Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "74xx" Class 0-6-0PT


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Tue 17/08/1954 7448 84F   Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954  
Sun 12/11/1961 7417 Wdn   Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Triangle. SLS 1/1962  
Sun 04/03/1962 7421 Wdn   Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Triangle.    
Sun 04/03/1962 7439 87G   Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Wolverhampton shed.    
Sun 08/04/1962 7413 86C   Oswestry Works visit: Around the works SLS 5/1962