GWR "645" Class 0-6-0PT
Class | GWR | SWMR | CCR | GWR (Returned) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
645 | 1 | 09/1872 | 04/1910 | ||||||
645 | 2 | 10/1872 | 0000 | ||||||
645 | 2 | 903 | 10/1872 | 04/1931 | |||||
645 | 3 | 11/1872 | 02/1910 | ||||||
645 | 1 | 902 | 11/1872 | 07/1932 | |||||
645 | 645 | 04/1872 | 10/1932 | ||||||
645 | 646 | 05/1872 | 07/07/1934 | ||||||
645 | 647 | 05/1872 | 05/1932 | ||||||
645 | 648 | 06/1872 | 07/1932 | ||||||
645 | 649 | 06/1872 | 07/1882 | ||||||
645 | 650 | 06/1872 | 04/1930 | ||||||
645 | 651 | 07/1872 | 05/1932 | ||||||
645 | 652 | 07/1872 | 03/1929 | ||||||
645 | 653 | 08/1872 | 23/05/1933 | ||||||
645 | 654 | 08/1872 | 10/1928 | ||||||
645 | 655 | 3 | 904 | 08/1872 | 08/1932 | ||||
645 | 656 | 09/1872 | 03/02/1933 | ||||||
645 | 757 | 10/1872 | 12/08/1933 | ||||||
645 | 758 | 11/1872 | 01/1931 | ||||||
645 | 759 | 12/1872 | 09/1935 | ||||||
645 | 760 | 12/1872 | 05/1932 | ||||||
645 | 761 | 12/1872 | 05/1930 | ||||||
645 | 762 | 01/1873 | 30/06/1934 | ||||||
645 | 763 | 01/1873 | 27/03/1933 | ||||||
645 | 764 | 02/1873 | 03/1930 | ||||||
645 | 765 | 02/1873 | 08/1932 | ||||||
645 | 766 | 02/1873 | 09/1935 | ||||||
645 | 767 | 03/1873 | 0000 | ||||||
645 | 768 | 03/1873 | 09/1935 | ||||||
645 | 769 | 04/1873 | 04/1930 | ||||||
645 | 770 | 04/1873 | CARM FGD |
Carmarthen Fishguard Goodwick |
16/11/1935 14/12/1935 |
10/1936 | |||
645 | 771 | 04/1873 | 07/1929 | ||||||
645 | 772 | 05/1873 | 20/01/1934 | ||||||
645 | 773 | 05/1873 | 03/1929 | ||||||
645 | 774 | 06/1873 | 07/1932 | ||||||
645 | 775 | 06/1873 | 02/03/1933 | ||||||
1501 | 1501 | 03/1878 | 12/1934 | ||||||
1501 | 1502 | 04/1878 | 07/1935 | ||||||
1501 | 1503 | 05/1878 | 05/1932 | ||||||
1501 | 1504 | 05/1878 | 11/1929 | ||||||
1501 | 1505 | 06/1878 | 01/1937 | ||||||
1501 | 1506 | 07/1878 | 12/1937 | ||||||
1501 | 1507 | 07/1878 | 30/06/1934 | ||||||
1501 | 1508 | 08/1878 | 09/1936 | ||||||
1501 | 1509 | 08/1878 | 10/1938 | ||||||
1501 | 1510 | 09/1878 | 08/1929 | ||||||
1501 | 1511 | 09/1878 | 01/1936 | ||||||
1501 | 1512 | 10/1878 | 03/1929 | ||||||
1501 | 1513 | 11/1878 | 07/1930 | ||||||
1501 | 1514 | 11/1878 | 12/1934 | ||||||
1501 | 1515 | 12/1878 | 06/1929 | ||||||
1501 | 1516 | 12/1878 | 06/1931 | ||||||
1501 | 1517 | 12/1878 | 08/1928 | ||||||
1501 | 1518 | 12/1878 | 22/09/1934 | ||||||
1501 | 1519 | 01/1879 | 07/1935 | ||||||
1501 | 1520 | 02/1879 | 05/1929 | ||||||
1501 | 1521 | 02/1879 | 12/1932 | ||||||
