Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 67 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 67 Week
» 18388 Month
» 106580 Year
» 990961 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

11 0-6-0


BR (1955 Num) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
7120 12033 30/04/1945 5B
1A
21A
17A
9A
9D
9A
W
Crewe South
Willesden
Saltley
Derby
Longsight
Newton Heath
Longsight
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
10/08/1957
25/01/1958
10/12/1966
07/01/1967
06/07/1968
25/01/1969
25/01/1969
7121 12034 31/05/1945 5B
1A
21A
17A
8C
10D
8C
8J
W
Crewe South
Willesden
Saltley
Derby
Speke Junction
Lostock Hall
Speke Junction
Allerton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
10/08/1957
09/08/1958
10/12/1966
20/05/1967
06/01/1968
11/05/1968
19/10/1968
19/10/1968
7122 12035 30/06/1945 5B
1A
21A
15A
21A
8C
8J
W
Crewe South
Willesden
Saltley
Wellingborough
Saltley
Speke Junction
Allerton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
10/08/1957
04/02/1961
11/02/1961
07/10/1967
11/05/1968
19/10/1968
19/10/1968
7123 12036 31/08/1945 5B
1A
6A
W
Crewe South
Willesden
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
10/08/1957
19/10/1968
19/10/1968
7124 12037 31/10/1945 5B
1A
6A
W
Crewe South
Willesden
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
10/08/1957
19/10/1968
19/10/1968
7125 12038 31/12/1945 18A
8C
10D
8F
W
Toton
Speke Junction
Lostock Hall
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/11/1966
20/05/1967
16/12/1967
25/01/1969
25/01/1969
7126 12039 31/08/1947 21A
  
6G
5A
W
Saltley
To Crewe Works
Llandudno Junction
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1966
30/12/1967
27/01/1968
19/10/1968
19/10/1968
7127 12040 30/09/1947 21A
5A
  
5A
W
Saltley
Crewe Diesel
To Crewe Works
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1966
06/01/1968
18/05/1968
19/10/1968
19/10/1968
7128 12041 31/10/1947 21A
W
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/10/1968
19/10/1968
7129 12042 30/11/1947 21A
W
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/10/1968
19/10/1968
7130 12043 29/02/1948 W Withdrawn 19/10/1968 19/10/1968
7131 12044 31/03/1948 W Withdrawn 19/10/1968 19/10/1968
  12045 30/04/1948 21A
18A
2D
2A
1E
W
Saltley
Toton
Coventry
Rugby
Bletchley
Withdrawn
11/09/1954
04/12/1954
13/08/1955
25/02/1956
11/01/1969
25/01/1969
25/01/1969
  12046 31/05/1948 9D
18A
2A
1E
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Rugby
Bletchley
Withdrawn
23/10/1954
06/11/1954
10/09/1955
11/01/1969
25/01/1969
25/01/1969
  12047 31/08/1948 9D
18A
2A
  
5A
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Rugby
To Crewe Works
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
17/07/1954
14/08/1954
10/09/1955
01/10/1966
18/05/1968
25/01/1969
25/01/1969
  12048 31/12/1948 9D
18A
2A
6A
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Rugby
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
11/09/1954
23/10/1954
10/09/1955
05/03/1960
25/01/1969
25/01/1969
  12049 31/12/1949 1A
5B
1A
16A
21A
2H
1A
1F
1E
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Willesden
Nottingham
Saltley
Monument Lane
Willesden
Rugby
Bletchley
Withdrawn
08/09/1951
06/10/1951
06/11/1954
10/08/1957
09/01/1960
18/04/1964
23/01/1965
22/04/1967
11/01/1969
03/10/1971
03/10/1971
  12050 31/01/1949 1A
1E
1A
16A
9D
9A
W
Willesden
Bletchley
Willesden
Nottingham
Newton Heath
Longsight
Withdrawn
04/12/1954
13/08/1955
28/01/1956
10/08/1957
12/11/1966
06/07/1968
11/07/1970
11/07/1970
  12051 28/02/1949 1A
16A
16A
16G
9D
9A
8J
W
Willesden
Nottingham
Toton
Westhouses
Newton Heath
Longsight
Allerton
Withdrawn
