GWR Churchward "4300" Class 2-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 4320 | 31 | Abergavenny | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 4328 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 4350 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 4364 | SWFPOOL | Swindon 'F' Pool | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 4381 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 4383 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 4391 | BPL | Barnstaple Junction | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 4398 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 5317 | SWSTCK | Swindon Stock shed | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 5319 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 8325 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 8329 | WES.1 | Frome | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 8333 | SWSTCK | Swindon Stock shed | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 8364 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 8393 | STAFF | Stafford Road Factory | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 5396 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6324 | CHELHS | Cheltenham High Street | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6326 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6330 | SDN.1 | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6354 | SWSTCK | Swindon Stock shed | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6360 | SDN.1 | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6361 | SWFPOOL | Swindon 'F' Pool | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6371 | CHELHS | Cheltenham High Street | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6378 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 7307 | WES.1 | Frome | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 7308 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | |||
01/01/1934 | Reallocation | 9301 | SWFPOOL | Swindon 'F' Pool | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4310 | 32 | WES | Westbury | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4312 | 215 | OXY | Oxley | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4319 | 66 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4321 | 203 | WES | Westbury | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4349 | 172 | WES | Westbury | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4355 | 136 | TYS | Tyseley | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4375 | 174 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4377 | 32 | SDN.1 | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4382 | 167 | WES.2 | Salisbury (GWR) | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4383 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4386 | 174 | CHR | Chester West | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4387 | 32 | BRD.1 | Weston-super-Mare | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4391 | BPL | Barnstaple Junction | TN | Taunton | |
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5316 | 126 | TYS | Tyseley | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5349 | 54 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 8366 | 87 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 8374 | 53 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 8381 | 213 | LA | Laira | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5385 | 95 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6307 | 162 | BAN | Banbury | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6308 | 44 | CHR | Chester West | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6309 | 203 | TN.1 | Barnstaple | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6314 | 142 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6319 | 215 | NEY | Neyland | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6322 | 76 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6323 | 44 | OXY | Oxley | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6343 | 22 | TN.1 | Barnstaple | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6344 | 162 | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6359 | 44 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6368 | 174 | WES.2 | Salisbury (GWR) | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6371 | CHELHS | Cheltenham High Street | NEY | Neyland | |
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6383 | 87 | TN | Taunton | ||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 7307 | WES.1 | Frome | BRD.1 | Weston-super-Mare | |
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 9315 | 101 | RDG.1 | Basingstoke (GWR) | ||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 4306 | 85 | NEY | Neyland | ||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 4342 | 114 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 5346 | 24 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 5347 | 167 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 5348 | 54 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 8365 | 133 | OXY | Oxley | ||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 8390 | 114 | OXY | Oxley | ||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6303 | 22 | WES | Westbury | ||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6367 | 107 | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6370 | 215 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6397 | 162 | LLY | Llanelli | ||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 4312 | OXY | Oxley | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 4346 | 54 | HFD | Hereford | ||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 4355 | TYS | Tyseley | SALOP | Shrewsbury | |
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 5348 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | BAN | Banbury | |
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 6341 | 172 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 6352 | 44 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 7303 | 85 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 9305 | 121 | RDG.1 | Basingstoke (GWR) | ||
02/1936 | Condemned | 4309 | 32 | COND | |||
02/1936 | Condemned | 4313 | 203 | COND | |||
02/1936 | Condemned | 4331 | 167 | COND | |||
02/1936 | Condemned | 4332 | 134 | COND | |||
02/1936 | Condemned | 4364 | SWFPOOL | Swindon 'F' Pool | COND | ||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 4304 | 203 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 4308 | 215 | CHR | Chester West | ||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 4317 | 24 | OXY | Oxley | ||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 8378 | 153 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 6320 | 134 | BAN | Banbury | ||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 6337 | 44 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 6372 | 174 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 7309 | 162 | WES | Westbury | ||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 7321 | 114 | WES.2 | Salisbury (GWR) | ||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 9313 | 101 | SHL | Southall | ||
03/1936 | Condemned | 4350 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | COND | ||
03/1936 | Condemned | 4383 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | COND | ||
03/1936 | Condemned | 4387 | BRD.1 | Weston-super-Mare | COND | ||
03/1936 | Condemned | 4397 | 126 | COND | |||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 4317 | OXY | Oxley | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 5311 | 44 | WES.2 | Salisbury (GWR) | ||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 8320 | 162 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 8358 | 32 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 5370 | 114 | TYS | Tyseley | ||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 8379 | 66 | OXY | Oxley | ||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 5397 | 134 | BAN | Banbury | ||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 5398 | 76 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 6316 | 44 | BAN | Banbury | ||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 6320 | BAN | Banbury | OXF | Oxford | |
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 6348 | 54 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 7305 | 22 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 7310 | 76 | BAN | Banbury | ||
04/1936 | Condemned | 4356 | 167 | COND | |||
07/1936 | Condemned | 4344 | 66 | COND | |||
07/1936 | Condemned | 4395 | 114 | COND | |||
08/1936 | Condemned | 4301 | 76 | COND | |||
08/1936 | Condemned | 4310 | WES | Westbury | COND | ||
08/1936 | Condemned | 4340 | 167 | COND | |||
08/1936 | Condemned | 4341 | 101 | COND | |||
08/1936 | Condemned | 4345 | 101 | COND | |||
08/1936 | Condemned | 4351 | 24 | COND | |||
08/1936 | Condemned | 4384 | 121 | COND | |||
08/1936 | Condemned | 4398 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | COND | ||
09/1936 | Condemned | 4329 | 174 | COND | |||
09/1936 | Condemned | 4372 | 76 | COND | |||
10/1936 | Condemned | 4323 | 54 | COND | |||
10/1936 | Condemned | 4334 | 76 | COND | |||
11/1936 | Condemned | 4335 | 126 | COND | |||
11/1936 | Condemned | 4346 | HFD | Hereford | COND | ||
11/1936 | Condemned | 4357 | 114 | COND | |||
11/1936 | Condemned | 4376 | 54 | COND | |||
12/1936 | Condemned | 4311 | 167 | COND | |||
12/1936 | Condemned | 4324 | 44 | COND | |||
01/1937 | Condemned | 4327 | 215 | COND | |||
01/1937 | Condemned | 4347 | 64 | COND | |||
01/1937 | Condemned | 4370 | 162 | COND | |||
01/1937 | Condemned | 4374 | 32 | COND | |||
01/1937 | Condemned | 4378 | 66 | COND | |||
02/1937 | Condemned | 4333 | 174 | COND | |||
02/1937 | Condemned | 4338 | 194 | COND | |||
02/1937 | Condemned | 4348 | 32 | COND | |||
02/1937 | Condemned | 4366 | 137 | COND | |||
02/1937 | Condemned | 4391 | TN | Taunton | COND | ||
04/1937 | Condemned | 4308 | CHR | Chester West | COND | ||
04/1937 | Condemned | 4315 | 172 | COND | |||
04/1937 | Condemned | 8342 | 133 | COND | |||
05/1937 | Condemned | 4359 | 215 | COND | |||
05/1937 | Condemned | 8304 | 133 | COND | |||
05/1937 | Condemned | 8354 | 132 | COND | |||
05/1937 | Condemned | 8383 | 53 | COND | |||
05/1937 | Condemned | 8389 | 76 | COND | |||
06/1937 | Condemned | 4306 | NEY | Neyland | COND | ||
06/1937 | Condemned | 4314 | 172 | COND | |||
06/1937 | Condemned | 4317 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | COND | ||
06/1937 | Condemned | 4396 | 114 | COND | |||
06/1937 | Condemned | 8352 | 83 | COND | |||
07/1937 | Condemned | 4300 | 26 | COND | |||
08/1937 | Condemned | 4305 | 215 | COND | |||
08/1937 | Condemned | 4330 | 54 | COND | |||
08/1937 | Condemned | 4352 | 167 | COND | |||
08/1937 | Condemned | 4362 | 134 | COND | |||
08/1937 | Condemned | 4373 | 194 | COND | |||
08/1937 | Condemned | 4393 | 194 | COND | |||
09/1937 | Condemned | 4316 | 114 | COND | |||
09/1937 | Condemned | 4321 | WES | Westbury | COND | ||
09/1937 | Condemned | 4322 | 87 | COND | |||
09/1937 | Condemned | 8363 | 194 | COND | |||
10/1937 | Condemned | 4343 | 174 | COND | |||
10/1937 | Condemned | 4389 | 114 | COND | |||
10/1937 | Condemned | 8301 | 132 | COND | |||
01/1938 | Condemned | 4382 | WES.2 | Salisbury (GWR) | COND | ||
02/1938 | Condemned | 4369 | 22 | COND | |||
02/1938 | Condemned | 4379 | 32 | COND | |||
03/1938 | Condemned | 4307 | 174 | COND | |||
03/1938 | Condemned | 4312 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | COND | ||
04/1938 | Condemned | 4325 | 126 | COND | |||
05/1938 | Condemned | 4319 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | COND | ||
05/1938 | Condemned | 4342 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | COND | ||
05/1938 | Condemned | 4360 | 66 | COND | |||
05/1938 | Condemned | 4399 | 167 | COND | |||
06/1938 | Condemned | 4302 | 126 | COND | |||
06/1938 | Condemned | 4349 | WES | Westbury | COND | ||
06/1938 | Condemned | 4355 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
07/1938 | Condemned | 4336 | 174 | COND | |||
07/1938 | Condemned | 4380 | 32 | COND | |||
08/1938 | Condemned | 4328 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | COND | ||
08/1938 | Condemned | 4394 | 137 | COND | |||
10/1938 | Condemned | 4304 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | COND | ||
11/1938 | Condemned | 4371 | 126 | COND | |||
12/1938 | Condemned | 4392 | 121 | COND | |||
01/1939 | Condemned | 4339 | 54 | COND | |||
01/1939 | Condemned | 4367 | 66 | COND | |||
01/1939 | Condemned | 4388 | 126 | COND | |||
01/1939 | Condemned | 8308 | 53 | COND | |||
02/1939 | Condemned | 4354 | 32 | COND | |||
02/1939 | Condemned | 4361 | 44 | COND | |||
02/1939 | Condemned | 4363 | 101 | COND | |||
02/1939 | Condemned | 4368 | 172 | COND | |||
02/1939 | Condemned | 4385 | 114 | COND | |||
02/1939 | Condemned | 4390 | 114 | COND | |||
03/1939 | Condemned | 8329 | WES.1 | Frome | COND | ||
03/1939 | Condemned | 8366 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | COND | ||
03/1939 | Condemned | 8387 | 114 | COND | |||
24/10/1945 | Condemned | 6315 | 98W | COND | |||
29/12/1945 | Reallocation | 5332 | 114 | WLN | Wellington | ||
26/01/1946 | Reallocation | 6318 | 121 | PZ | Penzance | ||
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 5309 | 133 | WLN | Wellington | ||
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 5334 | 24 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 5343 | 66 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 6306 | 32 | KDR | Kidderminster | ||
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 7305 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
20/04/1946 | Reallocation | 5303 | 85 | KDR | Kidderminster | ||
20/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6306 | KDR | Kidderminster | WOS | Worcester | |
20/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6365 | 37 | WES | Westbury | ||
20/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6384 | 172 | WES | Westbury | ||
20/04/1946 | Reallocation | 7312 | 101 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
20/04/1946 | Reallocation | 7316 | 37 | EXE | Exeter | ||
18/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6323 | OXY | Oxley | TN | Taunton | |
18/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6351 | 77 | WES | Westbury | ||
18/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6365 | WES | Westbury | WES | Westbury | |
18/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6384 | WES | Westbury | SDN | Swindon | |
