BPGVR/GWR "BPGV6" Class 0-6-0ST
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2196 | LLY | Llanelli | |||
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 2196 | LLY | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
30/04/1952 | Reallocation | 2196 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 2196 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
09/01/1956 | Condemned | 2196 | 98W | COND |