RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRA1" Class 0-6-2T
GWR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Mileage | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 06/1914 | 08/09/1952 | 38.25 | |||||||
64 | 07/1914 | 22/05/1950 | 35.83 | |||||||
65 | 08/1914 | 01/02/1954 | 39.5 | 580,696 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 27/02/1954 | 39.56 | ||
66 | 03/1916 | 12/07/1955 | 39.33 | 636,336 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/10/1955 | 39.59 | ||
67 | 07/1916 | 18/09/1952 | 36.17 | |||||||
68 | 09/1918 | 29/06/1954 | 35.75 | 552,550 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/09/1954 | 36.01 | ||
69 | 09/1918 | 21/07/1955 | 36.83 | 512,988 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 13/08/1955 | 36.93 | ||
70 | 09/1918 | 28/07/1955 | 36.83 | 530,295 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/09/1955 | 37.01 |