07/09/1946 | Reallocation | 7317 | 134 | OXY | Oxley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4303 | 126 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4318 | 76 | DID | Didcot | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4320 | 31 | Abergavenny | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4326 | 172 | DID | Didcot | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4337 | 114 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4353 | 114 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4358 | 114 | NEY | Neyland | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4365 | 172 | WES | Westbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4375 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4377 | SDN.1 | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | WES | Westbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4381 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | SDN | Swindon | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4386 | CHR | Chester West | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5300 | 174 | OXY | Oxley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5302 | 114 | BAN | Banbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5303 | KDR | Kidderminster | KDR | Kidderminster | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5305 | 133 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5306 | 136 | WES | Westbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5307 | 194 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5309 | WLN | Wellington | WLN | Wellington | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5310 | 76 | NEY | Neyland | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5311 | WES.2 | Salisbury (GWR) | WES | Westbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5312 | 194 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5313 | 213 | OXY | Oxley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5314 | 22 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5315 | 114 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5316 | TYS | Tyseley | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5317 | SWSTCK | Swindon Stock shed | BAN | Banbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5318 | 133 | LA | Laira | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5319 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5320 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5321 | 174 | EXE | Exeter | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5322 | 66 | SDN | Swindon | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5323 | 194 | OXF | Oxford | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5324 | 44 | BAN | Banbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5325 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5326 | 136 | WES | Westbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5327 | 66 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5328 | 54 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5330 | 194 | DID | Didcot | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5331 | 114 | OXY | Oxley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5332 | WLN | Wellington | WLN | Wellington | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5333 | SWSTCK | Swindon Stock shed | OXY | Oxley | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5334 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5335 | 133 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5336 | 85 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5337 | 83 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5338 | 133 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5339 | 121 | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5340 | 53 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5341 | 114 | LDR | Landore | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5343 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5344 | 114 | CHR | Chester West | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5345 | 54 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5346 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | TYS | Tyseley | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5347 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5348 | BAN | Banbury | HFD | Hereford | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5349 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | BAN | Banbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5350 | 32 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5351 | 32 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5353 | 83 | NEY | Neyland | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5355 | 132 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5356 | 132 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5357 | 132 | NEY | Neyland | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5358 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5359 | 114 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5360 | 76 | SHL | Southall | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5361 | 133 | BAN | Banbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5362 | 213 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5364 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5365 | OXY | Oxley | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5367 | 162 | SDN | Swindon | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5368 | 53 | NEY | Neyland | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5369 | 114 | TYS | Tyseley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5370 | TYS | Tyseley | TYS | Tyseley | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5371 | 107 | SDN | Swindon | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5372 | 213 | NEY | Neyland | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5373 | 101 | BAN | Banbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5374 | NA | Newton Abbot | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5375 | 215 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5376 | 83 | LA | Laira | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5377 | 194 | HFD | Hereford | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5378 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5379 | OXY | Oxley | OXY | Oxley | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5380 | 101 | DID | Didcot | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5381 | LA | Laira | DID | Didcot | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5382 | 66 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5384 | 133 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5385 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5386 | 85 | OXY | Oxley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5388 | 153 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5390 | OXY | Oxley | OXY | Oxley | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5391 | 162 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5392 | 114 | NEY | Neyland | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 8393 | STAFF | Stafford Road Factory | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5394 | 85 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5395 | 77 | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5396 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | SDN | Swindon | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5397 | BAN | Banbury | DID | Didcot | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5398 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5399 | 114 | CHR | Chester West | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6300 | 24 | OXF | Oxford | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6301 | 87 | EXE | Exeter | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6302 | 87 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6303 | WES | Westbury | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6304 | 77 | LDR | Landore | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6305 | 22 | TN | Taunton | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6306 | WOS | Worcester | WOS | Worcester | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6307 | BAN | Banbury | SALOP | Shrewsbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6308 | CHR | Chester West | CHR | Chester West | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6309 | TN.1 | Barnstaple | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6310 | 167 | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6311 | 194 | CHR | Chester West | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6312 | 101 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6313 | 44 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6314 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | WES | Westbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6316 | BAN | Banbury | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6317 | 76 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6318 | PZ | Penzance | PZ | Penzance | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6319 | NEY | Neyland | LA | Laira | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6320 | OXF | Oxford | SDN | Swindon | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6321 | 54 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6322 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | SDN | Swindon | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6323 | TN | Taunton | TN | Taunton | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6324 | CHELHS | Cheltenham High Street | WOS | Worcester | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6325 | 95 | SHL | Southall | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6326 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6327 | 44 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6328 | 37 | TN | Taunton | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6329 | 54 | DID | Didcot | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6330 | SDN.1 | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | SBZ | St Blazey | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6331 | 101 | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6332 | 101 | OXY | Oxley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6333 | 32 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6334 | 24 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6335 | 87 | OXY | Oxley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6336 | 167 | TYS | Tyseley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6337 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | CHR | Chester West | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6338 | 54 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6339 | 24 | CHR | Chester West | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6340 | 111 | SDN | Swindon | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6341 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6342 | 134 | OXY | Oxley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6343 | TN.1 | Barnstaple | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6344 | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | CARM | Carmarthen | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6345 | 167 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6346 | 114 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6347 | 132 | NEY | Neyland | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6348 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | SALOP | Shrewsbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6349 | 136 | HFD | Hereford | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6350 | 54 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6351 | WES | Westbury | WES | Westbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6352 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | HFD | Hereford | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6353 | 215 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6354 | SWSTCK | Swindon Stock shed | PZ | Penzance | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6355 | 22 | NEY | Neyland | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6356 | 66 | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6357 | 121 | SDN | Swindon | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6358 | 215 | SDN | Swindon | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6359 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | DID | Didcot | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6360 | SDN.1 | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | SDN | Swindon | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6361 | SWFPOOL | Swindon 'F' Pool | OXY | Oxley | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6362 | 114 | OXY | Oxley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6363 | 132 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6364 | 44 | TN | Taunton | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6365 | WES | Westbury | WES | Westbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6366 | 114 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6367 | CARM | Carmarthen | CARM | Carmarthen | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6368 | WES.2 | Salisbury (GWR) | WES | Westbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6369 | 44 | WES | Westbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6370 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6371 | NEY | Neyland | NEY | Neyland | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6372 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | TN | Taunton | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6373 | 121 | TR | Truro | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6374 | 114 | SDN | Swindon | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6375 | 32 | WES | Westbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6376 | 44 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6377 | 174 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6378 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | WOS | Worcester | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6379 | 85 | DID | Didcot | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6380 | 101 | CHR | Chester West | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6381 | 76 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6382 | 172 | WOS | Worcester | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6383 | TN | Taunton | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6384 | SDN | Swindon | SDN | Swindon | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6385 | 121 | WOS | Worcester | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6386 | 126 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6387 | 126 | SDN | Swindon | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6388 | 111 | SHL | Southall | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6389 | 167 | NEY | Neyland | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6390 | 32 | BAN | Banbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6391 | 101 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6392 | 101 | CHR | Chester West | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6393 | 66 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6394 | 54 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6395 | 32 | HFD | Hereford | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6396 | 174 | WOS | Worcester | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6397 | LLY | Llanelli | EXE | Exeter | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6398 | 37 | TN | Taunton | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6399 | 134 | WES | Westbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7300 | 132 | WES | Westbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7301 | 174 | WOS | Worcester | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7302 | 172 | WES | Westbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7303 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7304 | 136 | TN | Taunton | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7305 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7306 | 32 | NEY | Neyland | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7307 | BRD.1 | Weston-super-Mare | OXY | Oxley | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7308 | SWWKS | Swindon Works | WOS | Worcester | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7309 | WES | Westbury | WES | Westbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7310 | BAN | Banbury | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7311 | 54 | OXY | Oxley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7312 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7313 | 114 | CHR | Chester West | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7314 | 22 | TN | Taunton | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7315 | 194 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7316 | EXE | Exeter | EXE | Exeter | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7317 | OXY | Oxley | OXY | Oxley | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7318 | 121 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7319 | 77 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7320 | 174 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 7321 | WES.2 | Salisbury (GWR) | SDN | Swindon | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9300 | 121 | SHL | Southall | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9301 | SWFPOOL | Swindon 'F' Pool | SHL | Southall | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9302 | 121 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9303 | 101 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9304 | 41 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9305 | RDG.1 | Basingstoke (GWR) | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9306 | 101 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9307 | 101 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9308 | 101 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9309 | 101 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9310 | 101 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9311 | 101 | SHL | Southall | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9312 | 101 | OXY | Oxley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9313 | SHL | Southall | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9314 | 101 | OXY | Oxley | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9315 | RDG.1 | Basingstoke (GWR) | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9316 | 131 | OXF | Oxford | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9317 | 121 | OXF | Oxford | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9318 | 111 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9319 | 121 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | ||
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 5327 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 5391 | NA | Newton Abbot | LA | Laira | |
