Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 302 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5271 Week
» 17784 Month
» 105976 Year
» 990357 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "74xx" Class 0-6-0PT


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
7400 07/1936 06/1960 Carmarthen 23.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1960 24.27
7401 08/1936 08/1959 Hereford 23 23.55
7402 08/1936 07/1962 Carmarthen 25.92 26.44
7403 08/1936 01/1964 Severn Tunnel Junction 27.42 27.60
7404 08/1936 06/1964 Swansea East Dock 27.83 28.35
7405 08/1936 12/1963 Carmarthen 27.33 27.60
7406 08/1936 03/1962 Machynlleth 25.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1962 25.85
7407 08/1936 12/1963 Carmarthen 27.33 27.60
7408 08/1936 08/1962 Carmarthen 26 28.44
7409 08/1936 08/1961 Croes Newydd 25 25.27
7410 12/1936 01/1961 Shrewsbury 24.08 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 06/1961 24.52
7411 12/1936 05/1959 Oxford 22.42 23.93
7412 12/1936 07/1963 Oxford 26.58 26.68
7413 12/1936 09/1964 Stourbridge Junction 27.75 Cut Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) 11/1964 27.94
7414 12/1936 09/1964 Stourbridge Junction 27.75 Cut Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) 11/1964 27.94
7415 12/1936 02/1959 Swindon 22.17 26.19
7416 12/1936 01/1959 Hereford 22.08 22.85
7417 01/1937 09/1961 Machynlleth 24.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1962 25.18
7418 01/1937 09/1964 Stourbridge Junction 27.67 Cut Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) 11/1964 27.85
7419 01/1937 07/1960 Carmarthen 23.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1960 23.93
7420 05/1937 07/1959 Tyseley 22.17 22.35
7421 05/1937 11/1961 Swindon 24.5 25.18
7422 05/1937 03/1962 Carmarthen 24.83 25.18
7423 05/1937 07/1964 Aberdare 27.17 27.61
7424 05/1937 09/1964 Stourbridge Junction 27.33 Cut Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) 11/1964 27.52
7425 06/1937 06/1962 Carmarthen 25 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 09/1962 25.27
7426 06/1937 07/1963 Tyseley 26.08 26.18
7427 06/1937 06/1964 Swansea East Dock 27 27.52
7428 06/1937 05/10/1962 Shrewsbury 25.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1964 27.02
7429 06/1937 02/1961 Stourbridge Junction 23.67 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 06/1961 24.02
7430 31/08/1948 12/1963 Stourbridge Junction 15.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1964 15.80
7431 31/08/1948 08/1964 Croes Newydd 16 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1964 16.22
7432 31/08/1948 09/1964 Stourbridge Junction 16.08 Cut Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) 11/1964 16.22
7433 31/08/1948 02/1961 Croes Newydd 12.5 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 06/1961 12.80
7434 31/08/1948 22/10/1962 Shrewsbury 14.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1964 15.80
7435 30/09/1948 07/1964 Aberdare 15.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 16.22
7436 30/09/1948 06/1964 St Philips Marsh 15.75 15.88
7437 30/09/1948 03/1965 Llanelly 16.5 16.63
7438 31/10/1948 02/1959 Tyseley 10.33 12.13
7439 31/10/1948 04/1965 Llanelly 16.5 16.80
7440 31/01/1950 30/10/1962 Carmarthen 12.75 13.63
7441 31/01/1950 12/1963 Stourbridge Junction 13.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1964 14.38
7442 28/02/1950 12/1963 Carmarthen 13.83 13.97
7443 28/02/1950 09/1964 Stourbridge Junction 14.58 Cut Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) 11/1964 14.72
7444 28/02/1950 07/1964 Llanelly 14.42 14.81
7445 31/03/1950 03/1964 Carmarthen 14 14.39
7446 31/03/1950 07/1964 Llanelly 14.33 14.72
7447 31/03/1950 04/1959 Stourbridge Junction 9.08 9.47
7448 30/04/1950 09/02/1963 Pontypool Road 12.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1964 13.88
7449 30/04/1950 06/1963 Stourbridge Junction 13.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1963 13.39