Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4173 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17579 Week
» 70595 Month
» 190122 Year
» 3216975 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GWR Dean "2721" Class 0-6-0PT
GWR |
GWR (Renum) |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
2800
|
2700
|
03/1901 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
44.67 |
|
|
|
|
2721
|
|
11/1897 |
|
17/08/1950 |
|
52.75 |
|
|
|
|
2722
|
|
03/1898 |
|
27/11/1950 |
|
52.67 |
|
|
|
|
2723
|
|
03/1898 |
|
14/08/1947 |
|
49.42 |
|
|
|
|
2724
|
|
03/1898 |
|
14/02/1949 |
|
50.92 |
|
|
|
|
2725
|
|
03/1898 |
|
05/01/1946 |
|
47.83 |
|
|
|
|
2726
|
|
04/1898 |
|
02/08/1947 |
|
49.33 |
|
|
|
|
2727
|
|
04/1898 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
47.58 |
|
|
|
|
2728
|
|
05/1898 |
|
24/04/1948 |
|
49.92 |
|
|
|
|
2729
|
|
05/1898 |
|
04/03/1946 |
|
47.83 |
|
|
|
|
2730
|
|
05/1898 |
|
24/04/1948 |
|
49.92 |
|
|
|
|
2731
|
|
05/1898 |
|
29/10/1947 |
|
49.42 |
|
|
|
|
2732
|
|
06/1898 |
|
19/10/1945 |
|
47.33 |
|
|
|
|
2733
|
|
06/1898 |
|
04/11/1947 |
|
49.42 |
|
|
|
|
2734
|
|
07/1898 |
|
02/08/1948 |
|
50.08 |
|
|
|
|
2735
|
|
07/1898 |
|
27/08/1947 |
|
49.08 |
|
|
|
|
2736
|
|
08/1898 |
|
02/08/1947 |
|
49 |
|
|
|
|
2737
|
|
08/1898 |
|
14/11/1947 |
|
49.25 |
|
|
|
|
2738
|
|
08/1898 |
|
13/12/1949 |
|
51.33 |
|
|
|
|
2739
|
|
09/1898 |
|
10/05/1948 |
|
49.67 |
|
|
|
|
2740
|
|
09/1898 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
47.17 |
|
|
|
|
2741
|
|
04/1899 |
|
19/10/1945 |
|
46.5 |
|
|
|
|
2742
|
|
04/1899 |
|
24/10/1945 |
|
46.5 |
|
|
|
|
2743
|
|
04/1899 |
|
02/10/1950 |
|
51.5 |
|
|
|
|
2744
|
|
04/1899 |
|
08/11/1950 |
|
51.58 |
|
|
|
|
2745
|
|
05/1899 |
|
30/01/1950 |
|
50.67 |
|
|
|
|
2746
|
|
05/1899 |
|
10/07/1948 |
|
49.17 |
|
|
|
|
2747
|
|
05/1899 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
46.5 |
|
|
|
|
2748
|
|
05/1899 |
|
24/04/1948 |
|
48.92 |
|
|
|
|
2749
|
|
05/1899 |
|
24/04/1948 |
|
48.92 |
|
|
|
|
2750
|
|
06/1899 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
46.42 |
|
|
|
|
2751
|
|
06/1899 |
|
24/04/1948 |
|
48.83 |
|
|
|
|
2752
|
|
06/1899 |
|
01/03/1948 |
|
48.75 |
|
|
|
|
2753
|
|
07/1899 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
46.33 |
|
|
|
|
2754
|
|
07/1899 |
|
02/10/1950 |
|
51.25 |
|
|
|
|
2755
|
|
07/1899 |
|
16/08/1948 |
|
49.08 |
|
|
|
|
2756
|
|
