Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 62 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 62 Week
» 18383 Month
» 106575 Year
» 990956 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Dean "2021" Class 0-6-0PT


Class GWR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
2021 2021 02/1897 W Withdrawn 06/1951 06/1951
2021 2022 03/1897 CED
W
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
12/1949
12/1949
2021 2023 04/1897 W Withdrawn 01/1952 01/1952
2021 2025 05/1897 85B
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
31/03/1951
05/1952
05/1952
2021 2026 05/1897 W Withdrawn 04/1951 04/1951
2021 2027 06/1897 87F
87F
87F
W
Llanelly
Llanelly
Llanelly
Withdrawn
31/08/1951
29/02/1952
30/04/1952
02/1957
02/1957
2021 2029 07/1897 LLY
W
Llanelly
Withdrawn
30/10/1948
11/1949
11/1949
2021 2030 08/1897 CNYD
W
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
18/05/1946
02/1952
02/1952
2021 2031 09/1897 W Withdrawn 01/1953 01/1953
2021 2032 10/1897 W Withdrawn 06/1951 06/1951
2021 2033 11/1897 W Withdrawn 03/1951 03/1951
2021 2034 11/1897 85A
85C
W
Worcester
Hereford
Withdrawn
19/05/1951
24/04/1954
09/1955
09/1955
2021 2035 01/1898 86A
W
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
04/10/1952
03/1955
03/1955
2021 2037 01/1898 W Withdrawn 07/1950 07/1950
2021 2038 02/1898 83D
W
Laira
Withdrawn
29/02/1952
03/1953
03/1953
2021 2039 02/1898 W Withdrawn 04/1950 04/1950
2021 2040 03/1898 85B
85A
85B
85A
6C
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Worcester
Gloucester Horton Road
Worcester
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
12/07/1952
04/10/1952
27/03/1954
24/04/1954
17/07/1954
10/1956
10/1956
2021 2042 04/1898 LLY
6C
W
Llanelly
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
30/10/1948
29/12/1951
04/1953
04/1953
2021 2043 05/1898 85C
6C
W
Hereford
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
19/05/1951
16/05/1953
01/1955
01/1955
2021 2044 06/1898 W Withdrawn 07/1951 07/1951
2021 2045 06/1898 W Withdrawn 12/1949 12/1949
2021 2047 07/1898 W Withdrawn 12/1949 12/1949
2021 2048 08/1898 W Withdrawn 17/05/1952 17/05/1952
2021 2050 09/1898 W Withdrawn 10/1951 10/1951
2021 2051 10/1898 W Withdrawn 07/1951 07/1951
2021 2052 10/1898 BHD
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
26/01/1946
05/1950
05/1950
2021 2053 11/1898 82B
W
St Philips Marsh
Withdrawn
21/02/1953
04/1954
04/1954
2021 2054 12/1898 W Withdrawn 03/1951 03/1951
2021 2055 30/01/1899 DG
W
Danygraig
Withdrawn
30/06/1949
01/1951
01/1951
2021 2056 30/01/1899 W Withdrawn 03/1951 03/1951
2021 2059 03/1899 W Withdrawn 11/1949 11/1949
2021 2060 04/1899 W Withdrawn 12/1954 12/1954
2021 2061 04/1899 85B
84A
84H
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Stafford Road
Wellington
Withdrawn
30/04/1952
17/05/1952
21/02/1953
04/1955
04/1955
2021 2063 06/1899 W Withdrawn 05/1951 05/1951
2021 2064 06/1899 W Withdrawn 11/1949 11/1949
2021 2065 06/1899 W Withdrawn 11/1949 11/1949
2021 2066 07/1899 W Withdrawn 09/1951 09/1951
2021 2067 08/1899 BHD
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
11/1952
11/1952
2021 2068 08/1899 W Withdrawn 01/1953 01/1953
2021 2069 09/1899 6C

6C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Wolverton Works
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
29/01/1955
18/05/1957
16/06/1957
04/1959
04/1959
2021 2070 10/1899 W Withdrawn 08/1955 08/1955
2021 2071 10/1899 W Withdrawn 06/1950 06/1950
2021 2072 11/1899 82B
6C
W
St Philips Marsh
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
31/10/1953
06/11/1954
07/1956
07/1956
2021 2073 11/1899 W Withdrawn 06/1951 06/1951
2021 2075 01/1900 W Withdrawn 03/1951 03/1951
2021 2076 02/1900 SLO
W
Slough
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
10/1951
10/1951
2021 2079 06/1900 W Withdrawn 11/1952 11/1952
2021 2080 09/1900 W Withdrawn 03/1952 03/1952
2021 2081 10/1900 87F
W
Llanelly
Withdrawn
31/08/1952
10/1954
10/1954
2021 2082 10/1900 87K
87C
6C
6C
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Danygraig
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
31/01/1951
31/03/1951
22/03/1952
19/04/1952
06/1955
06/1955
2021 2083 11/1900 W Withdrawn 11/1951 11/1951
2021 2085 11/1900 87F
6C
