseley | |||
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 7417 | WTD | Whitland | MCH | Machynlleth | |
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 7446 | 83E | St Blazey | |||
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 7447 | 84J | Croes Newydd | |||
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 7448 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
20/05/1950 | Reallocation | 7448 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
20/05/1950 | Reallocation | 7449 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |||
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 7439 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |||
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 7439 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 7432 | 84J | Croes Newydd | |||
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 7435 | 84J | Croes Newydd | |||
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 7432 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 7435 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 7435 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 7435 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 7432 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 7432 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 7400 | CARM | Carmarthen | 87G | Carmarthen | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 7439 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
30/04/1951 | Reallocation | 7400 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
30/04/1951 | Reallocation | 7439 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87F | Llanelli | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 7400 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87G | Carmarthen | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 7418 | SDN | Swindon | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 7439 | 87F | Llanelli | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 7418 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82C | Swindon | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 7418 | 82C | Swindon | 82C | Swindon | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 7441 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |||
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 7442 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |||
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 7442 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 7437 | 85C | Hereford | |||
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 7415 | SDN | Swindon | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 7418 | 82C | Swindon | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 7421 | TN | Taunton | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 7402 | TYS | Tyseley | 89C | Machynlleth | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 7415 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82C | Swindon | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 7418 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82C | Swindon | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 7413 | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | 82C | Swindon | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 7421 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82C | Swindon | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 7410 | OSY | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 7410 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89A | Oswestry | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 7408 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82C | Swindon | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 7402 | 89C | Machynlleth | 87G | Carmarthen | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 7408 | 82C | Swindon | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 7439 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87G | Carmarthen | |
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 7426 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 7421 | 82C | Swindon | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 7421 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82C | Swindon | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 7447 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 7420 | HFD | Hereford | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 7422 | TR | Truro | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 7422 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 87G | Carmarthen | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 7445 | 83D | Laira | |||
07/09/1957 | Reallocation | 7439 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87C | Danygraig | |
07/09/1957 | Reallocation | 7445 | 83D | Laira | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 7415 | 82C | Swindon | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 7415 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82C | Swindon | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 7436 | 83B | Taunton | |||
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 7426 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 85C | Hereford | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 7428 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
19/01/1959 | Condemned | 7416 | 98W | COND | |||
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 7401 | CARM | Carmarthen | 85C | Hereford | |
09/02/1959 | Condemned | 7415 | 98W | COND | |||
09/02/1959 | Condemned | 7438 | 98W | COND | |||
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 7420 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84E | Tyseley | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 7427 | NA | Newton Abbot | 82C | Swindon | |
20/04/1959 | Condemned | 7447 | 98W | COND | |||
11/05/1959 | Condemned | 7411 | 98W | COND | |||
13/06/1959 | Reallocation | 7445 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 81F | Oxford | |
29/07/1959 | Condemned | 7420 | 98W | COND | |||
08/08/1959 | Reallocation | 7418 | 82C | Swindon | 85C | Hereford | |
08/08/1959 | Reallocation | 7424 | SDN | Swindon | 84E | Tyseley | |
08/08/1959 | Reallocation | 7434 | 89C | Machynlleth | |||
17/08/1959 | Condemned | 7401 | 98W | COND | |||
05/09/1959 | Reallocation | 7408 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 7439 | 87C | Danygraig | 87G | Carmarthen | |
30/06/1960 | Condemned | 7400 | 98W | COND | |||
21/07/1960 | Condemned | 7419 | 98W | COND | |||
