BPGVR/GWR "BPGV3" Class 0-6-0ST
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BPGV3 | 2192 | 08/1900 | NEA 87A 87A W |
Neath (Court Sart) Neath (Court Sart) Neath (Court Sart) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 04/1951 |
30/04/1951 |
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
Visitor Statistics |
» 5 Online » 166 Today » 4397 Yesterday » 17969 Week » 70985 Month » 190512 Year » 3217365 Total |
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023) (Free MySQL Counter) |
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BPGV3 | 2192 | 08/1900 | NEA 87A 87A W |
Neath (Court Sart) Neath (Court Sart) Neath (Court Sart) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 04/1951 |
30/04/1951 |