RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRA1" Class 0-6-2T
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RRA1 | 63 | 06/1914 | RYR 88B 88B W |
Radyr Cardiff East Dock Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/04/1951 19/05/1951 09/1952 |
08/09/1952 |
RRA1 | 64 | 07/1914 | RYR CHYS RYR W |
Radyr Cardiff Cathays Radyr Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 11/01/1936 15/06/1947 05/1950 |
22/05/1950 |
RRA1 | 65 | 08/1914 | ABDR 88B W |
Aberdare Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/01/1953 02/1954 |
01/02/1954 |
RRA1 | 66 | 03/1916 | CED 88A 88A 88B W |
Cardiff East Dock Cardiff Cathays Cardiff Cathays Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/12/1950 31/01/1951 01/11/1952 07/1955 |
12/07/1955 |
RRA1 | 67 | 07/1916 | CED CED W |
Cardiff East Dock Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/04/1948 09/1952 |
18/09/1952 |
RRA1 | 68 | 09/1918 | CED W |
Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1954 |
29/06/1954 |
RRA1 | 69 | 09/1918 | DYD W |
Duffryn Yard Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/1955 |
21/07/1955 |
RRA1 | 70 | 09/1918 | DYD W |
Duffryn Yard Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/1955 |
28/07/1955 |