Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 225 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 225 Week
» 18546 Month
» 106738 Year
» 991119 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Dean "Aberdare" Class 2-6-0


Class GWR (First) GWR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Aberdare 33 2600 08/1900 W Withdrawn 04/02/1936 04/02/1936
Aberdare 2681 2601 02/1906 W Withdrawn 25/09/1936 25/09/1936
Aberdare   2602 01/1907 W Withdrawn 24/08/1934 24/08/1934
Aberdare   2603 02/1906 W Withdrawn 10/09/1936 10/09/1936
Aberdare   2604 04/1906 W Withdrawn 23/04/1936 23/04/1936
Aberdare   2605 02/1906 W Withdrawn 20/10/1934 20/10/1934
Aberdare   2606 05/1906 W Withdrawn 26/10/1934 26/10/1934
Aberdare   2607 01/1906 W Withdrawn 29/08/1934 29/08/1934
Aberdare   2608 01/1906 W Withdrawn 19/10/1945 19/10/1945
Aberdare   2609 12/1906 W Withdrawn 08/09/1934 08/09/1934
Aberdare   2610 04/1906 W Withdrawn 24/08/1935 24/08/1935
Aberdare   2611 07/1903 W Withdrawn 08/09/1934 08/09/1934
Aberdare   2612 07/1903 W Withdrawn 29/01/1948 29/01/1948
Aberdare   2613 07/1903 W Withdrawn 15/10/1938 15/10/1938
Aberdare   2614 07/1903 W Withdrawn 14/12/1935 14/12/1935
Aberdare   2615 08/1903 W Withdrawn 01/11/1934 01/11/1934
Aberdare   2616 08/1903 W Withdrawn 10/11/1934 10/11/1934
Aberdare   2617 08/1903 W Withdrawn 14/09/1934 14/09/1934
Aberdare   2618 08/1903 W Withdrawn 31/12/1938 31/12/1938
Aberdare   2619 08/1903 W Withdrawn 19/01/1946 19/01/1946
Aberdare   2620 08/1903 W Withdrawn 29/08/1949 29/08/1949
Aberdare   2621 03/1901 W Withdrawn 21/09/1934 21/09/1934
Aberdare   2622 03/1901 W Withdrawn 28/06/1946 28/06/1946
Aberdare   2623 04/1901 W Withdrawn 14/02/1948 14/02/1948
Aberdare   2624 04/1901 W Withdrawn 06/12/1934 06/12/1934
Aberdare   2625 04/1901 W Withdrawn 01/09/1945 01/09/1945
Aberdare   2626 04/1901 W Withdrawn 24/04/1937 24/04/1937
Aberdare   2627 04/1901 W Withdrawn 21/09/1934 21/09/1934
Aberdare   2628 04/1901 W Withdrawn 30/08/1935 30/08/1935
Aberdare   2629 05/1901 W Withdrawn 14/12/1935 14/12/1935
Aberdare   2630 05/1901 W Withdrawn 09/10/1934 09/10/1934
Aberdare   2631 05/1901 W Withdrawn 27/09/1947 27/09/1947
Aberdare   2632 05/1901 W Withdrawn 06/09/1935 06/09/1935
Aberdare   2633 05/1901 W Withdrawn 27/09/1935 27/09/1935
Aberdare   2634 05/1901 W Withdrawn 29/11/1935 29/11/1935
Aberdare   2635 06/1901 W Withdrawn 30/08/1947 30/08/1947
Aberdare   2636 06/1901 W Withdrawn 29/07/1946 29/07/1946
Aberdare   2637 06/1901 W Withdrawn 15/09/1947 15/09/1947
Aberdare   2638 06/1901 W Withdrawn 19/10/1945 19/10/1945
Aberdare   2639 06/1901 W Withdrawn 15/05/1946 15/05/1946
Aberdare   2640 06/1901 W Withdrawn 12/06/1947 12/06/1947
Aberdare   2641 10/1901 W Withdrawn 29/09/1934 29/09/1934
Aberdare   2642 10/1901 W Withdrawn 03/06/1939 03/06/1939
Aberdare   2643 10/1901 W Withdrawn 26/07/1948 26/07/1948
Aberdare   2644 10/1901 W Withdrawn 16/10/1935 16/10/1935
Aberdare   2645 11/1901 W Withdrawn 14/12/1935 14/12/1935
Aberdare   2646 11/1901 W Withdrawn 01/10/1934 01/10/1934
Aberdare   2647 11/1901 W Withdrawn 01/12/1934 01/12/1934
Aberdare   2648 11/1901 W Withdrawn 14/02/1944 14/02/1944
Aberdare   2649 11/1901 W Withdrawn 08/08/1946 08/08/1946
Aberdare   2650 11/1901 W Withdrawn 30/05/1936 30/05/1936
Aberdare   2651 12/1901 W Withdrawn 06/06/1949 06/06/1949
Aberdare   2652 12/1901 W Withdrawn 24/08/1945 24/08/1945
Aberdare   2653 12/1901 W Withdrawn 17/11/1934 17/11/1934
Aberdare   2654 01/1902 W Withdrawn 20/01/1936 20/01/1936
Aberdare   2655 01/1902 W Withdrawn 08/06/1949 08/06/1949
Aberdare   2656 01/1902 W Withdrawn 27/03/1948 27/03/1948
Aberdare   2657 01/1902 W Withdrawn 18/10/1946 18/10/1946
Aberdare   2658 02/1902 W Withdrawn 03/11/1934 03/11/1934
Aberdare   2659 02/1902 W Withdrawn 28/10/1935 28/10/1935
Aberdare   2660 02/1902 W Withdrawn 12/01/1946 12/01/1946
Aberdare   2661 09/1902 W Withdrawn 29/11/1935 29/11/1935
Aberdare   2662 09/1902 W Withdrawn 03/07/1948 03/07/1948
Aberdare   2663 08/1902 W Withdrawn 08/10/1935 08/10/1935
Aberdare   2664 08/1902 W Withdrawn 20/01/1936 20/01/1936
Aberdare   2665 09/1902 W Withdrawn 17/01/1948 17/01/1948
Aberdare   2666 09/1902 W Withdrawn 20/10/1934 20/10/1934
Aberdare   2667 09/1902 W Withdrawn 27/10/1949 27/10/1949
Aberdare   2668 09/1902 W Withdrawn 12/12/1936 12/12/1936
Aberdare   2669 10/1902 W Withdrawn 17/05/1948 17/05/1948
Aberdare   2670 10/1902 W Withdrawn 20/08/1938 20/08/1938
Aberdare   2671 10/1902 W Withdrawn 17/11/1934 17/11/1934
Aberdare   2672 10/1902 W Withdrawn 05/11/1935 05/11/1935
Aberdare   2673 11/1902 W Withdrawn 24/05/1946 24/05/1946
Aberdare   2674 11/1902 W Withdrawn 21/09/1935 21/09/1935
Aberdare   2675 11/1902 W Withdrawn 12/09/1935 12/09/1935
Aberdare   2676 11/1902 W Withdrawn 20/09/1946 20/09/1946
Aberdare   2677 11/1902 W Withdrawn 04/04/1946 04/04/1946
Aberdare   2678 11/1902 W Withdrawn 09/06/1936 09/06/1936
Aberdare   2679 12/1902 W Withdrawn 02/02/1946 02/02/1946
Aberdare   2680 12/1902 W Withdrawn 07/06/1948 07/06/1948