GWR Armstrong "1901" Class 0-6-0PT
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1901 Pannier tank | 1901 | 08/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1929 | 09/1929 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1902 | 09/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1943 | 22/10/1943 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1903 | 09/1881 | lly CARM W |
Llanelli & Mynydd Mawr (Sandy) Carmarthen Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 15/06/1947 06/1952 |
06/06/1952 |
1901 Saddle tank | 1904 | 10/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1934 | 12/1934 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1905 | 10/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1936 | 10/1936 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1906 | 11/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1907 | 11/1881 | LLY W |
Llanelli Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1950 |
11/01/1950 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1908 | 12/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1936 | 11/1936 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1909 | 01/1882 | TN W |
Taunton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1949 |
11/11/1949 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1910 | 04/1882 | LLY W |
Llanelli Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 07/1944 |
08/07/1944 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1911 | 04/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1936 | 05/1936 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1912 | 04/1882 | SHL PDN OXF SHL W |
Southall Old Oak Common Oxford Southall Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 15/06/1947 26/03/1949 05/11/1949 12/1949 |
30/12/1949 |
1901 Saddle tank | 1913 | 06/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1929 | 11/1929 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1914 | 07/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1931 | 06/1931 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1915 | 07/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1935 | 08/1935 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1916 | 07/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1928 | 07/1928 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1917 | 08/1882 | BHD W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1951 |
19/03/1951 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1918 | 08/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1929 | 06/1929 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1919 | 09/1882 | WOS W |
Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1949 |
21/11/1949 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1920 | 10/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1933 | 30/09/1933 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1921 | 10/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1935 | 05/1935 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1922 | 11/1882 | LA W |
Laira Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 04/1936 |
04/1936 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1923 | 11/1882 | WTD W |
Whitland Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 07/1939 |
07/1939 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1924 | 12/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1938 | 08/1938 |
1901 Saddle tank | 1925 | 12/1883 | did DID SHL 81D W |
Lambourn Didcot Southall Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 14/12/1935 15/06/1947 02/12/1950 04/1951 |
20/04/1951 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1926 | 01/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1928 | 11/1928 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1927 | 02/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1929 | 10/1929 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1928 | 03/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1934 | 12/1934 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1929 | 04/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1935 | 07/1935 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1930 | 05/1884 | EXE SBZ W |
Exeter St Blazey Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 15/06/1947 08/1949 |
15/08/1949 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1931 | 06/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1938 | 12/1938 |
1901 Saddle tank | 1932 | 07/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1930 | 04/1930 |
1901 Saddle tank | 1933 | 07/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1928 | 03/1928 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1934 | 08/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1928 | 04/1928 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1935 | 08/1884 | OXF 81B 81F W |
Oxford Slough Oxford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/10/1951 29/12/1951 11/1953 |
05/11/1953 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1936 | 09/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1935 | 02/1935 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1937 | 09/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1934 | 12/1934 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1938 | 10/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1936 | 07/1936 |
1901 Saddle tank | 1939 | 10/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1929 | 11/1929 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1940 | 11/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1933 | 11/04/1933 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1941 | 11/1886 | WTD CARM W |
Whitland Carmarthen Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 15/06/1947 02/1951 |
16/02/1951 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1942 | 12/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1934 | 12/1934 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1943 | 01/1887 | DYD GLO W |
Duffryn Yard Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 15/06/1947 03/1951 |
20/03/1951 |
1901 Saddle tank | 1944 | 01/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1934 | 26/10/1934 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1945 | 02/1887 | DG W |
Danygraig Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1949 |
22/11/1949 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1946 | 03/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1935 | 01/1935 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1947 | 03/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1938 | 11/1938 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1948 | 03/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1934 | 18/08/1934 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1949 | 02/1888 | BHD W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1950 |
03/04/1950 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1950 | 02/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1934 | 11/06/1934 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1951 | 03/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1937 | 10/1937 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1952 | 03/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1928 | 11/1928 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1953 | 04/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1929 | 04/1929 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1954 | 05/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1944 | 07/09/1944 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1955 | 05/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1939 | 08/1939 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1956 | 06/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1938 | 12/1938 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1957 | 06/1888 | LLY LLY W |
Llanelli Llanelli Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 04/1951 |
09/04/1951 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1958 | 07/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1936 | 09/1936 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1959 | 08/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1935 | 11/1935 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1960 | 09/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1935 | 04/1935 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1961 | 10/1889 | lly W |
Llanelli & Mynydd Mawr (Sandy) Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 09/1936 |
09/1936 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1962 | 10/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1929 | 02/1929 |