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 6326 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | HFD | Hereford | |
31/03/1948 | Reallocation | 4326 | DID | Didcot | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | |
31/03/1948 | Reallocation | 5391 | LA | Laira | NA | Newton Abbot | |
31/03/1948 | Reallocation | 6306 | WOS | Worcester | KDR | Kidderminster | |
31/03/1948 | Reallocation | 6379 | DID | Didcot | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | |
10/04/1948 | Condemned | 4365 | 98W | COND | |||
24/04/1948 | Condemned | 4386 | 98W | COND | |||
30/04/1948 | Reallocation | 5332 | WLN | Wellington | OXY | Oxley | |
10/05/1948 | Condemned | 5349 | 98W | COND | |||
26/05/1948 | Condemned | 5302 | 98W | COND | |||
31/05/1948 | Reallocation | 5309 | WLN | Wellington | OXY | Oxley | |
31/05/1948 | Reallocation | 5397 | DID | Didcot | PDN | Old Oak Common | |
14/06/1948 | Condemned | 5374 | 98W | COND | |||
30/06/1948 | Reallocation | 5327 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
30/06/1948 | Reallocation | 6306 | KDR | Kidderminster | WOS | Worcester | |
03/07/1948 | Condemned | 5343 | 98W | COND | |||
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 5300 | OXY | Oxley | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 6332 | OXY | Oxley | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 6392 | CHR | Chester West | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 6392 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | CHR | Chester West | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 7317 | OXY | Oxley | TYS | Tyseley | |
27/09/1948 | Condemned | 5320 | 98W | COND | |||
27/09/1948 | Condemned | 5340 | 98W | COND | |||
14/10/1948 | Reallocation | 5386 | OXY | Oxley | SRD | Stafford Road | |
14/10/1948 | Reallocation | 5397 | PDN | Old Oak Common | DID | Didcot | |
30/10/1948 | Reallocation | 6382 | WOS | Worcester | KDR | Kidderminster | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 6324 | WOS | Worcester | KDR | Kidderminster | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 7308 | WOS | Worcester | HFD | Hereford | |
29/11/1948 | Condemned | 4353 | 98W | COND | |||
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 5385 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | WES | Westbury | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 6324 | KDR | Kidderminster | WOS | Worcester | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 6382 | KDR | Kidderminster | WOS | Worcester | |
03/01/1949 | Condemned | 4320 | 98W | COND | |||
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 9310 | PDN | Old Oak Common | SHL | Southall | |
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 5303 | KDR | Kidderminster | WOS | Worcester | |
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 5341 | LDR | Landore | CARM | Carmarthen | |
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 6304 | LDR | Landore | CARM | Carmarthen | |
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 6382 | WOS | Worcester | KDR | Kidderminster | |
26/03/1949 | Reallocation | 4337 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | SRD | Stafford Road | |
26/03/1949 | Reallocation | 5306 | WES | Westbury | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
26/03/1949 | Reallocation | 5326 | WES | Westbury | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
18/06/1949 | Reallocation | 7317 | TYS | Tyseley | TYS | Tyseley | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 7317 | TYS | Tyseley | TYS | Tyseley | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 9304 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | PDN | Old Oak Common | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 9305 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | PDN | Old Oak Common | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 4326 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | DID | Didcot | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 5307 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | TN | Taunton | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 5356 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | SHL | Southall | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 6313 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | OXF | Oxford | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 6333 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | TN | Taunton | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 9309 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | PDN | Old Oak Common | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 9315 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | PDN | Old Oak Common | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 5335 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | LLY | Llanelli | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 6333 | TN | Taunton | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 5372 | NEY | Neyland | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 5378 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | LLY | Llanelli | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 6351 | WES | Westbury | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 5307 | TN | Taunton | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 5311 | WES | Westbury | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 6311 | CHR | Chester West | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 7313 | CHR | Chester West | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 5372 | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | NEY | Neyland | |
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 5327 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
25/02/1950 | Reallocation | 7307 | OXY | Oxley | 85C | Hereford | |
25/03/1950 | Reallocation | 6340 | SDN | Swindon | 81E | Didcot | |
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 5327 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 7314 | TN | Taunton | 85C | Hereford | |
12/06/1950 | Condemned | 5373 | 98W | COND | |||
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 5332 | OXY | Oxley | 84C | Banbury | |
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 5333 | OXY | Oxley | 84E | Tyseley | |
12/08/1950 | Reallocation | 6385 | WOS | Worcester | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
31/08/1950 | Reallocation | 6385 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 5391 | NA | Newton Abbot | 84C | Banbury | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 6354 | PZ | Penzance | 84C | Banbury | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 5391 | 84C | Banbury | 84C | Banbury | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 6354 | 84C | Banbury | 84C | Banbury | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5307 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 84B | Oxley | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5307 | 84B | Oxley | 84B | Oxley | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5300 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 84B | Oxley | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5341 | CARM | Carmarthen | 84B | Oxley | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 9305 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5300 | 84B | Oxley | 84B | Oxley | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5341 | 84B | Oxley | 84B | Oxley | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 9305 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
02/12/1950 | Reallocation | 4337 | SRD | Stafford Road | 84E | Tyseley | |
02/12/1950 | Reallocation | 6354 | 84C | Banbury | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
02/12/1950 | Reallocation | 6391 | SRD | Stafford Road | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
02/12/1950 | Reallocation | 7309 | WES | Westbury | 81C | Southall | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 4337 | 84E | Tyseley | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 5328 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 6354 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 6391 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 7309 | 81C | Southall | 81C | Southall | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 4375 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 5328 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 6327 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 6363 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 84B | Oxley | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 7309 | 81C | Southall | 82D | Westbury | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 4375 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 5315 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 84B | Oxley | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 6327 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 6363 | 84B | Oxley | 84B | Oxley | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 7309 | 82D | Westbury | 82D | Westbury | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 9309 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 81C | Southall | |
05/03/1951 | Condemned | 5365 | 98W | COND | |||
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 5315 | 84B | Oxley | 84B | Oxley | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 9309 | 81C | Southall | 81C | Southall | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 5313 | OXY | Oxley | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 5350 | NA | Newton Abbot | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 6345 | NA | Newton Abbot | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 9315 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
07/05/1951 | Condemned | 5346 | 98W | COND | |||
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 4386 | 98W | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 5315 | 84B | Oxley | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 5350 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 5395 | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | 89C | Machynlleth | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 6334 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 85A | Worcester | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 6345 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 6355 | NEY | Neyland | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 9315 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
28/05/1951 | Condemned | 5303 | 98W | COND | |||
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 6338 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 84B | Oxley | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 6338 | 84B | Oxley | 84B | Oxley | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 5369 | TYS | Tyseley | 84C | Banbury | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 6332 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 84C | Banbury | |
16/07/1951 | Condemned | 5364 | 98W | COND | |||
31/07/1951 | Reallocation | 5369 | 84C | Banbury | 84C | Banbury | |
31/07/1951 | Reallocation | 6332 | 84C | Banbury | 84C | Banbury | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 5318 | LA | Laira | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 5356 | SHL | Southall | 87E | Landore | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 6325 | SHL | Southall | 87E | Landore | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 6333 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 7318 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 87F | Llanelli | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 7320 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 87F | Llanelli | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 9302 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 81C | Southall | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 9304 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 81C | Southall | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 9306 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 9308 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 5318 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 5356 | 87E | Landore | 87E | Landore | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 6325 | 87E | Landore | 87E | Landore | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 6333 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 7318 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 7320 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 9302 | 81C | Southall | 81C | Southall | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 9304 | 81C | Southall | 81C | Southall | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 9306 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 9308 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 5371 | SDN | Swindon | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 6371 | NEY | Neyland | 89C | Machynlleth | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 6386 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
30/09/1951 | Reallocation | 5371 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
30/09/1951 | Reallocation | 6371 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89C | Machynlleth | |
30/09/1951 | Reallocation | 6386 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
22/10/1951 | Condemned | 5359 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 4303 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 5325 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 82C | Swindon | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 5327 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82C | Swindon | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 5369 | 84C | Banbury | 84E | Tyseley | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 6322 | SDN | Swindon | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 6374 | SDN | Swindon | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
05/11/1951 | Condemned | 4337 | 98W | COND | |||
01/12/1951 | Reallocation | 5360 | SHL | Southall | 87G | Carmarthen | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 5379 | OXY | Oxley | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 6301 | EXE | Exeter | 83C | Exeter | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 6362 | OXY | Oxley | 84K | Chester West | |
31/12/1951 | Reallocation | 5360 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87G | Carmarthen | |
04/01/1952 | Condemned | 5348 | 98W | COND | |||
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 5313 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
31/01/1952 | Reallocation | 5379 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
31/01/1952 | Reallocation | 6301 | 83C | Exeter | 83C | Exeter | |
31/01/1952 | Reallocation | 6362 | 84K | Chester West | 84K | Chester West | |
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 7301 | WOS | Worcester | 85C | Hereford | |
29/02/1952 | Reallocation | 5313 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 5376 | LA | Laira | 83F | Truro | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 6330 | SBZ | St Blazey | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 6356 | SBZ | St Blazey | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
31/03/1952 | Reallocation | 7301 | 85C | Hereford | 85C | Hereford | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 4318 | DID | Didcot | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 5325 | 82C | Swindon | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 5390 | OXY | Oxley | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 6300 | OXF | Oxford | 81C | Southall | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 6332 | 84C | Banbury | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 6338 | 84B | Oxley | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 6375 | WES | Westbury | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
30/04/1952 | Reallocation | 5376 | 83F | Truro | 83F | Truro | |
30/04/1952 | Reallocation | 6330 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
30/04/1952 | Reallocation | 6356 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 4318 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 5309 | OXY | Oxley | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 5325 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 5390 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 6300 | 81C | Southall | 81C | Southall | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 6332 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 6338 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 6341 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 6370 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 6373 | TR | Truro | 83D | Laira | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 6375 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 9312 | OXY | Oxley | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