W
Llanelly
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
31/12/1951
26/01/1952
08/1953
08/1953
2021 2086 01/1901 86B
W
Newport Pill
Withdrawn
30/09/1951
05/1952
05/1952
2021 2088 03/1901 83B
W
Taunton
Withdrawn
04/10/1952
08/1955
08/1955
2021 2089 03/1901 W Withdrawn 09/1951 09/1951
2021 2090 03/1901 89A
86A
W
Oswestry
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
31/07/1951
30/09/1951
03/1955
03/1955
2021 2091 04/1901 W Withdrawn 04/1950 04/1950
2021 2092 04/1901 W Withdrawn 08/1955 08/1955
2021 2093 05/1901 W Withdrawn 01/1952 01/1952
2021 2094 05/1901 W Withdrawn 05/1952 05/1952
2021 2095 06/1901 W Withdrawn 04/1951 04/1951
2021 2096 07/1901 W Withdrawn 05/1950 05/1950
2021 2097 07/1901 213
153
NA
83G
83D
W
Truro
Penzance
Newton Abbot
Penzance
Laira
Withdrawn
03/11/1945
01/12/1945
18/05/1946
30/11/1950
03/10/1953
03/1955
03/1955
2021 2098 08/1901 W Withdrawn 05/1951 05/1951
2021 2099 09/1901 HFD
6C
6C
W
Hereford
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
23/02/1952
22/03/1952
06/1954
06/1954
2021 2100 11/1901 W Withdrawn 06/1952 06/1952
2021 2101 01/1902 85D
85A
6C
W
Kidderminster
Worcester
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
30/09/1951
16/05/1953
03/10/1953
03/1956
03/1956
2021 2102 01/1902 HFD
W
Hereford
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
11/1949
11/1949
2021 2104 03/1902 W Withdrawn 05/1951 05/1951
2021 2106 04/1902 W Withdrawn 08/1952 08/1952
2021 2107 05/1902 STB
BHD
84J
6C
W
Stourbridge Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Croes Newydd
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
26/01/1946
23/03/1946
27/12/1952
11/07/1953
06/1956
06/1956
2021 2108 05/1902 W Withdrawn 12/1954 12/1954
2021 2109 06/1902 85B
85A
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Worcester
Withdrawn
28/02/1951
30/04/1951
02/1952
02/1952
2021 2110 07/1902 W Withdrawn 07/1950 07/1950
2021 2111 07/1902 87G
W
Carmarthen
Withdrawn
24/01/1953
03/1953
03/1953
2021 2112 08/1902 6C
6C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
29/11/1952
24/01/1953
13/09/1954
13/09/1954
2021 2113 09/1902 W Withdrawn 03/1950 03/1950
2021 2114 09/1902 W Withdrawn 12/1949 12/1949
2021 2115 10/1902 HFD
85A
W
Hereford
Worcester
Withdrawn
05/11/1949
30/09/1950
06/1952
06/1952
2021 2117 11/1902 W Withdrawn 06/1951 06/1951
2021 2121 02/1903 85B
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
31/03/1951
06/1952
06/1952
2021 2122 03/1903 W Withdrawn 11/1952 11/1952
2021 2123 03/1903 W Withdrawn 10/1952 10/1952
2021 2124 05/1903 W Withdrawn 07/1950 07/1950
2021 2126 05/1903 87F
W
Llanelly
Withdrawn
31/08/1950
09/1950
09/1950
2021 2127 05/1903 W Withdrawn 09/1952 09/1952
2021 2129 07/1903 W Withdrawn 03/1953 03/1953
2021 2130 07/1903 W Withdrawn 05/1950 05/1950
2021 2131 08/1903 W Withdrawn 11/1951 11/1951
2021 2132 09/1903 W Withdrawn 08/1950 08/1950
2021 2134 10/1903 W Withdrawn 05/1957 05/1957
2021 2135 10/1903 W Withdrawn 01/1953 01/1953
2021 2136 11/1903 86A
6C
W
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
12/07/1952
04/10/1952
04/1955
04/1955
2021 2137 11/1903 W Withdrawn 12/1949 12/1949
2021 2138 12/1903 W Withdrawn 05/1956 05/1956
2021 2140 01/1904 18
88B
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
01/12/1945
31/01/1952
05/1952
05/1952
2021 2141 03/1904 W Withdrawn 10/1950 10/1950
2021 2144 05/1904 85C
85A
85D
85A
W
Hereford
Worcester
Kidderminster
Worcester
Withdrawn
30/04/1952
24/01/1953
16/05/1953
24/04/1954
05/1955
05/1955
2021 2146 06/1904 LYD
87C
W
Lydney
Danygraig
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
31/08/1951
03/1953
03/1953
2021 2147 06/1904 W Withdrawn 03/1953 03/1953
2021 2148 07/1904 W Withdrawn 02/1952 02/1952
2021 2150 09/1904 W Withdrawn 01/1952 01/1952
2021 2151 09/1904 W Withdrawn 05/1952 05/1952
2021 2152 10/1904 W Withdrawn 11/1951 11/1951
2021 2153 10/1904 W Withdrawn 12/1950 12/1950
2021 2154 11/1904 W Withdrawn 02/1952 02/1952
2021 2155 11/1904 175
W
Lydney
Withdrawn
03/11/1945
11/1950
11/1950
2021 2156 12/1904 W Withdrawn 02/1953 02/1953
2021 2159 02/1905 86B
W
Newport Pill
Withdrawn
30/06/1951
08/1951
08/1951
2021 2160 03/1905 6C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
29/01/1955
03/1957
03/1957