GWR Churchward "1361" Class 0-6-0ST
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 1362 | LA | Laira | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 1363 | LA.1 | Plymouth Dock | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 1365 | LA.1 | Plymouth Dock | |||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 1364 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1361 | LA | Laira | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1362 | LA | Laira | NA | Newton Abbot | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1363 | LA.1 | Plymouth Dock | LA | Laira | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1364 | NA | Newton Abbot | LA | Laira | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1365 | LA.1 | Plymouth Dock | LA | Laira | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 1361 | LA | Laira | TN | Taunton | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 1362 | NA | Newton Abbot | TN | Taunton | |
30/10/1948 | Reallocation | 1361 | TN | Taunton | LA | Laira | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 1362 | TN | Taunton | NA | Newton Abbot | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 1362 | NA | Newton Abbot | 83B | Taunton | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 1361 | LA | Laira | 83B | Taunton | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 1361 | 83B | Taunton | 83D | Laira | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 1365 | LA | Laira | 82C | Swindon | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 1362 | 83B | Taunton | 83D | Laira | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 1362 | 83D | Laira | 83B | Taunton | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 1362 | 83B | Taunton | 83D | Laira | |
19/04/1958 | Reallocation | 1361 | 83D | Laira | 83B | Taunton | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 1361 | 83B | Taunton | 83D | Laira | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 1362 | 83D | Laira | 83B | Taunton | |
09/02/1960 | Reallocation | 1361 | 83D | Laira | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 1364 | LA | Laira | 82C | Swindon | |
24/02/1961 | Condemned | 1364 | 98W | COND | |||
05/05/1961 | Condemned | 1361 | 98W | COND | |||
05/05/1961 | Condemned | 1362 | 98W | COND | |||
20/11/1962 | Condemned | 1363 | LA | Laira | COND | ||
20/11/1962 | Condemned | 1365 | 82C | Swindon | COND |