06/11/1954
10/08/1957
19/02/1966
19/03/1966
12/11/1966
06/07/1968
09/01/1971
09/10/1971
09/10/1971
  12052 31/03/1949 2A
5B
1A
16A
16A
16G
5A
W
Rugby
Crewe South
Willesden
Nottingham
Toton
Westhouses
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
31/10/1953
04/12/1954
10/08/1957
19/02/1966
19/03/1966
12/11/1966
13/06/1971
13/06/1971
  12053 30/04/1949 1A
1E
1A
2A
6A
1C
1A
W
Willesden
Bletchley
Willesden
Rugby
Chester (MR)
Watford
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1955
13/08/1955
28/01/1956
16/06/1957
04/04/1959
12/12/1964
03/04/1965
18/04/1971
18/04/1971
  12054 31/05/1949 1A
2A
6A
W
Willesden
Rugby
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
06/11/1954
10/08/1957
04/04/1959
25/07/1970
25/07/1970
  12055 16/07/1949 5B
1A
18A
5A
W
Crewe South (New)
Willesden
Toton
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
16/07/1949
04/12/1954
10/08/1957
12/11/1966
17/07/1971
17/07/1971
  12056 31/07/1949 9D
18A
9D
18A
9D
2E
2A
3C
21B
2G
2F
W
Buxton (LNWR) (on loan)
Toton
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Buxton (LNWR)
Northampton
Rugby
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
04/12/1954
01/01/1955
23/04/1955
21/05/1955
13/08/1955
10/09/1955
25/02/1956
23/02/1957
17/03/1962
16/04/1966
22/04/1967
09/10/1971
09/10/1971
  12057 31/08/1949 18A
14A
18A
9D
18A
9D
9D
18A
2E
2A
6A
8J
W
Toton (New)
Cricklewood East
Toton
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Buxton (LNWR) (on loan)
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Northampton
Rugby
Chester (MR)
Allerton
Withdrawn
31/08/1949
30/01/1954
27/03/1954
14/08/1954
11/09/1954
25/12/1954
26/03/1955
23/04/1955
08/10/1955
25/02/1956
05/03/1960
18/05/1968
25/01/1969
25/01/1969
  12058 31/10/1949 16A
18A
16A
14A
1A
W
Nottingham
Toton
Nottingham
Cricklewood East
Willesden
Withdrawn
26/01/1952
09/08/1952
03/01/1953
16/06/1956
12/12/1964
28/04/1971
28/04/1971
  12059 31/10/1949 W Withdrawn 25/01/1969 25/01/1969
  12060 30/11/1949 18A
15E
16C
9D
9A
W
Toton
Coalville
Derby
Newton Heath
Longsight
Withdrawn
03/02/1962
21/11/1964
13/02/1965
10/12/1966
06/07/1968
07/02/1971
07/02/1971
  12061 30/11/1949 21A
8C
8J
W
Saltley (New)
Speke Junction
Allerton
Withdrawn
30/11/1949
07/10/1967
11/05/1968
09/10/1971
09/10/1971
  12062 31/12/1949 21A
2A
  
5A
W
Saltley (New)
Tyseley
To Crewe Works
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
03/10/1964
01/10/1966
18/05/1968
19/04/1970
19/04/1970
  12063 31/12/1949 14A
16D
16A
5A
8J
8F
W
Cricklewood East (New)
Nottingham
Toton
Crewe Diesel
Allerton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
24/10/1964
19/02/1966
10/12/1966
11/05/1968
23/01/1971
01/01/1972
01/01/1972
  12064 31/12/1949 14A
1A
W
Cricklewood East (New)
Willesden
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
12/12/1964
19/04/1969
19/04/1969
  12065 31/12/1949 14A
2F
8F
8J
8F
W
Cricklewood East (New)
Bescot
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Allerton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
19/08/1967
11/05/1968
10/05/1969
10/04/1971
10/05/1971
10/05/1971
  12066 31/12/1949 14A
14A
21A
2A
5A
W
Cricklewood East (New)
Cricklewood East
Saltley
Tyseley
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
17/06/1950
28/01/1956
03/10/1964
22/04/1967
19/04/1969
19/04/1969
  12067 28/02/1950 1A
W
Willesden
Withdrawn
12/12/1964
25/01/1969
25/01/1969
  12068 31/03/1950 1A
W
Willesden
Withdrawn
12/12/1964
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
  12069 31/07/1950 16A
14A
1D
14A
16D
16E
5A
W
Nottingham
Cricklewood East
Devons Road (Bow)
Cricklewood East
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