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 7403 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 7448 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 87G | Carmarthen | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 7428 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 89C | Machynlleth | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 7431 | 89A | Shrewsbury | |||
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 7417 | MCH | Machynlleth | 89D | Oswestry | |
12/01/1961 | Condemned | 7410 | 98W | COND | |||
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 7408 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 87G | Carmarthen | |
06/02/1961 | Condemned | 7429 | 98W | COND | |||
06/02/1961 | Condemned | 7433 | 98W | COND | |||
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 7417 | 89D | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 7426 | 85C | Hereford | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 7431 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 7434 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89D | Oswestry | |
25/03/1961 | Reallocation | 7426 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84E | Tyseley | |
15/07/1961 | Reallocation | 7427 | 82C | Swindon | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
17/08/1961 | Condemned | 7409 | 98W | COND | |||
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 7413 | 82C | Swindon | 86C | Hereford | |
14/09/1961 | Condemned | 7417 | 98W | COND | |||
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 7442 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 89C | Machynlleth | |
22/11/1961 | Condemned | 7421 | 98W | COND | |||
27/01/1962 | Reallocation | 7435 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
24/02/1962 | Reallocation | 7418 | 85C | Hereford | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
24/02/1962 | Reallocation | 7442 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
05/03/1962 | Condemned | 7406 | 98W | COND | |||
05/03/1962 | Condemned | 7422 | 98W | COND | |||
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 7432 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 7442 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 89C | Machynlleth | |
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 7432 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 7446 | 83E | St Blazey | 89C | Machynlleth | |
05/06/1962 | Condemned | 7425 | 98W | COND | |||
04/07/1962 | Condemned | 7402 | 98W | COND | |||
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 7435 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 7445 | 81F | Oxford | 87G | Carmarthen | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 7446 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89D | Oswestry | |
21/08/1962 | Condemned | 7408 | 98W | COND | |||
05/10/1962 | Condemned | 7428 | 89C | Machynlleth | COND | ||
23/10/1962 | Condemned | 7434 | 98W | COND | |||
30/10/1962 | Condemned | 7440 | COND | ||||
03/11/1962 | Reallocation | 7442 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 7405 | OSY | Oswestry | 87G | Carmarthen | |
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 7418 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 7442 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 87G | Carmarthen | |
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 7414 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 7418 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 7443 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |||
19/04/1963 | Reallocation | 7432 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
19/04/1963 | Condemned | 7448 | 98W | COND | |||
06/06/1963 | Condemned | 7449 | 98W | COND | |||
02/07/1963 | Condemned | 7412 | 98W | COND | |||
02/07/1963 | Condemned | 7426 | 98W | COND | |||
14/07/1963 | Reallocation | 7413 | 86C | Hereford | 84E | Tyseley | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 7435 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 88J | Aberdare | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 7436 | 83B | Taunton | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
02/12/1963 | Condemned | 7407 | 98W | COND | |||
02/12/1963 | Condemned | 7430 | 98W | COND | |||
02/12/1963 | Condemned | 7441 | 98W | COND | |||
02/12/1963 | Condemned | 7442 | 98W | COND | |||
16/12/1963 | Condemned | 7405 | 98W | COND | |||
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 7404 | OXF | Oxford | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 7437 | 85C | Hereford | 87F | Llanelli | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 7444 | 87G | Carmarthen | |||
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 7445 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87G | Carmarthen | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 7446 | 89D | Oswestry | 87F | Llanelli | |
11/01/1964 | Condemned | 7403 | 98W | COND | |||
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 7427 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
22/02/1964 | Reallocation | 7444 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87F | Llanelli | |
10/03/1964 | Condemned | 7445 | 98W | COND | |||
21/03/1964 | Reallocation | 7413 | 84E | Tyseley | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | |
21/03/1964 | Reallocation | 7424 | 84E | Tyseley | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | |
13/04/1964 | Reallocation | 7439 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87F | Llanelli | |
13/04/1964 | Reallocation | 7444 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 7404 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 7427 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 7436 | 98W | COND | |||
06/07/1964 | Condemned | 7423 | 98W | COND | |||
06/07/1964 | Condemned | 7444 | 98W | COND | |||
06/07/1964 | Condemned | 7446 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1964 | Reallocation | 7437 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
20/07/1964 | Reallocation | 7439 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
24/07/1964 | Condemned | 7435 | 98W | COND | |||
29/08/1964 | Condemned | 7431 | 98W | COND | |||
05/09/1964 | Condemned | 7413 | 98W | COND | |||
05/09/1964 | Condemned | 7414 | 98W | COND | |||
05/09/1964 | Condemned | 7418 | 98W | COND | |||
05/09/1964 | Condemned | 7432 | 98W | COND | |||
05/09/1964 | Condemned | 7443 | 98W | COND | |||
26/09/1964 | Condemned | 7424 | 98W | COND | |||
19/03/1965 | Condemned | 7437 | 98W | COND | |||
21/04/1965 | Condemned | 7439 | 98W | COND |