1501 | 1522 | 03/1879 | 24/08/1934 | ||||||
1501 | 1523 | 04/1879 | 11/1937 | ||||||
1501 | 1524 | 04/1879 | 05/1939 | ||||||
1501 | 1525 | 05/1879 | 07/1935 | ||||||
1501 | 1526 | 05/1879 | 08/07/1933 | ||||||
1501 | 1527 | 06/1879 | 06/07/1945 | ||||||
1501 | 1528 | 07/1879 | 02/1936 | ||||||
1501 | 1529 | 07/1879 | 28/06/1933 | ||||||
1501 | 1530 | 08/1879 | 12/1938 | ||||||
1501 | 1531 | 08/1879 | OXF | Oxford | 15/06/1947 | 16/12/1949 | |||
1501 | 1532 | 09/1879 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 15/06/1947 | 26/07/1948 | |||
1501 | 1533 | 10/1879 | 07/1936 | ||||||
1501 | 1534 | 10/1879 | 29/08/1934 | ||||||
1501 | 1535 | 10/1879 | 07/04/1934 | ||||||
1501 | 1536 | 11/1879 | 02/06/1934 | ||||||
1501 | 1537 | 11/1879 | 02/1931 | ||||||
1501 | 1538 | 12/1879 | HFD SPM |
Hereford St Philips Marsh |
11/01/1936 15/06/1947 |
12/11/1948 | |||
1501 | 1539 | 12/1879 | 08/1938 | ||||||
1501 | 1540 | 01/1880 | 08/1935 | ||||||
1501 | 1541 | 02/1880 | 12/1937 | ||||||
1501 | 1542 | 02/1880 | sdn SDN |
Chippenham Swindon |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 |
21/02/1951 | |||
1501 | 1543 | 03/1880 | 08/1932 | ||||||
1501 | 1544 | 03/1880 | 02/1930 | ||||||
1501 | 1545 | 04/1880 | 11/1935 | ||||||
1501 | 1546 | 04/1880 | 12/1935 | ||||||
1501 | 1547 | 05/1880 | 17/11/1934 | ||||||
1501 | 1548 | 06/1880 | 02/1937 | ||||||
1501 | 1549 | 08/1880 | 07/1935 | ||||||
1501 | 1550 | 07/1880 | 07/1929 | ||||||
1501 | 1551 | 08/1880 | 09/1932 | ||||||
1501 | 1552 | 09/1880 | 10/1936 | ||||||
1501 | 1553 | 09/1880 | 04/1929 | ||||||
1501 | 1554 | 10/1880 | wln | Much Wenlock | 16/11/1935 | 04/11/1944 | |||
1501 | 1555 | 10/1880 | 07/1929 | ||||||
1501 | 1556 | 10/1880 | 09/1932 | ||||||
1501 | 1557 | 11/1880 | 01/1938 | ||||||
1501 | 1558 | 11/1880 | 09/1938 | ||||||
1501 | 1559 | 12/1880 | 08/1929 | ||||||
1501 | 1560 | 12/1880 | 01/1929 | ||||||
1501 | 1801 | 01/1881 | 09/1936 | ||||||
1501 | 1802 | 02/1881 | 08/1937 | ||||||
1501 | 1803 | 02/1881 | OXY SRD |
Oxley Stafford Road |
14/12/1935 11/01/1936 |
22/12/1944 | |||
1501 | 1804 | 03/1881 | 02/1931 | ||||||
1501 | 1805 | 08/1881 | 07/1930 | ||||||
1501 | 1806 | 04/1881 | 11/1938 | ||||||
1501 | 1807 | 04/1881 | 09/1928 | ||||||
1501 | 1808 | 05/1881 | 08/06/1945 | ||||||
1501 | 1809 | 05/1881 | 05/1936 | ||||||
1501 | 1810 | 06/1881 | 22/12/1944 | ||||||
1501 | 1811 | 07/1881 | 06/1928 | ||||||
1501 | 1812 | 07/1881 | 04/1937 |