04/06/1952 | Condemned | 4318 | 98W | COND | |||
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5300 | 84B | Oxley | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5307 | 84B | Oxley | 84C | Banbury | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5309 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84B | Oxley | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5318 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5372 | NEY | Neyland | 87H | Neyland | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 9312 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84B | Oxley | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5300 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5307 | 84C | Banbury | 84C | Banbury | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5309 | 84B | Oxley | 84B | Oxley | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5318 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5372 | 87H | Neyland | 87H | Neyland | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 9312 | 84B | Oxley | 84B | Oxley | |
01/07/1952 | Condemned | 5305 | 98W | COND | |||
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 4381 | SDN | Swindon | 81C | Southall | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 5318 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 5356 | 87E | Landore | 83D | Laira | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 5390 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 84B | Oxley | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 6325 | 87E | Landore | 87F | Llanelli | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 6330 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 6370 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 6373 | 83D | Laira | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 6383 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 84B | Oxley | |
31/08/1952 | Reallocation | 4381 | 81C | Southall | 81C | Southall | |
31/08/1952 | Reallocation | 5318 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
31/08/1952 | Reallocation | 5356 | 83D | Laira | 83D | Laira | |
31/08/1952 | Reallocation | 5390 | 84B | Oxley | 84B | Oxley | |
31/08/1952 | Reallocation | 6325 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
31/08/1952 | Reallocation | 6330 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
31/08/1952 | Reallocation | 6370 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
31/08/1952 | Reallocation | 6373 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
31/08/1952 | Reallocation | 6383 | 84B | Oxley | 84B | Oxley | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 5362 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 7318 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 5300 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84B | Oxley | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 5391 | 84C | Banbury | 84E | Tyseley | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5306 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5307 | 84C | Banbury | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5324 | BAN | Banbury | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5339 | CARM | Carmarthen | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5360 | 87G | Carmarthen | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5368 | NEY | Neyland | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5376 | 83F | Truro | 83D | Laira | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5386 | SRD | Stafford Road | 84E | Tyseley | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6305 | TN | Taunton | 83E | St Blazey | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6307 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 82C | Swindon | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6314 | WES | Westbury | 82C | Swindon | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6321 | SRD | Stafford Road | 84E | Tyseley | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6348 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 82C | Swindon | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6355 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6383 | 84B | Oxley | 89A | Oswestry | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6386 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6390 | BAN | Banbury | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6397 | EXE | Exeter | 83E | St Blazey | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 7311 | OXY | Oxley | 83B | Taunton | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 7315 | SRD | Stafford Road | 84C | Banbury | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 7319 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 82C | Swindon | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 9300 | SHL | Southall | 81E | Didcot | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 9301 | SHL | Southall | 81E | Didcot | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 9302 | 81C | Southall | 81E | Didcot | |
07/11/1952 | Condemned | 4303 | 98W | COND | |||
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5355 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5391 | 84E | Tyseley | 84B | Oxley | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5399 | CHR | Chester West | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6349 | HFD | Hereford | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6368 | WES | Westbury | 82C | Swindon | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 5367 | SDN | Swindon | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 5399 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84C | Banbury | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 6308 | CHR | Chester West | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 6362 | 84K | Chester West | 85C | Hereford | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 6383 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
15/01/1953 | Condemned | 5300 | 98W | COND | |||
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 6307 | 82C | Swindon | 82C | Swindon | |
27/01/1953 | Condemned | 5309 | 98W | COND | |||
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 5375 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 84B | Oxley | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 6300 | 81C | Southall | 83E | St Blazey | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 6322 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 6331 | CARM | Carmarthen | 84K | Chester West | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 6344 | CARM | Carmarthen | 84K | Chester West | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 6374 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 6388 | SHL | Southall | 83E | St Blazey | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 6396 | WOS | Worcester | 84B | Oxley | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 7319 | 82C | Swindon | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 9300 | 81E | Didcot | 81C | Southall | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 9301 | 81E | Didcot | 81C | Southall | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 5322 | SDN | Swindon | 81F | Oxford | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 5378 | LLY | Llanelli | 84B | Oxley | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 5381 | DID | Didcot | 84B | Oxley | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 6307 | 82C | Swindon | 84E | Tyseley | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 6324 | WOS | Worcester | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 6367 | CARM | Carmarthen | 84K | Chester West | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 6393 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 84K | Chester West | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 7309 | 82D | Westbury | 84E | Tyseley | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 4326 | DID | Didcot | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 5311 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 84K | Chester West | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 5334 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 84K | Chester West | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 6302 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 84B | Oxley | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 6308 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85C | Hereford | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 6324 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 85A | Worcester | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 6338 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 84B | Oxley | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 6354 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 85A | Worcester | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 6361 | OXY | Oxley | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 7301 | 85C | Hereford | 85A | Worcester | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 5322 | 81F | Oxford | 84E | Tyseley | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 5334 | 84K | Chester West | 85A | Worcester | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 5358 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 82D | Westbury | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 5368 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 82D | Westbury | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 6302 | 84B | Oxley | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 6313 | OXF | Oxford | 81E | Didcot | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 6338 | 84B | Oxley | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 6339 | CHR | Chester West | 82D | Westbury | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 6358 | SDN | Swindon | 82D | Westbury | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 6363 | 84B | Oxley | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 6393 | 84K | Chester West | 85A | Worcester | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 6396 | 84B | Oxley | 85A | Worcester | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 7301 | 85A | Worcester | 85D | Kidderminster | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 7303 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 7309 | 84E | Tyseley | 84A | Stafford Road | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 9307 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 84B | Oxley | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 9311 | SHL | Southall | 81F | Oxford | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 9317 | OXF | Oxford | 84B | Oxley | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 9318 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 84B | Oxley | |
28/05/1953 | Condemned | 4381 | 98W | COND | |||
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 5330 | DID | Didcot | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 5336 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 84B | Oxley | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 5356 | 83D | Laira | 82D | Westbury | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 6318 | PZ | Penzance | 83C | Exeter | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 6342 | OXY | Oxley | 84E | Tyseley | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 6389 | NEY | Neyland | 83D | Laira | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 9302 | 81E | Didcot | 81F | Oxford | |
08/08/1953 | Reallocation | 5356 | 82D | Westbury | 83D | Laira | |
08/08/1953 | Reallocation | 6375 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82D | Westbury | |
05/09/1953 | Reallocation | 5326 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 84K | Chester West | |
05/09/1953 | Reallocation | 6345 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 84K | Chester West | |
05/09/1953 | Reallocation | 6389 | 83D | Laira | 82C | Swindon | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5321 | EXE | Exeter | 83B | Taunton | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5328 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5368 | 82D | Westbury | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6339 | 82D | Westbury | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6382 | KDR | Kidderminster | 85A | Worcester | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6389 | 82C | Swindon | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6390 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 83B | Taunton | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5310 | NEY | Neyland | 87G | Carmarthen | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5353 | NEY | Neyland | 87G | Carmarthen | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6375 | 82D | Westbury | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6388 | 83E | St Blazey | 85A | Worcester | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6389 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 85A | Worcester | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 5324 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 87H | Neyland | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 5328 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 5338 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82D | Westbury | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 6339 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 6359 | DID | Didcot | 85A | Worcester | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 6369 | WES | Westbury | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 6386 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 6394 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 84E | Tyseley | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 9303 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 84E | Tyseley | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 9319 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 84E | Tyseley | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 5334 | 85A | Worcester | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 6317 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 6338 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 85C | Hereford | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 6393 | 85A | Worcester | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 5312 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 5327 | 82C | Swindon | 82D | Westbury | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 6304 | CARM | Carmarthen | 81E | Didcot | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 6327 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84E | Tyseley | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 6355 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 84B | Oxley | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 7301 | 85D | Kidderminster | 85C | Hereford | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 5307 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 6309 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 83E | St Blazey | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 6324 | 85A | Worcester | 84B | Oxley | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 6365 | WES | Westbury | 83C | Exeter | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 5334 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 5351 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 6317 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 6322 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 6351 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 7309 | 84A | Stafford Road | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 5312 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 85A | Worcester | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 5326 | 84K | Chester West | 85A | Worcester | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 6357 | SDN | Swindon | 85A | Worcester | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 6379 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 81F | Oxford | |
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 5307 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 5312 | 85A | Worcester | 84B | Oxley | |
