TVR/GWR Cameron "A" Class 0-6-2T
Class | TVR | GWR | GWR (1947) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TV A | 411 | 303 | 02/1921 | THT 88C W |
Treherbert Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/10/1953 05/05/1956 |
05/05/1956 | |
TV A | 413 | 305 | 03/1921 | CHYS W |
Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/04/1957 |
01/04/1957 | |
TV A | 120 | 322 | 01/1915 | CV.BRY 88E 88E W |
Barry Abercynon Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 29/12/1951 31/01/1952 30/10/1954 |
30/10/1954 | |
TV A | 7 | 335 | 11/1914 | CDF 88B W |
Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/11/1953 18/03/1954 |
18/03/1954 | |
TV A | 10 | 337 | 12/1914 | CV.AYN W |
Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/02/1953 |
09/02/1953 | |
TV A | 11 | 343 | 12/1914 | CHYS W |
Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
23/03/1946 15/06/1947 05/10/1955 |
05/10/1955 | |
TV A | 12 | 344 | 12/1914 | rhy CHYS W |
Dowlais Central Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 18/11/1952 |
18/11/1952 | |
TV A | 20 | 345 | 05/1920 | CV.BRY CHYS W |
Barry Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/05/1949 22/09/1955 |
22/09/1955 | |
TV A | 45 | 346 | 08/1915 | CHYS W |
Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/10/1953 |
05/10/1955 | |
TV A | 75 | 347 | 12/1921 | CHYS W |
Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/12/1956 |
04/12/1956 | |
TV A | 80 | 348 | 12/1921 | CHYS RHY CHYS W |
Cardiff Cathays Rhymney Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/07/1948 07/08/1948 05/05/1956 |
05/05/1956 | |
TV A | 90 | 349 | 12/1921 | PPRD 86C 86C 88B 88C 88E W |
Pontypool Road Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Barry Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/04/1951 19/05/1951 17/07/1954 01/01/1955 08/09/1956 04/03/1957 |
04/03/1957 | |
TV A | 91 | 351 | 12/1921 | CV.AYN W |
Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/07/1956 |
09/07/1956 | |
TV A | 122 | 352 | 08/1915 | THT W |
Treherbert Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/03/1955 |
14/03/1955 | |
TV A | 123 | 356 | 08/1915 | CV.AYN W |
Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/01/1955 |
03/01/1955 | |
TV A | 124 | 357 | 08/1915 | CDF 86J 88C W |
Cardiff Canton Aberdare Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/11/1951 24/01/1953 02/01/1956 |
02/01/1956 | |
TV A | 125 | 360 | 07/1916 | CHYS RHY CHYS W |
Cardiff Cathays Rhymney Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/07/1948 07/08/1948 10/02/1955 |
10/02/1955 | |
TV A | 127 | 361 | 07/1916 | CV.BRY 88A W |
Barry Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/07/1956 29/01/1957 |
29/01/1957 | |
TV A | 128 | 362 | 07/1916 | ABDR 88A W |
Aberdare Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/01/1953 28/05/1956 |
28/05/1956 | |
TV A | 129 | 364 | 07/1916 | CHYS W |
Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/03/1957 |
04/03/1957 | |
TV A | 130 | 365 | 07/1916 | THT 88B 88E W |
Treherbert Cardiff East Dock Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/07/1955 10/09/1955 17/10/1955 |
17/10/1955 | |
TV A | 132 | 366 | 08/1916 | THT W |
Treherbert Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/10/1955 |
10/10/1955 | |
TV A | 133 | 367 | 02/1919 | CHYS W |
Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 23/03/1956 |
23/03/1956 | |
TV A | 134 | 368 | 05/1920 | THT 88E W |
Treherbert Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/02/1956 24/10/1956 |
24/10/1956 | |
TV A | 135 | 370 | 02/1919 | CHYS 88E W |
Cardiff Cathays Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/03/1953 08/1957 |
13/08/1957 | |
TV A | 136 | 371 | 03/1919 | THT CHYS CHYS RHY CHYS 86C 86C 86J 86J 86C 88B W |
Treherbert Cardiff Cathays Cardiff Cathays Rhymney Cardiff Cathays Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Aberdare Aberdare Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 07/03/1936 15/06/1947 10/07/1948 07/08/1948 29/12/1951 31/01/1952 14/06/1952 30/06/1952 29/11/1952 17/07/1954 18/01/1955 |
18/01/1955 | |
TV A | 138 | 372 | 03/1919 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 23/02/1955 |
23/02/1955 | |
TV A | 139 | 373 | 04/1919 | THT 88C 88E W |
Treherbert Barry Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 15/07/1950 06/10/1956 08/1957 |
26/08/1957 | |
TV A | 140 | 374 | 04/1919 | ABDR 86C 88B W |
Aberdare Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1953 17/07/1954 19/09/1955 |
19/09/1955 | |
TV A | 144 | 375 | 05/1920 | CHYS 88E 88E 88C 88C W |
Cardiff Cathays Abercynon Abercynon Barry Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/06/1951 30/06/1951 01/12/1951 31/12/1951 22/11/1954 |
22/11/1954 | |
TV A | 149 | 376 | 05/1920 | CHYS 88B 88D 88C 88A W |
