GWR Dean "2721" Class 0-6-0PT
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 2745 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 2757 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 2769 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 2779 | WES | Westbury | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 2780 | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 2750 | THT | Treherbert | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 2780 | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | WES | Westbury | |
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 2750 | THT | Treherbert | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 2764 | PILL | Newport Pill | |||
19/10/1945 | Condemned | 2732 | 98W | COND | |||
19/10/1945 | Condemned | 2741 | 98W | COND | |||
19/10/1945 | Condemned | 2759 | 98W | COND | |||
24/10/1945 | Condemned | 2742 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2700 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2727 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2740 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2747 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2750 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2753 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2763 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2770 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2779 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2796 | 98W | COND | |||
14/11/1945 | Condemned | 2766 | 98W | COND | |||
30/11/1945 | Condemned | 2765 | 98W | COND | |||
15/12/1945 | Condemned | 2758 | 98W | COND | |||
05/01/1946 | Condemned | 2725 | 98W | COND | |||
06/02/1946 | Condemned | 2782 | 98W | COND | |||
04/03/1946 | Condemned | 2729 | 98W | COND | |||
15/07/1946 | Condemned | 2762 | 98W | COND | |||
31/07/1946 | Condemned | 2775 | 98W | COND | |||
03/10/1946 | Condemned | 2773 | 98W | COND | |||
07/05/1947 | Condemned | 2784 | 98W | COND | |||
31/05/1947 | Condemned | 2777 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2721 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2722 | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2723 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2724 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2726 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2728 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2730 | LLY | Llanelli | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2731 | PILL | Newport Pill | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2733 | TYS | Tyseley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2734 | PILL | Newport Pill | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2735 | TDU | Tondu | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2736 | LLY | Llanelli | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2737 | PZ | Penzance | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2738 | PILL | Newport Pill | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2739 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2743 | WOS | Worcester | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2744 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2745 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | SALOP | Shrewsbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2746 | LLY | Llanelli | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2748 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2749 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2751 | LLY | Llanelli | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2752 | PZ | Penzance | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2754 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2755 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2756 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2757 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | SLO | Slough | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2760 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2761 | TDU | Tondu | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2764 | PILL | Newport Pill | PILL | Newport Pill | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2767 | TDU | Tondu | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2768 | SBZ | St Blazey | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2769 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | TDU | Tondu | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2771 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2772 | LMTN | Leamington | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2774 | WOS | Worcester | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2776 | LA | Laira | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2778 | CHR | Chester West | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2780 | WES | Westbury | SBZ | St Blazey | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2781 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2783 | DID | Didcot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2785 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2786 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2787 | LLY | Llanelli | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2789 | SED | Swansea East Dock | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2790 | SLO | Slough | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2791 | SRD | Stafford Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2792 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2793 | PILL | Newport Pill | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2794 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2795 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2797 | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2798 | DG | Danygraig | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2799 | WOS | Worcester | |||
18/06/1947 | Condemned | 2788 | 98W | COND | |||
07/07/1947 | Condemned | 2778 | 98W | COND | |||
02/08/1947 | Condemned | 2726 | 98W | COND | |||
02/08/1947 | Condemned | 2736 | 98W | COND | |||
14/08/1947 | Condemned | 2723 | 98W | COND | |||
27/08/1947 | Reallocation | 2731 | 98W | SDN | Swindon | ||
27/08/1947 | Condemned | 2735 | TDU | Tondu | COND | ||
23/10/1947 | Condemned | 2768 | 98W | COND | |||
29/10/1947 | Condemned | 2731 | 98W | COND | |||
04/11/1947 | Condemned | 2733 | 98W | COND | |||
14/11/1947 | Condemned | 2737 | 98W | COND | |||
15/11/1947 | Condemned | 2783 | 98W | COND | |||
17/01/1948 | Condemned | 2793 | 98W | COND | |||
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 2757 | SLO | Slough | SHL | Southall | |
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 2790 | SLO | Slough | SHL | Southall | |
01/03/1948 | Condemned | 2752 | 98W | COND | |||
10/04/1948 | Condemned | 2776 | 98W | COND | |||
24/04/1948 | Condemned | 2728 | 98W | COND | |||
24/04/1948 | Condemned | 2730 | 98W | COND | |||
24/04/1948 | Condemned | 2748 | 98W | COND | |||
24/04/1948 | Condemned | 2749 | 98W | COND | |||
24/04/1948 | Condemned | 2751 | 98W | COND | |||
24/04/1948 | Condemned | 2774 | 98W | COND | |||
24/04/1948 | Condemned | 2785 | 98W | COND | |||
10/05/1948 | Condemned | 2739 | 98W | COND | |||
07/06/1948 | Condemned | 2781 | 98W | COND | |||
07/06/1948 | Condemned | 2797 | 98W | COND | |||
30/06/1948 | Reallocation | 2798 | DG | Danygraig | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |
10/07/1948 | Condemned | 2746 | 98W | COND | |||
10/07/1948 | Condemned | 2764 | 98W | COND | |||
02/08/1948 | Condemned | 2734 | 98W | COND | |||
07/08/1948 | Reallocation | 2798 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | DG | Danygraig | |
16/08/1948 | Condemned | 2755 | 98W | COND | |||
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 2745 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
10/01/1949 | Condemned | 2767 | 98W | COND | |||
25/01/1949 | Condemned | 2795 | 98W | COND | |||
14/02/1949 | Condemned | 2724 | 98W | COND | |||
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 2798 | DG | Danygraig | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |
14/03/1949 | Condemned | 2769 | 98W | COND | |||
09/05/1949 | Condemned | 2789 | 98W | COND | |||
17/05/1949 | Condemned | 2756 | 98W | COND | |||
02/11/1949 | Condemned | 2798 | 98W | COND | |||
24/11/1949 | Condemned | 2772 | 98W | COND | |||
30/11/1949 | Condemned | 2794 | 98W | COND | |||
02/12/1949 | Condemned | 2787 | 98W | COND | |||
08/12/1949 | Condemned | 2786 | 98W | COND | |||
13/12/1949 | Condemned | 2738 | 98W | COND | |||
30/01/1950 | Condemned | 2745 | 98W | COND | |||
03/02/1950 | Condemned | 2757 | 98W | COND | |||
10/03/1950 | Condemned | 2761 | 98W | COND | |||
10/03/1950 | Condemned | 2799 | 98W | COND | |||
10/04/1950 | Condemned | 2791 | 98W | COND | |||
01/06/1950 | Condemned | 2792 | 98W | COND | |||
05/06/1950 | Condemned | 2790 | 98W | COND | |||
12/06/1950 | Condemned | 2771 | 98W | COND | |||
10/07/1950 | Condemned | 2780 | 98W | COND | |||
17/08/1950 | Condemned | 2721 | 98W | COND | |||
02/10/1950 | Condemned | 2743 | 98W | COND | |||
02/10/1950 | Condemned | 2754 | 98W | COND | |||
23/10/1950 | Condemned | 2760 | 98W | COND | |||
08/11/1950 | Condemned | 2744 | 98W | COND | |||
27/11/1950 | Condemned | 2722 | 98W | COND |