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 5326 | 85A | Worcester | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 5315 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84K | Chester West | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 5391 | 84B | Oxley | 84A | Stafford Road | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 6322 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 6329 | DID | Didcot | 87G | Carmarthen | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 6338 | 85C | Hereford | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 6362 | 85C | Hereford | 84B | Oxley | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 6367 | 84K | Chester West | 84B | Oxley | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 6368 | 82C | Swindon | 87E | Landore | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 6385 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 83C | Exeter | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 9304 | 81C | Southall | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 9305 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 87H | Neyland | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 9310 | SHL | Southall | 87G | Carmarthen | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 9313 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 87H | Neyland | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 9315 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 87H | Neyland | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 9316 | OXF | Oxford | 84B | Oxley | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 5323 | OXF | Oxford | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 6306 | WOS | Worcester | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 6352 | HFD | Hereford | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 6365 | 83C | Exeter | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 6367 | 84B | Oxley | 84K | Chester West | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 9300 | 81C | Southall | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
14/08/1954 | Reallocation | 9312 | 84B | Oxley | 84A | Stafford Road | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 5325 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 83B | Taunton | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 5355 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 5382 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 5392 | NEY | Neyland | 87F | Llanelli | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 6314 | 82C | Swindon | 85A | Worcester | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 6322 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 83B | Taunton | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 6338 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 6339 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 6348 | 82C | Swindon | 85A | Worcester | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 6362 | 84B | Oxley | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 6370 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 7318 | 87F | Llanelli | 87H | Neyland | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 9305 | 87H | Neyland | 81C | Southall | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 9313 | 87H | Neyland | 81C | Southall | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 9315 | 87H | Neyland | 81C | Southall | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 9318 | 84B | Oxley | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 5306 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 5318 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 5322 | 84E | Tyseley | 81F | Oxford | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 5331 | OXY | Oxley | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 6309 | 83E | St Blazey | 82C | Swindon | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 6314 | 85A | Worcester | 85C | Hereford | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 6318 | 83C | Exeter | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 6336 | TYS | Tyseley | 81F | Oxford | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 6368 | 87E | Landore | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
01/01/1955 | Reallocation | 5351 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82C | Swindon | |
01/01/1955 | Reallocation | 6322 | 83B | Taunton | 83C | Exeter | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 5345 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 5362 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83C | Exeter | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 5379 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 85A | Worcester | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 5394 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 85D | Kidderminster | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 6312 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 6327 | 84E | Tyseley | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 9316 | 84B | Oxley | 85A | Worcester | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 9318 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 85A | Worcester | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 5319 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 5355 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85C | Hereford | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 6379 | 81F | Oxford | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 6394 | 84E | Tyseley | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 7305 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 84B | Oxley | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 6362 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84C | Banbury | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 6391 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 5306 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 5313 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84B | Oxley | |
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 5360 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 6356 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 6365 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 84B | Oxley | |
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 6368 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 6381 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 9309 | 81C | Southall | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 6365 | 84B | Oxley | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 4358 | NEY | Neyland | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 4377 | WES | Westbury | 84K | Chester West | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5319 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84K | Chester West | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5325 | 83B | Taunton | 84B | Oxley | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5330 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81E | Didcot | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 6326 | HFD | Hereford | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 6334 | 85A | Worcester | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 6393 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 5306 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82C | Swindon | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 5350 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82C | Swindon | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 6334 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85A | Worcester | |
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 5362 | 83C | Exeter | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 5337 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 5388 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 5399 | 84C | Banbury | 84K | Chester West | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 6301 | 83C | Exeter | 83B | Taunton | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 6308 | 85C | Hereford | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 6334 | 85A | Worcester | 85D | Kidderminster | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 6382 | 85A | Worcester | 85D | Kidderminster | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 9301 | 81C | Southall | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 9304 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 85C | Hereford | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 9313 | 81C | Southall | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 9315 | 81C | Southall | 82C | Swindon | |
10/10/1955 | Condemned | 5395 | 98W | COND | |||
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 4377 | 84K | Chester West | 89C | Machynlleth | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 5306 | 82C | Swindon | 84C | Banbury | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 5319 | 84K | Chester West | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 5391 | 84A | Stafford Road | 84B | Oxley | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 6359 | 85A | Worcester | 85C | Hereford | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 6387 | SDN | Swindon | 84C | Banbury | |
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 6331 | 84K | Chester West | 84C | Banbury | |
28/01/1956 | Reallocation | 5391 | 84B | Oxley | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
28/01/1956 | Reallocation | 9312 | 84A | Stafford Road | 84B | Oxley | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 5347 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 5379 | 85A | Worcester | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 6325 | 87F | Llanelli | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 6363 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 6378 | WOS | Worcester | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 9318 | 85A | Worcester | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
19/03/1956 | Condemned | 6321 | 98W | COND | |||
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 6326 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85D | Kidderminster | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 6361 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 5317 | BAN | Banbury | 84E | Tyseley | |
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 7307 | 85C | Hereford | 87F | Llanelli | |
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 7314 | 85C | Hereford | 87F | Llanelli | |
07/05/1956 | Condemned | 6383 | 98W | COND | |||
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 5344 | CHR | Chester West | 83C | Exeter | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 5350 | 82C | Swindon | 83D | Laira | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 5379 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84B | Oxley | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6301 | 83B | Taunton | 83D | Laira | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6328 | TN | Taunton | 83D | Laira | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6334 | 85D | Kidderminster | 85A | Worcester | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6335 | OXY | Oxley | 89A | Oswestry | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6337 | CHR | Chester West | 83C | Exeter | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6341 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85C | Hereford | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6361 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86J | Aberdare | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6363 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6375 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 83B | Taunton | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6378 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 89C | Machynlleth | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6384 | SDN | Swindon | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6389 | 85A | Worcester | 87F | Llanelli | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6396 | 85A | Worcester | 87F | Llanelli | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 7321 | SDN | Swindon | 83D | Laira | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 9318 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 87H | Neyland | |
21/06/1956 | Condemned | 5316 | 98W | COND | |||
02/07/1956 | Condemned | 5327 | 98W | COND | |||
14/07/1956 | Reallocation | 5325 | 84B | Oxley | 84E | Tyseley | |
14/07/1956 | Reallocation | 6335 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
14/07/1956 | Reallocation | 9319 | 84E | Tyseley | 84B | Oxley | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 6338 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 82D | Westbury | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 9306 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 9308 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 84E | Tyseley | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 5322 | 81F | Oxford | 81E | Didcot | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 5350 | 83D | Laira | 85A | Worcester | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 5379 | 84B | Oxley | 84C | Banbury | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 6341 | 85C | Hereford | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 6355 | 84B | Oxley | 84C | Banbury | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 7321 | 83D | Laira | 85A | Worcester | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 5337 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 85A | Worcester | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 5344 | 83C | Exeter | 83B | Taunton | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 5362 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 5396 | SDN | Swindon | 85A | Worcester | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 6300 | 83E | St Blazey | 83F | Truro | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 6337 | 83C | Exeter | 83B | Taunton | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 6395 | HFD | Hereford | 85A | Worcester | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 9303 | 84E | Tyseley | 84C | Banbury | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 9312 | 84B | Oxley | 84C | Banbury | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 5362 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 6313 | 81E | Didcot | 81C | Southall | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 6355 | 84C | Banbury | 82C | Swindon | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 6360 | SDN | Swindon | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 9308 | 84E | Tyseley | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
05/11/1956 | Condemned | 5317 | 98W | COND | |||
26/11/1956 | Condemned | 5307 | 98W | COND | |||
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 6320 | SDN | Swindon | 82D | Westbury | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 9311 | 81F | Oxford | 83F | Truro | |
29/12/1956 | Reallocation | 5336 | 84B | Oxley | 83D | Laira | |
29/12/1956 | Reallocation | 5378 | 84B | Oxley | 83E | St Blazey | |
29/12/1956 | Reallocation | 9311 | 83F | Truro | 83F | Truro | |
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 5391 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 84E | Tyseley | |
23/02/1957 | Reallocation | 6391 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
18/03/1957 | Condemned | 5391 | 98W | COND | |||
27/03/1957 | Condemned | 4326 | 98W | COND | |||
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 5392 | 87F | Llanelli | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 6314 | 85C | Hereford | 85D | Kidderminster | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 6326 | 85D | Kidderminster | 85C | Hereford | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 6340 | 81E | Didcot | 85A | Worcester | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 6362 | 84C | Banbury | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 6391 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 6340 | 85A | Worcester | 85D | Kidderminster | |
15/06/1957 | Reallocation | 6340 | 85D | Kidderminster | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 5318 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 5355 | 85C | Hereford | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 5382 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 6309 | 82C | Swindon | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 6318 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 6338 | 82D | Westbury | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 6348 | 85A | Worcester | 87H | Neyland | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 6357 | 85A | Worcester | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 6360 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 6392 | CHR | Chester West | 84C | Banbury | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 6394 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 83C | Exeter | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 6395 | 85A | Worcester | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 7301 | 85C | Hereford | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 7308 | HFD | Hereford | 84C | Banbury | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 7312 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
