RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRR1" Class 0-6-2T
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RRR1 | 35 | 07/1921 | RYR CV.FDL RYR 88B 88B W |
Radyr Ferndale Radyr Cardiff East Dock Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1948 31/03/1948 21/04/1951 19/05/1951 11/1956 |
12/11/1956 |
RRR1 | 36 | 07/1921 | CED W |
Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/1957 |
08/10/1957 |
RRR1 | 37 | 09/1921 | CED W |
Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/1956 |
24/09/1956 |
RRR1 | 38 | 09/1921 | RYR CHYS RYR RYR 88B 88B W |
Radyr Cardiff Cathays Radyr Radyr Cardiff East Dock Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 14/12/1935 11/01/1936 15/06/1947 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 10/1957 |
08/10/1957 |
RRR1 | 39 | 12/1921 | RHY 88B W |
Rhymney Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/05/1950 08/1955 |
22/08/1955 |
RRR1 | 40 | 12/1921 | RYR 88B 88B W |
Radyr Cardiff East Dock Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 10/1953 |
26/10/1953 |
RRR1 | 41 | 12/1921 | RYR 88B W |
Radyr Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/10/1951 05/1956 |
22/05/1956 |
RRR1 | 42 | 12/1921 | RYR 88B W |
Radyr Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 27/02/1954 09/1957 |
16/09/1957 |
RRR1 | 43 | 12/1921 | RYR 88B W |
Radyr Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/09/1955 02/1957 |
25/02/1957 |
RRR1 | 44 | 12/1921 | RYR 88B W |
Radyr Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/09/1955 07/1956 |
23/07/1956 |