26/01/1952
16/06/1956
21/03/1959
04/04/1959
21/08/1965
12/02/1966
10/12/1966
14/03/1971
14/03/1971
  12070 31/08/1950 84E
18A
14A
18A
9D
18A
2E
2A
6A
1A
8B
8F
W
Tyseley
Toton
Cricklewood East
Toton
Buxton (LNWR) (on loan)
Toton
Northampton
Rugby
Chester (MR)
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
30/04/1951
29/11/1952
30/01/1954
27/03/1954
06/11/1954
04/12/1954
08/10/1955
25/02/1956
01/12/1956
10/08/1957
07/04/1962
28/11/1964
30/09/1969
30/09/1969
  12071 31/08/1950 18A
84E
18A
9D
18A
2E
2A
6A
1A
8F
5B
21E
2F
6A
8H
8F
W
Toton (New)
Tyseley
Toton
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Northampton
Rugby
Chester (MR)
Willesden
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Crewe South
Monument Lane
Bescot
Chester (MR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
31/08/1950
30/04/1951
03/01/1953
21/05/1955
16/07/1955
08/10/1955
25/02/1956
01/12/1956
10/08/1957
04/10/1958
21/01/1961
09/09/1961
22/04/1967
11/01/1969
10/10/1970
14/11/1970
09/10/1971
09/10/1971
  12072 31/08/1950 18A
84E
18A
9D
18A
9D
18A
9D
18A
9D
18A
9D
18A
14A
17A
2F
17A
2F
17A
8F
W
Toton (New)
Tyseley
Toton
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Cricklewood East
Derby
Woodford Halse
Derby
Woodford Halse
Derby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
31/08/1950
30/04/1951
24/01/1953
26/02/1955
26/03/1955
16/07/1955
13/08/1955
08/10/1955
05/11/1955
03/12/1955
03/12/1955
25/02/1956
24/03/1956
16/06/1956
27/06/1959
14/11/1959
30/01/1960
14/05/1960
24/09/1960
10/12/1966
21/12/1968
21/12/1968
  12073 30/09/1950 18A
9D
18D
18A
9D
18A
9D
18A
9D
18A
9D
18A
1A
1E
8F
W
Toton (New)
Buxton (LNWR)
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Toton
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Buxton (LNWR)
Toton
Willesden
Bletchley
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
30/09/1950
01/01/1955
26/02/1955
26/03/1955
10/09/1955
08/10/1955
05/11/1955
03/12/1955
03/12/1955
25/02/1956
11/08/1956
06/10/1956
10/08/1957
03/12/1960
18/05/1968
06/11/1971
06/11/1971
  12074 30/09/1950 21A
1A
1E
8F
6A
W
Saltley (New)
Willesden
Bletchley
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
30/09/1950
10/08/1957
03/12/1960
18/05/1968
18/12/1971
01/01/1972
01/01/1972
  12075 30/09/1950 21A
1A
8B
8F
W
Saltley (New)
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
30/09/1950
10/08/1957
23/12/1961
28/11/1964
13/11/1971
13/11/1971
  12076 31/10/1950 21A
1A
8B
8F
W
Saltley (New)
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
10/08/1957
24/02/1962
28/11/1964
12/12/1971
12/12/1971
  12077 31/10/1950 21A
14A
17A
21A
2A
2F
2G
6A
9A
8F
W
Saltley (New)
Cricklewood East
Derby
Saltley
Tyseley
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Chester (MR)
Longsight
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
28/01/1956
23/03/1957
05/10/1957
03/10/1964
30/10/1965
16/04/1966
01/10/1966
03/04/1971
08/05/1971
09/10/1971
09/10/1971
  12078 31/10/1950 5B
1A
8B
8F
W
Crewe South (New)
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
04/12/1954
10/03/1962
28/11/1964
17/01/1971
17/01/1971
  12079 30/11/1950 68A
12D
12A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor (New)
Workington
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
30/11/1950
15/04/1967
06/01/1968
11/09/1971
11/09/1971
  12080 30/11/1950 68A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor (New)
Withdrawn
30/11/1950
24/04/1971
24/04/1971
  12081 30/11/1950 68A
12A
8C
9A
9D
9A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor (New)
Carlisle Upperby
Speke Junction
Longsight
Newton Heath
Longsight
Withdrawn
30/11/1950
24/03/1951
