Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 906 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1806 Week
» 13627 Month
» 182399 Year
» 1066780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

11 0-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 11/02/1961 12120 53C   Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.    
Sat 25/02/1961 12051,
12063
16A,
14A
  Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside diesel test house.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
   
Sun 26/02/1961 12126 40B   Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Paint shop.    
Sat 11/11/1961 12113 53C   Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. SLS 1/1962  
Fri 15/12/1961 12062,
12068,
12082,
12088,
12101
21A,
??,
18A,
21D,
1A
  Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Test house.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Shunter test house.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Sun 25/03/1962 12115 53C   Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Waiting entry to works on Darlington shed. SLS 5/1962  
Sun 15/04/1962 12036,
12049,
12063,
12071
6A,
21A,
14A,
21E
  Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
SLS 5/1962  
Sun 21/03/1965 12050 16D   A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed John Thickitt - depot visit  
Sun 17/09/1967 12113 55D   A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed John Thickitt  
Sun 14/04/1968 12107 Wdn   Thornton Junction: Dumped at Thornton Jct. RCTS 6/1968  
Sun 15/06/1969 12124 Wdn   G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard RO 9/1969  
Thu 17/07/1969 12034,
12035,
7122
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Glasgow Works visit: In Works
Glasgow Works visit: In Works
Glasgow Works visit: In Works
RO 9/1969  
Sun 03/08/1969 12034,
12035,
7122
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works
Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works
Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works
RO 10/1969  
Mon 01/09/1969 12034,
12035,
7122
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Eastfield Triangle: Dumped on Eastfield triangle.
Eastfield Triangle: Dumped on Eastfield triangle.
Eastfield Triangle: Dumped on Eastfield triangle.
RO 9/1969  
Wed 03/09/1969 12034,
12035,
7122
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Departed Eastfield for McWilliams, Shettleston
Departed Eastfield for McWilliams, Shettleston
Departed Eastfield for McWilliams, Shettleston
RO 11/1969  
Sat 20/09/1969 12086 Wdn   Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead RO489 11/69  
Tue 12/1971 12054 Wdn   NCB Mountain Ash Colliery - Out of use in favour of steam locomotive 7754 RO 4/1972  
Sun 19/12/1971 12103,
12103,
12105,
12108,
12111,
12114,
12115
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Stratford depot: Around the shed. - In store
Stratford depot: Around the shed. - In store
Stratford depot: Around the shed. - In store
Stratford depot: Around the shed. - In store
Stratford depot: Around the shed. - In store
Stratford depot: Around the shed. - In store
Stratford depot: Around the shed. - In store
RO 3/1972  
Sun 19/12/1971 12058 Wdn   Willesden shed. RO 3/1972  
Mon 27/12/1971 12055 Wdn   Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot RO 517  
Sat 05/02/1972 12058 Wdn   In store at Willesden RO 4/1972