22/07/1957 | Condemned | 5314 | 98W | COND | |||
26/08/1957 | Condemned | 5325 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1957 | Reallocation | 5378 | 83E | St Blazey | 84E | Tyseley | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 5341 | 84B | Oxley | 84E | Tyseley | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 5355 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 85D | Kidderminster | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 5372 | 87H | Neyland | 87F | Llanelli | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 6338 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 6348 | 87H | Neyland | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 6379 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81E | Didcot | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 6394 | 83C | Exeter | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 7303 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 7312 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 85C | Hereford | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 9310 | 87G | Carmarthen | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5326 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81E | Didcot | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5336 | 83D | Laira | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5376 | 83D | Laira | 83F | Truro | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5381 | 84B | Oxley | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5382 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5396 | 85A | Worcester | 87H | Neyland | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 6325 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 6338 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 6347 | NEY | Neyland | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 6349 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 6362 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 6392 | 84C | Banbury | 89C | Machynlleth | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 7322 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 9306 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 7333 | 83F | Truro | 83D | Laira | |
18/11/1957 | Condemned | 5334 | 98W | COND | |||
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5356 | 83D | Laira | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 6327 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 6334 | 85A | Worcester | 82C | Swindon | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 6354 | 85A | Worcester | 82C | Swindon | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 6389 | 87F | Llanelli | 87H | Neyland | |
06/01/1958 | Condemned | 4375 | 98W | COND | |||
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5311 | 84K | Chester West | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5315 | 84K | Chester West | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5328 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 82C | Swindon | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5336 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 83D | Laira | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5386 | 84E | Tyseley | 81E | Didcot | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5390 | 84B | Oxley | 81E | Didcot | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 6309 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82C | Swindon | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 6324 | 84B | Oxley | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 6336 | 81F | Oxford | 82C | Swindon | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 6341 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 6342 | 84E | Tyseley | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 6344 | 84K | Chester West | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 6353 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 6357 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 6367 | 84K | Chester West | 85A | Worcester | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 7303 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 5330 | 81E | Didcot | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 5339 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83C | Exeter | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 5350 | 85A | Worcester | 85C | Hereford | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 5386 | 81E | Didcot | 89A | Oswestry | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 5396 | 87H | Neyland | 85A | Worcester | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 6322 | 83C | Exeter | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 6328 | 83D | Laira | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 6357 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 6366 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | 82C | Swindon | |
03/03/1958 | Condemned | 6396 | 98W | COND | |||
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 6323 | TN | Taunton | 87F | Llanelli | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 6328 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 87F | Llanelli | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 6355 | 82C | Swindon | 87F | Llanelli | |
19/04/1958 | Reallocation | 6317 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
21/04/1958 | Condemned | 5347 | 98W | COND | |||
13/05/1958 | Condemned | 5313 | 98W | COND | |||
13/05/1958 | Condemned | 5379 | 98W | COND | |||
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 5311 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 5315 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 5323 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 87F | Llanelli | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 5337 | 85A | Worcester | 85C | Hereford | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 6304 | 81E | Didcot | 81F | Oxford | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 6327 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 6357 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84E | Tyseley | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 7305 | 84B | Oxley | 84C | Banbury | |
09/06/1958 | Condemned | 5323 | 98W | COND | |||
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5367 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 6323 | 87F | Llanelli | 83B | Taunton | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 7311 | 83B | Taunton | 83C | Exeter | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 7326 | 85C | Hereford | 83C | Exeter | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5337 | 85C | Hereford | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5360 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5377 | HFD | Hereford | 87G | Carmarthen | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5392 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 85A | Worcester | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 6313 | 81C | Southall | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 6326 | 85C | Hereford | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 6348 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 6388 | 85A | Worcester | 87H | Neyland | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 7312 | 85C | Hereford | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 7321 | 85A | Worcester | 87H | Neyland | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 9313 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 83D | Laira | |
04/07/1958 | Condemned | 5371 | 98W | COND | |||
04/07/1958 | Condemned | 5372 | 98W | COND | |||
12/07/1958 | Reallocation | 6376 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 6E | Chester West | |
22/07/1958 | Condemned | 5362 | 98W | COND | |||
24/07/1958 | Condemned | 5397 | 98W | COND | |||
29/07/1958 | Condemned | 5328 | 98W | COND | |||
31/07/1958 | Condemned | 5310 | 98W | COND | |||
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 5319 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 5321 | 83B | Taunton | 87F | Llanelli | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 5345 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 84E | Tyseley | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 5357 | NEY | Neyland | 87F | Llanelli | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 6305 | 83E | St Blazey | 84E | Tyseley | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 6337 | 83B | Taunton | 84E | Tyseley | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 6355 | 87F | Llanelli | 87H | Neyland | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 6360 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 84E | Tyseley | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 6367 | 85A | Worcester | 84E | Tyseley | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 6377 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 84E | Tyseley | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 6391 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 84E | Tyseley | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 7321 | 87H | Neyland | 87F | Llanelli | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 7326 | 83C | Exeter | 85C | Hereford | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 9305 | 81C | Southall | 84E | Tyseley | |
11/08/1958 | Condemned | 5338 | 98W | COND | |||
13/08/1958 | Condemned | 5390 | 98W | COND | |||
27/08/1958 | Condemned | 5392 | 98W | COND | |||
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 5315 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 5345 | 84E | Tyseley | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 5357 | 87F | Llanelli | 87H | Neyland | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 5375 | 84B | Oxley | 85A | Worcester | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 6305 | 84E | Tyseley | 87G | Carmarthen | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 6306 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 87H | Neyland | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 6338 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 6360 | 84E | Tyseley | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 6367 | 84E | Tyseley | 85D | Kidderminster | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 6391 | 84E | Tyseley | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 7341 | 84B | Oxley | 84B | Oxley | |
22/09/1958 | Condemned | 5344 | 98W | COND | |||
22/09/1958 | Condemned | 5377 | 98W | COND | |||
25/09/1958 | Condemned | 5368 | 98W | COND | |||
26/09/1958 | Condemned | 5360 | 98W | COND | |||
29/09/1958 | Condemned | 5367 | 98W | COND | |||
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5306 | 84C | Banbury | 82C | Swindon | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5336 | 83D | Laira | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5381 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5385 | WES | Westbury | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 6304 | 81F | Oxford | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 6338 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 6367 | 85D | Kidderminster | 85A | Worcester | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 6377 | 84E | Tyseley | 87G | Carmarthen | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 6382 | 85D | Kidderminster | 85C | Hereford | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 7324 | 81F | Oxford | 81E | Didcot | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 9305 | 84E | Tyseley | 81E | Didcot | |
16/10/1958 | Condemned | 5335 | 98W | COND | |||
20/10/1958 | Condemned | 5386 | 98W | COND | |||
24/10/1958 | Condemned | 5312 | 98W | COND | |||
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 5324 | 87H | Neyland | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 5332 | 84C | Banbury | 87F | Llanelli | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 5361 | BAN | Banbury | 83F | Truro | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 6303 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 6310 | CARM | Carmarthen | 87F | Llanelli | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 6311 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 84B | Oxley | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 6337 | 84E | Tyseley | 83B | Taunton | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 6342 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 89A | Oswestry | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 6388 | 87H | Neyland | 81E | Didcot | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 6393 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 87G | Carmarthen | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 5345 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 5393 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 5396 | 85A | Worcester | 85D | Kidderminster | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 6311 | 84B | Oxley | 84C | Banbury | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 6350 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 6363 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 6371 | 89C | Machynlleth | 83C | Exeter | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 7323 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 5322 | 81E | Didcot | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 5361 | 83F | Truro | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 5393 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 5396 | 85D | Kidderminster | 85A | Worcester | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 6346 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 6354 | 82C | Swindon | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 6376 | 6E | Chester West | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 6399 | WES | Westbury | 84E | Tyseley | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 7319 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 85A | Worcester | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 7323 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
05/01/1959 | Condemned | 6318 | 98W | COND | |||
05/01/1959 | Condemned | 6322 | 98W | COND | |||
07/01/1959 | Condemned | 5394 | 98W | COND | |||
19/01/1959 | Condemned | 6328 | 98W | COND | |||
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 5333 | 84E | Tyseley | 85C | Hereford | |
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 5337 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 84C | Banbury | |
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 6360 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 6367 | 85A | Worcester | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 6371 | 83C | Exeter | 89C | Machynlleth | |
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 7336 | OXY | Oxley | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
26/01/1959 | Condemned | 4377 | 98W | COND | |||
17/02/1959 | Condemned | 5315 | 98W | COND | |||
21/02/1959 | Reallocation | 5333 | 85C | Hereford | 85D | Kidderminster | |
21/02/1959 | Reallocation | 5336 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
21/02/1959 | Reallocation | 5375 | 85A | Worcester | 84C | Banbury | |
21/02/1959 | Reallocation | 6391 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82C | Swindon | |
23/02/1959 | Condemned | 5398 | 98W | COND | |||
23/02/1959 | Condemned | 6354 | 98W | COND | |||
02/03/1959 | Condemned | 6355 | 98W | COND | |||
09/03/1959 | Condemned | 5388 | 98W | COND | |||
11/03/1959 | Reallocation | 7303 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 5321 | 87F | Llanelli | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 5361 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 5396 | 85A | Worcester | 85D | Kidderminster | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 6304 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 6353 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 84B | Oxley | |
01/04/1959 | Condemned | 6303 | 98W | COND | |||
06/04/1959 | Condemned | 6334 | 98W | COND | |||
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 5324 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 5378 | 84E | Tyseley | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 5393 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 6307 | 84E | Tyseley | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 6357 | 84E | Tyseley | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 6363 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