1901 Saddle tank | 1963 | 11/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1943 | 18/01/1943 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1964 | 11/1889 | WTD 87B 87A 6C W |
Whitland Duffryn Yard Neath (Court Sart) Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/11/1950 31/12/1950 02/06/1951 02/1952 |
29/02/1952 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1965 | 12/1889 | MCH W |
Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1950 |
25/01/1950 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1966 | 12/1889 | WTD W |
Whitland Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 07/1939 |
07/1939 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1967 | 01/1890 | WTD LLY LLY W |
Whitland Llanelli Llanelli Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 14/12/1935 15/06/1947 06/1951 |
15/06/1951 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1968 | 02/1890 | BHD W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/1951 |
17/09/1951 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1969 | 02/1890 | SHL W |
Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/1949 |
15/08/1949 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1970 | 03/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1938 | 07/1938 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1971 | 03/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1938 | 12/1938 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1972 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1929 | 10/1929 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1973 | 07/1890 | LA W |
Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1949 |
02/12/1949 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1974 | 07/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1935 | 08/1935 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1975 | 09/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1935 | 09/1935 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1976 | 09/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1936 | 11/1936 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1977 | 10/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1931 | 02/1931 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1978 | 10/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1936 | 02/1936 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1979 | 11/1890 | wtd WTD W |
Cardigan Whitland Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 15/06/1947 08/1950 |
21/08/1950 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1980 | 11/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 17/11/1934 |
1901 Saddle tank | 1981 | 12/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1928 | 07/1928 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1982 | 01/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1983 | 01/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1935 | 12/1935 |
1901 Saddle tank | 1984 | 02/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1928 | 06/1928 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1985 | 02/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1934 | 16/07/1934 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1986 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1929 | 10/1929 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1987 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1929 | 01/1929 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1988 | 05/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1947 | 08/01/1947 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1989 | 06/1891 | GLO W |
Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/1950 |
25/09/1950 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1990 | 06/1891 | LA W |
Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1949 |
02/11/1949 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1991 | 07/1891 | LLY LLY LLY 87F W |
Llanelli Llanelli Llanelli Llanelli Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 15/06/1947 27/11/1948 11/08/1951 01/1953 |
26/01/1953 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1992 | 07/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1935 | 03/1935 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1993 | 08/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1951 | 19/04/1951 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1994 | 08/1891 | wtd CARM W |
Cardigan Carmarthen Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 07/03/1936 10/1938 |
10/1938 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1995 | 09/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1930 | 08/1930 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1996 | 10/1891 | WTD 87B 87A 85B W |
Whitland Duffryn Yard Neath (Court Sart) Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/11/1950 02/12/1950 19/05/1951 01/1953 |
05/01/1953 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1997 | 10/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1929 | 05/1929 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1998 | 11/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 17/11/1934 |
1901 Pannier tank | 1999 | 11/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1946 | 20/06/1946 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2000 | 12/1891 | CV.AYN W |
Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1949 |
29/12/1949 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2001 | 12/1891 | WOS W |
Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/1952 |
13/08/1952 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2002 | 01/1892 | LLY 87F W |
Llanelli Llanelli Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/08/1951 02/1952 |
26/02/1952 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2003 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1929 | 05/1929 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2004 | 09/1892 | BHD W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1952 |
30/01/1952 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2005 | 09/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1944 | 22/12/1944 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2006 | 10/1892 | BHD W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1949 |
02/12/1949 |
1901 Saddle tank | 2007 | 10/1892 | DID WOS W |
Didcot Worcester Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 12/1949 |
01/12/1949 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2008 | 11/1892 | CED CV.BRY CV.AYN CV.BRY CV.AYN 88C W |
Cardiff East Dock Barry Abercynon Barry Abercynon Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/12/1948 08/10/1949 05/11/1949 31/12/1949 17/10/1950 03/1958 |
03/03/1958 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2009 | 04/1894 | GLO W |
Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1951 |
10/01/1951 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2010 | 05/1894 | WTD WTD W |
Whitland Whitland Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 15/06/1947 03/1953 |
23/03/1953 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2011 | 11/1894 | WTD 87B W |
Whitland Duffryn Yard Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/11/1950 08/1956 |
18/08/1956 |
1901 Saddle tank | 2012 | 11/1894 | W LLY LLY LDR 87F 87F 87F |
Withdrawn Llanelli Llanelli Landore Llanelli Llanelli Llanelli |
08/1910 15/06/1947 24/01/1948 03/12/1949 12/08/1950 11/08/1951 12/07/1952 |
06/1958 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2013 | 12/1894 | WTD W |
Whitland Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/1950 |
30/05/1950 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2014 | 12/1894 | SDN W |
Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1951 |
02/11/1951 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2015 | 01/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 03/11/1945 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2016 | 02/1895 | WOS W |
Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1952 |
14/01/1952 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2017 | 02/1895 | SDN W |
Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1951 |
08/03/1951 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2018 | 03/1895 | WTD W |
Whitland Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1949 |
16/12/1949 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2019 | 03/1895 | LLY W |
Llanelli Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1949 |
07/12/1949 |
1901 Pannier tank | 2020 | 05/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1938 | 12/1938 |