01/12/1956
11/06/1966
12/11/1966
06/07/1968
20/06/1970
20/06/1970
  12082 30/11/1950 68A
12A
68A
12A
8C
6A
8C
18A
5A
6G
W
Carlisle Kingmoor (New)
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Upperby
Speke Junction
Chester (MR)
Speke Junction
Toton
Crewe Diesel
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
30/11/1950
24/03/1951
12/05/1956
19/05/1956
01/12/1956
23/02/1957
10/08/1957
18/07/1959
10/12/1966
15/08/1970
03/10/1971
03/10/1971
  12083 30/11/1950 68A
12A
12A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor (New)
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
30/11/1950
24/03/1951
29/11/1958
09/10/1971
09/10/1971
  12084 09/12/1950 12B
12A
12B
12B
12A
5A
W
Carlisle Canal (New)
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Canal (on loan)
Carlisle Canal
Carlisle Kingmoor
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
09/12/1950
24/03/1951
16/06/1951
08/09/1951
22/06/1963
07/12/1968
16/05/1971
16/05/1971
  12085 31/12/1950 12B
12A
12B
12B
12A
W
Carlisle Canal (New)
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Canal (on loan)
Carlisle Canal
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
31/12/1950
24/03/1951
16/06/1951
08/09/1951
22/06/1963
22/05/1971
22/05/1971
  12086 31/12/1950 12B
12A
12B
12A
12C
12A
12C
12D
12A
W
Carlisle Canal (New)
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Canal
Carlisle Kingmoor
Barrow in Furness
Carlisle Kingmoor
Barrow in Furness
Workington
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
31/12/1950
24/03/1951
08/09/1951
22/06/1963
22/01/1966
29/01/1966
02/07/1966
21/01/1967
06/01/1968
31/07/1969
31/07/1969
  12087 31/12/1950 12B
12A
84E
12A
68A
21C
21B
2G
2F
W
Carlisle Canal (New)
Carlisle Upperby
Tyseley
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Bushbury
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
31/12/1950
24/03/1951
30/04/1951
24/01/1953
18/02/1956
05/11/1960
24/03/1962
16/04/1966
22/04/1967
17/07/1971
17/07/1971
  12088 16/06/1951 3D
1F
1E
8F
8J
W
Aston (New)
Rugby
Bletchley
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Allerton
Withdrawn
16/06/1951
05/12/1964
11/01/1969
29/11/1969
14/11/1970
11/05/1971
11/05/1971
  12089 16/06/1951 3D
1A
1F
1A
W
Aston (New)
Willesden
Rugby
Willesden
Withdrawn
16/06/1951
07/11/1964
12/02/1966
15/10/1966
12/09/1970
12/09/1970
  12090 17/07/1951 3B
3A
1A
3D
1A
1E
W
Bushbury (New)
Bescot
Willesden
Aston
Willesden
Bletchley
Withdrawn
17/07/1951
17/07/1951
08/09/1951
26/01/1952
07/11/1964
11/01/1969
17/07/1971
17/07/1971
  12091 17/07/1951 3A
36B
2C
2K
2F
2G
5A
W
Bescot (New)
Mexborough
Stourbridge Junction
Bushbury
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
17/07/1951
18/08/1951
03/10/1964
17/10/1964
17/04/1965
16/04/1966
01/10/1966
20/06/1970
20/06/1970
  12092 11/08/1951 3A
21E
2F
5A
W
Bescot (New)
Monument Lane
Bescot
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
11/08/1951
26/11/1960
22/04/1967
27/05/1967
16/04/1969
16/04/1969
  12093 08/09/1951 3B
1A
3B
2F
2G
5A
W
Bushbury (New)
Willesden
Bushbury
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
08/09/1951
14/06/1952
24/01/1953
17/04/1965
16/04/1966
01/10/1966
16/05/1971
16/05/1971
  12094 06/10/1951 3B
2C
2F
8C
8J
W
Bushbury (New)
Stourbridge Junction
Bescot
Speke Junction
Allerton
Withdrawn
06/10/1951
17/10/1964
22/04/1967
07/10/1967
11/05/1968
09/10/1971
09/10/1971
  12095 29/12/1951 3D
21B
2C
9D
9A
W
Aston (New)
Bescot
Stourbridge Junction
Newton Heath
Longsight
Withdrawn
29/12/1951
09/12/1961
03/10/1964
28/05/1966
06/07/1968
16/04/1969
16/04/1969
  12096 29/12/1951 16A
5A
W
Nottingham (New)