20/04/1959 | Condemned | 6331 | 98W | COND | |||
23/04/1959 | Condemned | 5355 | 98W | COND | |||
23/04/1959 | Condemned | 5382 | 98W | COND | |||
16/05/1959 | Reallocation | 5311 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
16/05/1959 | Reallocation | 5339 | 83C | Exeter | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
16/05/1959 | Reallocation | 5351 | 82C | Swindon | 84C | Banbury | |
16/05/1959 | Reallocation | 5396 | 85D | Kidderminster | 85A | Worcester | |
16/05/1959 | Reallocation | 6363 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
08/06/1959 | Condemned | 5345 | 98W | COND | |||
13/06/1959 | Reallocation | 5361 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 87F | Llanelli | |
13/06/1959 | Reallocation | 7320 | 87F | Llanelli | 87H | Neyland | |
18/06/1959 | Reallocation | 7337 | 82C | Swindon | 83B | Taunton | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 5318 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 84E | Tyseley | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 5322 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 84E | Tyseley | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 5330 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 87G | Carmarthen | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 5381 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 87F | Llanelli | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 6345 | 84K | Chester West | 87F | Llanelli | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 6368 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 85A | Worcester | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 6388 | 81E | Didcot | 85D | Kidderminster | |
28/07/1959 | Condemned | 5341 | 98W | COND | |||
08/08/1959 | Reallocation | 5381 | 87F | Llanelli | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
11/08/1959 | Condemned | 4358 | 98W | COND | |||
24/08/1959 | Condemned | 6308 | 98W | COND | |||
01/09/1959 | Condemned | 5381 | 98W | COND | |||
01/09/1959 | Condemned | 6305 | 98W | COND | |||
05/09/1959 | Reallocation | 5322 | 84E | Tyseley | 82C | Swindon | |
05/09/1959 | Reallocation | 5337 | 84C | Banbury | 81E | Didcot | |
05/09/1959 | Reallocation | 5351 | 84C | Banbury | 81E | Didcot | |
05/09/1959 | Reallocation | 5370 | TYS | Tyseley | 87F | Llanelli | |
05/09/1959 | Reallocation | 5375 | 84C | Banbury | 81E | Didcot | |
07/09/1959 | Condemned | 6359 | 98W | COND | |||
14/09/1959 | Condemned | 5321 | 98W | COND | |||
14/09/1959 | Condemned | 5378 | 98W | COND | |||
14/09/1959 | Condemned | 6397 | 98W | COND | |||
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 5306 | 82C | Swindon | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 5318 | 84E | Tyseley | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 5322 | 82C | Swindon | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 5330 | 87G | Carmarthen | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6393 | 87G | Carmarthen | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
05/10/1959 | Condemned | 5393 | 98W | COND | |||
12/10/1959 | Condemned | 5356 | 98W | COND | |||
12/10/1959 | Condemned | 6358 | 98W | COND | |||
19/10/1959 | Condemned | 5375 | 98W | COND | |||
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 5361 | 87F | Llanelli | 87E | Landore | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6313 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81E | Didcot | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6323 | 83B | Taunton | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6337 | 83B | Taunton | 87C | Danygraig | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6360 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 87C | Danygraig | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6363 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6364 | TN | Taunton | 84C | Banbury | |
16/11/1959 | Condemned | 5319 | 98W | COND | |||
16/11/1959 | Condemned | 6399 | 98W | COND | |||
23/11/1959 | Condemned | 6325 | 98W | COND | |||
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 6319 | LA | Laira | 83D | Laira | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 6333 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 6337 | 87C | Danygraig | 83B | Taunton | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 6363 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 6385 | 83C | Exeter | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 7341 | 84B | Oxley | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
07/12/1959 | Condemned | 5350 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1959 | Reallocation | 5361 | 87E | Landore | 81E | Didcot | |
26/12/1959 | Reallocation | 6302 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81E | Didcot | |
26/12/1959 | Reallocation | 6319 | 83D | Laira | 83C | Exeter | |
26/12/1959 | Reallocation | 6368 | 85A | Worcester | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
26/12/1959 | Reallocation | 7319 | 85A | Worcester | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
26/12/1959 | Reallocation | 7338 | 85A | Worcester | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
11/01/1960 | Condemned | 6393 | 98W | COND | |||
18/01/1960 | Condemned | 5361 | 98W | COND | |||
18/01/1960 | Condemned | 6311 | 98W | COND | |||
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 5339 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 5376 | 83F | Truro | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 6319 | 83C | Exeter | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 6327 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82C | Swindon | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 6353 | 84B | Oxley | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 6360 | 87C | Danygraig | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 6364 | 84C | Banbury | 84E | Tyseley | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 6368 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 7308 | 84C | Banbury | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 5326 | 81E | Didcot | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 6333 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81E | Didcot | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 6335 | 89C | Machynlleth | 84C | Banbury | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 6366 | 82C | Swindon | 86K | Tredegar | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 7300 | WES | Westbury | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
26/03/1960 | Reallocation | 6300 | 83F | Truro | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
26/03/1960 | Reallocation | 6316 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 87G | Carmarthen | |
26/03/1960 | Reallocation | 6353 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84B | Oxley | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 5399 | 84K | Chester West | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 6380 | CHR | Chester West | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
02/05/1960 | Condemned | 5353 | 98W | COND | |||
09/05/1960 | Condemned | 5396 | 98W | COND | |||
14/05/1960 | Reallocation | 5399 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
14/05/1960 | Reallocation | 6380 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
16/05/1960 | Condemned | 5333 | 98W | COND | |||
21/05/1960 | Reallocation | 6310 | 87F | Llanelli | 87H | Neyland | |
21/05/1960 | Reallocation | 6347 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 87G | Carmarthen | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 6306 | 87H | Neyland | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 6333 | 81E | Didcot | 89C | Machynlleth | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 6368 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85D | Kidderminster | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 6395 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 89C | Machynlleth | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 7312 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 87G | Carmarthen | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 7314 | 87F | Llanelli | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 7319 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 83B | Taunton | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 7333 | 83D | Laira | 83B | Taunton | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 7334 | 84C | Banbury | 87G | Carmarthen | |
27/06/1960 | Condemned | 6300 | 98W | COND | |||
11/07/1960 | Condemned | 6323 | 98W | COND | |||
25/07/1960 | Condemned | 6307 | 98W | COND | |||
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 6335 | 84C | Banbury | 85A | Worcester | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 6341 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 6345 | 87F | Llanelli | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 6368 | 85D | Kidderminster | 85A | Worcester | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 6382 | 85C | Hereford | 85A | Worcester | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 7341 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84B | Oxley | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 6363 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 82D | Westbury | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 6370 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 6395 | 89C | Machynlleth | 85A | Worcester | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 7338 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85A | Worcester | |
16/09/1960 | Condemned | 5324 | 98W | COND | |||
16/09/1960 | Condemned | 5370 | 98W | COND | |||
16/09/1960 | Condemned | 6332 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1960 | Condemned | 6343 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1960 | Condemned | 6371 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1960 | Condemned | 6389 | 98W | COND | |||
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 6363 | 82D | Westbury | 81E | Didcot | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 6374 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 6375 | 83B | Taunton | 85A | Worcester | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 7319 | 83B | Taunton | 87F | Llanelli | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 7321 | 87F | Llanelli | 87H | Neyland | |
11/10/1960 | Condemned | 5384 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | COND | ||
24/10/1960 | Condemned | 5311 | 98W | COND | |||
24/10/1960 | Condemned | 5337 | 98W | COND | |||
24/10/1960 | Condemned | 6333 | 98W | COND | |||
24/10/1960 | Condemned | 6377 | 98W | COND | |||
24/10/1960 | Condemned | 6398 | 98W | COND | |||
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 5332 | 87F | Llanelli | 87G | Carmarthen | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 5369 | 84E | Tyseley | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 6364 | 84E | Tyseley | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 6374 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
10/11/1960 | Condemned | 5331 | 84G | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
21/11/1960 | Condemned | 6351 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | COND | ||
21/11/1960 | Condemned | 6352 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | COND | ||
21/11/1960 | Condemned | 6360 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | COND | ||
21/11/1960 | Condemned | 6382 | 85A | Worcester | COND | ||
29/11/1960 | Condemned | 5339 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | COND | ||
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 6342 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 6349 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 88A | Cardiff Canton | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 6353 | 84B | Oxley | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 6395 | 85A | Worcester | 89C | Machynlleth | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 7305 | 84C | Banbury | 83B | Taunton | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 7317 | TYS | Tyseley | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
31/12/1960 | Reallocation | 6348 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86C | Hereford | |
31/12/1960 | Reallocation | 6387 | 84C | Banbury | 85A | Worcester | |
31/12/1960 | Reallocation | 7315 | 84C | Banbury | 85A | Worcester | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 6310 | 87H | Neyland | 87F | Llanelli | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 6317 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84C | Banbury | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 6340 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 83D | Laira | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 6367 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84C | Banbury | |
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 5358 | 82D | Westbury | 85A | Worcester | |
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 6353 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84B | Oxley | |
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 7321 | 87H | Neyland | 87G | Carmarthen | |
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 7326 | 85C | Hereford | 83D | Laira | |
25/03/1961 | Reallocation | 6312 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 83B | Taunton | |
25/03/1961 | Reallocation | 7326 | 83D | Laira | 83B | Taunton | |
22/04/1961 | Reallocation | 6340 | 83D | Laira | 83B | Taunton | |
20/05/1961 | Reallocation | 6391 | 82C | Swindon | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
13/06/1961 | Condemned | 5351 | 98W | COND | |||
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 6336 | 82C | Swindon | 89C | Machynlleth | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 6347 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87H | Neyland | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 6362 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 88J | Aberdare | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 6379 | 81E | Didcot | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 6380 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 6386 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 88J | Aberdare | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 7322 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 88J | Aberdare | |
15/07/1961 | Reallocation | 6312 | 83B | Taunton | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
12/08/1961 | Reallocation | 6350 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 81E | Didcot | |
04/09/1961 | Condemned | 5318 | 98W | COND | |||
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 6362 | 88J | Aberdare | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 6386 | 88J | Aberdare | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 7322 | 88J | Aberdare | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 5369 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82C | Swindon | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 6320 | 82D | Westbury | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 6335 | 85A | Worcester | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 6347 | 87H | Neyland | 87G | Carmarthen | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 6373 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 7300 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 7314 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 7339 | 84B | Oxley | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 7341 | 84B | Oxley | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
09/10/1961 | Condemned | 5332 | 98W | COND | |||
19/10/1961 | Condemned | 6329 | 98W | COND | |||
19/10/1961 | Condemned | 6392 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1961 | Condemned | 7322 | 98W | COND | |||
04/11/1961 | Reallocation | 5306 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
04/11/1961 | Reallocation | 5330 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
04/11/1961 | Reallocation | 6366 | 86K | Tredegar | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
04/11/1961 | Reallocation | 7325 | 84C | Banbury | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
04/11/1961 | Reallocation | 7335 | 83D | Laira | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
13/11/1961 | Condemned | 6341 | 98W | COND | |||
21/11/1961 | Condemned | 6306 | 98W | COND | |||
21/11/1961 | Condemned | 6313 | 98W | COND | |||
02/12/1961 | Reallocation | 7306 | NEY | Neyland | 87G | Carmarthen | |
02/12/1961 | Reallocation | 7320 | 87H | Neyland | 87G | Carmarthen | |