08/1899 |
|
17/05/1949 |
|
49.75 |
|
|
|
|
2757
|
|
08/1899 |
|
03/02/1950 |
|
50.5 |
|
|
|
|
2758
|
|
08/1899 |
|
15/12/1945 |
|
46.33 |
|
|
|
|
2759
|
|
08/1899 |
|
19/10/1945 |
|
46.17 |
|
|
|
|
2760
|
|
08/1899 |
|
23/10/1950 |
|
51.17 |
|
|
|
|
2761
|
|
03/1900 |
|
10/03/1950 |
|
50 |
|
|
|
|
2762
|
|
03/1900 |
|
15/07/1946 |
|
46.33 |
|
|
|
|
2763
|
|
03/1900 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
45.67 |
|
|
|
|
2764
|
|
03/1900 |
|
10/07/1948 |
|
48.33 |
|
|
|
|
2765
|
|
03/1900 |
|
30/11/1945 |
|
45.67 |
|
|
|
|
2766
|
|
08/1900 |
|
14/11/1945 |
|
45.25 |
|
|
|
|
2767
|
|
08/1900 |
|
10/01/1949 |
|
48.42 |
|
|
|
|
2768
|
|
09/1900 |
|
23/10/1947 |
|
47.08 |
|
|
|
|
2769
|
|
09/1900 |
|
14/03/1949 |
|
48.5 |
|
|
|
|
2770
|
|
09/1900 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
45.17 |
|
|
|
|
2771
|
|
09/1900 |
|
12/06/1950 |
|
49.75 |
|
|
|
|
2772
|
|
09/1900 |
|
24/11/1949 |
|
49.17 |
|
|
|
|
2773
|
|
09/1900 |
|
03/10/1946 |
|
46.08 |
|
|
|
|
2774
|
|
09/1900 |
|
24/04/1948 |
|
47.58 |
|
|
|
|
2775
|
|
10/1900 |
|
31/07/1946 |
|
45.75 |
|
|
|
|
2776
|
|
10/1900 |
|
10/04/1948 |
|
47.5 |
|
|
|
|
2777
|
|
10/1900 |
|
31/05/1947 |
|
46.58 |
|
|
|
|
2778
|
|
10/1900 |
|
07/07/1947 |
|
46.75 |
|
|
|
|
2779
|
|
10/1900 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
45.08 |
|
|
|
|
2780
|
|
10/1900 |
|
10/07/1950 |
|
49.75 |
|
|
|
|
2781
|
|
01/1901 |
|
07/06/1948 |
|
47.42 |
|
|
|
|
2782
|
|
01/1901 |
|
06/02/1946 |
|
45.08 |
|
|
|
|
2783
|
|
01/1901 |
|
15/11/1947 |
|
46.83 |
|
|
|
|
2784
|
|
01/1901 |
|
07/05/1947 |
|
46.33 |
|
|
|
|
2785
|
|
01/1901 |
|
24/04/1948 |
|
47.25 |
|
|
|
|
2786
|
|
01/1901 |
|
08/12/1949 |
|
48.92 |
|
|
|
|
2787
|
|
01/1901 |
|
02/12/1949 |
|
48.92 |
|
|
|
|
2788
|
|
01/1901 |
|
18/06/1947 |
|
46.42 |
|
|
|
|
2789
|
|
02/1901 |
|
09/05/1949 |
|
48.25 |
|
|
|
|
2790
|
|
02/1901 |
|
05/06/1950 |
|
49.33 |
|
|
|
|
2791
|
|
02/1901 |
|
10/04/1950 |
|
49.17 |
|
|
|
|
2792
|
|
02/1901 |
|
01/06/1950 |
|
49.33 |
|
|
|
|
2793
|
|
02/1901 |
|
17/01/1948 |
|
46.92 |
|
|
|
|
2794
|
|
02/1901 |
|
30/11/1949 |
|
48.75 |
|
|
|
|
2795
|
|
02/1901 |
|
25/01/1949 |
|
47.92 |
|
|
|
|
2796
|
|
02/1901 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
44.75 |
|
|
|
|
2797
|
|
03/1901 |
|
07/06/1948 |
|
47.25 |
|
|
|
|
2798
|
|
03/1901 |
|
02/11/1949 |
|
48.67 |
|
|
|
|
2799
|
|
03/1901 |
|
10/03/1950 |
|
49 |
|
|
|
|