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
29/12/1951
10/12/1966
25/01/1969
25/01/1969
  12097 29/12/1951 16A
8F
W
Nottingham (New)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
29/12/1951
12/11/1966
28/03/1971
28/03/1971
  12098 23/02/1952 16A
9D
9A
W
8F
Nottingham (New)
Newton Heath
Longsight
Withdrawn
Springs Branch (Wigan)
23/02/1952
12/11/1966
06/07/1968
27/02/1970
27/02/1971
27/02/1970
  12099 22/03/1952 16A
1A
8F
5B
2B
2A
1E
W
Nottingham (New)
Willesden
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Crewe South
Nuneaton
Rugby
Bletchley
Withdrawn
22/03/1952
10/08/1957
04/10/1958
21/01/1961
10/06/1961
05/05/1962
11/01/1969
17/07/1971
17/07/1971
  12100 19/04/1952 16A
1A
8B
8F
W
Nottingham (New)
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
19/04/1952
10/08/1957
31/03/1962
28/11/1964
31/03/1969
31/03/1969
  12101 15/05/1952 16A
1A
W
Nottingham (New)
Willesden
Withdrawn
15/05/1952
10/08/1957
15/08/1970
15/08/1970
  12102 14/06/1952 16A
1A
8F

8F
W
Nottingham (New)
Willesden
Springs Branch (Wigan)

Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
14/06/1952
10/08/1957
04/10/1958
21/01/1961
28/11/1964
17/01/1971
17/01/1971
  12103 22/03/1952 30A
36B
30A

W
R
Stratford (New)
Mexborough
Stratford

Withdrawn
Reinstated
22/03/1952
19/09/1953
23/01/1954
05/1969
21/11/1971
10/01/1972
21/11/1971
  12104 19/04/1952 30A
36B
30A
W
Stratford (New)
Mexborough
Stratford
Withdrawn
19/04/1952
19/09/1953
24/10/1953
07/05/1967
07/05/1967
  12105 19/04/1952 30A
36B
30A
W
Stratford (New)
Mexborough
Stratford
Withdrawn
19/04/1952
22/08/1953
24/07/1954
14/01/1971
14/01/1971
  12106 17/05/1952 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
17/05/1952
30/07/1970
30/07/1970
  12107 17/05/1952 30A
64B
62A
W
Stratford (New)
Haymarket
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
17/05/1952
13/05/1967
27/05/1967
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
  12108 17/05/1952 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
17/05/1952
01/12/1971
01/12/1971
  12109 04/06/1952 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
04/06/1952
19/11/1972
19/11/1972
  12110 04/06/1952 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
04/06/1952
19/11/1972
19/11/1972
  12111 19/07/1952 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
19/07/1952
09/05/1971
09/05/1971
  12112 19/07/1952 34B
34A
34B
34G
D14
2F
2E
W
Hornsey (New)
Kings Cross
Hornsey
Finsbury Park
London (Midland)
Bescot
Saltley
Withdrawn
19/07/1952
17/09/1955
11/10/1958
30/04/1960
08/01/1966
19/08/1967
02/11/1968
31/10/1969
31/10/1969
  12113 19/07/1952 53A
53C
26E
26E
53C
55E
55D
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Lees (Oldham)
Lees (Oldham)
Hull Springhead
Normanton
Royston
Withdrawn
19/07/1952
23/01/1954
28/01/1956
18/02/1956
24/03/1956
25/02/1967
25/03/1967
14/03/1971
14/03/1971
  12114 19/07/1952 53A
53C
30A
91E
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Stratford
To Eastern Region
Withdrawn
19/07/1952
19/12/1953
29/06/1968
20/07/1968
05/10/1970
05/10/1970
  12115 23/08/1952 53A
53C
26E
53C
30A
91E
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Lees (Oldham)
Hull Springhead
Stratford
To Eastern Region
Withdrawn
23/08/1952
19/12/1953
24/03/1956
21/04/1956
29/06/1968
20/07/1968
05/10/1970
05/10/1970
  12116 20/09/1952 53A
53C
30A
91E
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Stratford
To Eastern Region
Withdrawn
20/09/1952
22/05/1954
29/06/1968
20/07/1968
30/09/1969
30/09/1969
  12117 20/09/1952 53A
53C
40B
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Immingham
Withdrawn
20/09/1952
22/05/1954
30/11/1968
28/02/1969