Cardiff Cathays Cardiff East Dock Merthyr Tydfil Barry Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/11/1953 19/06/1954 01/01/1955 06/10/1956 14/01/1957 |
14/01/1957 | |
TV A | 154 | 377 | 05/1919 | CV.BRY CHYS 88B 88F 88B 88E 88C W |
Barry Cardiff Cathays Cardiff East Dock Treherbert Cardiff East Dock Abercynon Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/05/1949 25/11/1953 09/10/1954 23/04/1955 28/01/1956 25/02/1956 14/05/1956 |
14/05/1956 | |
TV A | 156 | 378 | 05/1919 | THT 88B 88D 88B 88A W |
Treherbert Cardiff East Dock Merthyr Tydfil Cardiff East Dock Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/11/1953 22/05/1954 04/12/1954 26/03/1955 17/12/1956 |
17/12/1956 | |
TV A | 157 | 379 | 05/1919 | CV.BRY 88D 88D 88E W |
Barry Merthyr Tydfil Merthyr Tydfil Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/01/1952 29/02/1952 03/10/1953 27/02/1956 |
27/02/1956 | |
TV A | 158 | 380 | 07/1919 | CV.AYN W |
Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 22/10/1956 |
22/10/1956 | |
TV A | 159 | 381 | 07/1919 | CDF 88B 88F 88B 88A 88E W |
Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Treherbert Cardiff East Dock Cardiff Cathays Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/07/1954 09/10/1954 16/07/1955 03/12/1955 20/04/1957 08/1957 |
26/08/1957 | |
TV A | 160 | 382 | 07/1919 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/04/1956 |
26/04/1956 | |
TV A | 162 | 383 | 05/1920 | CHYS 88E W |
Cardiff Cathays Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/04/1957 08/1957 |
12/08/1957 | |
TV A | 164 | 384 | 06/1920 | CHYS 88F 88A W |
Cardiff Cathays Treherbert Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/01/1954 08/10/1955 13/02/1956 |
13/02/1956 | |
TV A | 165 | 385 | 06/1920 | PPRD 86J 86J 88E 88B 88F 88A W |
Pontypool Road Aberdare Aberdare Abercynon Cardiff East Dock Treherbert Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/06/1952 30/06/1952 21/02/1953 22/05/1954 09/10/1954 24/03/1956 01/04/1957 |
01/04/1957 | |
TV A | 400 | 386 | 06/1920 | CV.BRY 88E W |
Barry Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 22/04/1950 27/04/1956 |
27/04/1956 | |
TV A | 401 | 387 | 07/1920 | CV.BRY 88A W |
Barry Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/04/1956 05/11/1956 |
05/11/1956 | |
TV A | 402 | 388 | 08/1920 | CV.BRY RHY 88C 88A W |
Barry Rhymney Barry Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 29/01/1949 15/07/1950 16/06/1956 01/10/1956 |
01/10/1956 | |
TV A | 403 | 389 | 09/1920 | CV.BRY 88B W |
Barry Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/03/1955 20/01/1956 |
20/01/1956 | |
TV A | 404 | 390 | 09/1920 | CHYS 88C 88E 88A 88E W |
Cardiff Cathays Barry Abercynon Cardiff Cathays Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/11/1953 11/08/1956 26/01/1957 20/04/1957 08/1957 |
26/08/1957 | |
TV A | 405 | 391 | 10/1920 | CHYS W |
Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/09/1956 |
03/09/1956 | |
TV A | 406 | 393 | 11/1920 | CHYS 88D 88D 88C 88E W |
Cardiff Cathays Merthyr Tydfil Merthyr Tydfil Barry Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/01/1952 29/02/1952 03/10/1953 11/08/1956 05/1957 |
13/05/1957 | |
TV A | 407 | 394 | 12/1920 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/07/1956 |
09/07/1956 | |
TV A | 408 | 397 | 12/1920 | CV.AYN W |
Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/04/1957 |
01/04/1957 | |
TV A | 409 | 398 | 01/1921 | CV.AYN W |
Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/1957 |
13/08/1957 | |
TV A | 410 | 399 | 01/1921 | THT 88C 88B 88A 88E W |
Treherbert Barry Cardiff East Dock Cardiff Cathays Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/10/1953 25/11/1953 17/07/1954 04/12/1954 03/09/1956 |
03/09/1956 | |
TV A | 412 | 402 | 304 | 02/1921 | CV.AYN W |
Abercynon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/08/1957 |
12/08/1957 |
TV A | 414 | 404 | 306 | 12/1921 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/04/1956 |
16/04/1956 |
TV A | 415 | 406 | 307 | 12/1921 | CHYS 88E 88A W |
Cardiff Cathays Abercynon Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
03/11/1945 15/06/1947 26/03/1955 23/04/1955 13/03/1956 |
13/03/1956 |
TV A | 416 | 408 | 308 | 12/1921 | SED 88B W |
Swansea East Dock Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 19/06/1954 19/12/1955 |
19/12/1955 |
TV A | 3 | 438 | 309 | 10/1914 | SED W |
Swansea East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/02/1953 |
16/02/1953 |
TV A | 42 | 439 | 312 | 08/1915 | CV.BRY 88B 88A W |
Barry Cardiff East Dock Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 29/01/1955 08/10/1955 11/06/1956 |
11/06/1956 |
TV A | 52 | 440 | 316 | 08/1915 | CV.BRY RHY 88D W |
Barry Rhymney Merthyr Tydfil Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/10/1948 12/08/1950 23/07/1956 |
23/07/1956 |