RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRR1" Class 0-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 38 | RYR | Radyr | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 38 | RYR | Radyr | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 38 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | RYR | Radyr | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 35 | RYR | Radyr | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 36 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 37 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 38 | RYR | Radyr | RYR | Radyr | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 39 | RHY | Rhymney | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 40 | RYR | Radyr | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 41 | RYR | Radyr | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 42 | RYR | Radyr | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 43 | RYR | Radyr | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 44 | RYR | Radyr | |||
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 35 | RYR | Radyr | FDL | Ferndale | |
31/03/1948 | Reallocation | 35 | FDL | Ferndale | RYR | Radyr | |
20/05/1950 | Reallocation | 39 | RHY | Rhymney | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 35 | RYR | Radyr | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 35 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 38 | RYR | Radyr | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 40 | RYR | Radyr | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
30/09/1951 | Reallocation | 38 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
30/09/1951 | Reallocation | 40 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
31/10/1951 | Reallocation | 41 | RYR | Radyr | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
26/10/1953 | Condemned | 40 | 98W | COND | |||
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 42 | RYR | Radyr | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
22/08/1955 | Condemned | 39 | 98W | COND | |||
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 43 | RYR | Radyr | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 44 | RYR | Radyr | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
22/05/1956 | Condemned | 41 | 98W | COND | |||
23/07/1956 | Condemned | 44 | 98W | COND | |||
24/09/1956 | Condemned | 37 | 98W | COND | |||
12/11/1956 | Condemned | 35 | 98W | COND | |||
25/02/1957 | Condemned | 43 | 98W | COND | |||
16/09/1957 | Condemned | 42 | 98W | COND | |||
08/10/1957 | Condemned | 36 | 98W | COND | |||
08/10/1957 | Condemned | 38 | 98W | COND |