Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1708 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19511 Week
» 72527 Month
» 192054 Year
» 3218907 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GWR Dean "1813" Class 0-6-0T
Date |
Event |
Number |
From |
Depot From |
To |
Depot To |
Usage |
05/1928 |
Condemned |
1842 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1928 |
Condemned |
1813 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1928 |
Condemned |
1825 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1928 |
Condemned |
1829 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1929 |
Condemned |
1852 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1929 |
Condemned |
1843 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1929 |
Condemned |
1834 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1930 |
Condemned |
1822 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1930 |
Condemned |
1845 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1931 |
Condemned |
1832 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1931 |
Condemned |
1851 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1932 |
Condemned |
1817 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/05/1933 |
Condemned |
1821 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
21/10/1933 |
Condemned |
1830 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
04/08/1934 |
Condemned |
1818 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
18/08/1934 |
Condemned |
1837 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
24/08/1934 |
Condemned |
1849 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
12/1934 |
Condemned |
1827 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1934 |
Condemned |
1828 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1934 |
Condemned |
1841 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1934 |
Condemned |
1853 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1935 |
Condemned |
1848 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1935 |
Condemned |
1816 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
1831 |
|
|
WEY.1 |
Bridport |
|
12/1935 |
Condemned |
1844 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
1836 |
|
|
OXF |
Oxford |
|
10/1936 |
Condemned |
1826 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1936 |
Condemned |
1815 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1937 |
Condemned |
1840 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1937 |
Condemned |
1820 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1937 |
Condemned |
1814 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1938 |
Condemned |
1819 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1938 |
Condemned |
1824 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1938 |
Condemned |
1839 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1938 |
Condemned |
1850 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1939 |
Condemned |
1836 |
OXF |
Oxford |
|
COND |
|
25/08/1944 |
Condemned |
1823 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
14/05/1945 |
Condemned |
1831 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
29/07/1946 |
Condemned |
1846 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
07/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
1835 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
13/05/1947 |
Condemned |
1847 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
28/05/1947 |
Condemned |
1838 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1835 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
31/01/1949 |
Condemned |
1835 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|