30/12/1961 | Reallocation | 6353 | 84B | Oxley | 89C | Machynlleth | |
30/12/1961 | Reallocation | 7302 | WES | Westbury | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
27/01/1962 | Reallocation | 6309 | 82C | Swindon | 81E | Didcot | |
27/01/1962 | Reallocation | 6357 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 87G | Carmarthen | |
27/01/1962 | Reallocation | 7317 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 88A | Cardiff Canton | |
19/02/1962 | Condemned | 6348 | 98W | COND | |||
15/03/1962 | Condemned | 5326 | 98W | COND | |||
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 6301 | 83D | Laira | 84B | Oxley | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 6375 | 85A | Worcester | 84B | Oxley | |
29/03/1962 | Condemned | 6302 | 98W | COND | |||
02/04/1962 | Condemned | 6324 | 98W | COND | |||
03/04/1962 | Condemned | 7328 | 98W | COND | |||
03/04/1962 | Condemned | 7334 | 98W | COND | |||
05/04/1962 | Condemned | 6336 | 98W | COND | |||
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 7338 | 85A | Worcester | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
14/05/1962 | Condemned | 6376 | 98W | COND | |||
14/05/1962 | Condemned | 6390 | 98W | COND | |||
19/05/1962 | Reallocation | 6337 | 83B | Taunton | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
19/05/1962 | Reallocation | 6378 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89C | Machynlleth | |
19/05/1962 | Reallocation | 7340 | 87H | Neyland | 87H | Neyland | |
08/06/1962 | Condemned | 5376 | 98W | COND | |||
16/06/1962 | Reallocation | 5357 | 87H | Neyland | 87F | Llanelli | |
16/06/1962 | Reallocation | 5385 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 87F | Llanelli | |
16/06/1962 | Reallocation | 6316 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87F | Llanelli | |
16/06/1962 | Reallocation | 6347 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87F | Llanelli | |
16/06/1962 | Reallocation | 6349 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 87F | Llanelli | |
16/06/1962 | Reallocation | 6357 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87F | Llanelli | |
16/06/1962 | Reallocation | 7340 | 87H | Neyland | 87F | Llanelli | |
22/06/1962 | Condemned | 6387 | 98W | COND | |||
03/07/1962 | Condemned | 7313 | 98W | COND | |||
05/07/1962 | Condemned | 6310 | 98W | COND | |||
13/07/1962 | Condemned | 5385 | 98W | COND | |||
13/07/1962 | Condemned | 6340 | 98W | COND | |||
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 5330 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 5357 | 87F | Llanelli | 87H | Neyland | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 5358 | 98W | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 6301 | 84B | Oxley | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 6366 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 88A | Cardiff Canton | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 6368 | 85A | Worcester | 89C | Machynlleth | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 6375 | 84B | Oxley | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 7320 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87H | Neyland | |
17/07/1962 | Condemned | 5358 | 89C | Machynlleth | COND | ||
25/07/1962 | Condemned | 6316 | 98W | COND | |||
31/07/1962 | Condemned | 6339 | 98W | COND | |||
03/08/1962 | Condemned | 6374 | 98W | COND | |||
10/08/1962 | Condemned | 7323 | 98W | COND | |||
10/08/1962 | Condemned | 7338 | 98W | COND | |||
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 6327 | 82C | Swindon | 83B | Taunton | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 7312 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87F | Llanelli | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 7315 | 85A | Worcester | 87F | Llanelli | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 7321 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87F | Llanelli | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 7340 | 87F | Llanelli | 87H | Neyland | |
24/08/1962 | Condemned | 7302 | 98W | COND | |||
01/09/1962 | Condemned | 6362 | 98W | COND | |||
01/09/1962 | Condemned | 7331 | 98W | COND | |||
05/09/1962 | Condemned | 6386 | 98W | COND | |||
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 5369 | 82C | Swindon | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 6326 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 6345 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 7314 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 7317 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 7325 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
17/09/1962 | Condemned | 5399 | 98W | COND | |||
17/09/1962 | Condemned | 6342 | 98W | COND | |||
17/09/1962 | Condemned | 6366 | 98W | COND | |||
17/09/1962 | Condemned | 6391 | 98W | COND | |||
17/09/1962 | Condemned | 7305 | 98W | COND | |||
17/09/1962 | Condemned | 7311 | 98W | COND | |||
17/09/1962 | Condemned | 7316 | 98W | COND | |||
17/09/1962 | Condemned | 7336 | 98W | COND | |||
17/09/1962 | Condemned | 7341 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1962 | Condemned | 5357 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1962 | Condemned | 6312 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1962 | Condemned | 6330 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1962 | Condemned | 6388 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1962 | Condemned | 7300 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1962 | Condemned | 7301 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1962 | Condemned | 7321 | 98W | COND | |||
25/09/1962 | Condemned | 7330 | 98W | COND | |||
27/09/1962 | Condemned | 7309 | 98W | COND | |||
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 5369 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 6319 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82D | Westbury | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 6346 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 83C | Exeter | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 6364 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 84G | Kidderminster | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 6395 | 89C | Machynlleth | 87F | Llanelli | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 7332 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82D | Westbury | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 7340 | 87H | Neyland | 87G | Carmarthen | |
15/10/1962 | Condemned | 6301 | 89B | Croes Newydd | COND | ||
22/10/1962 | Condemned | 7324 | 81E | Didcot | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Reallocation | 6356 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82D | Westbury | |
03/11/1962 | Reallocation | 6375 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
03/11/1962 | Reallocation | 7314 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 7340 | 87G | Carmarthen | 81E | Didcot | |
02/12/1962 | Reallocation | 6344 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
02/12/1962 | Reallocation | 7303 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | |
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 6353 | 89C | Machynlleth | 82D | Westbury | |
07/01/1963 | Condemned | 7329 | 98W | COND | |||
14/01/1963 | Condemned | 6356 | 82D | Westbury | COND | ||
14/01/1963 | Condemned | 6370 | 86G | Pontypool Road | COND | ||
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 5306 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 7308 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 82D | Westbury | |
11/02/1963 | Condemned | 6369 | 98W | COND | |||
26/02/1963 | Condemned | 7314 | 98W | COND | |||
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 7312 | 87F | Llanelli | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 7318 | 87H | Neyland | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 7320 | 87H | Neyland | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
06/04/1963 | Reallocation | 7312 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
06/04/1963 | Reallocation | 7318 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
06/04/1963 | Reallocation | 7320 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
24/05/1963 | Condemned | 6314 | 98W | COND | |||
24/05/1963 | Condemned | 6353 | 98W | COND | |||
01/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6346 | 83C | Exeter | 82D | Westbury | |
15/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6317 | 84C | Banbury | 84G | Kidderminster | |
24/06/1963 | Condemned | 6384 | 98W | COND | |||
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6319 | 82D | Westbury | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6346 | 82D | Westbury | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6368 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89C | Machynlleth | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6375 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 87G | Carmarthen | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6378 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89C | Machynlleth | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6379 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81E | Didcot | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 7308 | 82D | Westbury | 81E | Didcot | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 7332 | 82D | Westbury | 87G | Carmarthen | |
02/07/1963 | Condemned | 6335 | 98W | COND | |||
14/07/1963 | Reallocation | 6368 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89C | Machynlleth | |
14/07/1963 | Reallocation | 6378 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89C | Machynlleth | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 5322 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 6338 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 7325 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
26/08/1963 | Condemned | 6319 | 98W | COND | |||
26/08/1963 | Condemned | 6379 | 98W | COND | |||
31/08/1963 | Reallocation | 6368 | 89C | Machynlleth | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
31/08/1963 | Reallocation | 6378 | 89C | Machynlleth | 81E | Didcot | |
10/09/1963 | Condemned | 7335 | 98W | COND | |||
17/09/1963 | Condemned | 6375 | 98W | COND | |||
17/09/1963 | Condemned | 7326 | 98W | COND | |||
23/09/1963 | Condemned | 5380 | 98W | COND | |||
23/09/1963 | Condemned | 6327 | 98W | COND | |||
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 6349 | 87F | Llanelli | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 6357 | 87F | Llanelli | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 7315 | 87F | Llanelli | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 7317 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 83B | Taunton | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 7332 | 87G | Carmarthen | 83B | Taunton | |
03/10/1963 | Condemned | 7333 | 98W | COND | |||
21/10/1963 | Condemned | 6365 | 98W | COND | |||
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 5330 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 5336 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 83B | Taunton | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6367 | 84C | Banbury | 81E | Didcot | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6385 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81E | Didcot | |
20/11/1963 | Condemned | 5369 | 98W | COND | |||
20/11/1963 | Condemned | 6317 | 98W | COND | |||
20/11/1963 | Condemned | 6320 | 98W | COND | |||
20/11/1963 | Condemned | 6344 | 98W | COND | |||
20/11/1963 | Condemned | 6381 | 98W | COND | |||
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 5306 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6337 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81E | Didcot | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6380 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 7303 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 83B | Taunton | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 7307 | 87F | Llanelli | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 7310 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 7312 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
01/12/1963 | Reallocation | 6395 | 87F | Llanelli | 2P | Kidderminster | |
02/12/1963 | Condemned | 6385 | 98W | COND | |||
02/12/1963 | Condemned | 7304 | 98W | COND | |||
07/12/1963 | Reallocation | 6394 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 2P | Kidderminster | |
16/12/1963 | Condemned | 6368 | 98W | COND | |||
16/12/1963 | Condemned | 7315 | 98W | COND | |||
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 5306 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 6326 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 83B | Taunton | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 6345 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 83B | Taunton | |
28/12/1963 | Condemned | 6347 | 98W | COND | |||
28/12/1963 | Condemned | 6372 | 98W | COND | |||
28/12/1963 | Condemned | 6373 | 98W | COND | |||
28/12/1963 | Condemned | 6380 | 98W | COND | |||
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 7306 | 87G | Carmarthen | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
28/12/1963 | Condemned | 7312 | 98W | COND | |||
28/12/1963 | Condemned | 7317 | 98W | COND | |||
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 7319 | 87F | Llanelli | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 7339 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
06/01/1964 | Condemned | 6350 | 98W | COND | |||
15/01/1964 | Condemned | 6304 | 98W | COND | |||
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 5330 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 81E | Didcot | |
22/02/1964 | Reallocation | 6364 | 84G | Kidderminster | 2L | Leamington | |
08/04/1964 | Condemned | 7332 | 98W | COND | |||
13/04/1964 | Reallocation | 6346 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
24/04/1964 | Condemned | 5322 | 98W | COND | |||
24/04/1964 | Condemned | 7325 | 98W | COND | |||
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 6363 | 81E | Didcot | 81E | Didcot | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 7318 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 7320 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
06/05/1964 | Condemned | 6361 | 98W | COND | |||
01/06/1964 | Condemned | 7307 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 5330 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 6338 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 6378 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 6394 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 7308 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 7310 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 7339 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 7340 | 98W | COND | |||
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 6357 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 6363 | 81E | Didcot | 83B | Taunton | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 7318 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 7320 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
06/07/1964 | Condemned | 5306 | 98W | COND | |||
06/07/1964 | Condemned | 6337 | 98W | COND | |||
13/07/1964 | Condemned | 6357 | 98W | COND | |||
08/08/1964 | Reallocation | 6364 | 2L | Leamington | 2P | Kidderminster | |
10/08/1964 | Condemned | 6349 | 98W | COND | |||
15/08/1964 | Reallocation | 6364 | 2P | Kidderminster | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | |
15/08/1964 | Reallocation | 6395 | 2P | Kidderminster | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | |
24/08/1964 | Reallocation | 6346 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
24/08/1964 | Reallocation | 7320 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 83B | Taunton | |
01/09/1964 | Condemned | 7306 | 98W | COND | |||
01/09/1964 | Condemned | 7337 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 5336 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 6309 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 6326 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 6345 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 6346 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 6363 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 7303 | 98W | COND | |||
09/10/1964 | Condemned | 7319 | 98W | COND | |||
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 7320 | 83B | Taunton | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 6367 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 7318 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 7320 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 7327 | 98W | COND | |||
21/11/1964 | Condemned | 6364 | 98W | COND | |||
21/11/1964 | Condemned | 6395 | 98W | COND |