28/02/1969
  12118 20/09/1952 53A
53C
40B
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Immingham
Withdrawn
20/09/1952
22/05/1954
30/11/1968
25/04/1971
25/04/1971
  12119 20/09/1952 53A
53C
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Withdrawn
20/09/1952
22/05/1954
18/11/1968
18/11/1968
  12120 20/09/1952 53A
53C
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Withdrawn
20/09/1952
22/05/1954
28/12/1968
28/12/1968
  12121 18/10/1952 53A
53C
50C
40B
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Hull Botanic Gardens
Immingham
Withdrawn
18/10/1952
19/03/1955
26/09/1970
26/12/1970
04/07/1971
04/07/1971
  12122 18/10/1952 53A
53C
50B
40B
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Hull Dairycoates
Immingham
Withdrawn
18/10/1952
19/03/1955
26/05/1962
29/11/1969
04/07/1971
04/07/1971
  12123 18/10/1952 34B
30A
40B
W
Hornsey (New)
Stratford
Immingham
Withdrawn
18/10/1952
18/02/1956
22/11/1958
25/06/1967
25/06/1967
  12124 18/10/1952 34B
30A
40B
W
Hornsey (New)
Stratford
Immingham
Withdrawn
18/10/1952
18/02/1956
22/11/1958
19/11/1968
19/11/1968
  12125 18/10/1952 34A
30A
40B
W
Kings Cross (New)
Stratford
Immingham
Withdrawn
18/10/1952
18/02/1956
22/11/1958
28/06/1969
28/06/1969
  12126 15/11/1952 34A
30A
31B
40B
W
Kings Cross (New)
Stratford
March
Immingham
Withdrawn
15/11/1952
18/02/1956
11/10/1958
29/11/1958
25/11/1968
25/11/1968
  12127 15/11/1952 31B
40B
30A
W
March (New)
Immingham
Stratford
Withdrawn
15/11/1952
25/12/1954
17/12/1955
22/10/1972
22/10/1972
  12128 15/11/1952 31B
30A
W
March (New)
Stratford
Withdrawn
15/11/1952
17/09/1955
30/07/1970
30/07/1970
  12129 15/11/1952 31B
34A
34B
34G
30A
34G
30A
W
March (New)
Kings Cross
Hornsey
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
15/11/1952
18/04/1953
18/02/1956
30/04/1960
25/02/1961
20/05/1961
10/09/1966
24/09/1967
24/09/1967
  12130 15/11/1952 31B
30A
W
March (New)
Stratford
Withdrawn
15/11/1952
17/12/1955
16/07/1972
16/07/1972
  12131 15/11/1952 31B
34A
34B
34G
30A
W
March (New)
Kings Cross
Hornsey
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
15/11/1952
18/04/1953
17/09/1955
30/04/1960
10/09/1966
16/04/1969
16/04/1969
  12132 15/11/1952 31B
36B
31B
30A
W
March (New)
Mexborough
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
15/11/1952
23/10/1954
13/11/1954
21/01/1956
25/06/1972
25/06/1972
  12133 13/12/1952 31B
36B
31B
40B
31B
30A
40B
W
March (New)
Mexborough
March
Immingham
March
Stratford
Immingham
Withdrawn
13/12/1952
24/04/1954
24/07/1954
25/12/1954
21/01/1956
18/02/1956
29/11/1958
01/02/1969
01/02/1969
  12134 13/12/1952 30A
40B
30A
30F
31B
31A
30A
W
Stratford (New)
Immingham
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
March
Cambridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
13/12/1952
25/12/1954
24/03/1956
19/07/1958
11/10/1958
04/02/1961
29/10/1966
19/11/1972
19/11/1972
  12135 17/01/1953 30A
40B
W
Stratford (New)
Immingham
Withdrawn
17/01/1953
29/11/1958
28/06/1969
28/06/1969
  12136 17/01/1953 30A
31B
31A
31B
30A
W
Stratford (New)
March
Cambridge
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
17/01/1953
29/11/1958
05/10/1963
04/06/1966
14/09/1968
30/12/1971
30/12/1971
  12137 17/01/1953 31B
34A
34B
34G
40B
31B
30A
W
March (New)
Kings Cross
Hornsey
Finsbury Park
Immingham
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
17/01/1953
18/04/1953
13/11/1954
30/04/1960
11/05/1963
03/09/1966
06/07/1968
18/11/1968
18/11/1968
  12138 17/01/1953 31B
34A
34B
34G
30A
W
March (New)
Kings Cross
Hornsey
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
17/01/1953
18/04/1953
18/02/1956
30/04/1960
10/09/1966
18/11/1968
18/11/1968